Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al v. Home Depot, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00261
District Judge John Gleeson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 4:27 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Visa, Inc. Visa, Inc., Plaintiff
Visa International Service Association Visa International Service Association, Plaintiff
Visa U.S.A., Inc. Visa U.S.A., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Adam Eisenstein +1 202 942 6606 +1 202 942 5999 matthew.eisenstein@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C. Mason +1 212 715 1088 +1 212 715 1399 robert_mason@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark R Merley +1 202 942 5321 +1 202 942 5999 Mark.Merley@APORTER.COM
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Vizas +1 415 356 3000 +1 415 356 3099 robert.vizas@aporter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holwell Shuster & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard J. Holwell +1 646 837 5152 +1 646 837 5150 rholwell@hsgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary Adam Kerner +1 646 837 5164 +1 646 837 5150 zkerner@hsgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Demian Alexander Ordway +1 646 837 5159 +1 646 837 5150 dordway@hsgllp.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael S. Shuster +1 646 837 5151 +1 646 837 5150 mshuster@hsgllp.com
v.
Home Depot USA, Inc. Home Depot USA, Inc., Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Home Depot, Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alicia Kimberly Cobb +1 212 849 7267 +1+1+ 1+1 1+1 +1+1 aliciacobb@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Neuwirth +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 stephenneuwirth@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steig David Olson +1 212 849 7152 +1 212 849 7100 steigolson@quinnemanuel.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Reply in Support
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
            Letter dated 1/27/2016 from James Horah J. to Clerk of Court. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Priftakis, Tina) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Letter
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arun Subramanian by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Subramanian, Arun) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Letter to Judge Brodie re courtesy copies by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                        REPLY in Support re (6389 in 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 Reply Declaration of Brian D. Graifman filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Doc. 6016 Class response to MCAG 9/11/13, # 2 Exhibit B) Minute Entries) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                          REPLY in Support re (6389 in 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 Reply Memorandum of Law filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                            Letter MOTION for Hearing on coordinated expedited scheduling by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re (6 in 1:15-cv-00264-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 of Brian D. Graifman filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) Injunctive Order Doc 6349, # 2 Exhibit B) Order 11/5/14, # 3 Exhibit C) Ltr of Class 11/16/13 doc 6088, # 4 Exhibit D) Class motion Doc 6127 12/12/13, # 5 Exhibit E) 12/20/13 Order Doc 6137 granting prelim inj, # 6 Exhibit F) 12/30/13 Order Doc 6147 modifying prelim inj, # 7 Exhibit G) Transcript 1/10/14 Doc 6193, # 8 Exhibit H) Order 1/13/14 doc 6193, # 9 Exhibit I) Ltr of Sirota 2/7/14 doc 6233, # 10 Exhibit J) Docket order 2/25/14, # 11 Exhibit K) Class counsel proposed communications 4/14/14 Doc 6300, # 12 Exhibit L) Ltr-opp Sirota 5/2/14 Doc 6318, # 13 Exhibit M) Class reply 5/12/14 doc 6319, # 14 Exhibit N) Transcript 5/30/14 court conf, # 15 Exhibit O) Letter of class counsel 10/14/14 Doc 6350, # 16 Exhibit P) CCB Notice of appeal doc 6351 of 10/3/14 injunctive order, # 17 Exhibit Q) CCB Notie of appeal doc 6356 of 11/5/14 docket order Doc 6356, # 18 Exhibit R) CCB Amended notice of appeal Doc 6358 of docket order, # 19 Exhibit S) Second Circuit Docket Sheet, # 20 Exhibit T) Scheduling Order of Second Circuit, # 21 Exhibit U) Plan of Admin & Distrib 10/19/12 Doc 1656-1, # 22 Exhibit V) Additional Info re Plan of Distrib & Admoin 4/11/13 Doc 2112-1, # 23 Exhibit W) Affidavit of Neil Zola 6/8/09 doc 1486 from Visa Check case) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re (6 in 1:15-cv-00264-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 of Mark L. Schneider filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Schneider) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re (6 in 1:15-cv-00264-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 of Brad Heffler filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re (6388 in 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on brief to follow for various relief see 6390, (6389 in 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO) MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 filed by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Vacate (212 in 1:05-cv-05319-MKB-JO, 18 in 1:13-cv-06339-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05074-MKB-JO, 66 in 1:06-cv-02532-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-00984-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:04-cv-01604-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05879-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-05073-MKB-JO, 105 in 1:05-cv-05870-MKB-JO, 49 in 1:06-cv-05583-MKB-JO, 12 in 1:14-cv-01980-MKB-JO, 109 in 1:05-cv-05868-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:13-cv-03474-MKB-JO, 149 in 1:05-cv-04974-MKB-JO, 59 in 1:07-cv-00592-MKB-JO, 102 in 1:05-cv-05880-MKB-JO, 63 in 1:13-cv-03074-MKB-JO, 40 in 1:09-cv-02264-MKB-JO, 20 in 1:13-cv-03473-MKB-JO, 40 in 1:09-cv-03225-MKB-JO, 151 in 1:05-cv-05153-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05081-MKB-JO, 100 in 1:05-cv-05878-MKB-JO, 223 in 1:05-cv-04520-MKB-JO, 103 in 1:05-cv-05871-MKB-JO, 183 in 1:05-cv-04194-MKB-JO, 166 in 1:05-cv-03924-MKB-JO, 23 in 1:13-cv-05352-MKB-JO, 142 in 1:05-cv-04677-MKB-JO, 97 in 1:05-cv-05869-MKB-JO, 31 in 1:13-cv-03355-MKB-JO, 206 in 1:05-cv-04650-MKB-JO, 159 in 1:05-cv-03800-MKB-JO, 60 in 1:06-cv-00078-MKB-JO, 56 in 1:13-cv-05746-MKB-JO, 20 in 2:14-cv-00873-MKB-JO, 222 in 1:05-cv-04521-MKB-JO, 176 in 1:05-cv-05080-MKB-JO, 196 in 1:05-cv-04728-MKB-JO, 173 in 1:05-cv-05071-MKB-JO, 15 in 1:14-cv-00880-MKB-JO, 30 in 1:14-cv-00321-MKB-JO, 175 in 1:05-cv-05083-MKB-JO, 218 in 1:05-cv-05207-MKB-JO, 155 in 1:05-cv-04131-MKB-JO, 161 in 1:05-cv-03925-MKB-JO, 60 in 1:06-cv-01829-MKB-JO, 60 in 1:06-cv-01830-MKB-JO, 108 in 1:05-cv-05883-MKB-JO, 67 in 1:06-cv-02534-MKB-JO, 175 in 1:05-cv-05076-MKB-JO, 167 in 1:05-cv-05078-MKB-JO, 174 in 1:05-cv-05070-MKB-JO, 61 in 1:06-cv-05765-MKB-JO, 31 in 1:14-cv-02318-MKB-JO, 60 in 1:06-cv-01831-MKB-JO, 183 in 1:05-cv-05075-MKB-JO, 107 in 1:05-cv-05881-MKB-JO, 6349 in 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO, 17 in 1:14-cv-00261-MKB-JO, 171 in 1:05-cv-05077-MKB-JO, 106 in 1:06-cv-00039-MKB-JO, 172 in 1:05-cv-05082-MKB-JO, 60 in 1:06-cv-01832-MKB-JO, 107 in 1:05-cv-05882-MKB-JO, 107 in 1:05-cv-05884-MKB-JO, 107 in 1:05-cv-05885-MKB-JO, 113 in 1:13-cv-05745-MKB-JO, 173 in 1:05-cv-05069-MKB-JO, 1666 in 1:96-cv-05238-MKB-JO, 169 in 1:05-cv-05866-MKB-JO, 170 in 1:05-cv-05072-MKB-JO, 207 in 1:05-cv-04799-MKB-JO, 36 in 1:13-cv-03059-MKB-JO, 155 in 1:05-cv-05352-MKB-JO) Order,, Order,, AND FOR INDICATIVE RULING FOR APPEAL AND STAY by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-MKB-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                          JPMDL ORDER REASSIGNING LITIGATION: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, with the consent of that court, this litigation is reassigned to the Honorable Margo K. Brodie for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                                            Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL as to Order,, by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC Amended Notice of Appeal. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Suggestion of Case Reassignment: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the above-captioned case and all individual member cases from the Honorable John Gleeson, United States District Judge, to the Honorable Margo K. Brodie, United States District Judge.The Clerk of Court is further directed to transmit a copy of this Suggestion of Case Reassignment to Thomasenia O. Duncan, Panel Executive for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/5/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Suggestion of Case Reassignment: The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign the above-captioned case and all individual member cases from the Honorable John Gleeson, United States District Judge, to the Honorable Margo K. Brodie, United States District Judge.The Clerk of Court is further directed to transmit a copy of this Suggestion of Case Reassignment to Thomasenia O. Duncan, Panel Executive for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/5/2014. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL by Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0207-7374286. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Dale Graifman on behalf of Claims Compensation Bureau, LLC (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 12/03/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE OF ATTORNEY by Wesley Railey Powell, Matthew Stephen Freimuth. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: Memorandum and order (1) granting permanent injunction against Premier Enterprises Group, Inc.; (2) declining to grant permanent injunction against other third party claims filing companies, i.e., Settlement Recovery Group, LLC, Managed Care Advisory Group, Spectrum Settlement Recovery, Financial Recovery Services, Inc., and Refund Recovery Services, Inc.; and (3) ordering the Court-mandated language be included on any contracts drafted by third party claims filing companies to be signed by class members. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 10/3/2014. Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Ross, Peter) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (6343 in 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO) Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Jon M Zimmerman. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0207-7216374. (Furman, Joshua) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry and Order for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. (Please see attached list for attorney appearances.) Oral Argument held on 7/18/2014 in case 14-MD-1720 regarding the defendants motions to dismiss the opt-out complaints/claims 20 and 93 , the defendants motions to dismiss the declaratory judgment actions 23 and 24 . The arguments were heard and the Court has DENIED all of these motions to dismiss for the reasons as stated on the record. Regarding the defendants motion to dismiss the Salveson Plaintiffs' complaint (filed as docket entry #38 in the case 14-CV-03529), the Court has reserved the decision and will file this decision separately via ECF. Other remaining issues were heard and further submissions shall be filed by 9/23/14. (Court Reporter Anthony Mancuso. Email: Anthony_Mancuso@nyed.uscourts.gov) Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO et al.(Lee, Ilene) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Steig David Olson on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO, 1:14-cv-00261-JG-JO (Olson, Steig) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Alicia Kimberly Cobb on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO, 1:14-cv-00261-JG-JO (Cobb, Alicia) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO, 1:14-cv-00261-JG-JO (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Neuwirth on behalf of Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc. (aty to be noticed) Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO, 1:14-cv-00261-JG-JO (Neuwirth, Stephen) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Visa U.S.A., Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa Inc.. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 5/9/2014, answer due 5/30/2014; Home Depot, Inc. served on 5/9/2014, answer due 5/30/2014. (Shuster, Michael) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re (20 in 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Air Canada, Air New Zealand Limited, Alticor Inc, Amway Corporation, Atlantic Retail Ventures Inc, Autotronic Systems Inc, Bestway Limousine, Bestway Limousine Inc dba Casino Holiday, Big Diamond LLC, Big Diamond Number 1 LLC, Blarney Castle Oil Company, Blue Nile LLC, CCSH Atlanta LLC, CNMK Texas Properties LLC, CST Arkansas Stations LLC, CST Brands Inc, CST California Stations Inc, CST Diamond LP, CST Marketing and Supply Company, CST Metro LLC, CST Security Services Inc, CST Services LLC, CST USA Inc, Calloway Golf Company, Calloway Golf Interactive Inc, Calloway Golf Sales Company, Century Theaters Inc, CheapCarribbean.com Inc, Cinemark Partners II Ltd, Cinemark USA Inc, Cinergy Corporation, City of Houston, ClubCorp USA Inc, Delta Airlines, Inc., Delta Private Jets Inc, Diamond Foods LLC, Diamond Shamrock Arizona Inc, Diamond Shamrock Stations Inc, Duke Energy Business Services LLC, Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation, Duke Energy Florida Inc, Duke Energy Indiana Inc, Duke Energy Kentucky Inc, Duke Energy Ohio Inc, Duke Energy Progress Inc, El Al Israel Airlines, Ltd., Emerald Foods Inc, Emerald Marketing Inc, Etihad Airways, Eva Airways Corporation, Everything Energy LLC d/b/a Independence Energy, Fastrac Markets LLC, GHC Specialty Brands LLC, Greeley Ltd, Group 1 Automotive, Inc., HST Grand Central LLC, HST Kierland LLC, HST Lessee Boston LLC, HST Lessee CMBS LLC, HST Lessee Cincinnati LLC, HST Lessee Denver LLC, HST Lessee Indianapolis LLC, HST Lessee Keystone LLC, HST Lessee LAX LP, HST Lessee Mission Hills LP, HST Lessee Needham LLC, HST Lessee S Coast LP, HST Lessee SLT LLC, HST Lessee SNYT LLC, HST Lessee SR Houston LP, HST Lessee San Diego LP, HST Lessee Tucson LLC, HST Lessee WNY LLC, HST Lessee Waltham LLC, HST Union Square LLC, HST W Seattle LLC, HST WRN LLC, Harris County Hospital District d/b/a Harris County Health System, Harris County Texas, Hidden Glen at Bentdale Farms, Host Hotels and Resorts LP, ITC Service Inc, Imperial Supplies LLC, J Hilburn Inc, Jack Griffith's Gas-Up LLC (formerly known as Jack Griffith's Gas-Up Inc), Jetstar Airways Limited, K Partners Hospitality Group LP, KEL Inc d/b/a Dimensions, Kiosk Operations Inc, LQ Management LLC, La Quinta Inns Inc, Laredo Theater Ltd, MAPCO Express Inc, MGM Resorts Vacations LLC dba MGM Mirage Resorts Vacations, MLT Inc, Mary Kay Inc, Murphy Oil USA Inc, NRG EV Services LLC d/b/a eVgo, National Convenience Store Incorporated, OnCue Marketing LLC, Orbitz LLC ("Orbitz.com"), Orbitz Worldwide LLC, Pier 1 Imports (U.S.), Inc., Progress Energy Inc, Progress Energy Services Company LLC, Qantas Airways Limited, R-Roof Assets LLC, R-Roof Business Trust I, R-Roof Business Trust IV, R-Roof Business Trust VI, R-Roof Funds LLC, R-Roof Holdings I LLC, R-Roof Holdings II LLC, R-Roof I LLC, R-Roof II LLC, R-Roof III LLC, R-Roof IV LLC, R-Roof Mezz I LLC, R-Roof Mezz II LLC, R-Roof Mezz III LLC, R-Roof Mezz IV LLC, R-Roof Mezz V LLC, R-Roof Mezz VI A LLC, R-Roof Mezz VI B LLC, R-Roof Mezz VI LLC, R-Roof V LLC, R-Roof VI LLC, RRI Reservations LLC, Radioshack Corporation, Red Roof Franchising LLC, Red Roof Inns, Inc., Red Wing Brands of America Inc, Red Wing Shoe Company Inc, Reliant Energy Retail Services LLC, Ricker Oil Company Inc, SCI Funeral and Cemetery Purchasing Cooperative Inc, SCK Inc a/k/a SC Kiosks Inc, Service Corporation International, Shaw's Gulf LLC (formerly known as Shaw's Gulf Inc), Sigmor Beverage Inc, Sigmor Company LLC, Sigmor Number 103 Inc, Sigmor Number 105 Inc, Sigmor Number 119 Inc, Sigmor Number 178 Inc, Sigmor Number 196 Inc, Sigmor Number 238 Inc, Sigmor Number 259 Inc, Sigmor Number 422 Inc, Sigmor Number 43 Inc, Sigmor Number 5 Inc, Sigmor Number 79 Inc, Sigmor Number 80 Inc, Singapore Airlines Limited, Skipper Beverage Company LLC, Societe Air France, Suit Mark Inc, Sunshine Beverage Company, TE Electronics LP, TOC-DS Company, TXU Energy Retail Company LLC, The Mark Travel Corporation, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Adventure Tours USA, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Blue Sky Tours Inc, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Global Booking Solutions (G2 Switchworks), The Mark Travel Corporation dba Lamacchia Enterprises Inc, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Mark International, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Nevada Coaches LLC, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Showtime Tours, The Mark Travel Corporation dba Trisept Solutions, The Mark Travel Corporation dba VAX Vacation Access, The Mark Travel dba United Vacations Hawaii, The Men's Wearhouse, Inc., The Neptune Society Inc, Trans Global Tours LLC, Traterra, Travelocity.com LP, Trip Network Inc ("Cheaptickets.com"), US Retailers LLC d/b/a Pennywise Power, United Supermarkets LLC, VRG Diamond Holdings LLC, Vacation Together Inc, Vacation Together Inc dba Sears Vacation, Valero Energy Corporation, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Valley Shamrock Inc, WW Grainger Inc, Wesco Inc, Zoro Tools Inc, uPlay Inc. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Norman, Richard) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re (20 in 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Giant Eagle, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Marcus, Bernard) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL by Vicente Consulting LLC . (Siegel, Edward) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Letter to Sandra A. Jones re: pro hac vice filing fee by Minnesota Twins LLC Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Zweig, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER directing that the New Actions will be coordinated in In re Payment Card Interchange Fee and Merchant Discount Antitrust Litigation, 1 :05-md-01720-JG-JO (E.D.N.Y.), under docket number 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO, which itself shall be included in 1:05-md-01720-JG-JO and listed as a related case therein.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on 2/14/2014. Associated Cases: 1:14-md-01720-JG-JO et al. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    DISCLOSURE of Interested Parties by Visa U.S.A., Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Home Depot, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        COMPLAINT against All Defendants Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Visa U.S.A., Inc., Visa International Service Association, Visa Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?