Joseph E. McLaughlin
Bankruptcy Case Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 95-12691
District Judge Frank J. Bailey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 9:10 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carolyn Bankowski-13, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Carolyn ZZ-Bankowski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn ZZ-Bankowski 13trustee@ch13boston.com
No Logo Mark G. Degiacomo, Trustee

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Murtha Cullina Roche Carens & DeGiacomo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Murtha Cullina Roche Carens & DeGiacomo +1 617 451 9300

Toggle Switch Represented by Murtha Cullina LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark G. DeGiacomo +1 617 457 4000 +1 617 482 3868 mdegiacomo@murthalaw.com
Space Olga L. Gordon +1 617 457 4000 +1 617 482 3868 ogordon@murthalaw.com
No Logo Joseph E. McLaughlin, Debtor

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph E. McLaughlin
No Logo Joseph M. Fleury, Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Bardsley & Gray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James P. Bardsley +1 508 985 0054 JBardsley@BardsleyandGray.com
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/1/2014, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 169 Order Denying the Payment of Unclaimed Funds) Notice Date 06/01/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
    Order Denying the Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds without Prejudice. (jc) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 168 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
      Deficiency Notice. The Court is unable to process the Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds without additional information. Deficiency Due 3/27/2014. (Re: 167 Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds) (jc) Replaced Notice with Correct one on 2/10/2014 (jc). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/10/2014 (jc). (Entered: 02/10/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
        Petition For Payment of Unclaimed Funds filed by PNC Bank, National Association on behalf of PNC Bank Successor to Mid-Lantic National Bank in the amount of 862.06. (Attachments: # 1 Vendor Information/Certification # 2 Proposed Order) (mem) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/1/2014, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (Re: 60 Order Denying the Payment of Unclaimed Funds) Notice Date 06/01/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
            Order Denying the Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds without prejudice. (jc) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 59 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
              Deficiency Notice. The Court is unable to process the Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds without additional information. Deficiency Due 3/27/2014. (Re: 58 Petition for Payment of Unclaimed Funds) (jc) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                Petition For Payment of Unclaimed Funds filed by PNC Bank, National Association on behalf of CLC Consumer Services in the amount of $2,955.46. (Attachments: # 1 Vendor Information/Certification # 2 Proposed Order) (mem) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 1,500 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?