Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. v. Belli
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11597

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 7:32 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (362) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 USCA Mandate
MANDATE of USCA as to [326] Notice of Appeal, filed by Regency Service Company, Inc. Appeal [326] Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 8/8/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 USCA Judgment
    USCA Judgment as to[326] Notice of Appeal, filed by Regency Service Company, Inc. Appellee's motions for sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 38 are denied. AFFIRMED. Judgment issued in the USCA 7/5/2012 (Ramos, Jeanette)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: 2/1/2012 Motion for Leave to File
      MOTION for Leave to File REPLY TO PESPONSE TO MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION WAIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER PETER BELLI and by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gulko, Gershon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/31/2012: # (1) Exhibit 1) (Danieli, Chris). (Main Document 364 replaced on 1/31/2012) (Danieli, Chris).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012 Opposition to Motion
          Opposition re [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 12/25/2011, Entered: 12/25/2011 Response
            Response by Peter Belli to [347] Writ Issued . (Attachments: # (1) Response To Writ)(Gulko, Gershon)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE to Motion re [359] MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/30/12 to File Response/Reply as to [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment , [358] MOTION for Extension of Time to for 30 days to Response Deadline Corrected FIling. Please delete previous Response To Motion for Extension of Time filing. filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Response to Motion
                RESPONSE to Motion re [359] MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/30/12 to File Response/Reply as to [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment , [358] MOTION for Extension of Time to for 30 days to Response Deadline filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to 1/30/12 to File Response/Reply as to [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: 12/21/2011 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION for Extension of Time to for 30 days to Response Deadline by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Motion for Hearing
                      Request for Hearing re [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli.(Danieli, Chris)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Declaration
                        DECLARATION re [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli. (Danieli, Chris)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Statement of Facts
                          Concise STATEMENT of facts re [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment . (Danieli, Chris)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [348] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Peter Belli. (Danieli, Chris)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Exhibit
                              EXHIBITS 13 thru 16 re [356]DECLARATION re 348 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 to link the Exhibits to the Declaration (Danieli, Chris).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Exhibit
                                EXHIBITS 9 thru 12 re [356]DECLARATION re 348 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment, by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 to Link the Exhibits to the Declaration (Danieli, Chris).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Exhibit
                                  EXHIBITS 7 and 8 re [356] DECLARATION re 348 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 to link the Exhibits to the Declaration(Danieli, Chris).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Exhibit
                                    EXHIBIT 3 thru 6 re [356] DECLARATION re 348 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment, by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 t0 link the Exhibits to the Declaration(Danieli, Chris).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Exhibit
                                      EXHIBITS 1 and 2 re [356] DECLARATION re 348 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 to link the Exhibits to the Declaration(Danieli, Chris).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Motion to Set Aside Judgment
                                        MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum, # (2) Concise Statement of Facts, # (3) Declaration of Joe Bird, # (4) Request For Hearing)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/19/2011 removing the attachments from this entry as they should have been filed as separate events. Please refer to dkt. no. 354 for the Memorandum in Support of this Motion; dkt. no. 355 for the Concise Statement of Facts; dkt. no. 356 for the Declaration; and dkt. no. 357 for the Request of Hearing (Danieli, Chris).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: 12/9/2011 Writ Issued
                                          WRIT of First Execution issued (Danieli, Chris)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 12/1/2011, Entered: 12/1/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders in response to 11/29/11 letter from J. Bird. (Saunders, Diane)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Joseph C. Bird. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Opposition re [342] MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and Defendant's Objection to Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [342] MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and Defendant's Objection to Issuance of Writ of Execution filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/15/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Motion for Sanctions
                                                    MOTION for Sanctions Under Rule 11 and Defendant's Objection to Issuance of Writ of Execution by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: 11/15/2011 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                      Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. Document received: First Writ of Execution. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Anderson, Jennifer)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 6/18/2011, Entered: 6/18/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        Assented to REPLY to Response to [338] MOTION to Alter Judgment RE: Satisfaction of Judgment Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Reply, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                          Opposition re [338] MOTION to Alter Judgment RE: Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 ~Motion to Alter Judgment
                                                            MOTION to Alter Judgment RE: Satisfaction of Judgment by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Statement/Counter Statement of Facts, # (2) Memorandum, # (3) Request for Hearing, # (4) Affidavit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Neal M. Brown (Brown, Neal)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Joseph C. Bird, Esquire to Judge Nancy Gertner. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: 5/11/2011 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY to Response to [330] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph C. Bird Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3392094 filed by Peter Belli, Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Opposition by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Reply In Opposition to Motion, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Opposition re [330] MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph C. Bird Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3392094 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email from J. Bird, # (2) Exhibit Email from J. Bird)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Transcript -AppealCourt Filing
                                                                          Transcript of Motion Hearing held on June 29, 2009, before Judge Nancy Gertner. COA Case No. 11-1374. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 5/26/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2011. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph C. Bird Filing fee: $ 50, receipt number 0101-3392094 by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Appearance, # (2) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by M. Amy Carlin (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011 Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Diane M. Saunders (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                  Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [326] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [324] Judgment, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, [325] Judgment by Regency Service Company, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 4/26/2011. (Burgos, Sandra)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                      Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; FINAL JUDGMENT Against Regency. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/10/2011 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; FINAL JUDGMENT Against Belli. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011 Objection
                                                                                          Objection to [322] Proposed Document(s) submitted, [321] Proposed Document(s) submitted by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Judgment Against Regency. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                              Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Judgment Against Belli. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: 3/3/2011 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: Motions Regarding Damages.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/25/2011 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [315] MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation). (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: 1/24/2011 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Opposition re [315] MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation). (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [315] MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [315] MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Transaction Detail List)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Motion for Bill of Costs
                                                                                                          MOTION for Bill of Costs by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011 Bill of Costs
                                                                                                            BILL OF COSTS by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Neal M. Brown, Esq.. (Brown, Neal) (Main Document 313 replaced on 1/11/2011) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2011: # (1) Exhibit) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: 1/6/2011 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders regarding Proposed Final Judgments. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment Against Regency, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Final Judgment Against Belli)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: 12/31/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                  Opposition re [276] Amended MOTION for Order to to Assess Damages, [265] MOTION for Order Post Hearing Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Damages filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: 12/17/2010 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Transcript of Hearing held on December 7, 2010, before Judge Nancy Gertner. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 1/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/18/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2011. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave for file Reply to Response to [297] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/17/2010 (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Main Document 307 replaced on 12/17/2010) (Gaudet, Jennifer). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/17/2010: # (1) proposed reply brief) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 12/14/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT re 10/12/2010 Hearing. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: 12/9/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                              Opposition re [295] First MOTION to Withdraw MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, [297] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Second Opposition re [290] MOTION for Declaratory Judgment Corrected filed by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [290] MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Amended Exhibit List for 12-7-10 Damages Hearing by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp... (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                      Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Joe James in Support re [276] Amended MOTION for Order to to Assess Damages filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Transcript of Hearing held on November 23, 2010, before Judge Nancy Gertner. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 12/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/3/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/3/2011. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders In Opposition to Neal Brown's Request for Guidance. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Gershon M. Gulko, Esq.. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ( Responses due by 12/16/2010) by Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc..(Brown, Neal) Modified on 12/3/2010 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Neal M. Brown. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 11/23/2010, Entered: 11/23/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [292] Emergency MOTION to Continue Damages Hearing to December 2, 2010 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Continue Damages Hearing to December 2, 2010 by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [290] MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: 11/22/2010 Motion for Declaratory Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Declaratory Judgment by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Kathleen Patterson to Judge Gertner. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [284] Emergency MOTION in Limine filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 11/18/2010, Entered: 11/18/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re [284] Emergency MOTION in Limine filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [284] Emergency MOTION in Limine and in Opposition re [281] Defendants Motion for Further Clarification filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [284] Emergency MOTION in Limine filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                        Emergency MOTION in Limine by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [282] Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing on Damages to 12/28, 12/29, 1230 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                            Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing on Damages to 12/28, 12/29, 1230 by Peter Belli.(Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Motion for Clarification
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Clarification by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                Third Notice of Supplemental Authorities re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Listing of court findings filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Notice of Supplemental Authorities re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by Peter Belli to [271] Order. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Notice of Supplemental Authorities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Supplemental Authorities re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Listing of admissible documents from 9-15-10 hearing filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Amended MOTION for Order to to Assess Damages by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp... (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                                            Allied's Witness List for 11/23/10 Hearing on Damages by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Hearing on Damages held on October 12, 2010, before Judge Nancy Gertner. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at vaohara@gmail.com Redaction Request due 11/10/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/18/2011. (Folan, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Nancy Gertner: PROCEDURAL ORDER Re Upcoming Damages Hearing entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Amy Carlin re: Request for Two Week Adjournment of Damages Hearing Set for October 12, 2010. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Nancy Gertner: PRELIMINARY MEMORANDUM re: Scope of Damages Hearing and Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re [265] MOTION for Order filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit with Exhibits)(Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental MEMORANDUM in Support re [265] AMENDED MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane) Modified on 10/7/2010 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [265] AMENDED MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Second Supplemental Declaration filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Saunders, Diane) Modified on 10/7/2010 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Order to Assess Damages by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. Amendment to [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Amended Application For Damages. (Saunders, Diane) Modified on 10/7/2010 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re [240] MOTION to Set Aside filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Motion re [257] MOTION for Order to Exclude Certain Testimony and Evidence At Damages Hearing filed by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: 10/5/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File SUR REPLY by Peter Belli.(Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to [257] MOTION for Order to Exclude Certain Testimony and Evidence At Damages Hearing filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Certain Testimony and Other Evidence at Damages Hearing by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First Opposition re [257] MOTION for Order to Exclude Certain Testimony and Evidence At Damages Hearing filed by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [257] MOTION for Order to Exclude Certain Testimony and Evidence At Damages Hearing by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-3, # (2) Exhibit 4)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 9/23/2010, Entered: 9/23/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Order to Exclude Certain Testimony and Evidence At Damages Hearing by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, a copy of which is attached to this entry.. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/21/2010 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Motion Hearing held on September 15, 2010, before Judge Nancy Gertner. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Valerie OHara at 617-737-2346 Redaction Request due 10/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2010. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT re [253] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Peter Belli. (Brown, Neal)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Order to Move Deadline for Defendant's Submission from 9/21 to 9/20 by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Neal M. Brown on behalf of Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Leave to reply granted on 9/14/10 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [247] Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing For Damages to October 4, 2010 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: 9/13/2010 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION to Continue Hearing For Damages to October 4, 2010 by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/10/2010, Entered: 9/10/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Gershon M. Gulko, Esquire. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [243] Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment with Proposed Reply filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment with Proposed Reply by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [240] MOTION to Set Aside filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Reply)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 8/18/2010, Entered: 8/18/2010 Motion to Set Aside
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency Corrected Filing and Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment, filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Gershon Affidavit, Belli Affidavit, Exhibits)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 8/18/2010 to change event to Motion (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: 8/17/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency and Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [237] Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to August 17, 2010 to File Response to Application for Damages filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to August 17, 2010 to File Response to Application for Damages by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-3)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First AFFIDAVIT of Joe James in Support re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-4, # (2) Exhibit 5-7, # (3) Exhibit 8 (Part 1), # (4) Exhibit 8 (Part 2)-9)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Syed Rizvi in Support re [231] MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Motion for Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Order to Assess Damages Against Belli and Regency by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 7-29-10 to File Damages Application by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: 6/16/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Gershon Gulko in response to letter from Diane Saunders. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/15/2010, Entered: 6/15/2010 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders, Counsel for Allied Regarding Damages Hearing Currently Scheduled for July 26, 2010. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MANDATE of USCA as to [215] Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Belli. Appeal [215] Terminated. Mandate issued in the USCA 5/17/2010 (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 USCA Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Judgment as to[215] Notice of Appeal, filed by Peter Belli. We have carefully reviewed the parties' submissions. Defendant's unopposed motion for voluntary dismissal of the appeal is GRANTED. Judgment issued in the USCA 4/23/2010 (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. JUDGMENT in favor of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. against Regency Service Company, Inc.(York, Steve)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [217] MOTION to Strike Defendant Regency's Answer and Counterclaims MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency Service Company, Inc. filed by Regency Service Company, Inc.. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Stay CASE by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to 02/03/2010 to File Opposition to Motion by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Feb 2, 2010 to File Opposition to Motion by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Judgment. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant Regency's Answer and Counterclaims and Motion for Default Judgment. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re [217] MOTION to Strike Defendant Regency's Answer and Counterclaims MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency Service Company, Inc. by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike Defendant Regency's Answer and Counterclaims, MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency Service Company, Inc.( Responses due by 1/28/2010) by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: 1/11/2010 Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re [215] Notice of Appeal, (Ramos, Jeanette)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Peter Belli re: (Judge Nancy Gertner: Electronic ORDER entered granting in part [206] Allied's Motion for Default Judgment against Regency. Entered on 12/10/09) Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 01010000000002733888 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/clerks/transcript.htm MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/efiling.htm. Appeal Record due by 1/28/2010. (Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 1/12/2010 (Hourihan, Lisa).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Regency Service Company, Inc. to [210] Opposition to Motion. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [206] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency Reply Declaration - Leave to Reply Granted on 12/9/09 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [206] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency Leave to Reply Granted on 12/9/09 filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: 12/8/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: 12/3/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to Motion re [206] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency filed by Regency Service Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/29/2009 to correct text. (Alves-Baptista, Antonia).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/3/2009 to File Motion by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/02/2009 to File Response/Reply by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [206] MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2009: # (1) signed main document) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Default Judgment as to Regency by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2009: # (1) signed main document) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [199] MOTION Pierce Corporate Veil Between Regency and Belli filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Memorandum, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to 10-26-2009 to Further Enlarge Time by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/28/2009: # (1) corrected main document) (Gaudet, Jennifer). Modified on 10/28/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to 10-23-2009 to File Opposition to Motion by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 10/22/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION Reschedule Pretrial Conference and Trial by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [199] MOTION Pierce Corporate Veil Between Regency and Belli filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [199] MOTION Pierce Corporate Veil Between Regency and Belli filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Pierce Corporate Veil Between Regency and Belli by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: 10/1/2009 Default -JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation against Peter Belli.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Judgment by Default. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/13/2009, Entered: 9/13/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [195] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [190] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Counterclaim filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: 9/10/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [190] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Counterclaim by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [187] MOTION to Strike Peter Belli's Answer & Counterclaims and Enter Default Judgment Against Him filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: 9/8/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [187] MOTION to Strike Peter Belli's Answer & Counterclaims and Enter Default Judgment Against Him filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Peter Belli re [186] Letter/request (non-motion). (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [190] MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Counterclaim filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: 9/1/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Verified Counterclaim by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Second Amended Verified Counterclaim, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [187] MOTION to Strike Peter Belli's Answer & Counterclaims and Enter Default Judgment Against Him filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [187] MOTION to Strike Peter Belli's Answer & Counterclaims and Enter Default Judgment Against Him filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 8/31/2009, Entered: 8/31/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike Peter Belli's Answer & Counterclaims and Enter Default Judgment Against Him by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from Gershon Gulko. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered; MEMORANDUM AND ORDER.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re [179] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of M. Amy Carlin in Opposition re [179] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [179] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/2/2009, Entered: 8/2/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Support re [179] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/26/2009, Entered: 7/26/2009 Addendum to Motion/Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Gershon M. Gulko re [179] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 8/3/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: 7/25/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: 7/24/2009 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter/request (non-motion) from M. Amy Carlin Regarding This Court's Order on Allied's Motion for Contempt dated July 8, 2009. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 7/15/2009, Entered: 7/15/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of M. Amy Carlin CORRECTED VERSION in Support of Allied's Request for Fees and Costs as Allowed by this Court's Orders dated July 8, 2009 by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of M. Amy Carlin in Support of Allied's Requests for Fees and Costs pursuant to Court Orders dated July 8, 2009 on Allied's Motion for Sanctions, Motion for Contempt and Motion to Compel Documents and Computer Hard Drive by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Diane Saunders in support of REPLY to Response to [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-H)(Saunders, Diane) Modified on 7/13/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/27/2009, Entered: 6/27/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [170] Affidavit in Support of Motion Oppose Plaintiff's Supplemental Declaration Regarding Motion For Contempt by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/27/2009, Entered: 6/27/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/27/2009, Entered: 6/27/2009 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re [167] MOTION to Compel Defendant Peter Belli's Production of Documents and Computer Hard Drive filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION re [167] MOTION to Compel Defendant Peter Belli's Production of Documents and Computer Hard Drive by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A through L, # (2) Exhibit M)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [167] MOTION to Compel Defendant Peter Belli's Production of Documents and Computer Hard Drive filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Defendant Peter Belli's Production of Documents and Computer Hard Drive by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [165] Reply to Response to Motion by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: 5/13/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 5, 2009 to File Response/Reply to [160] Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Response to Defendant Belli's Opposition to Allied's Motion for Summary Judgment by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition re [156] MOTION to Strike Defendant Peter Belli's Late-Filed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, Or In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File a Reply filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT re [160] Opposition to Motion, Exhbits to Peter Belli Affidavit by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition re [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Material Facts in Dispute, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/25/2009, Entered: 4/25/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to April 27, 2009 to File Response/Reply as to [148] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Issue of Whether Peter Belli was an Employee or a Franchise by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 4/27/2009 to link to Motion (Patch, Christine).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 25, 2009 to Enlarge Time for filing Opposition to Motion by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 4/17/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [156] MOTION to Strike Defendant Peter Belli's Late-Filed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, Or In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File a Reply. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike Defendant Peter Belli's Late-Filed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt, Or In the Alternative, Motion for Leave to File a Reply by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/12/2009, Entered: 4/12/2009 Surreply to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUR-REPLY to Motion re [128] MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 4/16/2009 to correct the linkage (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/5/2009, Entered: 4/5/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Opposition re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/5/2009, Entered: 4/5/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Second AFFIDAVIT of Gershon Gulko in Opposition re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/5/2009, Entered: 4/5/2009 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Peter Belli. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C & D, # (4) Exhibit E & F, # (5) Exhibit G, # (6) Exhibit H, I, J, K & L, # (7) Exhibit M, N & O)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Statement of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of facts re [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re [148] MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment On the Issue of Whether Defendant Peter Belli Was an Employee or Franchisee by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit B)(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 3/30/2009 to correct event used (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [143] MOTION for Contempt filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Motion for Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. MOTION for Contempt Declaration in support by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Saunders, Diane) Modified on 3/20/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Motion for Contempt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Contempt by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION re [141] Reply to Response to Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to [128] MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Allied's Proposed Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Allied's Motion for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence, # (2) Supplement Proposed Reply Declaration of Diane Saunders, # (3) Exhibit A to Proposed Reply Declaration of Diane Saunders, # (4) Exhibit B to Proposed Reply Declaration of Diane Saunders)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support re [138] Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2009 to To File Summary Judgment Motions. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to April 3, 2009 to To File Summary Judgment Motions by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Opposition re [128] MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Memorandum of Law, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Exhibit OIG/HUD AUDIT REPORT)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to March 3, 2009 to File Opposition by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 2/25/2009 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Feb. 24, 2009 to File Opposition to Motion by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended ANSWER to [72] Counterclaim by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/12/2009, Entered: 2/12/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [120] MOTION to Bifurcate /Phase Issues for Summary Judgment filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit)(Gulko, Gershon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2009: # (2) Signed Main Document) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [128] MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-D, # (2) Exhibit E-J)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [128] MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Sanctions Against Defendant Belli for Spoliation of Evidence by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [119] MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2009 to Complete Discovery nunc pro tunc filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Opposition re [119] MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2009 to Complete Discovery nunc pro tunc filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of M. Amy Carlin re [124] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motions by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Opposition re [117] MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [120] MOTION to Bifurcate /Phase Issues for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, B, C and D)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re [120] MOTION to Bifurcate /Phase Issues for Summary Judgment filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Motion to Bifurcate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Bifurcate /Phase Issues for Summary Judgment by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to March 31, 2009 to Complete Discovery nunc pro tunc by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Supporting of Motion to Extend)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Opposition re [116] MOTION for Hearing Request for Status Conference filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Reconsider)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Hearing Request for Status Conference by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [114] Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to D)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: 1/14/2009 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [107] MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation). (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Third Party Complaint by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER entered. STIPULATION AND ORDER as to discovery and other issues.(Urso, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [107] MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc., Third Party Plaintiffs filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Memorandum of Law)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders re: Proposed Stipulation for Approval. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Stipulation)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in Support re [107] MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [107] MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint filed by Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation). (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint by Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation).(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [105] MOTION for Extension of Time to February 16, 2009 to file FRCP 56 motions. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to February 16, 2009 to file FRCP 56 motions by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [102] MOTION to Compel Nicholas Ruscitti to Produce Subpoenaed Records. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [102] MOTION to Compel Nicholas Ruscitti to Produce Subpoenaed Records filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Nicholas Ruscitti to Produce Subpoenaed Records by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Counts VIII & IX of Counterclaim filed by Peter Belli. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law)(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: 12/3/2008 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jim Hodge, Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp., filed by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION re [98] Memorandum in Support of Motion, [97] MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Plaintiff's General Counsel by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to 5)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re [97] MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Plaintiff's General Counsel filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Plaintiff's General Counsel by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [94] MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Ruscitti ESI filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A & B, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit C)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [94] MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Ruscitti ESI filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Ruscitti ESI by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to [83] Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION to Dismiss Counts VIII & IX of Counterclaim filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts VIII & IX of Counterclaim by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/22/2008, Entered: 11/22/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Jim Hodge served on 11/20/2008, answer due 12/10/2008. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Regarding Mr. Belli's ESI Password Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [70] MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order and For Sanctions Request for Costs filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Kurt Binder, Esquire Letter/request (non-motion) from Gershon M. Gulko, Esquire. (Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Regarding Mr. Belli's ESI Password Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Document disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document disclosure by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Third-Party Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jim Hodge(President and Chief Executive Officer of Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation), Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp., filed by Peter Belli.(Gulko, Gershon)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED ANSWER to [11] Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Jim Hodge, Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. by Peter Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. (Gulko, Gershon) Modified on 12/8/2008 to correct filer (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders Regarding Belli's ESI Password. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [80] MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Jim Hodge filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit, # (6) Exhibit, # (7) Exhibit, # (8) Exhibit, # (9) Exhibit, # (10) Exhibit, # (11) Exhibit, # (12) Exhibit, # (13) Exhibit)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the Deposition of Jim Hodge by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply Declaration by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Proposed Reply Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 3, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Gershon M Gulko in Opposition re [74] MOTION to Compel filed by Peter Belli, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition re [74] MOTION to Compel filed by Peter Belli, c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's [73]Motion to Strike Defendants Counterclaim and Cross MOTION for Leave to File a Third Party Complaint against Jim Hodge by Peter Belli, c/s.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Diane Saunders in Support re [74] MOTION to Compel filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-9, # (2) Exhibit 10-16)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: 10/1/2008 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [72] Counterclaim by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COUNTERCLAIM against Jim Hodge, Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp. filed by Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc., with Jury Demand.(Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Affidavit in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re [70] MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order and For Sanctions. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to 6)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: 9/26/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Compliance with Court Order and For Sanctions by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to [64] MOTION to Modify the Preliminary Injunction Order to Compel Peter Belli to Pay His Fair Share of the Data Center Lease (Leave to File Granted September 10, 2008) filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction Order (Granted September 10, 2008) by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Preliminary Injunction Order to Compel Defendant Peter Belli to Pay His Fair Share of the Data Center Lease by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Opposition re [64] MOTION to Modify the Preliminary Injunction Order to Compel Peter Belli to Pay His Fair Share of the Data Center Lease filed by Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc., c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION re [64] MOTION to Modify the Preliminary Injunction Order to Compel Peter Belli to Pay His Fair Share of the Data Center Lease by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A & B, # (2) Exhibit C, # (3) Exhibit D, # (4) Exhibit D (Part 2), # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Motion to Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify the Preliminary Injunction Order to Compel Peter Belli to Pay His Fair Share of the Data Center Lease by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition re [61] MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Access ESI filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp., c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support re [61] MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Access ESI filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A & B)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel Production of Password to Access ESI by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Statement of counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED STATEMENT OF COUNSEL RE: Pre-trial Schedule of Gershon Gulko by Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc., c/s. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Gershon M. Gulko on behalf of Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc. (Jones, Sherry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Recommendations for Scheduling Order Plaintiff's Proposed Revised Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request for status conference Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Diane Saunders. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time by defendants.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION re [52] Reply to Response to Motion by David Langston by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H (part one), # (9) Exhibit H (part two), # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [37] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition re [47] MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Peter Belli, Regency Service Company, Inc.. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by Peter Belli to [38] Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 (Exhibit 1-10 attached, too large to scan). (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2008: # (1) Endorsed Main Document) (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Vicki Edwards by Peter Belli. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Peter Belli. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in Support of the Corporations Inability to Retain Counsel and Request for Representation by Peter Belli, President by Regency Service Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit One, # (2) Exhibit two, # (3) Exhibit three, # (4) Exhibit four)(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Joint statement re scheduling conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants Proposed Statement of Pretrial Schedule. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [30] MOTION to Strike [29] Answer to Amended Complaint and in further support of motion filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER Permitting Peter Belli Access to E.C.F. entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Certification pursuant to Local Rule 16.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support re [37] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit E Part 1, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit E Part 2)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re [37] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re [37] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Count I by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TERMINATED-DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #37. MOTION for Summary Judgment on Count I by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Saunders, Diane) Modified on 1/23/2008 (Gaudet, Jennifer).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter/request (non-motion) from Kurt L. Binder. (Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Summons to Trustee Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons to Trustee Issued as to Milford National Bank & Trust. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER for Appointment of Special Process Server entered. (Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Motion for Special Process Server)(Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike [29] Answer to Amended Complaint by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Regency Service Company, Inc..(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Peter Belli.(Gaudet, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on September 4, 2007 before Judge Gertner. Court Reporter: Valerie A. O'Hara. The original transcripts are maintained by the Clerk's Office. Copies may be obtained by contacting the court reporter at 617/737-2346 or the Clerk's Office. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw Appearance by Seder & Chandler, LLP.(Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed Peter Belli served on 11/15/2007, answer due 12/5/2007. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed Regency Service Company, Inc. served on 11/19/2007, answer due 12/10/2007. (Saunders, Diane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Regency Service Company, Inc., Peter Belli, filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Nancy Gertner: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IN SUPPORT OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (PI dated September 6, 2007.)(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Preliminary InjunctionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Nancy Gertner: ORDER for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION entered. Written findings will follow.(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Peter Belli by Peter Belli. (Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Peter Belli. Document received: Preliminary Injunction Order. (Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and in Support of Defendant's Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order filed by Peter Belli. (Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F. Coppinger on behalf of Peter Belli (Coppinger, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service by M. Amy Carlin by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Revised Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION Second Supplemental of David Langston by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A and B to Second Supplemental Langston Declaration)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp., filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by M. Amy Carlin by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Proposed Document(s) submitted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Document(s) submitted by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Document received: Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eric Klenk in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of David Langston in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Langston Declaration# (2) Exhibit B to Langston Declaration# (3) Exhibit C to Langston Declaration# (4) Exhibit D to Langston Declaration)(Carlin, M.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns : ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order(Zierk, Marsha)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. Peter Belli served on 8/27/2007. Acknowledgement filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Diane Saunders by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5)(Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [2] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp..(Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Peter Belli, filed by Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corp.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?