Allied Home Mortgage Corporati v. Belli, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 11-1374

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 13, 2016 at 11:40 PM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106415538 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None
MANDATE issued. [11-1374, 11-1896] (AS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106411639 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Michael Boudin, Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: The petition for rehearing having been denied by the panel of judges who decided the case and the petition for rehearing en banc having been submitted to the active judges of this court and a majority of the judges not having voted that the case be heard en banc, it is ordered that the petition for rehearing and petition for rehearing en banc be denied. [11-1374, 11-1896] (AS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106411191 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
      RESPONSE filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation in 11-1374 to motion to reconsider [5658487-2]. Certificate of service dated 07/30/2012. [11-1374, 11-1896] (DS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106407036 Filed: 7/19/2012, Entered: None
        MOTION to reconsider [5654771-2] filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. in 11-1374. Certificate of service dated 07/19/2012. [11-1374, 11-1896]. (BHM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106400872 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          JUDGMENT entered by Sandra L. Lynch, Chief Appellate Judge; Kermit V. Lipez, Appellate Judge and Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge. 11-1374 Affirmed 11-1896 Affirmed [11-1374, 11-1896] (AH)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106398621 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE issued. After 07/13/2012, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Joseph C. Bird for Regency Service Company, Inc. and Neal M. Brown for Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (AS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106325333 Filed: 1/28/2012, Entered: None
              MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2012. [11-1374] (BHM)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106283048 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                RESPONSE filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. to motion for sanctions [5589249-2], motion for sanctions [5588688-2], affidavit [5588690-2]. Certificate of service dated 10/27/2011. [11-1374] (BHM)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106279025 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
                  CORRECTED MOTION for sanctions filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106278333 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                    REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 10/17/2011. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/26/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106278320 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                      ORDER granting motion for leave to file oversized addendum to reply brief filed by Appellants Regency Service Company, Inc. and Peter M. Belli. [11-1374] (AS)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106278177 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                        MOTION for leave to file Addendum to Reply Brief filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (BHM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106277903 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT in support of motion for sanctions [5588688-2] filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106277898 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for sanctions filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/18/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106277071 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None
                              BRIEF tendered by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106269210 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
                                ORDER granting motion for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. [11-1374] (AS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106268142 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. to motion for leave to file supplemental appendix [5583373-2]. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106267419 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                    MOTION for leave to file supplemental appendix filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106267353 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2011. [11-1374] (RL)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106267349 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                        APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2011. Reply brief due 10/17/2011 for appellant Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 10/05/2011. [11-1374] (RL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106267289 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106251916 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: None
                                            REPLY filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation to response and motion to dismiss or for summary disposition [5575072-2]. [11-1374] (DS)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106251140 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE to motion to dismiss or for summary disposition [5573628-2] filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374]--[Edited 08/25/2011 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Relief selection was incorrect and/or incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BHM)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106250798 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2011. Brief due 09/28/2011 for appellee Allied Home Mortgage Capital Corporation. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/01/2011. [11-1374] (RL)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106248258 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                  BRIEF tendered by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2011. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106248008 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to dismiss or for summary disposition filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Corporation. Certificate of service dated 08/19/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106247421 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: None
                                                      BRIEF tendered by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106242794 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER directing Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. to file a conforming brief. Brief due 08/22/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106242304 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106240419 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appeal Wage Case filed by Appellant Peter M. Belli. Certificate of service dated 08/02/2011. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106238501 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                              ORDER directing Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. to file a conforming brief. Brief due 08/09/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106237668 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                BRIEF tendered by Appellant Peter M. Belliand Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2011. [11-1374]--[Edited 07/26/2011 by RL] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was incorrect and/or incomplete. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. [11-1374] (BHM)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106231930 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  ORDER directing Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. to file a conforming brief. Brief due 07/26/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106231918 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge granting in part motion to extend time to file appendix filed by Appellants Regency Service Company, Inc. and Peter M. Belli. Appendix due 07/26/2011 for appellant Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106230776 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to extend time to file appendix filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106230754 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        RESPONSE filed by Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Corporation to motion to extend time to file appendix [5563885-2]. Certificate of service dated 07/11/2011. [11-1374]--[Edited 07/11/2011 by AS]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (DS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106230440 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2011. [11-1374]--[Edited 07/11/2011 by AS] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Motion to extend time to file appendix should have been filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (BHM)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106226294 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief and appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief due 07/12/2011. Appendix due 07/12/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106207205 Filed: 5/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 06/20/2011 for appellant Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Appendix due 06/20/2011 for appellant Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106202550 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc. indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 06/29/2009, voir dire. Transcript(s) due 06/27/2011 from Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106202547 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106202544 Filed: 4/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of appearance filed by Attorney Brian H. Mahany for Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106200279 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Allied Home Mortgage Corporation filed by Attorney Diane M. Saunders. Certificate of service dated 04/25/2011. [11-1374] (DS)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106195978 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #326) filed by Appellants Peter M. Belli and Regency Service Company, Inc.. Docketing Statement due 04/27/2011. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/27/2011. Appearance form due 04/27/2011. [11-1374] (AS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?