United States v. O'Hara

Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00228
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 11, 2022 at 12:38 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Annette Bongiorno, Defendant

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ERIC R. BRESLIN +1 973 424 2063 +1 973 424 2001 erbreslin@duanemorris.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com

Represented by Sercarz & Riopelle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Caliendo +1 212 586 4900 +1 212 586 1234 rcaliendo@sercarzandriopelle.com
Space Diane Ferrone +1 212 586 4900 +1 212 586 1234 dferrone@sercarzandriopelle.com
Space Roland G. Riopelle +1 212 586 4900 +1 212 586 1234 rriopelle@sercarzandriopelle.com
Space Maurice H. Sercarz +1 212 586 4900 +1 212 586 1234 sercarzlaw@worldnet.att.net

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (992) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Page 1 Page 2

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1571 Filed: 3/11/2022, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1570 Filed: 3/9/2022, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1522 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1521 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: None Letter Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1520 Filed: 12/22/2018, Entered: None Release from Custody
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1496 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Warden Manuel Ocasio from Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated 10/26/2017 re: I write in regard to Ms. Annette Bongiorno, Bureau of Prisons ("BOP") Register Number: 96064-004, who is currently incarcerated at FCI Coleman Medium. (ft) (Entered: 10/26/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1495 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 1494 LETTER MOTION as to Annette Bongiorno (4). By letter application dated October 18, 2017 (Docket Entry No. 1494), Defendant Bongiorno requests "clerical" correction or other reduction or revision of her sentence in light of the Bureau of Prisons' inability to comply in full with the Court's recommendation that Ms. Bongiorno be designated to home confinement for the final year of her custodial term. The foregoing request for amendment, reduction or revision of the custodial sentence is denied, as there was no clerical error and the Court's intent was to commit Ms. Bongiorno to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for the stated custodial term, with recommended reentry conditions. The Court will, however, write to the Bureau of Prisons and the Warden of the facility to reiterate and clarify its recommendation that the maximum portion of the custodial term permitted under 18 U.S.C. § 3624(c)(1) be served under conditions (such as a halfway house) providing a reasonable opportunity for adjustment and preparation for reentry and that six months of that period be served in home confinement, as authorized by 18 U.S.C. § 3624(c)(2). This order resolves Docket Entry No. 1494. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/25/2017) (ft) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1494 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 10/18/17 re: Alter Judgment . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1493 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Alter Judgment . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript, # 2 Exhibit Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Reuters Article)(Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 10/18/2017 (ka). (Entered: 10/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
FINAL ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to Annette Bongiorno. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED THAT Pursuant to Title 21, United States Code, Section 853 (n) (7) the United States of America shall and is hereby deemedto have clear title to the Specific Property. On the third business day following entry of this Order as to the Specific Property (the "Transfer Date"), the Government shall direct E*Trade and STIS to, and pursuant to thatdirection E*Trade and STIS shall, create the New E*Trade Account and the New Sun Trust Account and cause the Released Stocks in their custody to be transferred to the New E*Trade Account and the New Sun Trust Account, the Trustee Recovered Stocks to be transferred from the E*Trade Account to the Trustee through instructions to be provided by a representative of the Trustee employed by Baker & Hostetler LLP, and the Retained Margin Debt to be transferred from the E*Trade Account to the New E*Trade Account. The defendant and Rudy Bongiorno shall authorize such transfers and complete any necessary authorizations. These transfers shall be for the benefit of the Trustee, the defendant and Rudy Bongiorno and with the consent of the defendant and Rudy Bongiorno. The United States Marshals Service shall take possession of the Specific Property and dispose of the same according to law, in accordance with Title 21, United States Code, Section 853(h). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/19/2016)(jw) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Niketh Velamoor dated October 14, 2016 . Document filed by USA as to Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Final Order of Forfeiture)(Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1464 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SERVICE BY PUBLICATION as to Annette Bongiorno. A Notice of Criminal Forfeiture was published in the www.forfeiture.gov on June 22, 2016 through July 21, 2016. Document filed by USA as to Annette Bongiorno. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1463 Filed: 8/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1229 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 1239 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 1238 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 1247 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 1241 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. USCA Case Number 14-4714-cr(L), 14-4715-cr(Con), v. 14-4716-cr(Con), 14-4719-cr(Con), 15-50-cr (con). UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgments entered on December 16, 2014 (Daniel Bonventre), December 17, 2014 (Annette Bongiorno), December 19, 2014 (Jerome O'Hara), December 22, 2014 (George Perez), and December 31, 2014 (Joann Crupi), are AFFIRMED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 08/17/2016. (nd) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1460 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen and Niketh Velamoor dated 6/16/2016 re: Reschedule Conference....ENDORSEMENT.. The Conference is adjourned to September 9, 2016 at 4:30pm( Status Conference set for 9/9/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/17/2016)(jw) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1458 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
AMENDED CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY / MONEY JUDGMENT: as to (S10-10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno....[See this Order]... NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED THAT, by and between the United States, United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys Niketh Velamoor and Jonathan Cohen, of counsel, the defendant, Annette Bongiorno, by counsel, Roland Riopelle, Esq. and Rudy Bongiorno, by counsel, James Druker, Esq., and Irving H. Picard, Esq., by counsel, Fernando Bohorquez, Esq., that: 1. As a result of committing the offenses charged 1n Counts One, Six, and Nine of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $155,158,703,200 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant, for wh1ch she shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her codefendants in this case, DANIEL BONVENTRE, JOANN CRUPI a/k/a "Jodi," JEROME O'HARA, GEORGE PEREZ, ERIC S. LIPKIN, DAVID L. KUGEL, ENRICA COTELESSA-PITZ, CRAIG KUGEL, IRWIN LIPKIN, PETER MADOFF, and PAUL J. KONIGSBERG, as well as any forfeiture money judgment entered against BERNARD L. MADOFF in United States v. Madoff, 09 Cr. 213 (DC), and DAVID G. FRIEHLING in United States v. Friehling, 09 Cr. 700 (AKH). 2. As a result of the offenses charged in Counts One, Six, and Nine of the Indictment, all of the defendant's right, title and interest in the Specific Property is hereby forfeited to the United States for disposition in accordance with the law, subject to the provisions of Title 21, United States Code, Section 853. 3. The defendant and Rudy Bongiorno withdraw and relinquish any claim to the Specific Property and the Trustee Recovered Stocks and agree that they will not object to the entry of a Final Order of Forfeiture or otherwise contest the judicial forfeiture of such property under the U.S. forfeiture laws or assist a third party in doing so. 4. Upon entry of a Final Order of Forfeiture as to the Specific Property, the Government shall relinquish any claim to the Released Stocks, the Trustee Recovered Stocks and Cape Coral Property and shall not seek the forfeiture of same. 5. Upon entry of a Final Order of Forfeiture forfeiting the Specific Property to the United States, the Specif1c Property shall be applied in partial satisfaction of the Money Judgment....[See this Order]... 33. The Court shall have exclusive jur1sdiction over the interpretation and enforcement of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment and shall retain jurisdiction to amend it as necessary, pursuant to Rule 32.2(e) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. 34. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment, the United States Attorney's Office is authorized to conduct any discovery needed to identify, locate or dispose of forfeitable property, including depositions, interrogatories, requests for production of documents and the issuance of subpoenas, pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 35. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Niketh Velamoor, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/14/2016) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to AUSA Niketh Velamoor, by inter-office mail on 6/15/2016. ***] (bw) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1456 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Niketh Velamoor dated June 14, 2016 . Document filed by USA as to Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Amended Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment)(Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1454 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1453 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1449 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1448 LETTER MOTION to respectfully request an adjournment of the appearance for eight weeks as to Jerome O'Hara (1), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno...ENDORSEMENT...The request is granted. The conference is adjourned to Friday, June 17, 2016 at 3:00pm. Docket entry number 1448 in case 10cr228 is resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/13/16) (jw) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1448 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 04/13/2016 re: Adjournment of 4/15/16 Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1444 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Jonathan Cohen, Niketh Velamoor dated February 19, 2016 re: An appearance in the above-referenced set of cases is scheduled for 2:00p.m. on Friday, February 26, 2016 at 4pm. We write to respectfully request an adjournment of the appearance for six weeks. We continue to be engaged in active discussions with counsel for the remaining litigants in this case, Mr. O'Hara, Mr. Bonventre and Ms. Bongiorno. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to April 15, 2016, at 9:45 AM. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/19/2016) [*** NOTE: Also for Civil Cases 09-Cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), 10-Cv-4858(LTS)(JCF). ***] (bw) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1443 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Niketh Velamoor dated February 19, 2016 re: Adjournment of Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1437 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen, Niketh Velamoor dated 1/4/2016 re: To request an adjournment of the appearance for six weeks....ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to February 26, 2016 at 4:00pm ( Status Conference set for 2/26/2016 at 04:00 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain). (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/5/2016)(jw) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1435 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Niketh Velamoor dated January 4, 2016 re: Adjournment of Status Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1431 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 12/10/15 re: Issuance of Consent Order . Document filed by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1430 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AMENDED MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1429 USCA Mandate, re: 1251 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1252 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1250 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1249 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1253 Notice of Appeal by USA. USCA Case Number 15-64, 15-66,15-68, 15-71, 15-72. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered". Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/23/2015. (nd) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1429 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1251 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1252 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1250 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1249 Notice of Appeal by USA, 1253 Notice of Appeal by USA. USCA Case Number 15-64, 15-66, 15-71, 15-72. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 11/23/2015. (nd) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1428 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) on re: 1427 LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Jonathan Cohen dated 11/10/2015 re: Adjournment. An appearance in the above-referenced set of cases is scheduled for 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 12, 2015. We write to respectfully request an adjournment of the appearance for four to six weeks. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to January 7, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/12/2015) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases: 09-Cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), Doc.#30; 10-Cv-4858(LTS)(JCF), Doc.#110. ***] (bw); Modified on 11/13/2015 (bw). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1427 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 11/10/2015 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1426 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1425 LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara (1), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Jonathan Cohen dated 09-23-15 re: Adjournment. An appearance in the above-referenced set of cases is scheduled for 4:30 p.m. on Thursday, October 1, 2015. We write to respectfully request, on the consent of counsel, adjournment of that appearance until Thursday, November 12, 2015, at 4:00 p.m., which has been provided to us by Deputy Ng as a date and time convenient to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The requested adjournment is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/24/2015) [*** NOTE: Also for Civil Cases: 09-Cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), 10-Cv-4858(LTS)(JCF). ***] (bw) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1425 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 09-23-15 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1422 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1418 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1417 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Conference as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi...ENDORSEMENT... IT IS ORDERED, that the conference previously scheduled in this matter for September 24, 2015 at 4:30pm is adjourned to October 1, 2015 at 4:30pm. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2015) (jw) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1417 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated August 12, 2015 re: Adjournment of September 24, 2015 Conference . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1415 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the Windsor Bay HOA, by its counsel, Keith F. Backer, Esq., that: At such time as the Subject Property is sold pursuant either to a final order of forfeiture in this criminal matter forfeiting the Subject Property to the United States, or to an interlocutory sale order in this criminal matter, the United States agrees to satisfy the outstanding HOA Arrears owed by the Defendant, including all charges that have come due subsequent to the entry of this Stipulation, on the Subject Property from the net proceeds of the sale of the Subject Property. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/14/15)(jw) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1401 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Jonathan Cohen dated 7/17/15 re: Adjournment . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1399 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Niketh Varadaraj Velamoor appearing for USA. (Velamoor, Niketh) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1398 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorney Preet Bharara, United StatesAttorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the Windsor Bay HOA, by its counsel, Keith F. Backer, Esq., that: 1. At such time as the Subject Property is sold pursuant either to a final order of forfeiture in this criminal matter forfeiting the Subject Property to the United States, or to an interlocutory sale order in this criminal matter, the United States agrees to satisfy the outstanding HOA Arrears owed by the Defendant, including all charges that have come duesubsequent to the entry of this Stipulation, on the Subject Property from the net proceeds of the sale of the Subject Property. 2. The net proceeds from the sale of the Subject Property will include all moneys realized from the sale of the Subject Property, except for the following: (See Order). 9. This Stipulation and Order may be executed in counterparts, each of which shall be deemed an original, and all of which, when taken together, shall be deemed the complete Stipulation. Signature pages may be by fax and such signaturesshall be deemed as valid originals. AGREED AND CONSENTED TO. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/14/15)(ajc) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1395 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 13, 2015 re: Forfeiture Stipulation as to Windsor Bay Homeowner's Association Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1381 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg dated 12/18/2013 re: Federal Bureau of Investigation. (jw) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1377 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrea Michelle Griswold appearing for USA. (Griswold, Andrea) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1371 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1370 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1363 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated June 15, 2015 re: Request to Unseal FBI Interview Report . Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1361 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1360 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1359 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1355 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno on re: 1350 Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to July 23, 2015, at 4:45 PM. This resolves DE# 105 in 10 CV 4858, DE# 1350 in 10CR228 and DE #26 in 09cv9455. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/3/2015)(ft) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1350 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated May 28, 2015 re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated April 20, 2015 re: Adjourn Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER EXONERATING BAIL as to (10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, upon the application of counsel for defendant Annette Bongiorno, that Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond in this matter is hereby exonerated and released, and all suretors on Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond and all property posted as security for Mrs. Bongiorno's personal recognizance bond are also released from any liability in connection with said bond. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that the Pre-Trial Services Agency or any other agency that has custody of Mrs. Bongiorno's passport return it to Mrs. Bongiorno's counsel in this matter, Roland Riopelle. IT IS SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/2015)(bw) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated April 2, 2015 re: Exonerating bail . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10 10 Cr. 228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated March 2, 2015 re: United States v. Daniel Bon ventre, et al. No. S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS); United States v. All Right, Title & Interest in the Real Property and Appurtenances Located at 167 Legion Place, et al. No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG); United States v. Joann Crupi, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG); United States v. All Funds on Deposit in Account Nos. 94660869, 9948199297, 8007487, 9115606297, 9116151903 and 9931127481 in the Names of Annette Bongiorno and/or Rudy Bongiorno, et al. No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF). We write to respectfully request that the March 4, 2015 conference scheduled in the criminal case and the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions be adjourned for 45 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. Counsel for all of the defendants and claimants except for Daniel Bonventre consent to this request. ENDORSEMENT: The general conference is adjourned to April 23, 2015, at 2:00 pm. A joint status report must be filed by April 20, 2015. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/3/2015) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases 09CV9455, doc.#23; 10CV4857, doc.#42; 10CV4858, doc.#101. ***] (bw) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated March 2, 2015 re: 1282 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, re: Adjournment of Forfeiture Conference . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 1290 LETTER MOTION to make an application on defendant Annette Bongiorno for permission to turn in her ankle bracelet on February 27, so that, on February 28, she can begin her travel to Coleman, Florida, where she will be surrendering to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons on or before March 5 as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5)...ENDORSEMENT...IT IS ORDERED that the defendant Annette Bongiorno return her ankle bracelet to the Pretrial Services Agency on February 27, 2015, and begin her travel to Coleman, Florida on February 28, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/19/15) (jw) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1290 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/19/2015 re: Permission to turn in ankle bracelet on February 27 . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated February 13, 2015 re: Scheduling of Forfeiture Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Annette Bongiorno on re: 1278 Letter - Sentencing, filed by Annette Bongiorno. I write to make an application on the defendant's behalf for a two week adjournment of her surrender date. I have discussed this application with AUSA Randall Jackson, and he has no objection to it, The reasons for the application are as follows. For all the foregoing reasons, I respectfully request that the Court extend the time for Mrs. Bongiorno to surrender to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons until March 5, 2015. As noted above, the US Attorney's Office has no objection to this request...It is ORDERED that the date by which the defendant Annette Bongiorno must surrender to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons is hereby extended to March 5, 2015. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/11/15)(jw) (Entered: 02/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/2015 re: Adjournment of Surrender Date. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1274 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the plaintiff, United States of America, by its attorriey Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, of counsel, and the Stone Hill HOA, by its counsel, Caryn L. Meyer, Esq., that Stone Hill HOA agrees to stay the Foreclosure Action against the Subject Property pending the resolution of the Defendant's criminal forfeiture matter. At such time as an amended preliminary order of forfeiture is entered by the Court in which the Government seeks the forfeiture of all right, title and interest of the defendant in the Subject Property, Stone Hill HOA agrees to not contest or file any claims of interest in the ancillary proceeding in this criminal action or the Civil Forfeiture Action contesting the forfeiture of the Subject Property to the Government. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/30/15)(jw) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 28, 2015 re: Stipulation Regarding Real Property Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulation)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSAs Paul M. Monteleoni, Jonathan Cohen dated January 17, 2015 re: We write with the consent of defense counsel to respectfully request that the January 26, 2015 conference scheduled in the above-referenced civil forfeiture actions, see No. 09 Civ. 9455(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 15), No. 10 Civ. 4857(LTS)(GWG) (ECF No. 35); No. 10 Civ. 4858(LTS)(JCF) (ECF No. 93), be adjourned for 30 days to allow the parties to attempt to consensually resolve or narrow the procedural and substantive issues involved in these cases. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. the conference is adjourned to February 26, 2015, at 4:00 p.m. The Clerk of Court is requeseted to docket this endorsed order in each of the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 1/20/2015)(bw); [*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Cases: 09-cv-9455(LTS)(GWG), doc.#17; 10-cv-4857(LTS)(GWG), doc.#37; 10-cv-4858(LTS)(JCF), doc.#96. ***] Modified on 1/21/2015 (bw). (Entered: 01/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 1/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/19/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 1/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Paul M. Monteleoni dated January 17, 2015 re: Timing of Conference on Forfeiture Issues Document filed by USA. (Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 01/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David Matthew Abramowicz appearing for USA. (Abramowicz, David) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 1/14/2015 re: Related Cases Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to Annette Bongiorno from 1225 Judgment. (nd) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1246 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER addressed to Mr. Cahill from Laura Taylor Swain dated 12/23/14 re: I have received your letter concerning the sentences of the former Madoff Securities employees. My reasons for imposing each sentence were laid out specifically and at great length on the record of each public sentencing hearing, each of which was more than two hours long. The transcripts of those hearings will be posted on the public docket in accordance with Judicial Conference policy (jw) Modified on 1/21/2015 (lan). (Entered: 12/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Annette Bongiorno from 1225 Judgment. [NOA filed by CJA appointed counsel on behalf of the defendant]. (nd) (Entered: 12/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Sentence held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/26/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/26/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Annette Bongiorno for a Sentence proceeding held on 12/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain Transcript due by 1/2/2015. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1230 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 12/19/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The attached Schedule A Revised lists all of the submissions that were considered in connection with the December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, sentencings of the above-captioned Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/18/2014)(ft) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: As to Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 12/16/2014 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the defendants conditions of bond concerning travel be modified to permit her to travel to her brother's home in Monmouth Junction, New Jersey on December 25, 2014 to celebrate the Christmas Holiday. ENDORSEMENT: Request Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/17/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to Annette Bongiorno (4), Count(s) 1, 10-14, 12s, 1s, 2, 25s-29s, 3, 30s, 4, 6s, 9s, Dismissed; Imprisonment: 60 months of imprisonment as to each of Counts One (1), Nine (9), Twelve (12), Twenty-Five (25), Twenty-Six (26),Twenty-Seven (27), Twenty-Eight (28) and Twenty-Nine (29), to run concurrently. 72 months of imprisonment as to Count Six (6), to run concurrently with the sentences on the other counts of conviction. 36 months of imprisonment as to Count Thirty (30), to run concurrently with the sentences on the other counts of conviction. The total custodial sentence is 72 months of imprisonment. Supervised Release: 1 year of supervised release as to each of Counts One (1 ), Six (6), Nine (9), Twelve (12), Twenty-Five (25), Twenty-Six (26), Twenty Seven (27), Twenty-Eight (28), Twenty-Nine (29) and Thirty (30), to run concurrently. The total supervised release term is 1 year. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: that the defendant be designated to the FCI Coleman Women's Satellite Camp, in Florida, in order to facilitate the maintenance of family ties and for health reasons.The Court recommends to the BOP that the defendant serve the final 12 months of her sentence in home confinement. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: before 2 p.m. on February 19, 2015. The above drug testing condition is suspended, based on the court's determination that the defendant poses a low risk of future substance abuse. The defendant shall not possess a firearm, ammunition, destructive device, or any other dangerous weapon. The defendant shall cooperate in the collection of DNA as directed by the probation officer. The defendant is to pay an assessment fee of $1000.00 due immediately. The defendantis to pay restitution in the amount of $155,158,703,200.00 as indicated on page7 of this document. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/17/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 12/16/2014 re: modify bail limits . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1221 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1220 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE AS TO SPECIFIC PROPERTY/MONEY JUDGMENT as to Annette Bongiorno. For the reasons as set forth in this Order; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: As a result of committing the offenses charged in Counts One, Six, and Nine of the Indictment, of which the defendant was found guilty following a jury trial, a money judgment in the amount of $155,158,703,200.00 in United States currency shall be entered against the defendant for which she shall be jointly and severally liable as to any forfeiture money judgment entered against her co-defendants in this case... The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Preliminary Order of Forfeiture as to Specific Property/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Paul M. Monteleoni, Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/9/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated December 5, 2014 Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSIONS CONSIDERED IN CONNECTION WITH SENTENCINGS OF ABOVE-CAPTIONED DEFENDANTS as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In connection with the sentencings scheduled for December 8, 9, 10 and 15, 2014, the Court has reviewed the Presentence Investigation Reports and the submissions listed on the attached Schedule A. All Defendants' submissions are included here because each of the Defendants has joined some or all of their co-Defendants' arguments. Briefs filed in connection with Defendants' post-trial motions are included because several parties have cross-referenced their earlier submissions. Counsel are requested to inform the Court promptly of any omissions or necessary corrections. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 12/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated December 2, 2014 re: Further update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 26, 2014 re: Update regarding responses to the Court's July 30 Order Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1200 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 10/27/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/20/2015. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated November 10, 2014 re 1038 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Email correspondence)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 10, 2014 re: Resopnse to the November 3, 2014 submission by the government Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Transcript, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt of GX 105c-46)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 4, 2014 re: Memoranda of defendants' proffer statements Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Government is hereby directed to provide this Court with copies of all memoranda from the proffer sessions of Defendants Annette Bongiorno and Joann Crupi. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 11/5/14)(jw) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER in regards to defendants Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Judge Swain has requested that I remind you that all objections and requests to the Court are to be made by letter motion filed on ECF (with a courtesy copy to chambers), rather than by email. Going forward, please follow this procedure. (jw) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's Letter of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Daniel Bonventre. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated November 4, 2014 re: Government's filing as of November 3, 2014 Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated November 3, 2014 re: Response to Questions from the October 27, 2014 Hearing Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibits E-H, # 3 Revised Proposed Orders of Forfeiture)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1181 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The continued sentencing hearings in the above-captioned case are adjourned to the following dates: for Daniel Bonventre, on Monday, December 8, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Annette Bongiorno, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for Jerome O'Hara, on Tuesday, December 9, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for George Perez, on Wednesday, December 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for Joann Crupi, on Monday, December 15, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/28/2014)(ft) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 10/20/2014 re: We write, on behalf of all parties, pursuant to the Court's October 2, 2014 Order, which notified the parties that the Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014. Mindful of the Court's urging that the parties "avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments,'' the defendants respectfully request oral argument time as follows... ENDORSEMENT: The requested time allotments are approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (S2-10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno on re: 1175 LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Attorney Roland Riopelle dated 10/15/14 re: Bail Modification. ENDORSEMENT: The defendant, Annette Bongiorno, having made an application to modify the conditions of her bail to permit her to leave her home any time after 7:00 a.m. on October 27, 2014, for the purpose of attending the hearing scheduled in this matter on October 27, 2014 at 9:30a.m., and good cause appearing to grant this application. IT IS ORDERED, that the defendant, Annette Bongiorno, is hereby permitted to leave her home any time after 7:00 a.m. on October 27,2014, for the purpose of attending the hearing scheduled in this matter on October 27, 2014. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/20/2014)(bw) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 20, 2014 re: Requests for Oral Argument Time Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 10/15/14 re: Bail Modification Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 10, 2014 re: Response to Defendants' Further Submissions on Forfeiture. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly A. Yuhas dated October 8, 2014 re: Provision of email chain between our firm and Mr. Madoff referred to in our Supplemental Submission Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Second Declaration on Behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Second Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Larry H. Krantz by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Declaration on behalf of George Perez and Jerome O'Hara Constituting Our Supplemental Submission on Forfeiture, Foreseeable Loss and Other Sentencing Issues (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Court has received four letters from the parties: a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18 and 22, 2014, Orders (docket entry no. 1156), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1157), a second joint letter from all Defendants in response to the Government's reply (docket entry no. 1160), and a letter from Andrew Frisch, counsel for Daniel Bonventre, expressing his intent not to offer live testimony at any forfeiture hearing (docket entry no. 1162). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: Any further documentary submissions that Defendants intend to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 6, 2014. Any further documentary submissions that the Government intends to make regarding forfeiture are due by October 10, 2014. The Court will hear oral argument regarding all forfeiture issues on October 27, 2014, at 9:30a.m. By October 20, 2014, the Government and all Defendants must file a joint letter delineating the time each requests to be allotted for oral argument. Defendants are urged to avoid making repetitive or cumulative arguments. Sentencings for the Defendants are rescheduled as follows: The sentencing of Daniel Bonventre will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Annette Bongiorno will be held on Monday, November 10, 2014, at 2:00p.m. The sentencing of Joann Crupi will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. The sentencing of Jerome O'Hara will be held on Wednesday, November 12, 2014, at 2:00 p.m. The sentencing of George Perez will be held on Thursday, November 13, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 10/2/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated October 6, 2014 re: Proposed forfeiture orders and upcoming hearing Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated October 1, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-29-14 re: Scheduling Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 28, 2014 re: Schedule for Sentencing Proceedings / Response to September 18 & 22 Orders. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 9/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Gordon Mehler dated 09/28/2014 re: Scheduling For Upcoming Forfeiture and Sentencing Proceedings (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 09/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi The Government's Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Connection with Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit C (Revised Crupi Preliminary Order of Forfeiture))(Schwartz, Matthew) Modified on 9/25/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The Court has received three letters from the parties- a joint letter from all Defendants in response to this Court's September 18, 2014, Order (docket entry no. 1149), the Government's reply to the Defendant's joint letter (docket entry no. 1150), and a letter from counsel for Daniel Bonventre, Andrew Frisch, alerting the Court to his upcoming travel plans (via e-mail). The Court has carefully considered each of these letters, and orders the following: The Defendants' request for an opportunity to argue the issue of whether the Government has made a prima facie case for forfeiture is hereby denied. As the Government points out, this issue was addressed and decided by the Court at the July 29, 2014, hearing. (See July 29, 2014, Tr. at 48.) In light of the Defendants' request to consider the Government's reply submissions regarding forfeiture, as well as Mr. Frisch's travel plans, the due date for submission ofthe parties' joint statement regarding witnesses and time required for forfeiture hearings is hereby extended to Monday, September 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. No forfeiture hearings will be held that week, in light of Mr. Frisch's unavailability. The Court will set a new hearing date following review of the Defendants' joint statement. The Government's request for an extension of time to file its reply papers regarding forfeiture is denied. The sentencing control dates for Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez are hereby adjourned pending further order of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/22/2014)(bw) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 9/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R Breslin dated September 21, 2014 re: Hearing and disclosure dates Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated September 19, 2014 re: Opposition to defendants' letter motion for reconsideration Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 9-19-14 re: Request for Oral Argument Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In their responses to the Government's supplemental forfeiture submissions, each of the Defendants has expressed, at least conditionally, a request for a hearing, and two of the Defendants have made supplemental testimonial proffers. The court will hold any necessary hearings, and entertain oral arguments regarding forfeiture, during the week of September 29, 2014, on the days that were provisionally set aside for sentencings. The following time periods are available: Monday, September 29,2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 1:00 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to 4:30 p.m. Tuesday, September 30, 2014, from 2:00p.m. to 4:30p.m..Wednesday, October 1, 2014, from 10:00 a.m. to 12:30 p.m. and 2:00p.m. to4:30p.m. The parties are directed to consult with each other as to which witnesses will be tendered for direct or cross-examination, and the time required for oral argument. A joint letter identifying the witnesses and proposing a schedule must be filed, with a courtesy copy to Chambers, by September 24, 2014 at 3:00p.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/18/14)(jw) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Eric R. Breslin in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1138 Memorandum of Law in Opposition,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bowen Affidavit)(Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - DECLARATION of Roland G Riopelle in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1079 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1124 Memorandum of Law in Support, filed by USA . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Yuhas, Kimberly) Modified on 9/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 1126 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Supplemental Memorandum of Law re Sentencing. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Conference held on 7/29/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus brief regarding sentencing. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Any victim of the Madoff Securities fraud who wishes to speak at the sentencing of Defendant Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, JoAnn Crupi, Jerome O'Hara and/or George Perez, is hereby directed to so notify the United States Attorney's Office Victim Coordinator for the Southern District of New York, by Wednesday, September 17, 2014, either by email to usanys.madoff@usdoj.gov or by regular mail addressed to the United States Attorney's Office Attn: U.S. v. Bonventre, Victim Statements, 1 Saint Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. A separate sentencing hearing will be held for each of the five Defendants. Up to ten victims will be permitted to speak for a maximum of three minutes at each of the sentencing hearings. The speakers will be selected by the victim coordinator and assigned at random to a sentencing unless they claim to have had personal interactions with one or more of the individual Defendants. Each victim may speak at only one of the sentencings. Each victim who makes a request to speak in response to this order will be notified of the date and time of the sentencing at which he or she will be invited to speak, after the sentencing hearing dates have been finalized. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/30/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 28, 2014 re: Agenda for Pre-Sentencing Hearing Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Pursuant to the Court's direction, the parties have conferred about possible new sentencing dates. All parties are available at any time on September 29 and 30, and October 1 and 2, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing hearings are rescheduled as follows: Mr. Bonventre - September 29, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Ms. Bongiorno - September 29, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Ms. Crupi - September 30, 2014, at 2:00 PM. Mr. O'Hara - October 1, 2014, at 10:00 AM. Mr. Perez - October 1, 2014, at 2:00 PM SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/28/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/17/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/16/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/16/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/21/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 25, 2014 re: Sentencing Dates Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Swain from Roland Riopelle dated 7/25/14 re: Supplemental Sentencing Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Letter)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BOP Regs, # 2 Exhibit NYT Article, # 3 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 4 Exhibit Defense Power Point Excerpt, # 5 Exhibit Ponzitracker list)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated July 25, 2014 re: Common issues for July 29 conference Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION AND ORDER: as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). After a more than five month trial, thirty-one counts of the above-captioned Superseding Indictment were submitted to the jury, and Defendants Daniel Bonventre ("Bonventre"), Annette Bongiorno ("Bongiorno"), Jo Ann Crupi ("Crupi"), Jerome O'Hara("O'Hara") and George Perez ("Perez," collectively, "Defendants") were convicted of each of the crimes which with they were charged. The charges included: conspiracy to defraud investment advisory clients and conspiracy to commit securities fraud; conspiracy to engage in accounting fraud and to defraud banks; conspiracy to commit tax fraud; securities fraud; falsifying the records of a broker-dealer; falsifying the records of an investment adviser; causing a false and misleading filing to be made with the Securities and Exchange Commission ("SEC"); bank fraud; making and subscribing to false income tax returns; corruptly obstructing the lawful administration of the internal revenue laws; and tax evasion. Fewer than all of the Defendants were charged in some of the counts. The Defendants move, separately and, as to certain issues, jointly, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, for a judgment of acquittal and, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33, for a new trial. The Court has considered carefully the parties' voluminous submissions and arguments. For the following reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. Familiarity with the more than 12,000-page trial record and the hundreds of thousands of pages of exhibits received in evidence is presumed....[See this Opinion And Order]... CONCLUSION: For the foregoing reasons, the Defendants' motions are denied in their entirety. This Opinion and Order resolves docket entry numbers 719, 722, 767, 970, 974, 975, 979 and 1014. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate docket entry numbers 645, 676, and 1007, which were previously resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/24/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain and Judge Sidney H. Stein from AUSAs, Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson, Paul M. Monteleoni dated July 23, 2014 re: We write in response to the letter dated July 16, 2014 to Judge Stein suggesting that the two above-referenced cases-the criminal prosecution of Jerome O'Hara stemming from his role in the fraud perpetrated through Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities, and the civil forfeiture of real property nominally in O'Hara's possession should be "consolidated" for unstated purposes. ENDORSEMENT: The relationship between proceedings in the above-captioned cases will be discussed at the conference scheduled for July 29, 2014 at 10:00 AM. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)[*** NOTE: Also docketed in Civil Case 09Civ.9455(SHS)(GWG), Doc.#13. ***] (bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to (S10-10-Cr-228-) Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. The Government is hereby ordered to provide the Court with copies of the following exhibits by Thursday, July 24, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. GX 105-a127; GX 105-b6; GX 105-b24; GX 105-c57; GX 105-d3; GX 105-d57; GX208-108; GX 208-132; GX 208-210; GX 208-215; GX 208-231; GX 900-53B; GX 2000-35 through 2000-54; GX 2000-93; GX 5000-1 at 142. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/23/2014)(bw) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated July 23, 2014 re: Transcript of DVD Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Victim Impact Statements Part 1, # 2 Victim Impact Statements Part 2, # 3 Victim Impact Statements Part 3, # 4 Victim Impact Statements Part 4, # 5 Victim Impact Statements Part 5, # 6 Victim Impact Statements Part 6, # 7 Victim Impact Statements Part 7, # 8 Victim Impact Statements Part 8)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 7/22/2014 re: Victim Impact Statements and Corrected Sentencing Submission Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER As to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the voluminous submissions received by the Court addressing the many issues that must be carefully considered in regard to sentencing, including forfeiture, sentencing proceedings are hereby adjourned to:Monday, September 15, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant Daniel Bonventre.Monday, September 15,2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Annette Bongiorno.Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. for defendant JoAnn Crupi. Tuesday, September 16, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant Jerome O'Hara. Wednesday, September 17, 2014, at 2:00p.m. for defendant George Perez. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. In light of the recently extended deadline for the parties' submission of sentencing and forfeiture briefing materials, the Court hereby adjourns the hearing currently scheduled for Friday, July 25, 2014, to Tuesday, July 29, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. At this hearing, the court will hear the parties' arguments on the following common Issues: 1. Loss amount calculations, principles and evidence for U.S. Sentencing Guidelines purposes. 2. Forfeiture determination principles and evidence. 3. Arguments relating to the applicability of U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 2B1.1(b)(19)(A), regarding the Defendants' roles as persons associated with registered brokers or dealers or investment advisers. 4. Applicability of an enhancement pursuant to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines § 3C 1.1 for obstructing or impeding the administration of justice. 5. Policy issues related to U.S. Sentencing Guidelines§ 2B1.1, regarding offenses involving fraud or deceit. 6. The relationship between the criminal forfeiture proceedings and the pending civil forfeiture cases. Procedures for the presentation of live victim statements at sentencing will also be discussed. The parties are directed to consult with each other to determine whether any additional common issues should be addressed. The parties are directed to notify the Court of any additional common issues in a joint letter filed by Friday, July 25, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/22/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re Proposed Preliminary Orders of Forfeiture. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Mehler, Gordon) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated July 17, 2014 re: 1033 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . re: Denying Government's Application for Preliminary Order of Forfeiture . Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rudy Bongiorno Declaration)(Caliendo, Robert) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration re Forfeiture)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/9/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/9/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/4/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain dated June 16,2014 re: Sentencing Letters on Behalf of George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/11/14 re: Reschedule Briefing.ENDORSEMENT: The proposed modified schedule is approved (Defense Sentencing Replies due by 7/25/2014., Government Sentencing Submission due by 7/18/2014, Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) Defense Forfeiture Submissions (including a joint submission on common issues) July 17, 2014, Defense Sentencing Replies set for July 25, 2014, Government Forfeiture Reply set for July 21, 2014. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/11/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 1064 Sentencing Submission filed by George Perez Amicus submission. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 7/15/2014 (ka). (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 11, 2014 re: Modifications to Briefing Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 P, # 2 Q, # 3 R, # 4 S, # 5 T, # 6 U, # 7 V, # 8 W, # 9 X, # 10 Y, # 11 Z, # 12 AA, # 13 BB, # 14 CC, # 15 DD)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 A, # 2 B, # 3 C, # 4 D, # 5 E, # 6 F, # 7 G, # 8 H, # 9 I, # 10 J, # 11 K, # 12 L, # 13 M, # 14 N, # 15 O)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Sentencing Letter by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-8-14 re: Objections to Final PSR. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz, John T. Zach, Randall W. Jackson and Paul M. Monteleoni dated 7/2/2014 re: The Government respectfully requests that the defendants be required to identify those common legal issues and submit a single, joint brief on those issues in connection with their sentencing. If the issues are truly common to all defendants and/or raise questions of law, this should not be difficult, and will both promote efficiency for the Court and will allow the Government to adequately prepare for any such conference..ENDORSEMENT: Defense counsel are expected to address common issues jointly in their opposition to the proposed preliminary forfeiture order. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
E-MAIL by USA as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5) addressed to Chambers of Judge Laura Taylor Swain from AUSA Matthew L. Schwartz dated 07/02/2014 03:51 PM re: Attached is a brief letter in response to Mr. Krantz's letter of yesterday, which requested a conference on the 25th. It was just filed on ECF. We are also in receipt of the letters filed by Mr. Frisch (yesterday) and Mr. Krantz (today) drawing the Court's attention to Judge's recent decision in United States v. Valle. Unless the Court believes it would be helpful, we do not intend to respond to those letters, as the Valle opinion contains no finding of misconduct, and was decided on the unique facts of that case. Similarly, Judge Glasser's opinion in United States v. Santiago, referenced in Mr. Krantz's letter, turns on the unique facts of that case. For the Court's convenience, we attach copies of the two opinions, which were not included with the copies of the letters served on the Government. (bw) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 7/1/14 re: Reschedule Conference. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held on July 25, 2014 at 2:15pm in Courtroom 12D ( Status Conference set for 7/25/2014 at 02:15 PM before Judge Laura Taylor Swain.) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated July 2, 2014 re: Defense request for a pre-sentencing conference Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-2-14 re: Pending Post-Trial Motions Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 7-1-14 re: Request for Status Conference Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 30, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Bonventre, # 2 Declaration as to Bonventre, # 3 Proposed Order as to Bongiorno, # 4 Declaration as to Bongiorno)(Monteleoni, Paul) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated June 30, 2014 re: Proposed Forfeiture Orders and Supporting Declarations . Document filed by USA as to Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order as to Bonventre, # 2 Declaration as to Bonventre, # 3 Proposed Order as to Bongiorno, # 4 Declaration as to Bongiorno)(Monteleoni, Paul) Modified on 7/1/2014 (ka). (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER terminating 1033 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1038 LETTER MOTION as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5); terminating 1037 LETTER MOTION as to Daniel Bonventre (3). Probation will issue the Presentence Reports for Defendants Bonventre,Bongiorno, Crupi, O'Hara and Perez by July 2, 2014. The deadlines for the submission of Defendants' sentencing memoranda, which are currently due by July 7, 8, or 9, 2014 (depending on the Defendant), are hereby adjourned to July 9, 10, and 11,2014, respectively. The Government's deadlines for its sentencing submissions are also adjourned to July 16, 17 and 18, 2014. The Government must provide its proposed preliminary orders of forfeiture, alongwith a description of the evidentiary bases for its positions and declarations supporting theGovernment's forfeiture theories, as outlined in the Government's June 25, 2014, letter, fourweeks prior to sentencing (i.e.. June 30, July 1, or July 2, depending on the Defendant).The Defendants responses to the Government's proposed preliminary orders offorfeiture, including any opposition declarations. are hereby due on July 14, 15, or 16, 2014 (depending on the Defendant). The Government's replies will be due on July 18, 19 and 20, 2014. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 1033, 1037 and 1038. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/30/14) (jw) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-29-14 re: Forfeiture briefing schedule Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated June 30, 2014 re: Scheduling of sentencing procedures . Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Breslin, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Response to Motion to Mark Case "Related" to Civil Forfeiture Action, and to "Consolidate" the Two Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/25/2014 re: Proposed Procedure for Forfeiture Matters . Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
DECLARATION of Matthew L. Schwartz in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 969 MOTION for Acquittal Under Rule 29. MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 33(a)., 973 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal and Memorandum in Support.FIRST MOTION for New Trial and Memorandum in Support., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit B-1, # 5 Exhibit B-2, # 6 Exhibit B-3, # 7 Exhibit B-4, # 8 Exhibit B-5, # 9 Exhibit B-6, # 10 Exhibit B-7, # 11 Exhibit B-8, # 12 Exhibit B-9, # 13 Exhibit B-10, # 14 Exhibit B-11, # 15 Exhibit B-12, # 16 Exhibit B-13, # 17 Exhibit B-14, # 18 Exhibit B-15, # 19 Exhibit B-16, # 20 Exhibit B-17, # 21 Exhibit B-18, # 22 Exhibit B-19, # 23 Exhibit B-20, # 24 Exhibit B-21, # 25 Exhibit B-22, # 26 Exhibit B-23, # 27 Exhibit C)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Melissa S. Geller dated June 18, 2014 re: Summation Power Point Slides Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Slides Part 1, # 2 Slides Part 2, # 3 Slides Part 3, # 4 Slides Part 4, # 5 Slides Part 5)(Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated 6/18/14 re: Filing of PowerPoint slides used in jury address Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Slides used in jury addresses (closing slides part 3) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 3)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Slides used in jury addresses (closing argument part 2) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 2)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: None
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Attaching slides used in jury addresses (closing argument part 1) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Closing Slides Part 1)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 6/16/14 re: Filing of Power Point Slides as Directed by the Court (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opening Slides in pdf)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1014 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated June 13, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Dismissal of All counts Post trial motions reply. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/12/2014 re: Slides Used in the Parties' Jury Addresses Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Kimberly Yuhas dated June 11, 2014 re: We write to respectfully request that the Court order the Government to provide to us a copy of the PowerPoint slides used in its rebuttal summation. Document filed by George Perez. (Yuhas, Kimberly) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief. . (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 6-5-14 re: Response to Letter from AUSA dated 6-5-14 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 6/5/2014 re: Correction to Opposition Brief Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 996 LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to File Reply as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). The requested extensions are granted. No further extensions of this briefly schedule will be granted. The sentencings remain scheduled for the week of July 28, 2014 and submissions must be made in accordance with the undersigned's published sentencing submission procedures in advance of the scheduled sentencing dates. Docket entry #996 resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/29/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Corrected Version) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 5/28/2014 re: 996 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply .. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated May 28, 2014 re: 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, re: Extension of Time to File Reply . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 994 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, . Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) Modified on 5/28/2014 (ka). (Entered: 05/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 975 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief., 979 MOTION for Acquittal.FIRST MOTION for New Trial., 970 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 993 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 992 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
Transcripts of pages 8825-8834 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: None
Transcripts of pages 6872-6879 for this case. See order docketed as document #989 by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 05/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Having been informed by the Government that it will not be making any objections and not having received any objections from the Defendants, the Court orders that pages 6872-6879 and 8825-8834 of the transcript from the trial for this case be unsealed and filed on the public docket in accordance with the Court's regular procedures. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 5/12/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 4/16/2014 re: Rule 29 and 33 proposed briefing schedule Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re 974 MOTION for New Trial and other relief.. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for New Trial and other relief. Document filed by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) Modified on 4/16/2014 (ka). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on All Counts Pursuant to Rule 29(c). (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi Motion for a New Trial Pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 33. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G Riopelle dated April 15, 2014 re: Dismissal of All Counts, and Counts 25-30 pursuant to post trial motion. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter of 2/11/2014, # 2 Exhibit Letter of 2/16/14)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 968 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 966 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 965 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/14/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 4-10-14 re: Extension of Post-Trial Motion Deadline Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 961 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 960 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/24/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/24/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/21/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/21/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/17/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/17/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/14/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/14/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/13/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/12/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/12/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/11/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/10/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/10/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/6/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/5/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/4/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 3/3/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 3/3/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/27/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/25/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/14 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/24/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/20/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/20/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/19/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/19/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/18/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/18/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/11/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/11/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/10/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/10/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/6/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/6/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 2/4/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 2/4/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/30/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/30/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/29/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/29/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/28/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/28/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/27/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/27/14 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/23/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/23/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/22/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/22/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/21/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/21/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/16/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/16/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/15/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/15/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/14/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/14/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/13/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/13/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/8/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/8/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 1/7/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 1/7/2014 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/19/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/19/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/18/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/18/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/17/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/17/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/16/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/16/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/13/13 CORRECTED TRIAL has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/13/13 CORRECTED TRIAL before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/12/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/12/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/11/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/11/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/10/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/10/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/9/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/9/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/5/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/5/13 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/4/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 12/2/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 12/2/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 853 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/26/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 852 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/26/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 851 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/25/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 850 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/25/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/21/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/21/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 847 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/20/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 846 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/20/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 845 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/19/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 844 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/19/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 843 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/18/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 842 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/18/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 841 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/14/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 840 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/14/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 839 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/13/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 838 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/13/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 837 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/12/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 836 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/12/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 835 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/7/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 834 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/7/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 833 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/6/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 832 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/6/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 831 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/5/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 830 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 11/5/2013 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 829 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/4/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 826 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/31/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/30/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 824 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/30/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 823 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/29/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 822 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/29/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 821 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/28/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 820 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/28/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/24/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 818 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/24/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/23/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 816 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/23/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 815 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/22/2013 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 814 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/22/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 813 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 10/21/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 812 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: Trial held on 10/21/13 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2014. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 811 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry H. Krantz dated 3/31/14 re: Accordingly, in an abundance of caution, and in light of the 14 day requirement set forth in Rule 33(b )(2), we hereby ask that the deadline for filing all motions for a new trial under Rule 33 be extended to Apri1 14, 2014. Such an extension is permissible by virtue of Rule 45(b)..ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted.. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 4/2/14)(jw) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 807 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Annette Bongiorno. Accordingly, the Government is hereby directed to determine what property it will seek to have forfeited and confer promptly with defense counsel to ascertain whether the defense opposes the forfeiture sought. The Government must thereafter provide, no later than two weeks before the scheduled sentencing date, via facsimile to Chambers with a copy served on defense counsel, a proposed preliminary order of forfeiture.If the preliminary order is not on consent, the Government's submission must be accompanied by a description of the evidentiary basis for its forfeiture position and a statement as to whether the parties believe that an evidentiary hearing is warranted pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(l). Defense counsel will have one week following his or her receipt of the Government's letter to respond. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/31/14)(jw) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 805 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-31-14 re: Rule 33 Motions Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 804 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 803 LETTER MOTION To request a 30 day extension of time in which to respond to the Court's order dated March 25, 2014 as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5)...ENDORSEMENT..The request is granted. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/27/14) (jw) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 803 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 27, 2014 re: Extension of Time to Respond to March 25, 2014 Order. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 802 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 3/25/2014 re: requesting the Court to autorize Courtroom Connect to receive reimbursement for their services (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 801 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. The Court intends to unseal transcript pages 6872-6879 and 8825-8834 on April 4, 2014. Any objections to such unsealing must be filed by April 2, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/25/14)(jw) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 800 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #64 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Verdict Form (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 799 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #63 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 798 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #62 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 797 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #61 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 796 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #60 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 795 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #59 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 794 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #58 by George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 793 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit Number 57 in USA v. Daniel Bonventre et al., S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS): as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (bw) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 792 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit Number 56 (Jury Communication To the Court) in USA v. Daniel Bonventre et al., S10 10 Cr. 228 (LTS): as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (bw) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 791 Filed: 3/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 23, 2014 re: Jury Note (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 790 Filed: 3/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated March 23, 2014 re: Proposed Response to Jury Note (CX 56) Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 789 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #55. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 788 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #54. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 787 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #53. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 786 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #52. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 785 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #49. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 784 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #48. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 783 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #47. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 782 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #41. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 781 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #40. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 780 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #15 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #14 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 778 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #13 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 777 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #12 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 776 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #10 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #7 as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 774 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit #6 Jury Communication to the Court as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 773 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None
Court Exhibit Number 9 (JURY INSTRUCTIONS) in United States v. Bonventre et al., 10 Cr. 228: as to Jerome O'Hara (1), George Perez (2), Daniel Bonventre (3), Annette Bongiorno (4), Joann Crupi (5). (bw) Modified on 3/24/2014 (lan). Modified on 3/24/2014 (lan). (Entered: 03/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 772 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 767 LETTER MOTION For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on March 13, 2014, Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motion for a curative instruction (docket entry number 767) is denied. This Order resolves docket entry number 767 as to Annette Bongiorno (4) (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/13/2014) (jw) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 771 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 3/13/2014 re: Rebuttal Summation Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 770 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-13-14 re: Request for Jury Instruction Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit 1)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 768 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 3/12/2014 re: Motion in Limine regarding Summations of Counsel for Ms. Bongiorno Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 767 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated March 12, 2014 re: Curative Instruction. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 3507-3)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 766 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
Verdict Form. as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 764 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on March 10,2014, Defendant Daniel Bonventre's motion (docket entry number 762) is granted in part and denied in part. This Order resolves docket entry number 762. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/10/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 763 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 03/07/2014 re: 762 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 7, 2014 re: Redacted Indictment.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 762 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated March 7, 2014 re: Redacted Indictment. Document filed by Daniel Bonventre as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Frisch, Andrew) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 761 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 3-7-14 re: Redacted Indictment Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 759 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER sustaining the Government's LETTER MOTION objecting to the admission of two defense exhibits is sustained. 743 LETTER MOTION. The Clerk of Court is also requested to close docket entry number 735, which was previously resolved. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/4/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 758 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 757 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 756 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 755 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 754 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 753 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 752 Filed: 3/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 3/1/2014 re 743 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/26/2014 re: Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 750 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Powerpoint of Final Jury Insruction Before Summation by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 749 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Powerpoint of Final Jury Insructions. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 748 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Final Version of Verdict Form by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 747 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Final Version of Jury Instructions. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 746 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
Final Version of Jury Instructions Before Summations. by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 745 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
VERDICT FORM by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 744 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
JURY INSTRUCTIONS by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (dnd) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 743 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/26/2014 re: Objections to Certain Defense Exhibits. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 742 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/25/2014 re: Untimely Requests to Further Modify the Court's Charge and Verdict Sheet Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 736 Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/22/2014 re: Application to Overrule Objection to GX 106-25, an email between Andrew and Mark Madoff Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 735 Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/22/14 re: Admission of Evidence and to advise of Defendant's Decision to Testify. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Exhibits)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 734 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno and Jo Ann Crupi moved, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 29, at the close of the Governments case in the trial on the above-captioned Indictment, seeking judgments of acquittal on Counts Four, Five, and Nineteen through Thirty-Three of the Indictment, which charge Defendants Bonventre,Bongiorno and Crupi with tax violations, Defendants Bonventre and Bongiorno with obstruction of the administration of the tax laws, and Defendant Bonventre with violating the Employment Retirement Income Securities Act (ERISA). Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno and Crupi request that the Court decide their Rule 29(a) motions with respect to these Counts prior to the submission of the case to the jury. The Court has carefully considered the parties voluminoussubmissions and arguments... For the foregoing reasons, Defendant Bonventres motion, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 29(a), for judgment of acquittal is granted as to Counts Five and Nineteen of Indictment S10 10 Cr. 228, and the pending motions of Defendants Bonventre, Bongiorno and Crupi as to Counts Four and Twenty through Thirty-Three are denied. Decision is reserved with respect to the remaining challenged Counts of the Indictment. This Memorandum Order resolves docket entry numbers 680, 688, 689, 696. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/21/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 733 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER. For the reasons stated on the record at the conferences on February 18, 2014, and February 19, 2014, the Government's application regarding prior consistent and inconsistent statements (docket entry no. 714) is granted in part and denied in part. This Order resolves docket entry number 714. The Clerk of Court is also requested to terminate docket entry number 709, which was previously resolved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/21/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 732 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-21-14 re: Verdict Sheet Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 731 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/21/2014 re: Prior Statements (SIAC Report) Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 730 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
Verdict Form as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2)- Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions with edits (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 729 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
Verdict Form as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 728 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
Jury Instructions as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2) - Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions with edits by Govt. (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 727 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
Jury Instructions as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. Draft (2)- Reflecting Charge Conference and Consideration of Subsequent Submissions by Gov't (jw) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/19/2014 re: Requested Limiting Instruction Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/19/2014 re: 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 722 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-17-14 re: Dismissal under Rule 29., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 722 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-17-14 re: Dismissal under Rule 29. Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 721 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 17, 2014 re: Government Application to Admit Prior Consistent Statements Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 720 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 17, 2014 re: Government Application to Preclude Prior Inconsistent Statement Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 717 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-16-14 re: Prior inconsistent statements Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 714 Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/16/2014 re: Prior Consistent and "Inconsistent" Statements. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 713 Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi re: 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript references, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits referenced)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 712 Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/16/2014 re: 688 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 13, 2014 re: Rule 29 Judgment of Acquittal on Counts 4-5 & 20-24., 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court.. Enclosing Cited Transcript Excerpts (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 709 Filed: 2/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/16/14 re: Requesting permission to instruct defense witnesses not to travel to Court on Tuesday. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 707 Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/15/2014 re: Testimony of Daniel Bonventre Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 706 Filed: 2/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 2/15/2014 re: 688 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated February 13, 2014 re: Rule 29 Judgment of Acquittal on Counts 4-5 & 20-24., 680 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts., 696 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court., 689 MOTION for Acquittal MEMORANDUM of law in support of Motion for Acquittal Made on the Record on February 11, 2014.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 705 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi.re: Evidence of Prior Consistent Statements The Court has reviewed and considered carefully the Governments February 12, 2014, application to elicit evidence of prior consistent statements made by certain cooperating witnesses and the Defendants opposition to the application. Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(1)(B) excludes from the category of inadmissable hearsay and thus permits the substantive proffer of a prior consistent statement offered to rebut an express or implied charge that the declarant recently fabricated trial testimony or acted from a recent improper influence or motive in testifying. To be admissible under Rule 801(d)(1)(B), the proponent of the prior consistent statement must show that the person who made the statement is available for cross examination concerning it, that the statement is consistent with the challenged testimony and that the prior consistent statement was made before the alleged motive to fabricate arose. See, e.g., Tome v. United States, 513 U.S. 150, 158 (1995) (where a witness has been impeached through the suggestion that his trial testimony was recently fabricated or resulted from a recent improper influence or motion, that suggestion is capable of direct and forceful refutation through introduction of out-of-court consistent statements that predate the alleged fabrication, influence or motive); see also United States v. Alviar, 573 F.3d 526, 542 (7th Cir. 2009) ([p]rior consistent statements that are offered to rebut a charge of recent fabrication or improper influence or motive are not hearsay). In United States v. Pierre, 781 F.2d 329, 331 (2d Cir. 1986), the Second Circuit held that prior inconsistent statements may be admitted for the more limited purpose of rehabilitating a witness credibility, but cautioned that the proponent must demonstrate the existence of probative value beyond the mere fact that the witness has repeated on a prior occasion a statement consistent with his trial testimony. Id. The Court finds that none of the witnesses prior consistent statements to the testifying FBI agents is admissible as substantive evidence under Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(1)(B), because the trial record supports Defendants contention that the cooperating witnesses were all motivated or influenced by a desire to impress the Government with their cooperation and the potential value of their information, a motive that predates all of their statements to the Government. Should the Government wish to have the opportunity to offer prior consistent statements for the more limited purpose of rehabilitating cooperating witness credibility, the Government must identify, as to each statement, the probative value of that statement beyond mere repetition. Any alleged prior consistent statements that the Government plans to offer, and the Governments rationale as to probative value for each such statement, must be identified to Defense counsel and the Court before the week of testimony in which the Government expects to introduce them. (For witnesses expected to be called during the week of February 17, 2014, disclosure of the statements and the rationale for admissibility must be made by February 16, 2014.) Any use of prior consistent statements will be limited to statements directly corresponding to the subject matter of the allegedly inconsistent statement. No general repetition of statements consistent with other aspects of trial testimony will be allowed, in order to avoid juror confusion, undue delay or unfair prejudice through the repetition of cooperator allegations by FBI agents. The foregoing procedural requirements and limitations are imposed pursuant to the Courts authority under Federal Rules of Evidence 611(a) and 403. If prior consistent statements are admitted, the Court will upon request provide limiting instructions as to the admission of such prior statements for credibility purposes only and not as substantive evidence. Cross-Examination of Character Witnesses: The Court has also reviewed and considered carefully the Governments February 12, 2014, application, pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 404(a)(2)(A), to offer evidence to rebut character witness testimony elicited by Defendants, and the parties correspondence relating to that application. Federal Rules of Evidence 405(a) and 404(a)(2)(A) permit a criminal defendant to offer evidence of pertinent traits of the defendant, by means of reputation or opinion testimony. Federal Rule of Evidence 405(a) permits the court to allow cross-examination as to relevant specific instances of the persons conduct and also permits the Government to offer evidence to rebut evidence of the pertinent trait. Neither of these provisions, however, is a license for the Government to rehearse with any and all character witnesses its collection of allegedly inculpatory facts. Cross-examination using guilt-assuming hypothetical questions is specifically prohibited. See United States v. Oshatz, 912 F.2d 534, 539-540 (2d Cir. 1990). Cross examination regarding knowledge of the allegations in the indictment is also impermissible, unless the defendant on direct has elicited testimony by the witness that the witness is aware of the charges and holds the relevant opinion. See United States v. Russo, 110 F.3d 948, 953 (2d Cir.1997). The following principles will be applied in determining the scope of specific-acts rebuttal cross-examination. Any rebuttal cross-examination concerning specific acts must be relevant to the trait for which the witness is proffered and, unless the Defendant has opened the door to inquiry concerning the witness knowledge of the charges in this case, specific acts cross examination touching on the charges in this case must be confined to questions concerning otherwise legal activity that tests the knowledge or acquaintanceship claims of the witness. See Russo,110 F.3d at 953 (approving cross-examination regarding facially neutral facts relating to business meetings and activities implicated in the case, where a character witness testified as to her opinions of the defendants honesty and trustworthiness and claimed to have formed those opinions based on work in the defendants business and twenty-five years of a business and personal relationship with him). This Order resolves docket entry numbers 684, 687, and 690. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/14/2014)(dnd) Modified on 2/14/2014 (dnd). (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 704 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 10, 2014, the Government's motion to preclude testimony on certain alleged prior inconsistent statements is granted in part and denied in part (see docket entry no. 666). For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 10, 2014, Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motion to question one of the Government's agents regarding certain prior inconsistent statements (see docket entry number 667) is granted in part and denied in part, her other motion relating to this same issue (docket entry number 668) is granted. Defendant JoAnn Crupi's motion seeking to question one of the Government's agents regarding a prior allegedly inconsistent statement is also granted (docket entry no. 670). The Charging Conference, which was held on February 11, 2014, resolved the issues raised by Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motions regarding the Court's Draft Jury Charge and Draft Verdict Form. (See docket entry numbers 625, 626 and 646.) The Clerk of Court is further instructed to terminate docket entry number 662 as the parties have resolved this issue. This Order resolves docket entry 625, 626, 646, 662, 666, 667, 668, and 670. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/14/2014) (dnd) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 700 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-14-14 re: Government's application re prior consistent statements Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 699 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from USA dated 2/14/2014 re: Reply re Prior consistent statements and character witnesses Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 696 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/14/14 re: Supplemental Submission on Rule 29 Attaching Exhibits and Transcript requested by Court. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Trial Exhibits Referred to in Rule 29 Motion, # 2 Exhibit Transcript Referred to in Rule 29 Motion)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 695 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-14-14 re: Reply Letter re Jury Charge Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 694 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/13/2014 re: Post Charge Conference Defense Objections to Proposed Jury Instructions Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 693 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/12/2014 re: Defense Objections to Cross Examination and defense's proffered videorecording Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 692 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
LETTER (E-mail) by (10-Cr-228-04) Annette Bongiorno from Roland Riopelle dated 2/13/2014 05:42 AM re: OK, and the Court's message indicates that the courthouse will not open until 11. (bw) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 687 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/13/14 re: Preclusion of testimony concerning prior consistent statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 684 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/12/14 re: Limits to cross-examination of character witnesses. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 683 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-12-14 re: Jury Instructions and Verdict Sheet Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 682 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated 2/10/2014 re: Defense Objections to the Court's Draft Charge Document filed by USA. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 681 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/12/2014 re: Jury Charge/Statute of Limitations Document filed by USA. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 680 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/11/14 re: Rule 29(a) dismissal of all counts. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 678 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-10-14 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by George Perez. (Attachments: # 1 Objections to Proposed Charge)(Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 677 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 9, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. REFILING AS PER ECF REQUEST (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 676 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 10, 2014 re: Motion permitting Ms. Crupi to admit video evidence in direct case. Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 675 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated 2/9/14 re 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 674 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Response)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 672 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
Draft Charge Jury Instructions submitted by USA. (jw) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 671 Filed: 2/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 9, 2014 re: David Kugel's Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 670 Filed: 2/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 9, 2014 re: 666 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements. re: Response Letter. Document filed by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 669 Filed: 2/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/08/2014 re: 668 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Admission of Prior Inconsistent Statements.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 668 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Admission of Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Pages from Official Report)(Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 667 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 7, 2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements Admission Thereof. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Riopelle, Roland) Modified on 2/10/2014 (ka). (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 666 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/07/2014 re: Prior Inconsistent Statements. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 664 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Joann Crupi as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Eric R. Breslin dated February 7, 2014 re: Comments to Draft Charge in Advance of Charge Conference Document filed by Joann Crupi. (Geller, Melissa) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 663 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 662 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/05/2014 re: Preclusion of Defense Expert Testimony. Document filed by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 661 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 660 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 659 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 657 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 655 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 4, 2014, to the extent that the issues were not previously resolved by the parties, the Government's motion regarding Defense disclosures (docket entry no. 621) is granted and the Government's motion to preclude the Defense from calling Frank DiPascali and asking him about his assertion of his Fifth Amendment privilege in a related civil proceeding is denied (docket entry no. 616). For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on February 4, 2014, the Court denies Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motion to introduce a new summary chart exhibit (docket entry no. 618 ). The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate docket entry numbers 639 and 643 as Defendant Daniel Bonventre's motions were withdrawn. The Clerk of Court is also instructed to terminate docket entry numbers 623, 631 and 632. which were discussed and resolved at this conference. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 616, 618, 621, 623, 631, 632, 639 and 643. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/5/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 654 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on January 21,2014, Defendant Annette Bongiorno's motion (docket entry number 597) requesting a limiting instruction with regards to summary charts of FBI Financial Analyst Jason Wake is denied and, for the reasons stated at the conference on January 29,2014, Defendant Bongiorno's motion(docket entry number 599) seeking to preclude other summary charts is denied. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference on January 29,2014, the Court grants Defendant Daniel Bonventre's motion to preclude certain newly offered exhibits (docket entry number 607); grants in part and denies in part Defendant JoAnn Crupi's motion to preclude certain newly offered exhibits (docket entry number 606); and grants in part and denies in part the Government's motions (docket entry numbers 611 and 612) seeking to admit certain summary charts as exhibits. Finally, for the reasons stated on the record at the conference on January 29, 2014, Defendant Perez's motion (docket entry no. 610) to preclude certain testimony of the Government's witness Haresh Hemrajani is denied. This Order resolves docket entry numbers 597, 599, 606, 607, 610, 611, and 612. The Clerk of Court is also directed to terminate docket entry number 556, which had been resolved by prior Court Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 2/4/2013) (dnd) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 653 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-4-14 re: Objections to Direct Examination Document filed by Jerome O'Hara, George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 652 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 651 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 650 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 649 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 647 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 646 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/03/2014 re: 643 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 02/03/2014 re: Preclusion of Cumulative Testimony.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 645 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Roland G. Riopelle dated February 3, 2014 re: Comments on DRAFT Jury Charg. Document filed by Annette Bongiorno as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg. (Riopelle, Roland) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 644 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from United States of America dated February 3, 2014 re: Defense Objections to Charge and Defense Exhibit AB-2000-1 Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 642 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Matthew L. Schwartz dated 02/03/2014 re: 639 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Andrew J. Frisch dated 2/3/2014 re: Disclosure of Account Information.. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 641 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 640 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER by George Perez as to Jerome O'Hara, George Perez, Daniel Bonventre, Annette Bongiorno, Joann Crupi, Eric S. Lipkin, David L. Kugel, Enrica Cotellessa-Pitz, Craig Kugel, Peter Madoff, Irwin Lipkin, Paul J. Konigsberg addressed to Judge Laura Taylor Swain from Larry Krantz dated 2-3-14 re: Response to Government's Letter dated February 2, 2014 Document filed by George Perez. (Krantz, Larry) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 638 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (nm) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 180 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?