Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. v. Doe 1 et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-03100

Tags
Last Updated August 24, 2016 at 7:48 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
    ORDER DISMISSING CASE In accordance with the Notice of Dismissal of Case filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) on April 18, 2014 ECF No. [29], it isORDERED that the remaining John Doe Defendants and this case are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/24/2014. (evana, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: 4/18/2014 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: 4/14/2014 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER re: [27] Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc., it is ORDERED that Defendant John Does # 6, 21, 26, and 33 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/14/2014. (evana, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6, 21, 26 and 33 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: 3/19/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
            MINUTE ORDER granting [24] Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants on or before April 16, 2014, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/19/2014.(evana, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2014, Entered: 3/18/2014 MemorandumCourt Filing
              MEMORANDUM regarding [24] MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/18/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: 3/17/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: 2/10/2014 Status Report
                  Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe # 14 and John Doe # 22 are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/21/14. (jjhsl, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: 1/17/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does #14 and 22 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER. ORDERED that John Doe # 17 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and shallhereafter be taken off the caption by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 01/07/14. (jjhsl, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: 1/6/2014 Supplement/Amendment
                          SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to [18] Notice of Dismissal of Party John Doe #17 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: 1/3/2014 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Doe 6 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013 Status Report
                              Monthly STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: 12/2/2013 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER: This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, the Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, the Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2013. Text Only Entry (mehcd)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [12] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/13.(jjhsl, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER. ORDERED that John Does 1-5 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and shall hereafter be taken off the caption in accordance with the Amended Complaint by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/26/13. (jjhsl, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: 11/26/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                      MEMORANDUM regarding [12] Renewed MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/26/13. Text Only Entry (jjhsl, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Motion to Expedite
                                        Renewed MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Amended Complaint
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe 10, John Doe 11, John Doe 12, John Doe 13, John Doe 14, John Doe 15, John Doe 16, John Doe 17, John Doe 18, John Doe 19, John Doe 20, John Doe 21, John Doe 22, John Doe 23, John Doe 24, John Doe 25, John Doe 26, John Doe 27, John Doe 28, John Doe 29, John Doe 30, John Doe 31, John Doe 32, John Doe 33, John Doe 34, John Doe 35, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/20/2013 Notice of Dismissal of Party
                                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party John Does 1, 2, 3, 4, and 5 by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. (Kannady, Scott)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/18/2013 Order on Motion to ExpediteCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice [3] Motion for Leave to Take Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/15/13.(jjhsl, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM regarding [3] MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/15/13. Text Only Entry (wydcd, rrk)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright
                                                    REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (dbera, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Summons IssuedCourt Filing
                                                      SUMMONS issued by Clerk. Magistrate Judge Consent Form attached. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                        Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Motion to Expedite
                                                          MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Plaintiff Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent 0939599 BC LTD., Corporate Parent Studio West Productions (VCC) Inc. for Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Kannady, Scott)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-3620760), filed by Lynn Peak Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Summons, # (4) Civil Cover Sheet)(Kannady, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?