Haigler v. Grand Canyon Education Incorporated et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-01230
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 5:25 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David Haigler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David Haigler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Haigler +1 616 334 0055
v.
No Logo Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Grand Canyon Education Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maurice G. Jenkins +1 248 936 1900 jenkinsm@jacksonlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Scott Pierce +1 602 714 7044 +1 602 714 7045 piercej@jacksonlewis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Victoria R Torrilhon +1 602 714 7042 +1 602 714 7145 victoria.torrilhon@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Grand Canyon University Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward G Hochuli +1 602 263 1700 +1 602 200 7812 Ehochuli@jshfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Kyle Robertson +1 602 263 1737 +1 602 200 7812 KRobertson@jshfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Plunkett & Cooney, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey S. Hengeveld +1 248 901 4000 jhengeveld@plunkettcooney.com
No Logo Schleier Law Offices PC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by BROENING OBERG WOODS & WILSON

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Wilson, Jr +1 602 271 7717 +1 602 252 7253 dwj@bowwlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kopka Pinkus Dolin & Eads PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/02/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Valerie Henning Mock +1 248 324 2620
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cavanagh Law Firm PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ralph E Hunsaker +1 602 322 4000 +1 602 322 4103 RHunsaker@cavanaghlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley James Johnston +1 602 322 4000 +1 602 322 4100 bjohnston@cavanaghlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller Canfield Paddock & Stone, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/12/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stanley J. Stek +1 616 776 6324 stek@millercanfield.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Movant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA affirming District Court decision re: 13-16769 as to 79 Notice of Appeal filed by David Haigler. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit). (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 NDA). (LSP) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. Pursuant to the Court's Order of October 25, 2013, granting the Motion for Attorneys' Fees, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Grand Canyon Education, Inc. and Grand Canyon University, Inc. and against Plaintiff in the amount of $32,676.50. (REW) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER, the Motion for Attorney Fees 77 is granted; the Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Grand Canyon Education, Inc. and Grand Canyon University, Inc. and against Plaintiff in the amount of $32,676.50. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/25/13.(REW) (Entered: 10/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
        USCA Case Number re: 79 Notice of Appeal, Case number 13-16769, Ninth Circuit. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 74 Clerks Judgment, 73 Order by David Haigler. Filing fee received: $455.00, receipt number PHX 137482. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt-Appeal Fees Paid)(REW) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM Defendant Grand Canyon Education, Inc. and Grand Canyon University, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees 77 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Defendants Grand Canyon Education Incorporated, Grand Canyon University Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 thru 7)(Pierce, Justin) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
              MOTION for Attorney Fees by Grand Canyon Education Incorporated, Grand Canyon University Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pierce, Justin) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER approving 72 Stipulation. Ralph E. Hunsaker and Bradley J. Johnston of The Cavanagh Law Firm, P.A., shall be substituted in place of Stanley J. Stek of Miller, Canfield, Paddock & Stone, PLC, as counsel of record for Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 75 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/9/13. (LAD) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                  First MOTION to Dismiss Case by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Johnston, Bradley) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                    CLERK'S JUDGMENT - pursuant to the Court's Order of August 2, 2013, dismissing the Complaint, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendants. Plaintiff shall take nothing by way of the Complaint. The Complaint and this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. (REW) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER, the Motions to Substitute Attorney 67 , 68 are granted; Attorneys Edward G Hochuli and F Kyle Robertson are substituted for Jeffrey S Hengeveld as counsel of record for Law Offices of Marshall A Martin; Attorney Donald Wilson Jr is substituted for Valerie Henning Mock as counsel of record for Schleier Law Offices P.C.; the Motion 70 is denied; this case is dismissed with prejudice; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/2/13.(REW) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Re: Substitution of Counsel)(Johnston, Bradley) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley James Johnston on behalf of Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints. (Johnston, Bradley) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Court to Allow Improvement to Cause of Action re: 5 Amended Complaint, by David Haigler. (REW) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                              (Response to Court Order) and AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, Grand Canyon Education Incorporated, Grand Canyon University Incorporated, Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin, Christopher Richardson, Schleier Law Offices PC, Unknown Parties, filed by David Haigler.(REW) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
                                *MOTION to Substitute Attorney; Donald Wilson, Jr. appearing for Schleier Law Offices PC in place of Attorney Valerie Henning Mock.(Wilson, Donald) *Modified from Notice on 7/23/2013* (REW). (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
                                  *MOTION for ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Edward G. Hochuli and F. Kyle Robertson appearing for Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin in place of Attorney Jeffrey Steven Hengeveld. (Hochuli, Edward) *Modified from Notice on 7/17/2013* (REW). (Entered: 07/16/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Wilson, Jr on behalf of Schleier Law Offices PC. (Wilson, Donald) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER the Amended Complaint 5 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint no later than July 19, 2013. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a judgment of dismissal without prejudice in the event no amended complaint is filed by that date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/26/13. (CLB) (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                        LETTER Re Transfer of 1:12-cv-01075 from the Western District of Michigan to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-12-1230-PHX-ROS. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Availability Form)(MAP) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None
                                          Case transferred in from District of Michigan Western; Case Number 1:12-cv-01075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            OPINION AND ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 57 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE in opposition to Objection 59 to Report and Recommendation 57 filed by Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Service)(Stek, Stanley); Modified text on 5/7/2013 (pjw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 05/07/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE to Objection 59 to Report and Recommendation 57 filed by Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Grand Canyon University, Inc. (Pierce, Justin); Modified text and filer on 5/7/2013 (pjw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                  OBJECTION by plaintiff David Haigler to Report and Recommendation 57 "document named as objection to court's report and recommendation concerning venue; motion for report and recommendation to be reversed; motion for venue to be affirmed for Western District Court of Michigan" (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE canceling 4/29/2013 motion hearing on various motions filed by the parties 13 , 17 , 24 , 33 , 42 (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this matter be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                        CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff David Haigler to 3291 Devonwood Dr NE, Grand Rapids, MI 49525 (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPLY in support of Motion for Reconsideration 45 filed by Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Grand Canyon University, Inc. (dfw) Modified text on 3/8/2013 (dfw). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                            RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for leave to file a Reply In Support of Their Motion For Reconsideration Regarding the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service of Christopher Richardson By U.S. Marshal's Office Attempt At Home And/Or Se 52 with Certificate of Service filed by David Haigler (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 52 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply; the proposed reply in support of 45 is accepted for filing; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for leave to file a Reply In Support of Their Motion For Reconsideration Regarding the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service of Christopher Richardson By U.S. Marshal's Office Attempt At Home And/Or Service By Publication by defendants Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Grand Canyon University, Inc.; (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Document Exhibit A- Proposed Reply in Support of Dkt #45)(Pierce, Justin) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  RESPONSE TO MOTION for reconsideration re 43 45 filed by David Haigler (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by US Marshal as to Christopher Richardson per order 46 (ald) Modified text on 2/25/2013 (jlg). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY to response to motion 33 ; RESPONSE to motion 42 filed by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Attachments: # 1 Attachment-certificate of service)(Stek, Stanley) Modified text on 2/15/2013 (pjw) Modified text on 2/19/2013 (jlg). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        CHANGE OF ADDRESS for plaintiff David Haigler to 7475 Coconut Drive, Jenison, MI 49428 (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Traycie Gee for Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints served on 2/5/2013, answer due 2/26/2013 (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/12/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER taking under advisement 45 Defendants Grand Canyon Education, Inc. and Grand Canyon University, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration Regarding the Court's Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service of Christopher Richardson by U.S. Marshal's Office Attempt at Home and/or Service by Publication; VACATING 43 order entered 2/5/2013; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for reconsideration re 43 by defendants Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Grand Canyon University, Inc.; (Jenkins, Maurice) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Remove Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, and Motion for Contempt and/or Injunction 42 : motion hearing is set for 4/29/2013 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  (VACATED) ORDER granting 41 Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service of Christopher Richardson by U.S. Marshal's Office Attempt at Home and/or Service by Publication; the United States Marshal Service is ordered to attempt personal service on Christopher Richardson at the address included in the summons attached to plaintiff's motion; if such service is not successful, plaintiff shall have 28 days from the return of the unexecuted summons to complete service by publication; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh); Modified text on 2/12/2013 to reflect vacated per Order 46 (pjw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for order "document named as motion to immediately remove the Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints", MOTION for contempt and/or injunction against the Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, attorney Stanely J. Sterk and Andrew T. Blum by plaintiff David Haigler; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibits E - I)(ald) Modified text on 2/4/2013 (ald). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for alternate service re Christopher Richardson with Certificate of Service by plaintiff David Haigler; (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A - Proposed Summons)(jem) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by US Marshal as to Christopher Richardson (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment 24 filed by David Haigler (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by movants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints re Notice of Motion Hearing, 37 , Attorney Appearance, MOTION to dismiss The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints 33 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 34 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 35 (Stek, Stanley) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints' Motion to Dismiss 33 : motion hearing is set for 4/29/2013 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin (Hengeveld, Jeffrey) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Stek, Stanley) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Stek, Stanley) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to dismiss by movants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Corporation of the Presiding Bishop of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stek, Stanley); Modified text on 12/31/2012 (pjw). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY to response to motion 13 filed by Grand Canyon Education, Inc., Grand Canyon University, Inc. (Jenkins, Maurice) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal by mail with acknowledgment of receipt of summons and complaint by Schleier Law Offices, P.C. served on 11/19/2012, answer due 12/10/2012 (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Motion for Personal Service of Christopher Richardson by U.S. Marshal's Office; the Clerk's Office is ordered to reissue summonses for defendants: 1) Christopher Richardson; and 2) Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints, and the United States Marshal Service is ordered to properly attempt service of the summonses and the Amended Complaint on both defendants and to document same; signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, cbh) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/19/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendant Schleier Law Offices, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss 24 : motion hearing is set for 4/29/2013 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for order "document named as motion for personal service of Christopher Richardson by U.S. Marshal's Office" by plaintiff David Haigler; (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 17 with Certificate of Service filed by David Haigler (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE by defendant Schleier Law Offices, P.C. re MOTION to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment 24 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 23 (Mock, Valerie) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of mailing error and correction for service of objection motion by plaintiff David Haigler (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to dismiss, or in the alternative, for summary judgment with Brief in Support by defendant Schleier Law Offices, P.C.; (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Tod Schleier, # 4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Complaint)(Mock, Valerie) Modified text on 12/11/2012 (dfw). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schleier Law Offices, P.C. (Mock, Valerie) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/10/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 19 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (to file response to 13 ); signed by Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 13 with certificate of service filed by David Haigler (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(jem) Modified text and link on 12/7/2012 (jlg). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff David Haigler re MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re 17 19 (ald) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply re 13 by plaintiff David Haigler; (ald) Modified text and link on 12/7/2012 (jlg). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION HEARING regarding Defendants Grand Canyon Education, Inc. and Grand Canyon University, Inc's Motion to Dismiss 13 and Defendant Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin's Motion to Dismiss 17 : motion hearing is set for 4/29/2013 at 11:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody (Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody, jal) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendant Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin; (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hengeveld, Jeffrey) Modified text on 11/16/2012 (dfw). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Canyon University, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Grand Canyon Education, Inc. for Grand Canyon University, Inc. (Jenkins, Maurice) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grand Canyon Education, Inc (Jenkins, Maurice) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 13 filed by Grand Canyon Education, Inc, Grand Canyon University, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 3)(Jenkins, Maurice) Modified text on 11/13/2012 (dfw). [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendants Grand Canyon Education, Inc, Grand Canyon University, Inc.; (Jenkins, Maurice) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by US Marshal as to Unknown Part(y)(ies) #1 (kvt) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of receipt of case (dfw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 10/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ellen S. Carmody; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 10/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:12-cv-12311; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (cmi) [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 10/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (DWor) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and request for service by the U.S. Marshal by David Haigler. (KKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by David Haigler, Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints against John Doe, Grand Canyon Education, Inc, Grand Canyon University, Inc., Law Offices of Marshall A. Martin, Mormon/LDS Associates, Christopher Richardson, Schleier Law Offices, P.C., Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (KKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by David Haigler. (KKra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 2 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by David Haigler and Order Plaintiff to Show Cause why this case should not be dismissed for improper venue. Response due 9/5/2012. Signed by District Judge Arthur J. Tarnow. (MLan) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 08/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by David Haigler. (PMil) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed by David Haigler against All Defendants (PMil) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 10/2/2012.] [Transferred from miwd on 6/20/2013.] (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?