USA v. Graves
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 3:05-cr-30035-JES-BGC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth L Collins +1 217 492 4450 +1 217 492 4888 beth.collins@usdoj.gov
Space Gregory K Harris +1 217 492 4450 +1 217 492 4512 gregory.harris@usdoj.gov
Space James A Lewis +1 217 492 4450 +1 217 492 4512 jim.lewis2@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Springfield
Filed 4/8/2005
County Adams
Terminated 11/23/2005
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1344A.F
Offense Level 4
181344.F BANK FRAUD - On or about January 8, 2002 at Illiopolis, defendan commited bank fraud in violation of 181344(1) & (2)
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1014.F
Offense Level 4
181014.F - LOAN AND CREDIT APPLICATIONS GENERALLY - On or about January 8, 2002 at Illiopolis defendant made a false statement in an audit completion report to Hickory Point Bank in violation of 181014
Def Custody Status Released
Flags 33, 36
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Reply
Reply by USA as to John Richard Graves re [35] Letter. (Lewis, James)
    LREF
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE James A Lewis appearing for USA. Entry of Appearance (Lewis, James)
      LREF
      Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008 Letter
      Letter from John Graves. (CT, ilcd)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Order
        TEXT ORDER: The Court has received a letter from Defendant John Graves. The Clerk is directed to file the letter and send copies to counsel of record. The Government is directed to review the letter and file a response. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 9/4/2008. (CT, ilcd)
          LREF
          Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 LetterCourt Filing
          Letter from John Graves to Judge Scott regarding sentence. (CT, ilcd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Order
            TEXT ORDER: The Court has received a letter from Defendant Graves requesting either a one month reduction in his sentence or home confinement. The request is denied. The Court has no authority at this point to modify the Defendant's sentence. The Court also has no authority to affect the Defendant's placement within the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is directed to place the letter in the court file and send a copy to the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this Text Order to the Bureau of Prisons and to Defendant Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 8/5/2008. (CT, ilcd)
              LREF
              Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 LetterCourt Filing
              Letter received by Judge Scott from Defendant John Graves requesting home confinement. (ME, ilcd)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Order
                TEXT ORDER: The Court has received a letter from Defendant Graves regarding his placement within the Bureau of Prisons, and requesting home confinement. The request for home confinement is denied. The Court has no authority at this point to modify the Defendant's sentence to place him in home confinement. The Court also has no authority to affect the Defendant's placement within the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is directed to place the letter in the court file and send a copy to the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this Text Order to the Bureau of Prisons and to Defendant Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 1/18/08. (ME, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                  TEXT ORDER: Defendant's Motion to Modify (d/e 32) is DENIED. The Court has no authority to affect the Defendants placement within the Bureau of Prisons. The Bureau of Prisons makes that determination. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 7/25/07. (ME, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                    MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by John Richard Graves. (MC, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Letter
                      Letter from John Graves. (MC, ilcd)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Order
                        TEXT ORDER: The Court has received a letter from Defendant Graves regarding his placement within the Bureau of Prisons. The Court has no authority to affect the Defendants placement within the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is directed to place the letter in the court file and send a copy to the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is further directed to send a copy of this Text Order to the Bureau of Prisons and to Defendant Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 5/14/07. (MC, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                          TURNOVER ORDER as to John Richard Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 5/10/2007. (CT, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Memoradum in Support
                            MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to John Richard Graves re [28] MOTION Motion for Turnover Order re [20] Writ Issued (Collins, Elizabeth)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/10/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MOTION Motion for Turnover Order re [20] Writ Issued by USA as to John Richard Graves. (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE Cover Sheet to Copy of Summary of Exemptions & Claim of Exemption Form by USA as to John Richard Graves (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Collins, Elizabeth)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                ANSWER of Non-Wage Garnishee NADART as to John Richard Graves (ME, ilcd)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007, Terminated: 4/11/2007 Motion to Strike
                                  MOTION to Strike Document by USA as to John Richard Graves. (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                    PER THE TEXT ORDER OF 4/11/2007 THIS DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN: NOTICE Final Accounting of Agreed Order of Continuing Earnings Garnishment (Doc. 25) by USA as to John Richard Graves (Collins, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/11/2007 (CT, ilcd).
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                      Certificate of Service by USA as to John Richard Graves re [19] Order on Motion for Writ, [20] Writ Issued, [21] Notice (Other) (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Order on Motion to Strike
                                        TEXT ORDER: The Government's Motion for Leave to Strike Document (d/e 25) is ALLOWED. The Notice of Final Accounting and Agreed Order of Continuing Earnings Garnishment (d/e 24) is stricken. The stricken document concerns a different matter and was filed in this case by mistake. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 4/11/2007. (CT, ilcd)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007 Affidavit
                                          AFFIDAVIT by USA as to John Richard Graves [19] Order on Motion for Writ, [20] Writ Issued, [21] Notice (Other) filed by USA (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 ~Notice (other)
                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF POST JUDGMENT GARNISHMENT (NON-WAGE) by USA as to John Richard Graves (CT, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Writ Issued
                                              WRIT of of Garnishment issued. (CT, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Order on Motion for WritCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [17] Motion for Writ as to John Richard Graves (1). Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 12/7/2006. (CT, ilcd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006 Memoradum in Support
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to John Richard Graves re [17] MOTION for Writ Application for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Wage) (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006, Terminated: 12/7/2006 ~Motion for Writ
                                                    MOTION for Writ Application for Writ of Garnishment (Non-Wage) by USA as to John Richard Graves. (Collins, Elizabeth)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Letter
                                                      Letter from Georgia Hagmann and Defendant Graves. (MC, ilcd)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Order
                                                        TEXT ORDER: The Court has received letters from the Defendant and a friend of his, Georgia Hagmann. The Clerk is directed to file the letters and send copies to counsel of record and the Bureau of Prisons. As the Court explained at the sentencing, the Court can only recommend a placement to the Bureau of Prisons. The Clerk is also directed to send a copy of this Text Order to the Defendant. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 8/15/06. (MC, ilcd)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                          Judgment Returned Executed as to John Richard Graves on 2/22/06. (MC, ilcd)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Letter
                                                            Letter from Michael Nailey, Regional Director re: Defendant Graves. (MC, ilcd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Presentence Investigation Report
                                                              +++ PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to John Richard Graves (CT, ilcd)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Sentencing Recommendation +
                                                                +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to John Richard Graves. (CT, ilcd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER regarding sentencing as to John Richard Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 11/23/2005. (CT, ilcd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Statement of Reasons +
                                                                    +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to John Richard Graves (CT, ilcd)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                                      JUDGMENT as to John Richard Graves (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Defendant sentenced to 37 months imprisonment on each of count 1 and 2 to run concurrently; 5 years supervised release on each of counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently; $200 special assessment; restitution in the amount of $1,160,936.08. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 11/22/2005. (CT, ilcd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to John Richard Graves (Harris, Gregory)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeanne E. Scott: SENTENCING HEARING. AUSA Gregory Harris present for government. Defendant present in person and with his attorney, Douglas J. Beevers. Defendant's objection to the PSR heard. Witnesses called, sworn, and questioned. Arguments of counsel heard regarding objection. Court sustained objection. Arguments of counsel heard regarding sentencing. Defendant exercised his right of allocution and addressed the Court. Defendant sentenced to 37 months imprisonment on each of count 1 and 2 to run concurrently; 5 years supervised release on each of counts 1 and 2 to run concurrently; $200 special assessment; restitution in the amount of $1,160,936.08. Interest waived. Rights of appeal given. Defendant's motion to self report granted. Defendant is to report by 12 noon on 1/10/2006 to the designated facility or to the US Marshals Service located at 600 E. Monroe, Springfield, IL. (Court Reporter K. Sullivan.) (CT, ilcd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                            SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by John Richard Graves (Beevers, Douglas)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER on Implementation of Sentencing Guidelines as to John Richard Graves. Entered by Judge Jeanne E. Scott on 11/8/2005. (CT, ilcd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings before Judge Jeanne E. Scott: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING. AUSA Gregory Harris present for government. Defendant present in person and with his attorney, Douglas Beevers. Defendant sworn, examined by Court, advised of his rights and found competent to enter a knowing plea. Open plea discussed and entered of record. Defendant entered an open guilty plea to counts 1 and 2 of the indictment. Judgment entered on plea. PSR ordered. Trial set for 7/11/2005 is canceled. Sentencing hearing scheduled for Friday, November 18, 2005, at 3:30 pm. Order on Implementation of Sentencing Guidelines entered. Defendant's bond to continue and remain in full force and effect. (Court Reporter K. Sullivan.) (CT, ilcd)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to John Richard Graves (1) $10,000 O/R Bond . Entered by Judge Byron G. Cudmore on 05/19/05. (MR, ilcd)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Bond
                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to John Richard Graves in amount of $ 10,000 O/R (MR, ilcd)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Byron G. Cudmore :Initial appearance & Arraignment as to John Richard Graves (1) Count 1,2 held on 5/19/2005. AUSA Gregory Harris present on behalf of the Govt. Dft John Richard Graves present on summons. Dft advised of rights, charges, and penalties. Dft sworn and questioned regarding financial status. Court finds dft indigent. Asst Federal Public Defender Douglas Beevers present and accepts appointment. Dft waives the reading of the Indictment. Dft arraigned; Not Guilty plea entered. Discovery to commence. Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2005 09:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 7/11/2005 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Jeanne E. Scott. Court orders $10,000 O/R Bond set as to dft John Richard Graves. (MR, ilcd)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                        Summons Returned Executed on 4/21/05. as to John Richard Graves (MC, ilcd)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Indictment
                                                                                          INDICTMENT as to John Richard Graves (1) count(s) 1, 2. (MC, ilcd)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?