BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. v. MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-00674
District Judge Clarence Cooper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 2:19 AM EDT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bellsouth Telecommunications Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd, Evans & Figel, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean A. Lev +1 202 326 7975 +1 202 326 7999 slev@khhte.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kilpatrick Townsend & Stockton, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Henry Patton +1 404 815 6460 +1 404 541 3333 mpatton@kilpatricktownsend.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McRae Brooks Warner, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael E. Brooks +1 404 681 0720 +1 404 681 0780 mbrooks@mbwattorneys.com
v.
No Logo Al-Call, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Angela E. Speir, Defendant
No Logo AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by AT&T Communications of the Southern States, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Suzanne W. Ockleberry +1 404 810 7175

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J. Armstrong +1 404 527 4000 +5274 527 527 4198 barmstrong@mckennalong.com
No Logo Broadriver Communications Corp., Defendant
No Logo Business Telecom, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Competitve Carriers of the South, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Governor's Office of Consumer Protection

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christiane +1 404 463 0223 tiane.sommer@cuc.oca.state.ga.us

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christiane +1 404 463 0223 tiane.sommer@cuc.oca.state.ga.us
No Logo David L. Burgess, Defendant
No Logo Dieca Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ez Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Georgia Public Service Commission, Defendant
No Logo H. Doug Everett, Defendant
No Logo Itc^deltacom Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kmc Telecom Holdings, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware Corporation Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
No Logo KMC Telecom III, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware limited liability company Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
No Logo KMC Telecom V, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a Delaware Corporation Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
No Logo Lecstar Telecom, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A. Goldman +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 mgoldman@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Georgia Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Walsh +1 404 657 2204 dwalsh@law.ga.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Teresa Wynn Roseborough +1 404 853 8100 teresa.roseborough@sablaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dara L. Steele-Belkin +1 404 853 8184 dara.steele-belkin@sablaw.com
No Logo Nuvox Communications, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
a Delaware Corporation Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank B. Strickland +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 fbs@sbllaw.net
No Logo Robert B. Baker, Defendant
No Logo Southern Digital Network, Inc., Defendant
Sprint Nextel Corporation Sprint Nextel Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sprint Communications Company, L.P."
No Logo Stan Wise, Defendant
No Logo Talk America Inc., Defendant
No Logo Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc., Defendant
No Logo US LEC of Georgia, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lewis Mills House

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Newton M. Galloway +1 770 233 6230 +1 770 233 6231 ngalloway@gallyn-law.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terri Mick Lyndall +1 770 233 6230
No Logo USCarrier Telecom, Defendant
No Logo XO Communications Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
No Logo Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strickland Brockington Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anne W. Lewis +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 awl@sbllaw.net
Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 151
Nature of Suit 450 - Commerce ICC Rates Etc.
  Entries (111) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 110 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. It is Ordered that BellSouth's claims against MCI and MCI's counterclaims against BellSouth are hereby Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/28/06. (vs) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal Between Plaintiff BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. and Defendant MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 03/24/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: None
      Certified copy of ORDER of USCA affirming the district court decision re: 55 Notice of Appeal filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc., 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Business Telecom, Inc.,Dieca Communications, Inc.,Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc.,KMC Telecom III, LLC,KMC Telecom V, Inc.,Talk America, Inc.,ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Lecstar Telecom, Inc.,Broadriver Communications Corp., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Robert B. Baker, H. Doug Everett,Angela E. Speir, Stan Wise, 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, 65 Notice of Appeal filed by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 05-11880. (fem) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying as moot 94 Motion to Stay, denying as moot 96 Motion to Stay . Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 10/7/05. (vs) (Entered: 10/07/2005)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None
          ANSWER to Counterclaim by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc..(Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: None
            FORTHWITH LETTER from USCA re 55 Notice of Appeal filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc., 56 Notice of Appeal, filed by Business Telecom, Inc., Dieca Communications, Inc., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC, KMC Telecom V, Inc.,Talk America, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC,Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Lecstar Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom,, 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission,, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC,, Robert B. Baker,, H. Doug Everett, Angela E. Speir, Stan Wise, 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, 65 Notice of Appeal filed by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Case Appealed to USCA Case Number 05-11880-DD.Appeal Record due by 7/14/2005. (fem) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
              SECOND AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(vs) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER granting 101 Motion for Leave to File movant's Second Amended Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 6/16/05. (vs) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. (Warner, Jill) (Entered: 06/16/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                    REPLY BRIEF re 94 MOTION to Stay filed by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Leave to File A Second Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaimby MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Second Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim of MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Second Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim of MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC# 3 Text of Proposed Order Order - Motion of MCIMetro Access Transmission Services LLC for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim)(Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 06/14/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None
                        Record of the Georgia Public Service Commission (vs) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None
                          Certificate of Interested Persons by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: The time within which BellSouth must serve a reply to MCI's Counterclaim is extended 30 days, through and including June 27, 2005. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 5/26/05. (vs) (Entered: 06/01/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE to re 94 MOTION to Stay, 96 MOTION to Stay filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/18/2005, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Stay by US LEC of Georgia, Inc.. (Galloway, Newton) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None
                                  RESPONSE in Support re 94 MOTION to Stay filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, Robert B. Baker, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise. (Walsh, Daniel) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None
                                    MOTION to Stay by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None
                                      Certified copy of CERTIFICATE OF READINESS transmitted to USCA re: 55 Notice of Appeal, 66 Notice of Appeal, 56 Notice of Appeal, 58 Notice of Appeal, 59 Notice of Appeal and 65 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (12 Vols. of Pldgs and 1 Transcript) (kac) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        CONSENT ORDER extending time for 3 days through and including 5/5/05 for the parties to file a Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 5/3/05. (vs) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                          Certificate of Interested Persons by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc., Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Competitve Carriers of the South, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, Dieca Communications, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, US LEC of Georgia, Inc., Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                            PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY SCHEDULE filed by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc., Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, Dieca Communications, Inc., BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, US LEC of Georgia, Inc., Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Clerk's Entry of Dismissal re: 85 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to dft XO Communications Services, Inc. (vs) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER extending time within which BellSouth must serve a reply to MCI's 49 Counterclaim for 30 days, through May 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/28/05. (vs) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Georgia Public Service Commission re: 58 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD. Certificate of Readiness due on 5/4/2005 (No transcript is required for appeal purposes.)(kac) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                          USCA Acknowledgment of certified docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees re: 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD. (kac) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC Eleventh Circuit Transcript Information Form (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                              USCA Acknowledgment of 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                USCA Acknowledgment of certified docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees re: 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD. (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  USCA Acknowledgment of 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    USCA Acknowledgment of docket sheets reflecting payment of appeal filing and docketing fees re: 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Robert B. Baker, H. Doug Everett, Angela E. Speir and Stan Wise. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD. (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      USCA Acknowledgment of 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Robert B. Baker, H. Doug Everett, Angela E. Speir and Stan Wise. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        USCA Acknowledgment of 56 Notice of Appeal filed by Business Telecom, Inc., Dieca Communications, Inc., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC, KMC Telecom V, Inc., Talk America, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Lecstar Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Southern Digital Network, Inc., SCarrier Telecom. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          USCA Acknowledgment of 55 Notice of Appeal filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            USCA Acknowledgment of 65 Notice of Appeal filed by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-DD (kac) (Entered: 04/15/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom.(Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc..(Armstrong, Barry) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  USCA Appeal Fees received $255.00; Receipt Number 535786 re: 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-D. (kac) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      Forwarded Appeal Fee and Transmittal Letters to USCA re: 66 Notice of Appeal filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-D. (kac) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        USCA Appeal Fees received $255.00; Receipt Number 535716 re: 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-D. (kac) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          USCA Appeal Fees received $255.00; Receipt Number 535704 re: 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Robert B. Baker, H. Doug Everett, Angela E. Speir and Stan Wise. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 05-11880-D. (kac) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by US LEC of Georgia, Inc.. Transcript Order Form due on 4/22/2005 (Galloway, Newton) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. Filing Fee $255.00; Receipt Number 535656. Transcript Order Form due on 4/21/2005 (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                Forwarded Appeal Fee and Transmittal Letters to USCA re: 59 Notice of Appeal filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Forwarded Appeal Fee and Transmittal Letters to USCA re: 58 Notice of Appeal filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, David L. Burgess, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Robert B. Baker, H. Doug Everett, Angela E. Speir, Stan Wise. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 1, 2005 before Judge Clarence Cooper. Court Reporter: Amanda Lohnaas. Certificate of Readiness due on 4/20/2005 (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      USCA Appeal Fees received $255.00; Receipt Number 535652 re: 56 Notice of Appeal filed by Business Telecom, Inc., Dieca Communications, Inc., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC, KMC Telecom V, Inc., Talk America, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Lecstar Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Southern Digital Network, Inc. and USCarrier Telecom. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        USCA Appeal Fees received $255.00 Receipt Number 535596 re: 55 Notice of Appeal filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. Case Appealed to USCA - 11th Circuit Case Number 00-00000-00. (kac) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. Transcript Order Form due on 4/21/2005 (Sommer, Christiane) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, Robert B. Baker, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. Transcript Order Form due on 4/21/2005 (Walsh, Daniel) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs.(vs) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. Transcript Order Form due on 4/20/2005 (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 53 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. Transcript Order Form due on 4/20/2005 (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Clarence Cooper : Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2005 re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc., Court heard from cnsl. Court verbally granted pla's motion for Preliminary Injunction. Cnsl for pla to prepare written order for court's signature no later than Tues. 4/5/05. Verbal moiton by dfts for a stay pending an 11th circuit review taken under advisement. Cnsl to confer re: bond issue. (Court Reporter Amanda Lohnaas.)(vs) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 51 Motion to Stay, granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. All dfts are directed to answer or otherwise respond to pla's cmp within 7 days of the date of this order . Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 4/5/05. (vs) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Amend Proposed Order by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom. (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing corrected exhibit 2 to dft's 33 Joint Memo in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injuction, by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC (vs) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of R. Chad Pifer by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(vs) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing Declaration of R. Chad Pifer by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC (vs) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(vs) (Entered: 04/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Second Notice of Supplemental Exhibits in Support of Joint Defendants' Opposition to BellSouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mary Conquest# 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jerry Watts# 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Matthew Feil# 4 Exhibit 4 - BellSouth 2004 10_K)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Supplemental Exhibits in Support of Joint Defendants' Opposition to BellSouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Jean Houck - ITC^DeltaCom# 2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jean Houck - Business Telecom# 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Brian Chaiken - Supra Telecommunications# 4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Philip Forbes - US Carrier# 5 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Julia Strow - Cbeyond# 6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Matthew Feil - Southern Digital Network# 7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Michael Britt - LecStar Telecom# 8 Exhibit 8 - Declaration of Charles Watkins - Covad Communications# 9 Exhibit 9 - Declaration of Page Miller - Talk America# 10 Exhibit 10 - Declaration of Page Miller - Talk America# 11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of Fran Audia - BroadRiver Communication# 12 Exhibit 12 - Declaration of Robert Bye)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Brief In Support by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Supplemental Exhibit in Support of MCI's Opposition to BellSouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of John Monroe)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              REPLY BRIEF re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit Exhibit N)(Brooks, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, Robert B. Baker, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC.(Walsh, Daniel) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 14 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Marc A. Goldman. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/30/05. (vs) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 20 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Sean A. Lev. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/30/05. (vs) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of the Joint Defendants and MCI's Memoranda in Opposition to BellSouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Memorandum Opinion and Order in Illinois Bell v. Hurley# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Memorandum Opinion and Order in BST v. Universal Telecom)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Brief in Opposition to BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.'s Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Brief)(Galloway, Newton) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc.. (vs) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of voluntarily dismissal without prejudice as to defendant EZ Communications, Inc. by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. (er) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MEMORANDUM in opposition to 2 plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., and KMC Telecom III, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Tab-1# 2 Tab-2# 3 Tab-3# 4 Tab-4# 5 Tab-5)(er) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs. (er) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC re 28 Notice of Appearance,, 29 Notice of Appearance Certificate of Service (Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC re 27 Notice of Appearance, 26 Notice of Appearance, Certificate of Service (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Dara L. Steele-Belkin on behalf of MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC (Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Dara L. Steele-Belkin on behalf of Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom (Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Wynn Roseborough on behalf of MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Teresa Wynn Roseborough on behalf of Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom (Roseborough, Teresa) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit 1 to declaration of David M. Eppsteiner by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. (Exhibit 1 too voluminous to scan, see file) (vs) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. filed by XO Communications Services, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Hardy, Steven) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, Table of Contents# 2 Appendix, Exhibit A# 3 Appendix, Exhibit B# 4 Appendix, Exhibit C# 5 Appendix, Exhibit D# 6 Appendix, Exhibit E# 7 Appendix, Exhibit F# 8 Appendix, Exhibit G# 9 Appendix, Exhibit H# 10 Appendix, Exhibit I)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom. (Attachments: # 1 2nd Supp. Appendix, Ex. A, Part 1# 2 2nd Supp. Appendix, Ex. A, Part 2# 3 2nd Supp. Appendix, Ex. A, Part 3# 4 2nd Supp. Appendix, Ex. A, Part 4# 5 2nd Supp. Appendix, Ex. A, Part 5)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Sean A. Lev Pro Hac Viceby plaintiff BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc..Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #534883. (cdg) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER extending time thru 3/25/05 for defendants to file responses to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/24/05. (dr) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint and Entry of Appearance by US LEC of Georgia, Inc.. Discovery ends on 8/22/2005.(cdg) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition to 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by US LEC of Georgia, Inc..(cdg) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Armstrong, Barry) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Of Filing of Exhibit 1 to Declaration of David M. Eppsteiner by AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. (Armstrong, Barry) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Marc A. Goldman Pro Hac Viceby MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC.Filing Fee received $150.00, Receipt #535021. (Attachment: (1) Proposed Order)(dfb) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction TO EMERGENCY MOTION OF BELLSOUTH TELECOMMUNICATIONS, INC FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, Robert B. Baker, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Walsh, Daniel) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Al-Call, Inc. served on 3/15/2005, answer due 4/4/2005. (cdg) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Dieca Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit A - ITC^DeltaCom CLEC Agreement Part 1# 2 Appendix Exhibit A - ITC^DeltaCom CLEC Agreement Part 2# 3 Appendix Exhibit B - Business Telecom CLEC Agreement Part 1# 4 Appendix Exhibit B - Business Telecom CLEC Agreement Part 2# 5 Appendix Exhibit B - Business Telecom CLEC Agreement Part 3# 6 Appendix Exhibit B - Business Telecom CLEC Agreement Part 4# 7 Appendix Exhibit C - Supra CLEC Agreement Part 1# 8 Appendix Exhibit C - Supra CLEC Agreement Part 2# 9 Appendix Exhibit D - US Carrier CLEC Agreement Part 1# 10 Appendix Exhibit D - US Carrier CLEC Agreement Part 2# 11 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 1# 12 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 2# 13 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 3# 14 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 4# 15 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 5# 16 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 6# 17 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 7# 18 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 8# 19 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 9# 20 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 10# 21 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 11# 22 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 12# 23 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 13# 24 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 14# 25 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 15# 26 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 16# 27 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 17# 28 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 18# 29 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 19# 30 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 20# 31 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 21# 32 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 22# 33 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 23# 34 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 24# 35 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 25# 36 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 26# 37 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 27# 38 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 28# 39 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 29# 40 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 30# 41 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 31# 42 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 32# 43 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 33# 44 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 34# 45 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 35# 46 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 36# 47 Appendix Exhibit E - Cbeyond CLEC Agreement Part 37# 48 Appendix Exhibit F - FDN CLEC Agreement Part 1# 49 Appendix Exhibit F - FDN CLEC Agreement Part 2# 50 Appendix Exhibit F - FDN CLEC Agreement Part 3# 51 Appendix Exhibit F - FDN CLEC Agreement Part 4# 52 Appendix Exhibit F - FDN CLEC Agreement Part 5# 53 Appendix Exhibit G - LecStar CLEC Agreement Part 1# 54 Appendix Exhibit G - LecStar CLEC Agreement Part 2# 55 Appendix Exhibit H - Covad CLEC Agreement Part 1# 56 Appendix Exhibit H - Covad CLEC Agreement Part 2# 57 Appendix Exhibit H - Covad CLEC Agreement Part 3# 58 Appendix Exhibit H - Covad CLEC Agreement Part 4# 59 Appendix Exhibit I - Talk America CLEC Agreement Part 1# 60 Appendix Exhibit I - Talk America CLEC Agreement Part 2# 61 Appendix Exhibit I - Talk America CLEC Agreement Part 3# 62 Appendix Exhibit J - Cbeyond and BellSouth Abeyance Agreement)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit A - CLEC Agreement Part 1# 2 Appendix Exhibit A - CLEC Agreement Part 2# 3 Appendix Exhibit A - CLEC Agreement Part 3# 4 Appendix Exhibit A - CLEC Agreement Part 4)(Steele-Belkin, Dara) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Return of Service Executed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Talk America, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Southern Digital Network, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; US LEC of Georgia, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Georgia Public Service Commission served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Angela E. Speir served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Robert B. Baker served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; David L. Burgess served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; H. Doug Everett served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; Stan Wise served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; KMC Telecom V, Inc. served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005; KMC Telecom III, LLC served on 3/11/2005, answer due 3/31/2005. (vs) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Return of Service Executed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. XO Communications Services, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Business Telecom, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Competitve Carriers of the South, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Sprint Communications Company, L.P. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Broadriver Communications Corp. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Cbeyond Communications, LLC served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Dieca Communications, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; EZ Communications, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; USCarrier Telecom served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Nuvox Communications, Inc. served on 3/14/2005, answer due 4/4/2005. (vs) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. Lecstar Telecom, Inc. served on 3/15/2005, answer due 4/4/2005; Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs served on 3/15/2005, answer due 4/4/2005. (vs) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: 2 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 4/1/2005 09:30 AM before Judge Clarence Cooper. (pds) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion for Expedited Briefing and Hearing. Any defendant who wishes to oppose Bellsouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, must file and serve its brief in opposition no later than March 24, 2005. Bellsouth may reply to any brief in opposition by filing and serving its reply no later than 3/31/05. No party will file any other papers unless requested by the Court ; and A hearing will be held on Bellsouth's Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction on April 6, 2005 at 4:00 pm. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 3/14/05. (cdg) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Xspedius Management Co. Switched Services, LLC, Xspedius Managment Co. of Atlanta, XO Communications Services, Inc., AT & T Communications of the Southern States, LLC., Teleport Communications Atlanta, Inc., Talk America, Inc., Lecstar Telecom, Inc., ITC^Deltacom Communications, Inc., Business Telecom, Inc., Competitve Carriers of the South, Inc., Al-Call, Inc., Sprint Communications Company, L.P., Broadriver Communications Corp., Cbeyond Communications, LLC, Consumers' Utility Counsel Division of the Governor's Office of Consumer Affairs, Dieca Communications, Inc., EZ Communications, Inc., Southern Digital Network, Inc., USCarrier Telecom, US LEC of Georgia, Inc., Georgia Public Service Commission, Angela E. Speir, Robert B. Baker, David L. Burgess, H. Doug Everett, Stan Wise, MCImetro Access Transmission Services, LLC, Nuvox Communications, Inc., KMC Telecom Holdings, Inc., KMC Telecom V, Inc., KMC Telecom III, LLC. (vs) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Expedite briefing and hrg on pla's emergency motion for preliminary injunctionby BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (vs) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A-1# 3 Exhibit A-2# 4 Exhibit A-3# 5 Exhibit A-4# 6 Exhibit A-5# 7 Exhibit A-6# 8 Exhibit A-7# 9 Exhibit B# 10 Exhibit C# 11 Exhibit D# 12 Exhibit E# 13 Exhibit F# 14 Exhibit G)(vs) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed and summon(s) issued. Consent form to proceed before U.S. Magistrate and pretrial instructions given to attorney ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 534589.), filed by BellSouth Telecommunications, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(vs) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 102 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?