Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. v. Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 8:14-cv-01387
District Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 3, 2018 at 1:50 PM DT (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Litchfield Associates Ltd, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bajo Cuva, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pedro F. Bajo, Jr. +1 813 443 2199 +1 813 443 2193 pedro.bajo@bajocuva.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brad F. Barrios +1 813 443 2199 +1 813 443 2193 brad.barrios@bajocuva.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kenneth George Turkel +1 813 221 2626 +1 813 221 7335 kturkel@bajocuva.com
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Michael A. Grow +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 growm@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Brandon Paul Faulkner +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 brandon.faulkner@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Joseph H. Varner, III +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 joe.varner@hklaw.com
No Logo Deseret Book Company, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Michael A. Grow +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 growm@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Brandon Paul Faulkner +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 brandon.faulkner@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Joseph H. Varner, III +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 joe.varner@hklaw.com
No Logo Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arent Fox LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Michael A. Grow +1 202 857 6000 +1 202 857 6395 growm@arentfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Brandon Paul Faulkner +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 brandon.faulkner@hklaw.com
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Joseph H. Varner, III +1 813 227 8500 +1 813 229 0134 joe.varner@hklaw.com
v.
No Logo Inblosam, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman LLP - Den/CO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/26/2015 Carrie Ann Wozniak +1 407 423 4000 +1 407 843 6610 carrieann.wozniak@akerman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Akerman Senterfitt LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Storrs Wood +1 407 419 8548 +1 407 254 4208 david.wood@akerman.com
No Logo Standard Works, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Litchfield Associates Ltd, Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jia-Ming Shang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 Scott T. Lyon +1 949 567 7837 +1 949 852 8282 scott.lyon@sedgwicklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Litchfield Associates Ltd, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by MacFarlane Ferguson & McMullen

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 JEFFREY WALDEN GIBSON +1 727 441 8966 +1 727 442 8470 jg@clw.macfar.com
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 Noel Poncy McDonell +1 813 273 4200 +1 813 273 4396 npm@macfar.com
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 Jessica Smith West +1 813 273 4200 jms@macfar.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
3825 Henderson Blvd, Ste 100
Tampa, FL 33629 Ashley R. Kellgren +1 813 273 4200 +1 813 273 4396 Akellgren@traublieberman.com
No Logo Bajo | Cuva | Cohen | Turkel, Interested Party
No Logo Peter J. Grilli, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Peter J. Grilli, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter John Grilli +1 813 874 1002 +1 813 874 1131 peter@grillimediation.com
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER dismissing case for want of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to terminate any deadlines and close the case. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/26/2015. (JMF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with the Court's Order, as to Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. Show Cause Response due on or before 5/19/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/5/2015. (JMF) (JNB).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ENDORSED ORDER granting 75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Scott T. Lyon and Sedgwick LLP terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff and relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/3/2015. (JMF) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Scott T. Lyon to withdraw as attorney by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Lyon, Scott)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER re 72 Stipulation filed by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorneys Noel Poncy McDonell, Jeffrey W. Gibson, Ashley R. Kellgren, Jessica Marie Smith, and the law firm of Macfarlane, Ferguson & McMullen as counsel of record for Plaintiff, and each are relieved of any further obligation in this matter. Plaintiff shall have up to and including thirty days from the date of this Order to obtain new counsel. Failure to obtain counsel within the allotted time will result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/31/2015. (JMF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE by Bajo | Cuva | Cohen | Turkel re 68 Notice (Other) of Satisfaction of Charging Lien (Barrios, Brad)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
              STIPULATION for Order to Withdraw by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: 3/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                STATUS report by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER approving 69 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company. This action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to Defendants Corporation of the President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints; Intellectual Reserve, Inc.; Deseret Book Company; and Inblosam, LLC, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/25/2015. (JMF)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Unknown Document Type
                    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE by Bajo | Cuva | Cohen | Turkel of Filing Charging Lien (Barrios, Brad)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER directing Plaintiff to file either a status report, motion for default judgment, or a notice of dismissal as to Standard Works, LLC, within 14 days of the date of this Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/13/2015. (JMF)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                          MEDIATION report Hearing held on March 10, 2015. Hearing outcome: The case has been completely settled as to those parties. The case remains pending as to any default judgment procedures against Standard Works, LLC.. (Grilli, Peter)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Peter John Grilli on behalf of Peter J. Grilli (Grilli, Peter)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: 1/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting 63 Motion for Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/21/2015. (JMF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                Joint MOTION for protective order by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order)(Varner, Joseph)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: 1/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Ann Wozniak on behalf of Inblosam, LLC (Wozniak, Carrie)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Marie Smith on behalf of Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. (Smith, Jessica)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Noel Poncy McDonell on behalf of Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. (McDonell, Noel)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley R. Kellgren on behalf of Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. (Kellgren, Ashley)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Gibson on behalf of Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. (Gibson, Jeffrey)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/17/2015, Dispositive motions due by 8/14/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/9/2015 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli, Jury Trial set for 1/11/2016 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli, Conduct mediation hearing by 7/31/2015. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/5/2015. (JMF)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 55 Motion to extend time. The case management deadlines will be rescheduled by separate order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/31/2014. (JMF) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                Joint MOTION to extend time to Case Management Deadlines by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Varner, Joseph)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Michael A. Grow (Grow, Michael)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 3/10/15 9:00am before Peter J. Grilli, Esq.. (Lyon, Scott)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE of hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/5/2015 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli, Jury Trial set for 12/7/2015 at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. If the parties request a different trial date, the Court will accommodate such request.(JMF) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/4/2014. (VCG) (Entered: 11/05/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                              AMENDED ANSWER in REPLY to 34 Counterclaim by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc..(Lyon, Scott)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint by Inblosam, LLC.(Wood, David)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  REPLY to 34 Counterclaim by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc..(Lyon, Scott)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: 10/27/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    ANSWER in REPLY to 34 Counterclaim by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc..(Lyon, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Insoblam, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer, File a Motion or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 44 . Defendant has until and including October 27, 2014, to file a response. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/14/2014. (KBT) (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint File a Motion or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Inblosam, LLC. (Wood, David)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott T. Lyon on behalf of Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. (Lyon, Scott)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by David Storrs Wood on behalf of Inblosam, LLC (Wood, David)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED ORDER granting 38 Motion to Withdraw. The Clerk is directed to terminate Attorneys Kenneth G. Turkel, Brad F. Barrios, and Pedro F. Bajo, Jr., and the law firm of Bajo Cuva Cohen & Turkel, P.A., as counsel of record for Plaintiff and each is relieved of any further obligation in this matter. Plaintiff shall have up to and including thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to obtain new counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/11/2014. (JMF) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediation 39 . The Notice of Mediation is due on or before November 21, 2014. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 9/10/2014. (KBT) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Notice of Mediation by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Turkel, Kenneth)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Turkel, Kenneth)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Local Rule 3.01(a) requires every motion to state a concise statement of the precise relief requested, a statement of the basis for the request, and a memorandum of legal authority in support of the request. The instant motion fails to provide either a statement of the basis for the request or a memorandum of legal authority in support of such request and, therefore, is deficient. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 9/9/2014. (JMF) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 2 Related case order and track 2 notice by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Faulkner, Brandon)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MOTION for Kenneth G. Turkel, Pedro F. Bajo, Jr., Brad F. Barrios and the law firm Bajo Cuva Cohen & Turkel, P.A. to withdraw as attorney for Plaintiff by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Turkel, Kenneth) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 11 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. by Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Deseret Book Company, Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints.(Varner, Joseph)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2015 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the November 2015 trial term before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 5/26/2015. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/21/2014. (LYB)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington: CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING held on 8/21/2014. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (LYB)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 2 Related case order and track 2 notice by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      *** STRICKEN- counsel notified to refile under proper event *** NOTICE by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. of Related Actions (Barrios, Brad) Modified text on 8/21/2014 (KMB).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        WAIVER of service returned executed on 08/13/2014 by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Inblosam, LLC. (Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of compliance re 20 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice Michael A. Grow by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc. (Grow, Michael)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting the Unopposed Motion to Continue the Hearing 25 scheduled for August 22, 2014, at 10:00 AM. The Court is not available on the dates provided by the parties. The Court will hold the Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P. scheduling conference on August 21, 2014, at 2:15 PM, in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all of the deadlines that would normally be included in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order. In addition, counsel should be prepared to discuss mediation and other scheduling orders. Out of town counsel may appear by telephone using a land-line telephone in a quiet environment (no cell phones permitted and no speaker phones). Counsel are directed to call the conference toll free number at 1-888-684-8852. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is 2564072. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1387 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference call will be activated at 2:10 PM so that the conference may start promptly at 2:15 PM. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/13/2014. (KBT) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on August 22, 2014 by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Notice of Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., scheduling conference. The Court will hold a Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P. scheduling conference on August 22, at 10:00 AM, in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Counsel should be prepared to discuss all of the deadlines that would normally be included in the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order. In addition, counsel should be prepared to discuss mediation and other scheduling matters. Out of town counsel may appear by telephone using a land-line telephone in a quiet environment (no cell phones permitted and no speaker phones). Counsel are directed to call the conference toll free number at 1-888-684-8852. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is 2564072. Counsel will then be prompted to enter the participant security code: 1387 followed by the # (pound) key. This conference call will be activated at 9:55 AM so that the conference may start promptly at 10:00 AM.(KBT) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint 22 . Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, Intellectual Reserve, Inc., and Deseret Book Company have until and including August 25, 2014, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/12/2014. (KBT) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, re: 9 Order by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph) Modified text on 8/11/2014 (KMB).
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ALIAS SUMMONS issued as to Inblosam, LLC. (LD) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER granting 15 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael A. Grow may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, with Attorney Joseph H. Varner, III, designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/23/2014. (JMF) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Inblosam, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Non-Service UT, # 2 Affidavit of Non-Service WA)(Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              RETURN of service executed on 06/19/2014 by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RETURN of service executed on 06/16/2014 by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Deseret Book Company. (Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  RETURN of service executed on 06/17/2014 by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit A)(Barrios, Brad)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Michael A. Grow to appear pro hac vice by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Standard Works, LLC (JNB) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for entry of clerk's default against Standard Works, LLC by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Barrios, Brad) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          RETURN of service executed on 06/17/2014 by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc. as to Standard Works, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lost Original Summons)(Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            UNREDACTED COMPLAINT against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Inblosam, LLC, Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Standard Works, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Barrios, Brad) Modified text on 7/9/2014 (KMB). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION for Plaintiff to File Unredacted Complaint by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the Stipulation for Acceptance of Service and Time to Respond to Complaint 7 , Defendants Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, Intellectual Reserve, Inc., and Deseret Book Company have until and including August 11, 2014, to respond to the Complaint. However, the Court advises the parties that any future request for an extension of time must be filed as a motion in accordance with Local Rule 3.01. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/8/2014. (CH) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiff's Motion to File Unredacted Complaint. Plaintiff may re-file the motion after effecting service of process upon the Defendants and complying with the requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/12/2014. (CH) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Paul Faulkner on behalf of Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc. (Faulkner, Brandon) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued as to Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Inblosam, LLC, Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Standard Works, LLC. (KMB) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re 1 Complaint for Acceptance of Service and Time To Respond to Complaint by Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc.. (Varner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to file Unredacted Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Barrios, Brad) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph H. Varner, III on behalf of Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Intellectual Reserve, Inc. (Varner, Joseph) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/25/2014. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/11/2014. (LYB) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints, Deseret Book Company, Inblosam, LLC, Intellectual Reserve, Inc., Standard Works, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA23922) filed by Litchfield Associates LTD. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit #A, # 2 Exhibit #B, # 3 Exhibit #C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(VCG) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?