Revel AC, Inc.
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-22654-GMB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 1:37 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Revel AC, Inc., Debtor

Toggle Switch Represented by Alix Partners

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vanessa A Pogue +1 201 647 7564

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space L. John Bird +1 302 622 4263 +1 302 656 8920
Space Raymond M. Patella +1 609 572 2254 +1 609 348 6834 rpatella@foxrothschild.com
Space John H. Strock, III +1 302 427 5510 +1 302 656 8920 jstrock@foxrothschild.com
Space MICHAEL J. VISCOUNT, JR. +1 609 348 4515 mviscount@foxrothschild.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Midtown Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fox Rothschild

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space White & Case LLP +1 305 371 2700
Space John K. Cunningham +1 305 995 5252 +1 305 358 5744 jcunningham@whitecase.com
Space Evan Goldenberg +1 305 371 2700
Space Fan Bruce He +1 305 995 5204 +1 305 358 5744
Space Richard S. Kebrdle +1 305 995 5276 +1 305 358 5744
Space Alfred J. Lechner, Jr. +1 212 819 8200 +1 212 354 8113 jlechner@whitecase.com
Space Kevin M. McGill +1 305 371 2700 +1 305 358 5744
Space Andrew Ritter +1 305 371 2700
Space Jason Nelson Zakia +1 305 371 2700 +3585 358 358 5744 jzakia@whitecase.com
  Entries (1702) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2000 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
Certification of No Objection (related document:1884 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1999 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
    Certification of No Objection (related document:1882 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1998 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
      Certification of No Objection (related document:1961 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1997 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
        Certification of No Objection (related document:1883 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1996 Filed: 8/22/2015, Entered: None
          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/22/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/23/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1995 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/21/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1994 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
              Order Denying Idea Boardwalk, LLC's Motion To Compel Payment Of Administrative Claim Without Prejudice. (Related Doc # 1946). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/20/2015. (wir) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1993 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/19/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1992 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/19/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1991 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/19/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1990 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                      Brief in Opposition to IDEA Motion to Compel (related document:1946 Motion to Compel Payment of Administrative Claim Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/10/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Moskovitz, Stuart) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1989 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION AND ORDER RESOLVING SECURED CLAIM OF IGT(related document:1967 Certificate of Consent (related document:1614 Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 By and Among the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Wells Fargo (Related Doc 1266). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/20/2015. (cmf)). Filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. filed by Other Prof. Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/16/2015. (kmf) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1988 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                          Certification of No Objection (related document:1956 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1987 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                            Certification of No Objection (related document:1951 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1986 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
                              Certification of No Objection (related document:1846 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1985 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER. Judge Jerome B. Simandle Dismissed as Withdrawn Bankruptcy Court Appeal. (CV# 15-0877) (related document:1259 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee). Signed on 8/17/2015. (nrf) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1984 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER. Judge Jerome B. Simandle Dismissed as Withdrawn Bankruptcy Court Appeal. (CV# 15-3137) (related document:1678 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC). Signed on 8/17/2015. (nrf) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1983 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1969, 1968, 1972, 1971, 1975, 1970, 1974, 1973). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1982 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None
                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1966). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1981 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1980 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1979 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1978 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1977 Filed: 8/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 119. Notice Date 08/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1976 Filed: 8/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 08/15/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/16/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1975 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Final Application for Compensation for Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt PA, Other Professional, period: 6/19/2014 to 6/30/2015, fee: $41,053.45, expenses: $2,426.00. Filed by Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt PA. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1974 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Final Application for Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/19/2014 to 7/31/2015, fee: $2,065,174.00, expenses: $128,211.35. Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1973 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Final Application for Compensation for Ernst & Young, Auditor, period: 6/19/2014 to 6/30/2015, fee: $206,297.50, expenses: $4,692.49. Filed by Ernst & Young. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1972 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Final Application for Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., Consultant, period: 6/23/2014 to 7/31/2015, fee: $181,478.00, expenses: $3,967.24. Filed by The Brattle Group, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1971 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                            Final Application for Compensation for White & Case LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/19/2014 to 6/30/2015, fee: $11,244,153.5, expenses: $239,689.54. Filed by White & Case LLP. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1970 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Final Application for Compensation for Alixpartners LLP, Other Professional, period: 5/1/2015 to 6/30/2015, fee: $31,512.00, expenses: $13,428.14. Filed by Alixpartners LLP. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1969 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Final Application for Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Other Professional, period: 7/2/2014 to 6/30/2015, fee: $296,241.25, expenses: $2,107.68. Filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1968 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Final Application for Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 7/2/2014 to 6/30/2015, fee: $1,541,653.00, expenses: $55,776.88. Filed by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. Hearing scheduled for 9/17/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1967 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Consent (related document:1614 Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 By and Among the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors and Wells Fargo (Related Doc 1266). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/20/2015. (cmf)). Filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1966 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      Order Granting Motion For Final Decree and Order Closing Chapter 11 Cases (Related Doc # 1960). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice., Signed on 8/10/2015. (wir) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1965 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        COPY OF DISTRICT COURT NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHDRAWING APPEAL. (CV# 15-3147) (related document:1684 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee). Signed on 8/11/2015. (nrf) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1964 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:1880 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Shaun Martin, Liquidation Trustee. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1963 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1961). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1962 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1960). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1919 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING IN PART CROSS-MOTION OF IDEA BOARDWALK, LLC SEEKING CLARIFICATION OF RIGHTS PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 365(h) AND GRANTING IN PART PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 1615 Document re: Joinder of Amenity Tenants to Idea Boardwalk, LLCs Cross-Motion for Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1918 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Jennifer L. Del Medico on behalf of Mudrick Capital Management, LP. (Del Medico, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1917 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document:1845 Motion to Modify Claims Filed by Jeffrey Venezia. Hearing scheduled for 7/13/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) filed by Creditor Jeffrey Venezia) filed by Jeffrey Venezia. (jey) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1916 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1907, 1904, 1910, 1909, 1905, 1908). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1915 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        AGREED ORDER RESOLVING CREDITOR'S MOTION TO ALLOW FILING OF A LATE PROOF OF CLAIM (related document:533 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Class Action Litigation. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 AT 10:00 AM (Rescheduled from 9/10/2014 at 12:00 PM) at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit) (Muhlstock, Todd) Modified on 8/26/2014 TO REFLECT CORRECT NAME OF MOVANT IS CONSUMER FRAUD CLASS ACTION (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), TO REFLECT RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE AND TO REFLECT NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED (jpp). filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), 541 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF). Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit) filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), 1844 Joinder of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Debtors' Objection to the Motion of the Class Action Claimants for an Order Allowing the Filing of an Untimely Filed Proof of Claim in support of (related document:973 Objection filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1914 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Order Confirming The Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan For Revel AC, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors (related document:1672 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1913 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            Order Approving The Amendment To The Settlement Agreement By and Among (I) The Debtors, (II) The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors and (III) Wells Fargo (Related Doc # 1887). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1912 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Order Approving Compromise and Settlement Agreement By and Between (I) The Debtors and (II) The State of New Jersey (Related Doc # 1886). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1911 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                Order Approving The Compromise and Settlement Agreement By and Among (I) The Debtors, (II) The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, (III) Wells Fargo, (IV) ACR Energy Partners, LLC and (V) The Bank of New York Mellon (Related Doc 1885). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/30/2015. (wir) Modified on 6/30/2015 (wir). (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1910 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $490529.50, expenses awarded: $28187.86 (Related Doc # 1737). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1909 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Order Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $2707495.00, expenses awarded: $31131.94 (Related Doc 1736). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) WHITE & CASE LLP NOTICED VIA US MAIL -Modified on 6/30/2015 (slf). (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1908 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Order Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $1294000.00, expenses awarded: $59452.86 (Related Doc # 1734). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1907 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        CORRECTED Order Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $15328.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (related document:1906 Order on Application for Compensation). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1906 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Order Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $15328.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 1722). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1905 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Order Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $48515.50, expenses awarded: $149.03 (Related Doc 1721). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) GAVIN/SOLMONESE NOTICED VIA US MAIL -Modified on 6/30/2015 (slf). (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1904 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Order Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $334374.50, expenses awarded: $11867.01 (Related Doc # 1720). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/29/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1903 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1896, 1897). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1902 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1890, 1889). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1901 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Certification of No Objection (related document:1809 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1900 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1899 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 06/24/15 (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/6/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 07/20/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/30/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 09/28/2015. (J&J Court Transcribers) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1898 Filed: 6/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/28/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1897 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Document re: Notice Of Filing Proposed Order Confirming The Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan For Revel AC, Inc. And Its Affiliated Debtors filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Confirmation Order) (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/27/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1896 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Document re: Debtors' Memorandum Of Law In (A) Support Of Confirmation Of Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan For Revel AC, Inc. And Its Affiliated Debtors And (B) Reply To The U.S. Trustee Objection (related document:1672 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1858 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1895 Filed: 6/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Response to (related document:1892 Document re: Joinder of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to Settlement Motion (related document:1885 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Moskovitz, Stuart) (Entered: 06/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1894 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 06/26/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1893 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certification of Ballot filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1892 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Document re: Joinder of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to Settlement Motion (related document:1885 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1891 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1886, 1883, 1882, 1887, 1888, 1885, 1879, 1884). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1890 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1889 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:1887 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/26/2015. Hearing scheduled for 6/29/2015 at 11:30 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (wir) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1888 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Application to Shorten Time (related document:1885 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1886 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1887 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1887 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1886 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1885 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1884 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of May 1, 2015 - June 30, 2015. Objection Date is 7/16/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1883 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of May 2015. Objection Date is 7/16/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1882 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of May 2015. Objection Date is 7/16/2015. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1881 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1877). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1880 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April - May 2015. Objection Date is 7/16/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1879 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1878 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 81. Notice Date 06/24/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1877 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of May 2015. Objection Date is 7/15/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1876 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Opinion Summary: After Tenants' leases were rejected, a cross motion was filed, seeking clarification of the Tenants' rights under section 365(h) of the Bankruptcy Code. The Court ruled that the Tenants hold true leases and retain their possessory rights. Furthermore, the Court preliminarily enjoined the landlord from interfering with Tenants' rights to use, possession, and quiet enjoyment of the premises, so long as Tenants act in compliance with local, state and federal regulations. (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC).. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/24/2015. (wir) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1875 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1866, 1870, 1867). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1874 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:1796 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Gavin/Solmonese LLC) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1873 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected Direct Testimony Certification of Jason Spillerman in Connection with Amenity Tenants' and LDV Tenants' 11 U.S.C. § 365(h) Election in support of (related document:1828 Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1831 Document filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 1871 Support filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. (Martin, Warren) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1872 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Letter to Chambers regarding hearing on June 24, 2015 (related document:1871 Support filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. (Martin, Warren) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1871 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Direct Testimony Certification of Jason Spillerman in Connection with Amenity Tenants' and LDV Tenants' 11 U.S.C. § 365(h) Election in support of (related document:1828 Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1831 Document filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. (Martin, Warren) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1870 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2015 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1869 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of Barbara Oif Stack, Esq. in Support of IDEA Boardwalk LLC's Cross-Motion for Clarification of Sec. 365(h) Rights in support of (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1868 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1862, 1863). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1867 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit (related document:1862 Notice of Agenda filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1866 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Document re: Supplemental Certification of Michael J. Viscount, Jr. in Support of Continuing Retention of Fox Rothschild LLP as Counsel to the Debtors (related document:100 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 456 Order on Application For Retention) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1865 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1846). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1864 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of No Objection (related document:1787 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1863 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1862 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1861 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 1818 Letter in support of (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, deseqno7806 Hearing Rescheduled from 6/11/15; (related document(s): 1577 Cross Motion filed by Idea Boardwalk, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (kmf ), 1828 Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1829 Document re: Appendix of Court Filings in Connection with LDV Tenant Lease Issues filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Tab 1 # 2 Tab 2 # 3 Tab 3 # 4 Tab 4 # 5 Tab 5 # 6 Tab 6 # 7 Tab 7 # 8 Tab 8 # 9 Tab 9 # 10 Tab 10 # 11 Tab 11 # 12 Tab 12 # 13 Tab 13 # 14 Tab 14 # 15 Tab 15 # 16 Tab 16 # 17 Tab 17 # 18 Tab 18 # 19 Tab 19 # 20 Tab 20 # 21 Tab 21) filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1830 Exhibit (related document:1829 Document filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Meadow Leases 2 # 2 Meadow Leases 3 # 3 Meadow Leases 4A # 4 Meadow Leases 4B # 5 Meadow Leases 5 # 6 Meadow Leases 6 # 7 Meadow Leases 7A # 8 Meadow Leases 7B) filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1831 Document re: Letter Regarding Amenity Tenant Lease Issues and Joinder with the LDV Pre-Trial Memorandum (related document:1828 Pre-Trial Memorandum filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1829 Document filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 1857 Document re: Statement of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of this Court's Jurisdiction to Hear and Determine Tenant Possessory Issues under 11 U.S.C. Section 365(h) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, 1860 Response to (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. filed by Interested Party Polo North Country Club, Inc.) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1860 Filed: 6/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to (related document:1577 Cross Motion re: Clarification of 365(h) Rights (related document:554 Motion to Reject / Debtors Second Omnibus Motion To Reject Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc To The Shutdown Date filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 4/20/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Application # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Moskovitz, Stuart) (Entered: 06/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1859 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 06/11/15 (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 1823 Order (Generic)). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/26/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 07/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 07/20/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 09/17/2015. (J&J Court Transcribers) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1858 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:1672 Second Modified Chapter 11 Plan Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of United States Trustee. (Sponder, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1857 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Document re: Statement of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of this Court's Jurisdiction to Hear and Determine Tenant Possessory Issues under 11 U.S.C. Section 365(h) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of No Objection (related document:1721 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. Gavin/Solmonese LLC) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of No Objection (related document:1720 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1820 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1810, 1812, 1811). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1819 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1801). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1818 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in support of (related document:1577 Cross Motion filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1817 Filed: 6/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1816 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document:1813 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 1815 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1815 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Shorten Time (related document:1813 Motion for Relief from Stay re: Letter of Credit. Fee Amount $ 176. filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1814 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court (related document:1810 Appeal Counter Designation filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) (wir) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1813 Filed: 6/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion for Relief from Stay re: Letter of Credit. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 06/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1812 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document re: Notice of Adjourned Hearings filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1811 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1810 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appellee's Designation of Record (related document:1678 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 1684 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, 1769 Appeal Designation filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1809 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of May, 2015. Objection Date is 6/26/15. Filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1808 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service. filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Dakis, Robert). Related document(s) 1799 Response filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC. Modified on 6/5/2015 (jey). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1807 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service. filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Dakis, Robert). Related document(s) 1749 Notice of Appearance and Request filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, 1750 Response filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC. Modified on 6/5/2015 (jey). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1806 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service (related document:1804 Objection filed by Creditor IGT) filed by John P. Leon on behalf of IGT. (Leon, John) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1805 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response to (related document:1672 Second Modified Chapter 11 Plan Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1804 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:1672 Second Modified Chapter 11 Plan Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John P. Leon on behalf of IGT. (Leon, John) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1803 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1797). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1802 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1791). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1801 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1800 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Confirmation of Plan (related document:1672 Second Modified Chapter 11 Plan Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1799 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to (related document:1672 Second Modified Chapter 11 Plan Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1798 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request to be Removed From All Service Lists filed by Scott H. Bernstein on behalf of Ravel Hotel LLC. (Bernstein, Scott) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1797 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1796 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April, 2015. Objection Date is 6/23/15. Filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Gavin/Solmonese LLC. (Jareck, Ryan) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1795 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of No Objection (related document:1710 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1780 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE APRIL MONTHLY FEE APPLICATION(related document:1778 Document re: Notice of Extension of Deadline to Submit Fee Application (related document:276 Order (Generic)) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Attorney White & Case LLP). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/27/2015. (bwj) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1779 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AGREED ORDER GRANTING REVEL HOTEL, LLC RELIEF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY (related document:108 Motion for Relief from Stay re: Trademark Litigation. Fee Amount $ 176. Filed by Eduardo J. Glas on behalf of Ravel Hotel LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/5/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Unknown Role Type Ravel Hotel LLC, 414 Cross Motion re: Debtors' (I) Objection to the Motion of Ravel Hotel LLC for Relief from Stay under Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code and (II) Cross-Motion to Extend Automatic Stay to Licensor (related document:108 Motion for Relief from Stay re: Trademark Litigation. Fee Amount $ 176. filed by Unknown Role Type Ravel Hotel LLC) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael) Modified on 8/7/2014 HEARING DATE IS TO BE 8/18 AT 11:30AM (kvr). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/26/2015. (bwj) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1778 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document re: Notice of Extension of Deadline to Submit Fee Application (related document:276 Order (Generic)) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1777 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April 2015. Objection Date is 6/16/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1776 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1767, 1771). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1775 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April 2015. Objection Date is 6/16/2015. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1774 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of No Objection (related document:1669 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1773 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court (related document:1769 Appeal Designation filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) (wir) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1772 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to (related document:1634 Objection to Claim Filed by Revel AC, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. MATTER WILL BE HEARD BY JUDGE KAPLAN. CORRECT HEARING JUDGE AND LOCATION IS MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton, NJ. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 (cmf). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Heather Lynn Anderson on behalf of State Of New Jersey Division Of Taxation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Certificate of Service) (Anderson, Heather Lynn) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1771 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document re: Monthly Report by Winter Harbor LLC of Compensation Earned, Expenses Incurred and Staffing for the Period of April 1, 2015 through April 30, 2015 filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1770 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document:1757 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1769 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint Designation of Record On Appeal (related document:1614 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019, 1678 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 1684 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee) Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. Transmission of Record due 06/5/2015. Appellee designation due by 06/5/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1768 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1765). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1767 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1766 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1753). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1765 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1764 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record,.(related document:1763 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record) (wir) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1763 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record, (related document:1684 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee) (wir) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1762 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transmittal Memo to District Court Re: Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record.(related document:1761 Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record) (wir) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1761 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of Failure to File Designation of Record, (related document:1678 Notice of Appeal filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) (wir) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1760 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 110. Notice Date 05/20/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1759 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 110. Notice Date 05/20/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1758 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 110. Notice Date 05/20/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1757 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion re: For Temporary Allowance of Claims for Voting Purposes Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3018 Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM (check with court for location). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1756 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1694). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1755 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of No Objection (related document:1649 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1754 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:1633 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1753 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April 2015. Objection Date is 6/9/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1752 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response to (related document:1634 Objection to Claim Filed by Revel AC, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. MATTER WILL BE HEARD BY JUDGE KAPLAN. CORRECT HEARING JUDGE AND LOCATION IS MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton, NJ. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 (cmf). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1751 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief in Opposition to Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative Expense Requets (related document:1634 Objection to Claim Filed by Revel AC, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. MATTER WILL BE HEARD BY JUDGE KAPLAN. CORRECT HEARING JUDGE AND LOCATION IS MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton, NJ. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 (cmf). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1635 Declaration of Shaun Martin in Support of Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative Expense Requests in support of (related document:1634 Objection to Claim filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1750 Response to (related document:1634 Objection to Claim Filed by Revel AC, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. MATTER WILL BE HEARD BY JUDGE KAPLAN. CORRECT HEARING JUDGE AND LOCATION IS MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton, NJ. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 (cmf). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. filed by Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Lugo AC, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1750 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to (related document:1634 Objection to Claim Filed by Revel AC, Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/26/2015 at 01:30 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. MATTER WILL BE HEARD BY JUDGE KAPLAN. CORRECT HEARING JUDGE AND LOCATION IS MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton, NJ. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 (cmf). filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1749 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1748 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Change of Address for Rumsey Electric Company From: Incomplete address To: c/0 Cohen, Seglias, Pallas, Greenhall & Furman, PC, Attn: Evan A. Blaker, Esq., United Plaza, 30 S. 17th Street, 19th Floor, Philadelphia, PA 19103 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1747 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Change of Address for Rakeen Henderson From: Incomplete address To: c/o Todd Muhlstock Baker Sanders, 100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500, Garden City, NY 11530 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1746 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Change of Address for Nicholas Peragine From: Incomplete address To: 361 West Lancaster Ave., One Haverford Center, Haverford, PA 19041 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1745 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Change of Address for Megan Boyd From: Incomplete Address To: Todd Muhlstock Baker Sanders, 100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500, Garden City, NY 11530 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1744 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of Address for Margaret Peragine From: Incomplete Address To: 361 West Lancaster Ave., One Haverford Center, Haverford, PA 19041 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1743 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Change of Address for Howard Stern From: Incomplete address To: c/o Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, 210 Summit Ave., Montvale, NJ 07645 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1739 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing on Application for Compensation. No. of Notices: 110. Notice Date 05/15/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1738 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Document re: Supplement to Second Interim Fee Application of Fox Rothschild LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Co-Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from October 1, 2014 through December 31, 2014 [Regarding Docket No. 1206] (related document:1206 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1737 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Interim Application for Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 1/1/2015 to 3/31/2015, fee: $490,529.50, expenses: $28,187.86. Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2015 at 01:30 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F) (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1736 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third Application for Compensation for White & Case LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 1/1/2015 to 3/31/2015, fee: $2,707,495.00, expenses: $31,131.94. Filed by White & Case LLP. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2015 at 01:30 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1735 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document re: Notice of Supplemental Exhibits to Second Interim (Quarterly) Application of White & Case LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from October 1, 2014 through December 31, 2014 (related document:1320 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1734 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Third Application for Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, Consultant, period: 1/1/2015 to 3/31/2015, fee: $1,294,000.00, expenses: $59,452.86. Filed by Moelis & Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 6/23/2015 at 01:30 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E) (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1719 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1718 Filed: 5/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/10/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1717 Filed: 5/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/09/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1716 Filed: 5/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/09/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1715 Filed: 5/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/09/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1714 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/08/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1713 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/08/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1712 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 05/08/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1711 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution of Attorney, terminating Tracy E. Richardson and adding Mary A. Carboni for State of New Jersey, Division of Gaming Enforcement. Filed by Tracy E. Richardson and Mary A. Carboni on behalf of the State of New Jersey, Division of Gaming Enforcement. (Carboni, Mary) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1710 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document re: Monthly Report by Winter Harbor LLC of Compensation Earned, Expenses Incurred and Staffing for the Period of March 1, 2015 through March 31, 2015 (Objection deadline is 5/29/15) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1709 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Transferring Case. Judge Gloria M. Burns removed from the case and Judge Michael B. Kaplan assigned to case. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/8/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1702 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Motion of ACR Energy Partners, LLC Modifying the Automatic Stay. (Related Doc # 1052). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/7/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1701 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion To Assume and Assign Executory Contracts to Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Related Doc # 1546). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/7/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1700 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:1691 Document filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/7/2015. Hearing scheduled for 5/13/2015 at 10:00 AM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. (cmf) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1699 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2015 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1698 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response to (related document:1632 Motion re: to Strike the Expert Report and Bar the Testimony of Phillip Hanser in Support of the Debtors' Motion for an Order Determining the Fair Market Value of Postpetition Services Under the Energy Sales Agreement Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order # 3 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) Modified on 5/1/2015 TO REFLECT, HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 5/26/15 AT 1:30PM AT MBK COURTROOM #8, TRENTON, NJ (mef). filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1697 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of April 1 - 30, 2015. Objection Date is 5/27/15. Filed by Warren A. Usatine on behalf of Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. (Usatine, Warren) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1696 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Debtors' Third Omnibus Motion to Reject Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases Nunc Pro Tunc to the Closing Date. (Related Doc # 1555). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/6/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1695 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Approving Disclosure Statement (related document:1682 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/6/2015. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/9/2015 at 01:30 PM at MBK - Courtroom 8, Trenton. Last day to Object to Confirmation 6/2/2015. Last day to file ballots is 6/2/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1694 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order (I) Approving the Disclosure Statement Relating to the Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan for Revel AC, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors; (II) Approving Form of Ballots and Proposed Solicitation and Tabulation Procedures for the Plan; (III) Approving the Solicitation Packages and Prescribing the Form and Manner of Notice and Distribution Thereof; (IV) Establishing Procedures for (A) Voting in Connection with the Plan Confirmation Process and (B) Temporary Allowance of Claims Related Thereto; and (V) Scheduling a Hearing on Plan Confirmation for June 9, 2015 at 1:30 pm. (Related Doc # 1618). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 5/6/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1693 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael F.J. Romano on behalf of Richard E. Pierson Construction Co., Inc.. (Romano, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1485 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney R. Craig Martin, Esq. as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 1437). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 3/16/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1484 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service (related document:1474 Document re: Notice Of Proposed Order Denying Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order (A) Approving Amended And Restated Asset Purchase Agreement With Polo North Country Club, Inc. And (B) Granting Related Relief filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1483 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1477, 1476). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1482 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1475). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1481 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1466). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1480 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document re: Notice of Omnibus Hearing Date filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1479 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/13/15 (related document:1383 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/23/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 04/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/16/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 06/15/2015. (Doman Transcription) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1478 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript regarding Hearing Held 03/12/15 (related document:1383 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/23/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 04/6/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/16/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 06/15/2015. (Doman Transcription) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1477 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document re: Notice of Third Quarterly Statement of Retained Non-Legal Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course of Business (related document:278 Order (Generic)) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Statement)) (Strock, John) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1476 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period January, 2015 filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1475 Filed: 3/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) Modified on 3/16/2015 TO CLARIFY DOCKET TEXT (mef). (Entered: 03/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1474 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Notice Of Proposed Order Denying Debtors' Emergency Motion For Entry Of An Order (A) Approving Amended And Restated Asset Purchase Agreement With Polo North Country Club, Inc. And (B) Granting Related Relief filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1473 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Declaration of Meade Monger of AlixPartners, LLP as Claims and Noticing Agent in support of (related document:97 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Alixpartners LLP. (Strock, John) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1472 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/12/2015 5:50:41 AM ]. File Size [ 14157 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:58:59 ]. (admin). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1471 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/12/2015 3:59:02 AM ]. File Size [ 19736 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:22:14 ]. (admin). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1470 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/12/2015 12:27:03 PM ]. File Size [ 31312 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:10:28 ]. (admin). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1469 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/12/2015 10:14:36 AM ]. File Size [ 23760 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:39:00 ]. (admin). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1468 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1464). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1467 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1449). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1466 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1465 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 3/13/2015 11:26:24 AM ]. File Size [ 3928 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:16:22 ]. (admin). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 12/26/2014, Entered: 12/26/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of No Objection (related document:986 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 12/25/2014, Entered: 12/26/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/25/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/25/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/24/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Shorten Time (related document:1068 Objection filed by Interested Party Polo North Country Club, Inc.) Filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moskovitz, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Sale and Motion to Apply Breakup Fee (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law # 2 Proposed Order) (Moskovitz, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Order on Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:1064 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1065 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion to (I) Increase Interim Availability Under DIP Facility, (II) Approve a Corresponding Increase in New Money Commitments and (III) Grant Related Relief filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/24/2014. Hearing scheduled for 12/30/2014 at 10:00 AM VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014, Terminated: 12/24/2014 Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Shorten Time (related document:1064 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1065 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion to (I) Increase Interim Availability Under DIP Facility, (II) Approve a Corresponding Increase in New Money Commitments and (III) Grant Related Relief filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 ~Motion (Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion to (I) Increase Interim Availability Under DIP Facility, (II) Approve a Corresponding Increase in New Money Commitments and (III) Grant Related Relief Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: 12/24/2014 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November 2014. Objection Date is 1/13/2015. Filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November, 2014. Objection Date is 1/13/15. Filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Gavin/Solmonese LLC. (Jareck, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November 2014. Objection Date is 1/13/2015. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Extending Deadline to File November Monthly Fee Application (related document:1058 Document re: Notice of Extension of Deadline to Submit Fee Application (related document:276 Order (Generic)) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of White & Case LLP) Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/23/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: 12/23/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Document re: Monthly Report by Winter Harbor LLC of Compensation Earned, Expenses Incurred and Staffing for the Period of November 1, 2014 through November 30, 2014 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014, Terminated: 12/23/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Notice of Extension of Deadline to Submit Fee Application (related document:276 Order (Generic)) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of No Objection (related document:964 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Order on Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:1052 Motion re: For an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/22/2014. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014, Terminated: 12/22/2014 Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Shorten Time (related document:1052 Motion re: For an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Transmittal of Record on Appeal (USDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court (related document: 933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) (jpp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Motion for Relief From Stay(14-22654-GMB) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 176.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29154611, fee amount $ 176.00. (re: Doc#1052) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing (Document) Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Scheduled. (related document:1052 Motion re: For an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) Modified on 12/22/2014 INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED AND MOTION TO BE SCHEDULED 1/26/2015 AT 10:00AM (kvr). filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 1/26/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Create Fee Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Due Motion for Relief From Stay $ 176. (related document:1052 Motion re: For an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Brown, Stuart) Modified on 12/22/2014 INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED AND MOTION TO BE SCHEDULED 1/26/2015 AT 10:00AM (kvr). filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of Docketing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document:1052 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC). Type of Error: INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED, filed by Stuart Brown, Esq. IN THE FUTURE PLEASE USE THE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM STAY EVENT CODE (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 12/21/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/21/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 ~Motion (Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion re: For an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order # 5 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart) Modified on 12/22/2014 INCORRECT EVENT CODE USED AND MOTION TO BE SCHEDULED 1/26/2015 AT 10:00AM (kvr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November 2014. Objection Date is 1/9/2015. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1045). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of No Objection (related document:952 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Consent Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent Order Granting Relief from Automatic Stay (related document:672 Motion for Relief from Stay re: Personal Injury Claim in Superior Court. Receipt Number 417695, Fee Amount $ 176. filed by Creditor Benjamin Zippel, Creditor Elizabeth Zippel). Filed by Fox, Rothschild, White & Case LLP on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/18/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1009, 1012). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Withdrawal of Document (related document(s)1036, 1044). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November 2014. Objection Date is 1/8/2015. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Withdrawal of Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Withdrawal of Document (related document(s)1036). (Pogue, Vanessa) Modified on 12/18/2014 WITHDRAWN- PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET #1046 (kvr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/17/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/17/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/17/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:953 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of No Objection (related document:950 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1014, 1032, 1031, 1030). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1014, 1015, 1013). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1009, 1012). (Pogue, Vanessa) Modified on 12/18/2014 WITHDRAWN- PLEASE REFER TO DOCKET #1046(kvr).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: 12/17/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of No Objection (related document:947 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Consultant The Brattle Group, Inc.) filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of No Objection (related document:951 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/16/2014 Order District Court Re: AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COPY OF DISTRICT COURT ORDER. Judge Jerome B. Simandle Dismissed as Moot Bankruptcy Court Appeal. (CV# 14-7167) (related document:780 Notice of Appeal filed by Interested Party Polo North Country Club, Inc.). Signed on 12/15/2014. (nrf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Reject Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Rejecting Agreements with ACR Energy Partners, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Motion # 2 Exhibit A- Part 1 # 3 Exhibit A - Part 2 # 4 Exhibit A - Part 3 # 5 Schedule 2 - Exhibit A part 4) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Extend Time For Other Reason re:Debtors' Motion for an Order Further Extending the Time Period Within Which the Debtors May Remove Actions Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Motion # 2 Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Extend Time For Other Reason re:Motion for an Order Further Extending the Time Period Within Which the Debtors May Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Motion # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document re: Notice of Second Quarterly Statement of Retained Non-Legal Professionals Used in the Ordinary Course of Business filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1006, 1004). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1003, 1002). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)999, 997). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)990, 989). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)988). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)987). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Notice of Filing of Proposed Tax Settlement Order (related document:914 Motion to Reject filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of No Objection (related document:938 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Gavin/Solmonese LLC) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [914] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [913] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute of 12/15/2014, OUTCOME - Revised form of Order Submitted Resolving Creditors' Committe's Comments and Extending Exclusivity (related document(s): [912] Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period filed by Revel AC, Inc.) (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [732] Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [880] Motion (Generic) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 01/08/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [414] Cross Motion filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [427] Objection filed by International Game Technology) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [425] Objection filed by Idea Boardwalk, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [423] Objection filed by American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [419] Objection filed by Brown Rudnick LLP, Michael Garrity, Kevin DeSanctis, Revel Group LLC) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [420] Objection filed by Konami Gaming, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 12/15/2014 (related document(s): [554] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 12/14/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/14/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order on Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement through January 30, 2015 (Related Doc # 912). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/12/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Mark Ellenberg, Esq. as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 922). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 12/12/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 12/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Document re: Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (Hearing scheduled for 1/8/15 at 10:00 a.m.) (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 880 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 Order(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to the Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. for January 5, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/12/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Pro Hac Vice Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of 150.00. Receipt Number NEW022144. (related document:937 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (tcw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing Held and Continued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute of Hearing Held and Continued. OUTCOME: Granted as to Terminating the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and Scheduling Hearing on Approval of Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc.; Order Entered. (related document(s): [1002] Motion (Generic) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 12/12/2014. Adjourned for Judge to Advise Status of Decision. (related document(s): [757] Motion (Generic) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/12/2014. (related document(s): [16] Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/08/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to (related document:914 Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements with The City of Atlantic City Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 972 in Opposition to Objection to Debtors' Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements (related document:914 Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements with The City of Atlantic City Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Russell J. Passamano on behalf of City of Atlantic City. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel) filed by Interested Party City of Atlantic City) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response to (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. (Pitta, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1003 Application to Shorten Time (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart J. Moskovitz on behalf of Polo North Country Club, Inc.. (Moskovitz, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 12/10/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 12/10/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Notice of Hearing -(Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Hearing for: (related document:987 Application for Retention filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 1000 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Debtor's Co-Counsel, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Order on Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/10/2014. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014, Terminated: 12/10/2014 Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Shorten Time (related document:1002 Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 ~Motion (Generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion re: Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors' Decision to Terminate the Brookfield Asset Purchase Agreement and (II) Scheduling a Hearing for Entry of an Order Approving the Sale to Back-Up Bidder, Polo North Country Club, Inc. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E # 6 Exhibit F # 7 Exhibit G # 8 Exhibit H # 9 Exhibit I # 10 Exhibit J) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: 12/9/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service (related document:986 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Jareck, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  TERMINATE deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          7 Day Objection Deadline Terminated, Reason: Objection Filed (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Scheduled. (related document:987 Application For Retention of Professional Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt, P.A. as Non-Bankruptcy Legal Professional Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Objection deadline is 12/10/2014 and 1000 Objection to Debtors Application For Retention of Non-Bankruptcy Legal Professional Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of United States Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by U.S. Trustee United States Trustee) Hearing scheduled for 1/5/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection to Debtors Application For Retention of Non-Bankruptcy Legal Professional Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document:987 Application For Retention of Professional Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt, P.A. as Non-Bankruptcy Legal Professional Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Objection deadline is 12/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A # 2 Schedule B # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Jeffrey M. Sponder on behalf of United States Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Sponder, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Order on Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Application For Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, fees awarded: $23075.50, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 883), Granting Application For Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, fees awarded: $450000.00, expenses awarded: $66252.28 (Related Doc # 895), Granting Application For Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., fees awarded: $631536.00, expenses awarded: $17276.30 (Related Doc # 896), Granting Application For Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, fees awarded: $200845.25, expenses awarded: $1747.06 (Related Doc # 897), Granting Application For Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., fees awarded: $26300.00, expenses awarded: $0.00 (Related Doc # 900), Granting Application For Compensation for Ernst & Young, fees awarded: $151282.00, expenses awarded: $4586.26 (Related Doc # 903), Granting Application For Compensation for White & Case LLP, fees awarded: $4334783.00, expenses awarded: $94981.44 (Related Doc # 904), Granting Application For Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, fees awarded: $849116.50, expenses awarded: $26708.37 (Related Doc # 905). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 12/8/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Certificate of Service (related document:638 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor IGT, 639 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor IGT, 643 Order on Application to Shorten Time, 646 Document filed by Creditor IGT) filed by John P. Leon on behalf of IGT. (Leon, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: 12/8/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [905] Application for Compensation filed by Fox Rothschild LLP) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [904] Application for Compensation filed by White & Case LLP) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [903] Application for Compensation filed by Ernst & Young) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [900] Application for Compensation filed by Alfred J. Lechner, The Brattle Group, Inc.) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [897] Application for Compensation filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [896] Application for Compensation filed by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [895] Application for Compensation filed by Moelis & Company LLC) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute of 12/8/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Allowed as Requested, Order Entered. (related document(s): [883] Application for Compensation filed by Bonnie Glantz Fatell) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [914] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [913] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [912] Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [732] Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [880] Motion (Generic) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [757] Motion (Generic) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [16] Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [414] Cross Motion filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [427] Objection filed by International Game Technology) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute of 12/8/2014, OUTCOME - Moot (related document(s): [409] Objection filed by Schindler Elevator Corp.) (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [425] Objection filed by Idea Boardwalk, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [423] Objection filed by American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [419] Objection filed by Brown Rudnick LLP, Michael Garrity, Kevin DeSanctis, Revel Group LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [420] Objection filed by Konami Gaming, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [554] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [638] Motion for Relief From Stay filed by IGT) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [541] Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date filed by Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF)) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [533] Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date filed by Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF)) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [33] Disclosure Statement filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 12/8/2014 (related document(s): [529] Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Konami Gaming, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 01/05/2015 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)965, 964). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)959, 958, 956, 957, 955, 960). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)973, 974). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)954, 950, 953, 951, 952). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)941). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)968, 969, 970, 967, 966, 971). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit (related document:989 Notice of Agenda filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Receipt Number and Filing Fee (generic) - Court Use Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt of Fee Amount $ 30.00, Receipt Number 418208. CD of Hearing of December 4, 2014. Fee received from Intercept Delivery Service (dac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Statement of Issues on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Designation of Record On Appeal (related document:933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.), Statement of Issues on Appeal (related document:933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Revel AC, Inc.. Transmission of Record due 12/18/2014. Appellee designation due by 12/18/2014. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Appeal Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Designation of Record On Appeal (related document:933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.), Statement of Issues on Appeal (related document:933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Filed by Revel AC, Inc.. Transmission of Record due 12/18/2014. Appellee designation due by 12/18/2014. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 12/4/2014. (related document(s): [757] Motion (Generic) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 01:00 PM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Application for Retention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application For Retention of Professional Slater, Tenaglia, Fritz & Hunt, P.A. as Non-Bankruptcy Legal Professional Nunc Pro Tunc to Petition Date Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Objection deadline is 12/10/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Schedule A # 2 Schedule B # 3 Proposed Order) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of November, 2014. Objection Date is 12/24/14. Filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of No Objection (related document:857 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Agenda filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of No Objection (related document:883 Application for Compensation filed by Consumer Privacy Ombudsman Bonnie Glantz Fatell) filed by Bonnie Glantz Fatell on behalf of Bonnie Glantz Fatell. (Fatell, Bonnie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of No Objection (related document:900 Application for Compensation filed by Consultant The Brattle Group, Inc., 902 Exhibit filed by Consultant The Brattle Group, Inc.) filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certification of No Objection (related document:903 Application for Compensation filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of No Objection (related document:895 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of No Objection (related document:905 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of No Objection (related document:904 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certification of No Objection (related document:876 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:897 Application for Compensation filed by Other Prof. Gavin/Solmonese LLC) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: 12/2/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of No Objection (related document:896 Application for Compensation filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Document re: Joint Exhibit List for December 4, 2014 Hearing on Debtors' Motion for an Order Determining the Fair Market Value of Postpetition Services Under the Energy Sales Agreement [D.I. 30] (related document:30 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 757 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Objection to Motion of Class Action Claimants For an Order Allowing Filing of a Late Filed Claim (related document:533 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Class Action Litigation. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 AT 10:00 AM (Rescheduled from 9/10/2014 at 12:00 PM) at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit) (Muhlstock, Todd) Modified on 8/26/2014 TO REFLECT CORRECT NAME OF MOVANT IS CONSUMER FRAUD CLASS ACTION (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), TO REFLECT RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE AND TO REFLECT NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED (jpp). filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), 541 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF). Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit) filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), 693 Limited Objection to Creditor's Motion to Allow Filing of a Late Proof of Claim (related document:533 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Class Action Litigation. Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 AT 10:00 AM (Rescheduled from 9/10/2014 at 12:00 PM) at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit) (Muhlstock, Todd) Modified on 8/26/2014 TO REFLECT CORRECT NAME OF MOVANT IS CONSUMER FRAUD CLASS ACTION (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), TO REFLECT RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE AND TO REFLECT NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED (jpp). filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF), 541 Motion to File Claim After Claims Bar Date Filed by Todd David Muhlstock on behalf of Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF). Hearing scheduled for 9/15/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit) filed by Creditor Consumer Fraud Class Action (S.D.N.Y. 13-5965-KPF)) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  in Opposition to Objection to Debtors' Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements (related document:914 Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements with The City of Atlantic City Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Russell J. Passamano on behalf of City of Atlantic City. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Counsel) (Passamano, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transfer of Claim Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Transfer of Claim - Agent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Fee Amount $25. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Chatham Asset High Yield Master Fund, Ltd. (Amount $13,715,972.00) To Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC Filed by Credit Suisse Loan Funding LLC (Leen, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#971) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#970) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#969) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#968) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#967) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt of filing fee for Transfer of Claim - Agent(14-22654-GMB) [claims,trclmagt] ( 25.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 29030655, fee amount $ 25.00. (re: Doc#966) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 12/1/2014. (related document(s): [757] Motion (Generic) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Evidentiary hearing scheduled for 12/04/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: 11/28/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Corrected Notice of Rate Change for White & Case LLP (related document:963 Document filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: 11/28/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October 2014. Objection Date is 12/19/2014. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: 11/28/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document re: Notice of Rate Change for White & Case LLP filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/27/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 73. Notice Date 11/26/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Document re: Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Motion for an Order Determining the Fair Market Value of Postpetition Services Under the Energy Sales Agreement [D.I. 30] (related document:30 Motion (Generic) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 111 Motion to Increase Assurance Payment filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 755 Document filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period September 2014 filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 2014 (Amended) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period July 2014 (Amended) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Operating Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period June 2014 (Amended) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document re: Debtors' Notice of Filing Amended Global Notes, Amended Schedule A, Second Amended Schedule D and Amended Schedule G for Debtor Revel Entertainment Group, LLC (Case No. 14-22659) (related document:126 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 432 Amended Schedules (Fee Attorney) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 751 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Document re: Debtors' Notice of Filing Amended Global Notes, Amended Schedule A and Amended Schedule G for Debtor Revel Atlantic City, LLC (Case No. 14-22658) (related document:125 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 750 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Document re: Notice of Extension of Deadline to Submit Fee Application (related document:276 Order (Generic)) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Proposed Order) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October 2014. Objection Date is 12/16/2014. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October 2014. Objection Date is 12/16/2014. Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document re: Monthly Report by Winter Harbor LLC of Compensation Earned, Expenses Incurred and Staffing for the Period October 1, 2014 through October 31, 2014 filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October 2014. Objection Date is 12/16/2014. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Fox Rothschild LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)936, 933, 934). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)919, 921). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October 2014. Objection Date is 12/16/2014. Filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: 11/25/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certification of No Objection (related document:803 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of No Objection (related document:824 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Refiled in support of (related document:933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Certificate of Service - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (related document: 933 Notice of Appeal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) (jpp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript regarding Hearing Held 11/21/14 (related document:936 Notice of Agenda filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/1/2014. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 12/15/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/29/2014. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 02/23/2015. (Doman Transcription)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Document re: Notice of Rescheduled Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 880 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pro Hac Vice Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of 150.00. Receipt Number NEW021992. (related document:842 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (tcw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice of Docketing Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Correction Notice in Electronic Filing (related document: 933 Notice of Appeal filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. for Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) Type of Error: PDF Attachment Does Not Contain Required /s/ Signature of Efiler. Please Correct and Refile With the Court Using the Event Code "Support" and Linking to Document #933. (jpp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 11/23/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 11/23/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 11/23/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/23/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Monthly Fee Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Monthly Fee Statement. For the Month of October, 2014. Objection Date is 12/12/14. Filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Gavin/Solmonese LLC., ATTORNEY FOR COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS (Jareck, Ryan) Modified on 11/25/2014 TO CLARIFY DOCUMENT (mef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Application To Allow Attorney Michael F. Walsh, Esq. as Special Counsel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Related Doc # 882). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. This order has been mailed to the Treasurer of the New Jersey Lawyer's Fund for Client Protection via US mail. Signed on 11/21/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 11/21/2014 (related document(s): [880] Motion (Generic) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 11/21/2014 (related document(s): [16] Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 12/08/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response to (related document:917 Response to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 29 Declaration of Barak Klein in Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of And Scheduling Hearings in support of (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 299 Limited Objection to Proposed Final DIP Order (related document:49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Joseph M. Garemore on behalf of Konami Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor Konami Gaming, Inc., 301 Objection to Debtors' Motion for Entry of Final Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Pre Petition Secured Parties (related document:37 Order and Notice on Disclosure Statement. (related document:33 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. Hearing on Disclosure Statement set for 7/30/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. Objections due by 7/21/2014. (kvr) Modified TO REFLECT THAT CORRECT OBJECTION DEADLINE DATE SHOULD BE 7/23/14 on 6/20/2014 (mrm)., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by David A. Kasen on behalf of Stone Concrete, Inc.. filed by Creditor Stone Concrete, Inc., 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 305 Limited Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 351 Document re: Supplemental Declaration of Barak Klein in Support of (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtors to File under Seal the Proposed Debtor-in-Possession Financing Fee Letter (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 17 Motion to Seal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Raymond M. Patella on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 623 Document re: Restatement/Continuing Objection of Amenity Tenants to Debtors: (I) Sale Motion, (II) Dip Financing Motion, and (III) Notice of Intent to Assume and Assign (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 57 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 332 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf), 853 Objection to of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (i) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (ii) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (iii) Use Cash Collateral, and (iv) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) The Disbursement of Sale Proceeds Prior to the Entry of a Final Order in the CUP Motion (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 732 Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Under Section 363(f).(Related Doc 57). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/7/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf)) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 854 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, 901 Objection to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to PrePetition Secured Parties (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. in Support of Objection # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stanley Mastil in Support of Objection) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 918 Response to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 305 Limited Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 473 Objection to Objection Of Mudrick Capital Management, LP To The Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant To Sections 361, 362, 363 And 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Rule 4001 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure For The Entry Of Interim And Final Orders (A) Authorizing The Debtors To (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens And Superpriority Claims To Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, And (IV) Provide Adequate Protection To Prepetition Secured Parties, And (B) Prescribing Form And Manner Of Notice Of And Scheduling Hearings (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Jennifer L. Del Medico on behalf of Mudrick Capital Management, LP. (Del Medico, Jennifer) filed by Creditor Mudrick Capital Management, LP, 853 Objection to of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (i) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (ii) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (iii) Use Cash Collateral, and (iv) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) The Disbursement of Sale Proceeds Prior to the Entry of a Final Order in the CUP Motion (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 732 Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Under Section 363(f).(Related Doc 57). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/7/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf)) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 854 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, 901 Objection to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to PrePetition Secured Parties (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. in Support of Objection # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stanley Mastil in Support of Objection) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration Of Julian I. Gurule, Esq. In Support of Reply) # 2 Exhibit 1 to Gurule Declaration (Transcript of 7-11-2014 Hearing) # 3 Exhibit 2 to Gurule Declaration (Transcript of 10-16-2014 Hearing) # 4 Exhibit 3 to Gurule Declaration (Shaun Martin Deposition Transcript) # 5 Exhibit 4 to Gurule Declaration (Case No 13-16253 Dkt No. 300) # 6 Exhibit 5 to Gurule Declaration (Amended and Restated First-Lien Credit Agreement) # 7 Exhibit 6 to Gurule Declaration (First-Lien Security Agreement)) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. (Pitta, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appeal to District Court. (related document:855 Order on Motion For Relief From Stay). Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Appellant Designation due by 12/4/2014. Transmission of Designation Due by 12/22/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Viscount, Michael) Modified on 11/24/2014 TO REFLECT ERROR IN EFILING - PDF ATTACHMENT DOES NOT CONTAIN REQUIRED /S/ SIGNATURE OF EFILER (jpp).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Credit Card/Debit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt of filing fee for Notice of Appeal(14-22654-GMB) [appeal,ntcapl] ( 298.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28988509, fee amount $ 298.00. (re: Doc#933) (U.S. Treasury)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 72. Notice Date 11/19/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/20/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 11/19/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)917). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)913, 912, 914). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)904, 896, 905, 897, 903, 895). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)885). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)879). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)878, 874, 875, 873). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)857, 852). (Pogue, Vanessa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service (related document:918 Response filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Ross, Sommer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014, Terminated: 12/12/2014 application to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for Attorney Mark Ellenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..Objection deadline is 11/26/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of M. Ellenberg in Support of Application for Pro Hac Vice # 2 Proposed Order Propoed for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Katchen, William) Modified on 11/19/2014 (Giannetti, Claire).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Document re: Notice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC's Motion to Strike ACR Energy Partners, LLC's Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 853 Objection to of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (i) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (ii) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (iii) Use Cash Collateral, and (iv) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) The Disbursement of Sale Proceeds Prior to the Entry of a Final Order in the CUP Motion (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 732 Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Under Section 363(f).(Related Doc 57). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/7/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf)) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 880 Motion re: Motion to Strike Objection of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to Debtors' Debtor in Possesion Financing Motion Filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) (Brown, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Notice of Agenda
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Agenda filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 305 Limited Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 473 Objection to Objection Of Mudrick Capital Management, LP To The Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant To Sections 361, 362, 363 And 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Rule 4001 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure For The Entry Of Interim And Final Orders (A) Authorizing The Debtors To (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens And Superpriority Claims To Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, And (IV) Provide Adequate Protection To Prepetition Secured Parties, And (B) Prescribing Form And Manner Of Notice Of And Scheduling Hearings (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Jennifer L. Del Medico on behalf of Mudrick Capital Management, LP. (Del Medico, Jennifer) filed by Creditor Mudrick Capital Management, LP, 853 Objection to of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (i) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (ii) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (iii) Use Cash Collateral, and (iv) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) The Disbursement of Sale Proceeds Prior to the Entry of a Final Order in the CUP Motion (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 732 Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Under Section 363(f).(Related Doc 57). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/7/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf)) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 854 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, 901 Objection to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to PrePetition Secured Parties (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. in Support of Objection # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stanley Mastil in Support of Objection) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration Of Julian I. Gurule, Esq. In Support of Reply) # 2 Exhibit 1 to Gurule Declaration (Transcript of 7-11-2014 Hearing) # 3 Exhibit 2 to Gurule Declaration (Transcript of 10-16-2014 Hearing) # 4 Exhibit 3 to Gurule Declaration (Shaun Martin Deposition Transcript) # 5 Exhibit 4 to Gurule Declaration (Case No 13-16253 Dkt No. 300) # 6 Exhibit 5 to Gurule Declaration (Amended and Restated First-Lien Credit Agreement) # 7 Exhibit 6 to Gurule Declaration (First-Lien Security Agreement)) (Ross, Sommer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 29 Declaration of Barak Klein in Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of And Scheduling Hearings in support of (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 299 Limited Objection to Proposed Final DIP Order (related document:49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Joseph M. Garemore on behalf of Konami Gaming, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor Konami Gaming, Inc., 301 Objection to Debtors' Motion for Entry of Final Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Pre Petition Secured Parties (related document:37 Order and Notice on Disclosure Statement. (related document:33 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. Hearing on Disclosure Statement set for 7/30/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. Objections due by 7/21/2014. (kvr) Modified TO REFLECT THAT CORRECT OBJECTION DEADLINE DATE SHOULD BE 7/23/14 on 6/20/2014 (mrm)., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by David A. Kasen on behalf of Stone Concrete, Inc.. filed by Creditor Stone Concrete, Inc., 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 305 Limited Objection to Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Obtain Postpetition Financing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 133 Brief in Opposition to (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 42 Interim Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors (related document:9 Motion re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Certain Essential Vendors Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 302 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf)) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC) filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. filed by Creditor Idea Boardwalk, LLC, 351 Document re: Supplemental Declaration of Barak Klein in Support of (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Debtors to File under Seal the Proposed Debtor-in-Possession Financing Fee Letter (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 17 Motion to Seal filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Raymond M. Patella on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 623 Document re: Restatement/Continuing Objection of Amenity Tenants to Debtors: (I) Sale Motion, (II) Dip Financing Motion, and (III) Notice of Intent to Assume and Assign (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 57 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 332 Document filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Warren J. Martin Jr. on behalf of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., GRGAC1, LLC, GRGAC2, LLC, GRGAC3, LLC, Lugo AC, LLC, Mussel Bar AC, LLC, PM Atlantic City, LLC, RJ Atlantic City, LLC, The Marshall Retail Group, LLC. filed by Creditor GRGAC1, LLC, Creditor GRGAC2, LLC, Creditor GRGAC3, LLC, Creditor American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC, Creditor Azure AC Allegretti, LLC, Creditor Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc., Creditor Lugo AC, LLC, Creditor Mussel Bar AC, LLC, Creditor PM Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor RJ Atlantic City, LLC, Creditor The Marshall Retail Group, LLC, 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf), 853 Objection to of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to (I) Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (i) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (ii) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (iii) Use Cash Collateral, and (iv) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Hearings and (II) The Disbursement of Sale Proceeds Prior to the Entry of a Final Order in the CUP Motion (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc., 49 Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364 and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (a) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/20/2014. (cmf), 352 Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing for August 18, 2014 at 11:30 (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2014. (cmf), 515 Second Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice and Scheduling Final Hearing (Related Doc 16). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 8/21/2014. (dac), 585 Third Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc. filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/4/2014. (cmf), 651 Fourth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 9/22/2014. (cmf), 732 Order Granting Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens, Claims and Encumbrances Under Section 363(f).(Related Doc 57). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/7/2014. (cmf), 823 Fifth Amended Interim Order Pursuant to Sections 361,362,363,364, and 507 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy procedure (A) Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, and (B) Prescribing Form and Manner of Notice of and Scheduling Final Hearing. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/27/2014. (cmf)) filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Certificate of Service) filed by Creditor ACR Energy Partners, LLC, 854 Objection to (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Thomas Pitta on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee. filed by Creditor The Bank of New York Mellon, as Trustee, 901 Objection to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to PrePetition Secured Parties (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. in Support of Objection # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stanley Mastil in Support of Objection) filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certification of No Objection (related document:828 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney White & Case LLP) filed by John H Strock on behalf of White & Case LLP. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplement to Objection of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Debtors' Motion in support of (related document:901 Objection filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Komrower, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Receipt Number and Filing Fee (generic) - Court Use Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Receipt of Fee Amount $27.50, (Cetified Copy Work) Receipt Number 418093. Fee received from Fox Rothschild, LLP. (dmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Reject Tax Settlement Agreements with The City of Atlantic City Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Reject Trademark License Agreement Nunc Pro Tunc to the Date of the Motion Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014, Terminated: 12/12/2014 Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certification of No Objection (related document:801 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Gavin/Solmonese LLC) filed by Michael D. Sirota on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/29/14 (related document:620 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party City of Atlantic City). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/24/2014. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 12/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/18/2014. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 02/17/2015. (Doman Transcription)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Notice of Docketing Record on AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal to District Court. Case Number: 14-cv-07167-JBS. (related document: 780 Notice of Appeal filed by Polo North Country Club, Inc.) United States District Court Judge Jerome B. Simandle Assigned. (jpp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of No Objection (related document:807 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Consultant The Brattle Group, Inc.) filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 11/15/2014, Entered: 11/16/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 11/15/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/17/2014 Order on Motion to Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion To Reject Employment Agreement Nunc Pro Tunc to the Resignation Date. (Related Doc # 804). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/14/2014. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Application for Compensation for Fox Rothschild LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/19/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $849,116.50, expenses: $26,708.37. Filed by Fox Rothschild LLP. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Viscount, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation for White & Case LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 6/19/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $4,334,783.00, expenses: $94,981.44. Filed by White & Case LLP. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Interim Application for Compensation for Ernst & Young, Auditor, period: 6/19/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $151,282.00, expenses: $4,586.26. Filed by Ernst & Young. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit (related document:900 Application for Compensation filed by Consultant The Brattle Group, Inc.) filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr. on behalf of The Brattle Group, Inc.. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection to Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 361, 362, 363 and 364 of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 4001 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for the Entry of a Final Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Obtain Post-Petition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens and Superpriority Claims to Post-Petition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, and (IV) Provide Adequate Protection to PrePetition Secured Parties (related document:16 Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364(b), Rule 4001(c) or (d) Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - proposed Interim Order # 2 Exhibit A to Interim Order # 3 Exhibit A to Interim Order Part 2 # 4 Exhibit B to Interim Order # 5 Exhibit C to Interim Order) filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.) filed by Stuart Komrower on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Ryan T. Jareck, Esq. in Support of Objection # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Stanley Mastil in Support of Objection) (Komrower, Stuart)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation for The Brattle Group, Inc., Consultant, period: 6/23/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $26,300.00, expenses: $0.00. Filed by Alfred J. Lechner Jr.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Lechner, Alfred)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Transmittal of Record on Appeal (USDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transmittal of Record on Appeal to U.S. District Court (related document:780 Notice of Appeal filed by Polo North Country Club, Inc.) (jpp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service (related document:892 Order on Application to Shorten Time, 894 Document filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Ross, Sommer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Interim Application for Compensation for Gavin/Solmonese LLC, Other Professional, period: 7/2/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $200,845.25, expenses: $1,747.06. Filed by Gavin/Solmonese LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 7/2/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $631,536.00, expenses: $17,276.30. Filed by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Sirota, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1148, 1149). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Pro Hac Vice Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of NEW021909. Receipt Number 150.00. (related document:861 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (tcw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service filed by Alixpartners LLP (related document(s)1137, 1138). (Pogue, Vanessa) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Pro Hac Vice Payment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pro Hac Vice Payment has been made to the US District Court in the amount of 150.00. Receipt Number NEW021899. (related document:871 Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice). (tcw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appeal to District Court. (related document:1138 Order (Generic)). Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Stuart M. Brown on behalf of ACR Energy Partners, LLC. Appellant Designation due by 01/29/2015. Transmission of Designation Due by 02/17/2015. (Brown, Stuart) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Scheduled. (related document:895 Interim Application for Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/19/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $450,000.00, expenses: $66,252.28. Filed by Moelis & Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC, 896 Interim Application for Compensation for Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A., Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 7/2/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $631,536.00, expenses: $17,276.30. Filed by Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmittal of Appeal Documents to U.S. District Court (related document: 1163 Notice of Appeal filed by Idea Boardwalk, LLC). (jpp) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014, Terminated: 12/8/2014 Application for Compensation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Interim Application for Compensation for Moelis & Company LLC, Other Professional, period: 6/19/2014 to 9/30/2014, fee: $450,000.00, expenses: $66,252.28. Filed by Moelis & Company LLC. Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Clerk's Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal (related document: 1163 Notice of Appeal filed by Idea Boardwalk, LLC). (jpp) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Document re: Notice Of Hearing On Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. And Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC's Motion To Strike ACR Energy Partners, LLC's Objection To Debtors' Emergency Motion Pursuant To Sections 361, 362, 363 And 364 Of The Bankruptcy Code And Rule 4001 Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure For The Entry Of Interim And Final Orders (A) Authorizing The Debtors To (I) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (II) Grant Senior Priming Liens And Superpriority Claims To Postpetition Lenders, (III) Use Cash Collateral, And (IV) Provide Adequate Protection To Prepetition Secured Parties, And (B) Prescribing Form And Manner Of Notice Of And Scheduling Final Hearing (related document:880 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC, 881 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Ross, Sommer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/05/15 (related document:732 Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/22/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 02/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 02/17/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 04/15/2015. (Doman Transcription) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Certification of No Objection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certification of No Objection (related document:796 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Denying the Oral Motion of Casino Reinvestment Development Authority for Stay Pending Appeal (related document:1138 Order Approving the Sale and Purchase of the Assets of the Debtors Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests and Granting Related Relief. (related document:57 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f).. Fee Amount $176. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/15/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order on Application to Shorten Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Application to Shorten Time (related document:880 Motion re: Motion to Strike Objection of ACR Energy Partners, LLC to Debtors' Debtor in Possesion Financing Motion filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 11/13/2014. Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (cmf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Appeal to District Court. (related document:1138 Order (Generic), 1158 Order (Generic)). Fee Amount $ 298. Filed by Barry J. Roy on behalf of Idea Boardwalk, LLC. Appellant Designation due by 01/29/2015. Transmission of Designation Due by 02/17/2015. (Roy, Barry) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Certificate of Service (related document:880 Motion (Generic) filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC, 881 Application to Shorten Time filed by Creditor Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Creditor Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC) filed by Sommer Leigh Ross on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Principal Lending, LLC. (Ross, Sommer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 01/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Hearing (Document) Scheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Hearing Scheduled. (related document:883 Final Application for Compensation for Bonnie Glantz Fatell, Ombudsman Consumer, period: 9/23/2014 to 11/12/2014, fee: $23,075.50, expenses: $0.0. Filed by Bonnie Glantz Fatell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Proposed Order) filed by Consumer Privacy Ombudsman Bonnie Glantz Fatell) Hearing scheduled for 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (kvr) Modified on 11/13/2014 - BNC NOTICE STOPPED (mef).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/14/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Hearing held;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute of 11/13/2014 Hearing. OUTCOME: Granted, Order Entered. (related document(s): [804] Motion to Reject filed by Revel AC, Inc.) (cmf )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of No Objection (related document:1061 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Other Prof. Moelis & Company LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Moelis & Company LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Hearing (Document) Rescheduled
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 11/13/2014 (related document(s): [16] Motion for Authority to Obtain Credit Under Section 364, Rule 4001(c) or (d) filed by Revel AC, Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2014 at 10:00 AM at GMB - Courtroom 4C, Camden. (dac )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certification of No Objection (related document:1051 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Auditor Ernst & Young) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Ernst & Young. (Strock, John) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 11/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Denying the Oral Motion of IDEA Boardwalk, LLC for Stay Pending Appeal (related document:1138 Order Approving the Sale and Purchase of the Assets of the Debtors Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests and Granting Related Relief. (related document:57 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f).. Fee Amount $176. Filed by Michael J. Viscount Jr. on behalf of Revel AC, Inc). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/14/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 10. Notice Date 11/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Document re: Monthly Report by Winter Harbor LLC of Compensation Earned, Expenses Incurred and Staffing for the Period of December 1, 2014 through December 31, 2014 filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B # 3 Exhibit C # 4 Exhibit D # 5 Exhibit E) (Strock, John) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certification of No Objection (related document:1059 Document filed by Other Prof. Winter Harbor LLC) filed by John H Strock on behalf of Winter Harbor LLC. (Strock, John) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 BNC Certificate of Notice - Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/12/2014. (Admin.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript regarding Hearing Held 12/15/14 (related document:912 Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period filed by Debtor Revel AC, Inc.). The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 1/21/2015. List of Items to be Redacted Due By 02/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 02/17/2015. Remote electronic access to the transcript will be restricted through 04/14/2015. (Doman Transcription) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Appeal Counter Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appellee's Designation of Record (related document:780 Notice of Appeal filed by Interested Party Polo North Country Club, Inc., 835 Appeal Designation filed by Interested Party Polo North Country Club, Inc., Statement of Issues on Appeal) Filed by John H Strock on behalf of Revel AC, Inc.. (Strock, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Denying the Oral Motions of American Cut AC Marc Forgione, LLC; Azure AC Allegretti, LLC; Exhale Enterprises XXI, Inc.; GRGAC1, LLC; GRGAC2, LLC; GRGAC3, LLC; Lugo AC, LLC; Mussel Bar AC, LLC; PM Atlantic City, LLC; RJ Atlantic City, LLC; and the Marshall Retail Group, LLC for Stay Pending Appeal (related document:1138 Order Approving the Sale and Purchase of the Assets of the Debtors Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Interests and Granting Related Relief. (related document:57 Motion to Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens under Section 363(f)). Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 1/14/2015. (cmf) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service (related document:876 Monthly Fee Statement filed by Attorney Cole, Schotz, Meisel, Forman & Leonard, P.A.) filed by Ryan T. Jareck on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Jareck, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,404 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?