Unknown
Bankruptcy Case Wisconsin Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 12:37 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996 Final Decree
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/20/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996 Certificate of Mailing
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996 Order Discharging Debtors
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995 Order(Generic)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Proof of Service
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Notice of Motion
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Motion to Avoid Lien
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution/No Asset
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Meeting of Creditors Held.
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Certificate of Mailing
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/16/1995 Notice of 341 Meeting of Creditors
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995 Voluntary Petition
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 2 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?