District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Massachusetts District Court Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
  1. Case No. 12-1594
    Filed 5/11/2012
  2. Case No. 14-1596
    Filed 6/3/2014
United States Supreme Court

Greenspan v. Random House, Inc., et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 14-1596

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 1, 2016 at 1:58 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Greenspan, Aaron, Plaintiff-Appellant
Officially listed as "Aaron Greenspan"

Toggle Switch Represented by Think Computer Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron J. Greenspan +1 415 670 9350 +1 415 373 3959 aarong@thinkcomputer.com
No Logo Mezrich, Benjamin, Defendant-Appellee
Officially listed as "Benjamin Mezrich, A/k/a Benjamin Mezrick"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Howard Ellis +1 213 896 6632 +1 213 896 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850 gordon.katz@hklaw.com
Space Benjamin M. McGovern +1 617 619 9276 +1 617 523 6850 benjamin.mcgovern@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G. Contopulos +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 scontopulos@sidley.com
No Logo Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., A/k/a Sony Pictures Entertainment Inc., A/k/a Columbia Tristar Motion Picture Group, Defendant-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin T. Baine +1 202 434 5000
Space Dustin Frederick Hecker
Space Megan Anne Hughes +1 202 434 5000
No Logo Mezco, Inc., Defendant-Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Howard Ellis +1 213 896 6632 +1 213 896 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850 gordon.katz@hklaw.com
Space Benjamin M. McGovern +1 617 619 9276 +1 617 523 6850 benjamin.mcgovern@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G. Contopulos +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 scontopulos@sidley.com
Random House, Inc. Random House, Inc., Defendant-Appellee
Unknown Role, Audible, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Howard Ellis +1 213 896 6632 +1 213 896 6600

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon P. Katz +1 617 573 5839 +1 617 523 6850 gordon.katz@hklaw.com
Space Benjamin M. McGovern +1 617 619 9276 +1 617 523 6850 benjamin.mcgovern@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G. Contopulos +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 scontopulos@sidley.com
Nature of Suit 3820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Case Type civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:11-cv-12000-RBC&caseId=0
Lower Court Case https://ecf.mad.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=1:11-cv-12000-RBC&caseId=0
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 00106733313 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE submitted. Panel: Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge; Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge; David J. Barron, Appellate Judge. [14-1596] (LM)
    LREF
    Blank  Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
    NINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [5848150-2] submitted by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. [14-1596] (CC)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106731244 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
      REPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 08/25/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/02/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 00106731213 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
        BRIEF tendered by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 08/25/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
          LREF
          Legal Document 00106731210 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
          REPLY filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan to response [5847119-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/25/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
            LREF
            Legal Document 00106729506 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Intent to File a Reply in Support of Counter-Motion for Sanctions filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. [14-1596] (AG)
              LREF
              Legal Document 00106729503 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
              RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., to response and motion for sanctions [5845538-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/20/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                LREF
                Legal Document 00106729500 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., to response and motion for sanctions [5845538-2]. Certificate of service dated 08/20/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None
                  Public docket note: Paper copies were received of Mr. Greenspan's Opposition Response and Motion for Sanctions filed on 08/14/2014. Paper copies of electronically filed documents, with the exception of briefs, are not necessary. [14-1596] (TS)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 00106727182 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Intent to File Reply in Support of Motion for Sanctions filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 08/14/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 00106726604 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT in support of response and motion for sanctions [5845538-2] filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 08/13/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 00106726601 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for sanctions and RESPONSE to motion for sanctions [5844005-2] filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 08/13/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                          NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [5844017-2] submitted by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. [14-1596] (CC)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                            NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [5844017-2] submitted by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. [14-1596] (CC)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 00106724613 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None
                              CERTIFICATE of service for appellee/respondent brief [5844017-2], motion for sanctions [5844005-2] filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 08/08/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                NINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [5844014-2] submitted by Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.. [14-1596] (CC)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 00106723720 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                  CERTIFICATE of service for appellee/respondent brief [5844014-2] filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2014. [14-1596] (DFH)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 00106723596 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 00106723593 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                      APPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. Reply brief due 08/25/2014 for APPELLANT Aaron Greenspan. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/14/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 00106723589 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE disclosure statement filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 00106723586 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None
                                          APPELLEE'S BRIEF filed by Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 08/14/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 00106723562 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION for sanctions filed by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 00106723559 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                              BRIEF tendered by Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. [14-1596] (BHE)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 00106723249 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                BRIEF tendered by Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/06/2014. [14-1596] (DFH)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                  TEN (10) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [5837491-2] submitted by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. [14-1596] (TS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106712192 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                    APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2014. Brief due 08/07/2014 for APPELLEE Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc., Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc.,. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/18/2014. [14-1596] (TS)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                      APPENDIX filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2014. [14-1596] (TS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                        PLEADING tendered: Appendix filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Number of volumes: 1. Number of copies: 5. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2014. [14-1596] (DK)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 00116710936 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                          BRIEF tendered by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00106710936 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                            BRIEF tendered by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Certificate of service dated 07/08/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 00106704203 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Gordon P. Katz. Certificate of service dated 06/23/2014. [14-1596] (GPK)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 00106702868 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Benjamin M. McGovern. [14-1596] (BMM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 00106702652 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Bradley H. Ellis. [14-1596] (BHE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 00106702642 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Mezco, Inc., Benjamin Mezrich and Random House, Inc., filed by Attorney Stephen G. Contopulos. [14-1596] (SGC)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 00106701957 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. filed by Attorney Kevin T. Baine. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2014. [14-1596] (DFH)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 00106701954 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Columbia Pictures Industries, Inc. filed by Attorney Dustin F. Hecker. Certificate of service dated 06/17/2014. [14-1596] (DFH)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 00106696605 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 06/04/2014. [14-1596] (AG)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 00106695630 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #79) filed by Appellant Aaron Greenspan. Fee and Transcript Report/Order form due 06/17/2014. [14-1596] (TS)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 252 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?