USA v. Moyer
Criminal Case Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:05-cr-10023-MMM-JAG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley W Murphy +1 309 671 7050 +1 309 671 7259 brad.murphy@usdoj.gov
Space Greggory R Walters +1 309 671 7050 Greggory.Walters@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Peoria
Filed 4/20/2005
County Tazewell
Terminated 11/14/2006
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 871.F
Offense Level 4
18871.F THREATS AGAINST PRESIDENT AND SUCCESSORS TO PRESIDENT On or about March 5, 2005, within the CDIL, Dft did knowingly and willfully deposit for conveyance in the US mail for delivery from a post office a letter containing a threat to the Presid
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 876.F
Offense Level 4
18876.F MAILING THREATENING COMMUNICATIONS On or about March 5, 2005, within the CDIL, Dft did knowingly deposit a letter containing a written threat to injure the President of the USA in violation of 18 USC Section 876(c)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Sealed Document +
+++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non-redacted (corrected by interlineation) Judgment as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Judgment*Court Filing
    JUDGMENT (Corrected by Interlineation) as to Jessica A Moyer (1), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Sealed Document +Court Filing
      +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.Non-redacted J & C as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd) 60 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Judgment JUDGMENT (Corrected by Interlineation) as to Jessica A Moyer (1), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd) 61 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non-redacted (corrected by interlineation) Judgment as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
        REVOCATION JUDGMENT as to Jessica A Moyer (1): Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Sentencing Recommendation +Court Filing
          +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Jessica A Moyer. (CL, ilcd) 58 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Amended Judgment REVOCATION JUDGMENT as to Jessica A Moyer (1): Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd) 59 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.Non-redacted J & C as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd) 60 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Judgment JUDGMENT (Corrected by Interlineation) as to Jessica A Moyer (1), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd) 61 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non-redacted (corrected by interlineation) Judgment as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008 Violation Report + +Court Filing
            +++ VIOLATION REPORT as to Jessica A Moyer. (CL, ilcd) 57 Filed & Entered: 07/11/2008 Sentencing Recommendation +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Jessica A Moyer. (CL, ilcd) 58 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Amended Judgment REVOCATION JUDGMENT as to Jessica A Moyer (1): Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd) 59 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.Non-redacted J & C as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd) 60 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Judgment JUDGMENT (Corrected by Interlineation) as to Jessica A Moyer (1), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Probation is Revoked. Defendant committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; unpaid balance of restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/14/2008. (CL, ilcd) 61 Filed & Entered: 07/14/2008 Sealed Document +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non-redacted (corrected by interlineation) Judgment as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: AUSA Murphy/FPD Alvarado with defendant Moyer present in person and Final Probation Revocation Hearing as to Jessica A Moyer held on 7/11/2008. Court orders Probation is REVOKED. Defendant committed to the custody of the BOP for a term of 12 months; 12 months supervised release; Unpaid restitution in the amount of $4411 reimposed. Defendant advised of appeal rights and remanded to the custody of the USM. (Court Reporter J.J.) (CL, ilcd)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Remark
                Remark: Pursuant to Doc #55 Order, Doc #36 Psychiatric Evaluation placed in sealed envelope and hand delivered to USPO Hunt for delivery to Dr. Snell. (TK, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order Committing for Study/ObservationCourt Filing
                  ORDER FOR PSYCHIATRIC OR PSYCHOLIGICAL EXAMINATION Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/16/08. IT IS ORDERED that Dft Moyer be evaluated by Dr. Brent Snell on May 27, 2008 at 11:00 AM, during which a psychiatric or psychological examination shall be conducted upon Moyer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Forensic Report prepared by the Bureau of Prisons [Docket number 36] be released to Dr. Snell to allow him to evaluate Moyer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a psychiatric or psychological report be prepared by Dr. Snell and filed with the Court, with copies to be provided to defense counsel and the Assistant United States Attorney assigned to this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal for this District transport Moyer to and from the examination. (TK, ilcd)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Jessica A Moyer entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/16/08. (KB, ilcd)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                      Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 5/6/08 as to Jessica A Moyer. (TK, ilcd)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Detention Hearing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present in open court by AUSA Murphy, FPD Alvarado with defendant Jessica Moyer for Initial Appearance on Supplemental Petition and Detention Hearing at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, 5/16/2008. Evidence on behalf of defendant; defendant rests. Arguments held. Court orders defendant detained. Discussion held re: USPO to check availability of a general mental health examination of the defendant. Order of detention pending trial entered. Defendant remanded to custody of USM. (Tape #PR-C 9:54 AM) (KB, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                          SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR WARRANT OR SUMMONS FOR OFFENDER UNDER SUPERVISION with ORDER entered endorsed as to Jessica A Moyer re [48] Sealed Document. Ordered that this supplemental petition for warrant or summons for offender under supervision is part of the original petition [48] filed on 5/5/2008. Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 5/15/2008. (CL, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2008: # (1) amended supplement to include date) (HK, ilcd).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Position
                            POSITION filed as Supplemental Petition for Warrant or Summons for Offender Under Supervision as to Jessica A Moyer. (TK, ilcd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification
                              Notice of Docket Text Modification re 5/7/08 Minute Entry. Text altered to read, "Detention hearing set for 5/16/08 at 10:00 a.m. in COURTROOM C BEFORE JUDGE JOHN A. GORMAN." (SM, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Jessica A Moyer. Entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman on 5/7/08. (SM, ilcd)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman: Parties present in open court by AUSA Murphy and FPD Alvarado with dft Moyer for Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release on Wednesday, 5/7/2008. Dft and counsel acknowledge receipt of petition and requests hearing. Final Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release set for 7/11/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Govt requests detention of the dft. Ct orders dft detained pending Detention Hearing set for 5/16/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C before Judge John A Gorman. Temporary order of detention to enter. Dft remanded to the custody of the US Marshal. (Tape #PR-C 1:49 a.m.) (SM, ilcd) Modified on 5/13/2008 (SM, ilcd).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Sealed Document +
                                    +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. (TK, ilcd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                                      AMENDED JUDGMENT as to Jessica A. Moyer adding Special Conditions of Supervision #7 and #8. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/1/2008. (RK, ilcd)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Sealed Document +
                                        +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Unredacted original of the Amended Judgment as to Jessica Moyer. (RK, ilcd)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Summons Returned Executed
                                          Summons Returned Executed on 4/23/08 as to Jessica A Moyer (TK, ilcd)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: AUSA Murphy/FPD Alvarado present in person. Defendant Jessica A Moyer present in person and is sworn as to financial ability to hire counsel. Defendant found indigent and Court appoints Federal Public Defender Alvarado. Initial Appearance re Revocation of Probation as to Jessica A Moyer held on 4/28/2008. Defendant advised of consequences and allegation of petition. Defendant agrees to petition and to amendment to judgment to add special conditions #6-7 (See Petition #43). Oral motion to withdraw #43 granted. Amended judgment to enter. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                              Attorney update in case as to Jessica A Moyer. Attorney Robert A Alvarado for Jessica A Moyer added. Attorney William M Anderson, IV terminated. (CL, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Position
                                                POSITION filed as Petition for Summons for Offender Under Supervision by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (TK, ilcd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Notice of Hearing.
                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer Miscellaneous Hearing re Position [#43] set for 4/28/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (MMM0, ilcd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Receipt
                                                    Return Receipt for #37 Presentence Report, #38 Sentencing Recommendation and #41 Statement of Reasons as returned to USPO on 2/6/07 re Jessica A Moyer. (TK, ilcd)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Statement of Reasons +
                                                      +++ STATEMENT OF REASONS FOR IMPOSING SENTENCE as to Jessica A Moyer (CL, ilcd)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                        +++ SEALED DOCUMENT. Non -redacted J & C as to Jessica Moyer (CL, ilcd)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Judgment*Court Filing
                                                          JUDGMENT as to Jessica A Moyer (1), Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Defendant placed on Probation for a term of 5 years; Restitution in the amount of $9,981 and $100 special assessment. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 11/14/2006. (CL, ilcd)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Sentencing Recommendation +
                                                            +++ SENTENCING RECOMMENDATION as to Jessica A Moyer. (CL, ilcd)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Presentence Investigation Report
                                                              +++ PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT as to Jessica A Moyer (CL, ilcd)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006 Sentencing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Murphy/Atty Wm. Anderson with defendant present in person for Sentencing on 10/16/2006 for Jessica A Moyer (1). Court accepts plea and judgment of conviction is entered. Court imposes sentence as follows: Count(s) 1, Dismissed upon motion of Government; Count(s) 2, Defendant placed on Probation for a term of 5 years; Restitution in the amount of $9,981 and $100 special assessment. Defendant advised of right to appeal and released on current bond and conditions. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer Sentencing previously scheduled for 9/22/06 is cancelled and reset for 10/16/2006 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.)(MMM0, ilcd)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: 7/18/2006 Sealed Document +
                                                                    +++ SEALED DOCUMENT-FORENSIC REPORT AS TO JESSICA MOYER. (HK, ilcd)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Order on Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Chambers/Atty Anderson with defendant Moyer present in person and Competency Hearing held 7/14/2006. Court finds defendant competent to proceed. Court is granting [35] Motion to Unseal Document as to Jessica A Moyer (1) in that Counsel if granted leave to provide the psychiatric report to defendant's counsel in a seperate case, outside this Court. Report to be used for the purpose of that other case only and for no other purpose. Further Court grants leave to the investigating agency to use the report in order to conclude their investigation. Excludable(s) stopped as to Jessica A Moyer. Sentencing set for 9/22/2006 11:00 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Defendant released on existing bond and conditions. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006, Terminated: 7/14/2006 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                        MOTION to Unseal Document filed as "Motion for Leave to Release Sealed Psychiatric Evaluation" by Jessica A Moyer. (Anderson, William) Modified on 6/29/2006 (HK, ilcd).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/7/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Jessica A Moyer: Competency Hearing set for 7/14/2006 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.) (CG, ilcd)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer Competency Hearing set for 6/8/2006 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.)(CG, ilcd)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Order
                                                                              Text ORDER as to Jessica Moyer. Per request of Warden Palmquist, Federal Detention Center, SeaTac, Washington, the evaluation period for Jessica Moyer will end on May 30, 2006 with a final report no later than June 12, 2006. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 5/8/06. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Warden Palmquist) (CG, ilcd) (CG, ilcd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Order on Motion for Psychiatric ExamCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [33] Motion for Psychiatric Exam as to Jessica A Moyer (1)entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 4/6/06. Defendant Moyer ordered to report to the facility designated by the Bureau of Prisons or surrender to the custody of the US Marshal for transportation to designated facility. (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/7/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Murphy/Atty Anderson with defendant and Motion Hearing as to Jessica A Moyer held on 4/6/2006 re [33] MOTION for Psychiatric Exam to determine mental competency to proceed. Motion for Exam #33 granted. Order to enter. Excludable started as to Jessica A Moyer (XA). (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION in case as to Jessica A Moyer [33] MOTION for Psychiatric Exam to determine mental competency: Motion Hearing set for 4/6/2006 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Sentencing previously set for 4/6/06 at 4:00 is vacated. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.)(CG, ilcd)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006, Terminated: 4/6/2006 Motion for Psychiatric Exam
                                                                                      MOTION for Psychiatric Exam to determine mental competency by USA as to Jessica A Moyer. (Murphy, Bradley)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2006, Entered: 3/28/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Jessica A Moyer: Sentencing reset for 4/6/2006 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.) (CG, ilcd)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Plea Agreement
                                                                                          PLEA AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION OF FACTS as to Jessica A Moyer (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Murphy/Atty Anderson with defendant Moyer present in person for Pretrial Conference.Change of Plea Hearing as to Jessica A Moyer held on 1/12/2006. Guilty Plea entered by Jessica A Moyer to Count 2. Written plea agreement filed in open court. Court neither accepts nor rejects agreement and matter referred to Probation Office for PSI and report.Decision on Agreement/Possible Sentencing set for 4/4/2006 04:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Trial previously set 2/6/06 is vacated. Defendant released on existing bond and conditions.(Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Walters/Atty Anderson with defendant present in person and Pending Motions/Pretrial Conference as to Jessica A Moyer held on 12/8/2005. Attys. request additional time to work on possible resolution. Same granted. Excludable started as to Jessica A Moyer: Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to continue this case pending possible resolution and further finds the time from today to 2/6/06 is excludable pursuant to Speedy Trial Act. Trial previously set 12/19/05 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for 2/6/2006 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Pretrial Conference - probably change of plea hearing set for Thurs 1/12/2006 04:00 PM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court ORDERS all previously issued subpoenas are continued and remain in full force and effect. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer Pretrial Conference set for 12/8/2005 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO/Ct. Rept.)(CG, ilcd)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                    NOTICE GOVERNMENT'S DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT TESTIMONY by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                      NOTICE Amended Jury Instructions by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                        NOTICE Government's Notice of Filing Amended Jury Instructions by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM Government's Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion In Limine by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 11/14/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine by USA as to Jessica A Moyer. (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                              NOTICE Government's Notice of Filing Jury Instructions and Jury Instructions by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: 11/25/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                NOTICE 404(b) Notice by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Walters, Greggory)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Official Court Reporter's TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion to Suppress as to dft Jessica A Moyer held on 7/13/05 before Judge Michael M. Mihm in Peoria, IL. Court Reporter: Karen Hanna. (ML, ilcd)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                    NOTICE To Produce At Trial by dft Jessica A Moyer (ML, ilcd)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT LIST by dft Jessica A Moyer, filed as: "Defendant's List of Physical Evidence" (ML, ilcd)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005, Terminated: 10/7/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue by Jessica A Moyer. (Anderson, William)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Murphy/Atty Anderson/Defendant Jessica Moyer present by phone and Pretrial Conference held 10/7/05 as to Jessica A Moyer. Court isgranting [18] Motion to Continue. Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to continue this case and further finds the time from today to 12/19/05 is excludable pursuant to speedy trial act. Excludable started as to Jessica A Moyer (XT). Trial previously set 10/11/05 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for 12/19/2005 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                            TEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. On 10/6/05, Document #17 was filed in this case without the signature of the filing attorney. Document # [17] Motion to Continue as to dft Jessica A Moyer (1) is accordingly stricken. Counsel is ordered to refile this document with proper signature pursuant to Administrative Procedures. (ML, ilcd)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005, Terminated: 10/7/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Continue by Jessica A Moyer. (Anderson, William) Modified on 10/7/2005 (ML, ilcd)to reflect: Stricken pursuant to text order entered on 10/7/05.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                NOTICE To Produce at Trial by Jessica A Moyer (ML, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Murphy, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer Status Conference set for 10/7/2005 at 11:30 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel)(CG, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Order on Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm : AUSA Murphy/Atty William Anderson with defendant present inperson and motion hearing as to Jessica A Moyer held on 9/7/05. No further arguments by counsel. Court is denying [9] Motion to Suppress as to Jessica A Moyer. Court finds it to be in the interest of justice to reset the trial in this matter and further finds the time from today to 10/11/05 is excludable pursuant to Speedy Trial Act. Excludable started as to Jessica A Moyer (XT): Trial previously set 9/19/05 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for Tues 10/11/2005 08:30 AM before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (Court Reporter KH.) (CL, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Jessica A Moyer: Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2005 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO) (CG, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: 8/9/2005 Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                          Text ORDER granting [13] Motion to Continue as to Jessica A Moyer (1) Motion Hearing reset for 8/22/2005 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm.. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 8/9/05. (c: All Counsel/USM/USPO)(CG, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005, Terminated: 8/9/2005 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue hearing set on 8/11/05 by Jessica A Moyer. (HK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM of Law by Jessica A Moyer re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File (HK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/28/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                Text ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File as to Jessica A Moyer (1). Defendant has until 7/29/05 to file her Memorandum of Law. Entered by Judge Michael M. Mihm on 7/28/05. (c: All Counsel) (CG, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Extend Deadline, filed by defendant Jessica A Moyer. (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM Memorandum Of Law by USA as to Jessica A Moyer (Murphy, Bradley)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Order on Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present in open court by AUSA Murphy/attorney Anderson with Dft Jessica A Moyer for motion hearing. Same held on 7/13/05. Evidence presented on behalf of Govt re: [9] Motion to Suppress. Govt. rests. Evidence presented on behalf of Dft re: [9] Motion to Suppress. Dft rests. Arguments by counsel. Motion taken under advisement. Court directs parties to submit memos with supporting case law by 7/27/05. Status Conference re: ruling on #9 set Thursday, 8/11/2005 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Jury Trial of 8/1/05 is vacated and reset to Monday, 9/19/2005 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court finds it is in the interest of justice that the time between today's date and 9/19/05 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. Dft remains on bond as previously imposed.(Court Reporter KH.) (CAD, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Suppress Statements by Jessica A Moyer. (CAD, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William M Anderson, IV appearing for Jessica A Moyer. (CAD, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael M. Mihm: Parties present in open court by AUSA Murphy/Attorney Anderson with Dft Jessica A Moyer for Pending Motion/Pretrial Conference. Status Conference held on 6/6/2005. Motion to Suppress filed in open court. Dft requests hearing on said motion. Motion to Suppress set for hearing on Wednesday, 7/13/2005 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Jury trial previously set on 7/25/05 is vacated and reset to Monday, 8/1/2005 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Court finds it is in the interest of justice that the time between today's date and 8/1/05 is excludable pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. (Court Reporter KH.) (CAD, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release Entered by Judge John A. Gorman on 5/12/05 as to Dft Jessica A Moyer. (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Bond
                                                                                                                                                                Appearance Bond Entered as to Jessica A Moyer in amount of $ 10,000 OR. (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Jessica A Moyer. Jury Trial set for 7/5/2005 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2005 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Entered by Judge John A. Gorman on 5/12/05. (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Gorman: Parties present in open court by AUSA Murphy and Jessica Moyer present in person with atty Bill Anderson(retained) for Initial Appearance/Arraignment on 5/12/2005 at 2:00 pm. Same held. Dft advised of charges and possible penalties.Dft enters plea of not guilty. Case is set for PM/PTC on 6/6/05 at 2:30 pm and Jury Trial on 7/5/05 at 8:30 am, both in person in Peoria in Courtroom A before Judge Michael M. Mihm. Gvt suggests release of dft. Dft released on $10,000 OR bond with special conditions. (Tape #C 429 2574-2888.) (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Case Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                      Case unsealed as to Jessica A Moyer pursuant to Initial Appearance held 5/12/05. (TK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Jessica A Moyer: Initial Appearance/Arraignment set for Thursday, 5/12/2005 at 2:00 PM in person in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Clerk is directed to issue summons for the defendant for this hearing.(WW, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                          +++ SEALED INDICTMENT as to Jessica A Moyer (1) count(s) 1, 2. (RK, ilcd)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?