LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC. et al v. GIBSON et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01045
District Judge Rosemary M. Collyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 11:32 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Herman +1 202 662 5280 +1 202 778 5280 aherman@cov.com
No Logo PETER A. IANUZZI, JR., Plaintiff
v.
United States Department of Veterans Affairs United States Department of Veterans Affairs, Defendant
Officially listed as "DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/09/2014 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015 Shannon L. Fagan +1 202 252 2575 shannon.fagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Dyer Stewart +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jesse.stewart@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAN R. FRYE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/09/2014 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015 Shannon L. Fagan +1 202 252 2575 shannon.fagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Dyer Stewart +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jesse.stewart@usdoj.gov
No Logo SLOAN D. GIBSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/09/2014 Judith A. Kidwell +1 202 514 7250 +1 202 307 2304 judith.a.kidwell@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/22/2015 Shannon L. Fagan +1 202 252 2575 shannon.fagan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Dyer Stewart +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jesse.stewart@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Reopen Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None Transcript
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Reopen Case
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shannon L. Fagan on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, JAN R. FRYE, SLOAN D. GIBSON Substituting for attorney Judith Kidwell (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying 2 Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO. The Deputy Clerk shall set a status conference in this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/27/2014. (KD) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by PETER A. IANUZZI, JR, LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC.. (Herman, Anthony) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gregory C. Padgett, :Firm- Covington & Burling LLP, :Address- 1201 Pennsylvania Ave NW, Washington, DC 20004. Phone No. - 202-662-5404. Fax No. - 202-778-5404 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3760899. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by PETER A. IANUZZI, JR, LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Herman, Anthony) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, JAN R. FRYE, SLOAN D. GIBSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Proposed Order re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (rdj) (Entered: 06/24/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, JAN R. FRYE, SLOAN D. GIBSON (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                        LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PETER A. IANUZZI, JR, LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC. (rdj) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by PETER A. IANUZZI, JR, LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration OF PETER A. IANUZZI, JR, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 65.1 Certificate)(rdj) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, JAN R. FRYE, SLOAN D. GIBSON ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616064338) filed by LEGION CONSTRUCTION, INC., PETER A. IANUZZI, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) Modified on 6/23/2014 (rdj). (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?