Kachi v. Natrol, Inc. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-00412
District Judge Jeffrey T. Miller, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Jeffrey T. Miller
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 1:22 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Nadeem Kachi, Plaintiff

Represented by Moule & Frank

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Tomina +1 248 327 6556 +1 248 436 3385 btomina@hotmail.com

Represented by Oliver Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nick Suciu, III +2 483 277 6556 +1 248 436 3385 nsuciu@oliverlg.com

Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT A. GEORGE +1 215 553 7982 +1 215 851 8029 sgeorge@seegerweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Shub +1 215 564 2300 +1 215 851 8029 jshub@shublaw.com
v.
No Logo Natrol Acquisition Corp, Defendant
No Logo Natrol Direct, Inc. , Defendant
No Logo Natrol Products, Inc. , Defendant
No Logo Natrol, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Michael Santoro

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gene F Williams +1 310 552 4400 +1 310 552 8400 gwilliams@millerbarondess.com
Attributes
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3731
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Timeline
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (Williams, Gene) (av1). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION;DISMISSING ACTION FOR LACKOF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION 40 .Thecourt also dismisses the action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and permitsPlaintiff to file an appropriate motion within 30 days of entry of this order.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 6/19/14. (av1) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Nadeem Kachi re 40 MOTION to Certify Class (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shub, Jonathan). Modified on 4/16/2014 - - Edited attachment description (jah). (Entered: 04/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan). Modified on 4/14/2014 - Wrong event. QC Email sent. Corrected text (jah). (Entered: 04/11/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 52 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Pla may file Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in support of her Motion for Class Certification that exceeds the 10-page limit, but not to exceed 18 pages (not including the caption page, table of contents, and table of authorities). Pla is instructed to file reply brief by 4/11/2014. At that time, the Motion for Class Certification will be taken under submission without oral argument. Clerk is instructed to strike Reply Brief 47 filed on 3/3/2014 from the Court Docket. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/4/2014. (jah) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Shub, Jonathan). (jah). (Entered: 04/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
OBJECTION to Reply Brief re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Williams, Gene). Modified on 4/3/2014 - Wrong event. Corrected text to match pleading (jah). (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Order by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller: Motions Submitted 40 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 04/07/2014 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is vacated. Written order to follow. (no document attached) (gac) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Supplemental Authority ISO Opposition to Motion for Class Certification)(Williams, Gene) (dlg). (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 46 Joint Motion to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification. Motion Hearing set for 3/10/2014 is moved to 4/7/2014 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 3/3/2014. (jah) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
ORDERED STRICKEN ON 4/4/2014 PER ORDER 35 - REPLY to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Nadeem Kachi.(Shub, Jonathan). Modified on 3/4/2014 - Wrong event. QC Email sent to Atty. Corrected text (jah). (Main Document 47 replaced on 4/7/2014) (jah). Modified on 4/7/2014 - Images removed. Text edited to reflect as stricken (jah). (Entered: 03/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing Date on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Williams, Gene). (jah). (Entered: 02/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jenia Khudagulyan, # 2 Declaration of Guoyao Wu, Ph.D., # 3 Declaration of Gene Williams)(Williams, Gene). Modified on 2/25/2014 - Edited attachment descriptions (jah). (Entered: 02/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting Plaintiff's 39 Ex Parte Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Exhibits B and C in support of Pla's Motion for Class Certification shall be filed under seal. Pla allowed to file Exhibit F and the Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Class Certification with appropriate redactions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/6/2014. (jah) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Nadeem Kachi re 40 MOTION to Certify Class (Shub, Jonathan). (jah). (Entered: 02/04/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
[FILED AS SEALED DOCUMENT ON 2/6/2014] SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: 39 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Shub, Jonathan). (jah). Modified on 2/7/2014 - Added file date of lodgment (jah). (Main Document 41 replaced on 2/7/2014) (jah). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Certify Class by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Shub, Jonathan). Modified on 2/3/2014 - Proposed Order attached. No Proof of Service. QC Email sent to Atty to email proposed order to Chambers and to file proof of service (jah). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Shub, Jonathan). Modified on 1/31/2014 - Proposed Order attached. QC Email sent to Atty to Email Proposed Order to Chambers (jah). (Entered: 01/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 37 joint motion permitting the parties to complete expert discovery after the deadlines set by the Court. Upon review of the motion, the Court finds good cause to grant the parties motion and extend the deadline to complete expert discovery to January 31, 2014. No other dates contained in the Court's case management order are affected and remain unchanged. (See ECF No. 33). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/27/2013. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Discovery extension by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Williams, Gene) (dls). (Entered: 12/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc. (Williams, Gene). Modified on 12/20/2013 - Wrong event. QC Email sent for Atty Khoudagoulian to file Notice of Appearance using own ECF login per Local Rule 83.3 and General Order 550 (jah). (Entered: 12/19/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 34 joint motion for protective order. The Court has reviewed the proposed Protetive Order and finds good cause to approve the Order as modified. See attached Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 11/14/13. (atk) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Suciu, Nick). Modified on 11/12/2013 - Wrong event, should be Joint Motion. Proposed Order attached. QC Email sent to Atty to email Proposed Order to Chambers. Changed to Motion and corrected text (jah). (Entered: 11/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Case Management Order Regulating Discovery Through Motion for Class Certification: Any motion to amend the complaint (new parties/pleadings)must be filed on or before September 3, 2013. All expert disclosures (relating to class discovery) required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(2) shall be served on all parties on or before October 25, 2013. Any contradictory or rebuttal disclosures within the meaning of Rule 26(a)(2)(D)(ii) shall be disclosed on or before November 25, 2013. All fact and expert discovery necessary to support or oppose class certification shall be completed by December 23, 2014. On or before January 31, 2014, any motion for class certification shall be filed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 8/1/2013.(mkz) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 31 Notice of Appearance, filed by Nadeem Kachi. (Do Not Refile the Notice of Appearance. No Further Action Required) (jah) (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Shub on behalf of Nadeem Kachi (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Shub, Jonathan). Attorney Jonathan Shub added to party Nadeem Kachi (pty:pla). Modified on 8/2/2013 - Pdf is 12-point Times New Roman. Notice of Non-Compliance prepared (jah). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 8/1/2013. Scheduling Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Nick Suciu, Scott George). (Defendant Attorney Gene Williams). (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None
Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. (Williams, Gene) Modified on 7/23/2013 ECF Discrep sent to MDD Chambers re: doc was to be lodged, not e-filed (leh). (Entered: 07/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: None
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Scott Alan George appearing for Plaintiff Nadeem Kachi. (vam) (jrl). (Entered: 07/16/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re 26 Order Setting telephonic Case Management Conference. (mkz) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Notice of Case Management Conference: The Court held an ENE on 6/17/13. A telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 8/1/2013 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/17/2013.(mkz) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 6/17/2013. Order to follow.(Plaintiff Attorney Nick Suciu, Scott George). (Defendant Attorney Gene Williams). (no document attached) (mkz) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER regarding 23 Defendants' ex parte motion to continue the early neutral evaluation conference (ENE). The Court has reviewed the motion and declines to continue the ENE, rather, the ENE will be converted to a telephonic conference. Counsel only are required to participate. Parties are not required to participate. Counsel are ordered to use the dial-in information sent as a separate notice to access the Court's teleconference service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/12/13. (no document attached) (atk) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: None
Ex Parte MOTION to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Unopposed Ex Parte Application for An Order Continuing the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, # 2 Declaration of Gene Williams in Support of Unopposed Ex Parte Application for An Order Continuing the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference)(Williams, Gene) (jao). (Entered: 06/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Scheduling for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference: An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/17/2013 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 6/4/2013.(mkz) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
ANSWER to 13 Amended Complaint by Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc.(Williams, Gene) (jao). (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Granting 19 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants' deadline to respond to the First Amended Complaint is hereby continued from April 26, 2013 to May 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 4/29/2013. (jao) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 Amended Complaint by Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc. (Williams, Gene) (jao). (Entered: 04/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi, as to Natrol, Inc. (Suciu, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi, as to Natrol Acquisition Corp. (Suciu, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi, as to Natrol Products, Inc. (Suciu, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi, as to Natrol Direct, Inc. (Suciu, Nick) (jao). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi, as to Natrol Direct, Inc. dba Med. Research Inst. (Suciu, Nick) Modified party name on 4/17/2013 (jao). (Entered: 04/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Cover Sheet) (Suciu, Nick) (jpp). (Entered: 04/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None
PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Nick Suciu, III appearing for Plaintiff Nadeem Kachi. (vam) (Entered: 03/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. Natrol Direct, Inc. served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. Natrol Direct, Inc. served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. Natrol Products, Inc. served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. Natrol Acquisition Corp served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. Natrol, Inc. served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 03/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. All Defendants served. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Proof of Service, # 3 Proof of Service, # 4 Proof of Service, # 5 Proof of Service)(Tomina, Brian) Contacted atty 3/8/2013, Mailer sent on 3/11/2013 (jao). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nadeem Kachi. All Defendants served. (Tomina, Brian) Mailer sent on 3/8/2013 (jao). (Entered: 03/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Non-Compliance with Local Rule 5.1(a) Legibility, re 1 Complaint, filed by Nadeem Kachi. (jao) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Nadeem Kachi re 1 Complaint, (Tomina, Brian) (jao). (Entered: 02/22/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (av1). (Entered: 02/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Natrol Acquisition Corp, Natrol Direct, Inc., Natrol Products, Inc., Natrol, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0974-5640011.), filed by Nadeem Kachi. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:13-cv-00412-JM-MDD. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Tomina, Brian)(attorney maintenance) (cxl). (av1). (Entered: 02/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 224 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?