Henry M. Jackson Foundation v. Norwell, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 14-1580

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 9:34 AM EDT (5.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4896 - Other Statutes
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405091416 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 08/06/2014. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999411355] [14-1580] Michael Schaengold
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
    BRIEF by Appellee Norwell, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/08/2014. [999431909] [14-1580] Marc Hines
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellant The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/06/2014. [999411345] [14-1580] Michael Schaengold
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
        OBJECTION to DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellee Norwell, Inc.. [14-1580] Marc Hines
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Norwell, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999390995] [14-1580] Marc Hines
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marc S. Hines for Norwell, Inc..[999390950] [14-1580] Marc Hines
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-1580] (SLW)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Marc Hines. Opening Brief and Appendix due 08/06/2014. Response Brief due 09/08/2014 [14-1580] (CB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                  DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999384314] [14-1580] Michael Schaengold
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc.. [14-1580] Michael Schaengold
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael J. Schaengold for The Henry M. Jackson Foundation for the Advancement of Military Medicine, Inc..[999384299] [14-1580] Michael Schaengold
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                        DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:14-cv-01067-RWT. Mailed to: Michelle Carder, Ugo Colella, David Donohoe, Marc Hines, Michael Schaengold. [14-1580] (CB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None
                          Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:14-cv-01067-RWT. Case manager: CBennett. [14-1580] (CB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 238 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?