Eng v. Pacermonitor.com et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-03912-ENV-LB
District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 11, 2016 at 2:05 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eng, Kenneth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Eng +1 917 573 9453
v.
No Logo Harros LLC, Defendant
No Logo Pacermonitor.com , Defendant
No Logo Rosen, Joe, Defendant
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: 7/11/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; For the foregoing reasons, Eng has failed to state claims upon which relief may be granted, and his factual allegations make clear that, even if amended, his pleadings could not possibly state any valid cause of action. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. ยง 1915(e)(2)(B), therefore, Eng's complaints are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice; The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in both cases and to close them for administrative purposes. Ordered by Judge Eric N. Vitaliano on 7/1/2014. (fwd for judgment) c/m to pro se pltf (Fernandez, Erica)
    LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Letter
    Letter dated 6/25/2014 from Kenneth Eng, stating that the undersigned "would like to redact [his] address from all of [his] lawsuits" etc. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Clerks Notice of Rule 73
      In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Eng. (Davis, Kimberly)
          LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Complaint
          COMPLAINT against Harros LLC, Pacermonitor.com, Joe Rosen, filed by Kenneth Eng. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 940 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?