Landmark Technology, LLC v. eBay, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00605
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 3:35 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Landmark Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Provost Umphrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andy Tindel +1 903 596 0900 +1 903 596 0909 atindel@andytindel.com
v.
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Findlay Craft, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael C Chow +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 mchow@orrick.com
Space Benjamin S Lin +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 blin@orrick.com
Space Will Hussein Melehani +1 949 567 6700 +1 949 567 6710 wmelehani@orrick.com
Space Matthew Herman Poppe +1 650 614 7400 +1 650 614 7401 mpoppe@orrick.com
Space Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com
No Logo Law Office Of Scott C. Harris, Defendant
No Logo Scott C Harris, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/2/2014, Entered: None Withdraw
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Hearing
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/6/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Chapter 27 of the Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code and Request for Hearing, 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                    SUMMONS Issued as to eBay, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Law Office of Scott C Harris Inc, # 2 Scott C Harris)(ch, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Landmark Technology, LLC (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                        DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None
                                          COMPLAINT against Scott C Harris, Law Office of Scott C. Harris, eBay, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4650263.), filed by Landmark Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tindel, Andy) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?