Derrer v. Spiegel Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-08946
District Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 21, 2017 at 12:34 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter Derrer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Behn & Wyetzner, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael I Behn +1 312 629 0000 +1 312 327 0266 mbehn@behnwyetzner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cafferty Clobes Meriwether & Sprengel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher B Sanchez csanchez@caffertyclobes.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Winter Sprengel +1 312 782 4880 jsprengel@millerfaucher.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley, Geller, Bowman & Coates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 gcauley@cauleybowman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Futterman Howard Watkins Wylie & Ashley, Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald L. Futterman +1 312 427 3600 + 312 427 1850 rfutterman@futtermanhoward.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David J. Syrios

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guri Ademi +1 414 482 8000 +1 414 482 8001 gademi@ademilaw.com
Space Shpetim Ademi +1 414 482 8000 sademi@ademilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marvin Alan Miller +1 312 332 3400 +1 312 676 2676 mmiller@millerlawllc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Gusikoff Stewart +1 619 390 4006 +1 619 231 7423
v.
No Logo Horst Hansen, Defendant
No Logo James Cannataro, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freeborn & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph L. Fogel +1 312 360 6000 jfogel@freebornpeters.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D. Freeborn +1 312 360 6000 +3606 360 360 6572 mfreeborn@freebornpeters.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine A. Miller +1 312 360 6752 +1 312 360 6595 cmiller@freebornpeters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Wendy E. Morris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd J. Ohlms +1 312 360 6000 tohlms@freebornpeters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donna Lynn McDevitt +1 312 407 0910 +1 312 407 8581 donna.mcdevitt@skadden.com
TERMINATED: 11/19/2003, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy A. Nelsen +1 312 407 0700 +1 312 407 0700 tnelsen@skadden.com
No Logo James W Sievers, Defendant
No Logo Kpmg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James H. Bowhay +1 312 251 4600 jbowhay@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Desmond +1 312 251 4600 +1 312 251 4610 mdesmond@fslegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colleen M Schmiege +1 312 251 4600 cschmiege@fslegal.com
No Logo Martin Zaepfel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAURENCE S. SHTASEL +1 215 569 5691 +1 215 832 5691 shtasel@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher W Carmichael +1 312 263 3600 +1 312 578 6666 christopher.carmichael@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBIN POTTER & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew I Farmer +1 312 861 1800 +1 312 861 3009 matt@potterlaw.org
No Logo Michael Crusemann, Defendant
No Logo Michael Otto, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Wendy N Enerson +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 wendy.enerson@snrdenton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Zachary Fain +1 312 876 8000 lfain@sonnenschein.com
No Logo Michael R Moran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Garelli Grogan Hesse & Hauert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen Marie McNamara +1 630 833 5533 +1 630 833 6855 kmcnamara@gghhlaw.com
No Logo Peter Muller, Defendant
No Logo Service List, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerach Coughlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert M Rothman +1 877 992 2555
No Logo Spiegel Holdings Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Thomas Eliseuson +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 aeliseuson@sonnenschein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harold C. Hirshman +1 312 876 8000 +1 312 876 7934 harold.hirshman@dentons.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Qualley King +1 312 876 8000 christopher.king@dentons.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dressler & Peters, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Alan Primack +1 312 602 7370 mprimack@dresslerpeters.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Cox Smith - Dallas

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Raymond Hill thill@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kellogg North America Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/25/2006 Tamara Lynn Meyer +1 616 961 2187
No Logo Spiegel, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jay A. Lipe
TERMINATED: 01/15/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen E. Sward

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter C. Carlson wcarlson@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stinson Leonard Street LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell J. Keller +1 816 691 2336 +1 888 226 6407 russell.keller@stinsonleonard.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (193) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/2/2007(vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: The court hereby finds and concludes that the Plan of Allocation set forth in the Notice is in all respects fair and reasonable and the court hereby approves the Plan of Allocation. Enter Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/2/2007(vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer :Motion for Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation and Class Certification and for Award of Attorneys fees and Reimbursement of Expenses 176 granted. It is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed that: All of the capitalized terms used herein shall have the same meanings as set forth in the Stipulation of Settlement dated as of 11/1/2006 (the "Stipulation"). This case has jurisdiction over the subject matter of this application and all matters relating thereto, including all Members of the Class who have not timely and validly requested exclusion. The court hereby awards Lead counsel attorneys' fees of 30% of the Settlement Fund and reimbursement of expenses in an aggregate amount of $237,536.54 together with the interest earned. Enter Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
          FINAL Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/2/2007(vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Fairness hearing held. It is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed that: This judgment incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation, and all terms used herein have the same meanings set forth in the Stipulation. This court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Litigation and over all terms used herein shall have the same meanings set forth in the Stipulation. Enter Final Judgment and order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
              [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                [Proposed] Order Awarding Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                  [Proposed] Order Approving Plan of Allocation of Settlement Proceeds by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                    DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Declaration of Cauley Bowman in Support of Fees (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                      DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Ademi & O'Reilly Declaration in Support of Fees (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Cafferty Faucher Declaration in Support of Fees (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Lerach Coughlin Declaration in Support of Fees (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Declaration of Robert Rothman in Support of Final Approval and Fees (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                              DECLARATION regarding motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Declaration of Carole K. Sylvester re Notice of Pendency and Proof of Claim (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM motion for miscellaneous relief, 176 by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Memorandum in Support of Final Approval (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by Unknowns Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne TonettiMotion for Final Approval of Settlement, Plan of Allocation and Class Certification and for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses (Cafferty, Patrick) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation by Peter Derrer (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 02/13/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                        LETTER from Brian E. McDonough dated 01/18/07. (vmj, ) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          [PROPOSED] ORDER preliminarily approving settlement and providing for notice Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/21/2006(vmj, ) (Entered: 11/29/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Enter Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Peter Derrer by Ellen A Stewart; Order entered granting leave by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Filing fee $ 100 paid, receipt number 10427517 (vmj, ) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                [Proposed] Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice by Peter Derrer (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement granted. Parties to submit revised order setting Fairness Hearing for 3/2/07 at 10:00. Notice to be mailed by 12/5/06; publcation on 12/12/06. Briefs in support of final approval to be filed by 2/23/07. Objections to be filed by 1/19/07. Claims deadline 3/5/07. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                    STIPULATION regarding memorandum, 167 Stipulation of Settlement (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Lead Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : At the parties' request, status hearing set for 10/30/06 is stricken and reset to 11/6/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (td, ) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 9/26/2006. Parties report continued progress in their settlement negotiations. Motion for preliminary approval to be filed by 10/30/2006 at 10:30. Status hearing set for 10/30/06 at 10:30. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held on 8/22/2006. Status hearing set for 9/26/2006 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (etv, ) (Entered: 08/22/2006)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/25/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Agreed motion to withdraw counsel 161 is granted. Tamara Lynn Meyer of Kellogg Company is granted leave to withdraw her appearance on behalf of the defendants. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 07/26/2006)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Anthony Thomas Eliseuson for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 161 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/1/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION by Defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen to withdraw as attorney [Agreed Motion] (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/24/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER to amended complaint by Martin Zaepfel(Carmichael, Christopher) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      PROTECTIVE Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.26(c) Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/6/2006(vmj, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Agreed motion for entry of protective order 151 granted. Enter Protective Order Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(C). Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to amended complaint (Third Consolidated) by James Cannataro(Fogel, Joseph) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            ANSWER to amended complaint and Additional Defenses (to Plaintiffs' Third Consolidated Amended Complaint) by Michael R Moran, James W Sievers(McNamara, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [Corrected to Add Electronic Signature] ANSWER to Complaint by Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen(Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                CERTAIN DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to amended complaint AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS' THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen(Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  STIPULATION TO ALLOW DEFENDANTS TO INCORPORATE THEIR ANSWERS AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO THE SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AS THEIR ANSWERS AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES TO THE THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Anthony Thomas Eliseuson for presentment of motion for protective order 151 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/11/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by Defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen, Michael R Moran, Martin Zaepfel, James W Sievers, James Cannataro, Plaintiff Peter Derrer for protective order (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Defendants' joint motion to extend time for defendants to answer or otherwise plead to the Third Consolidated Amended Complaint 147 granted to 7/10/06. Status hearing set for 8/22/2006 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          Lead Plaintiffs' Partial Opposition to Defendants' Joint Motion to Extend the Time for Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Third Consolidated Amended Complaint by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Anthony Thomas Eliseuson for presentment of motion for extension of time, 147 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/13/2006 at 08:45 AM. (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION by Defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen, Michael R Moran, Martin Zaepfel, James W Sievers, James Cannataro for extension of time To Answer Or Otherwise Plead To The Third Consolidated Amended Complaint (Eliseuson, Anthony) (Entered: 06/08/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                Third Consolidated AMENDED complaint by Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrews Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, Dionne Tonetti against Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen, Spiegel, Inc., Spiegel Holdings Inc, Michael R Moran, Martin Zaepfel, James W Sievers, James Cannataro (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/2/2006(vmj, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Enter Stipulation to Extend Discovery. All fact discovery to be completed by 11/1/2006. Reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(1) due from plaintiffs by 1/5/2007; defendants' expert reports due 3/2/2007; depositions of all experts must be completed by 4/13/2007. Dispositive motions due 5/11/2007; responses by 6/8/2007; replies 6/29/2007. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      STIPULATION to Extend Discovery (Miller, Marvin) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/29/2005:Judicial staff mailed notice(hp, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. KPMG's motion to dismiss (Docket No. 116 )is granted. Plaintiffs should further amend the complaint to reflect the court's ruling that KPMG is no longer a proper defendant in this case. Notices mailed by judge's staff (hp, ) (Entered: 08/03/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            RESPONSE by defendant KPMG LLP to lead plaintiffs' motion for leave to file additional authority 136 (hp, ) (Entered: 06/17/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff's motion for leave to file additional authority granted. 136 Mailed notice (hp, ) (Entered: 06/13/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendant KPMG's motion for leave to file additional authority 134 is granted. Mailed notice (hp, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Marvin Alan Miller for presentment of MOTION by Plaintiff for leave to file additional authority 136 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/9/2005 at 09:30 AM. (gma, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff for leave to file additional authority (gma, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by James H. Bowhay for presentment of MOTION by Defendant KPMG for leave to file additional authority 134 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/1/2005 at 09:00 AM. (gma, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant KPMG for leave to file additional authority (gma, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by Marc A. Topaz of change of address. (mjc, ) (Entered: 02/14/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by counsel Samuel H. Rudman of change of firm affiliation for plaintiffs. (hp, ) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              REPLY by defendant KPMG LLP in support of its motion to dismiss third consolidated amended complaint [116-1] (Attachments). (hp) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 11/4/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Filed plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a consolidated response in excess of 15 pages. Motion is granted. [129-1] KPMG also granted leave to file brief of 20 pages; date extended to 12/07/04. [116-1] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiffs for leave to file a response in excess of 15 pages (Attachments); Notice. (hp) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION by plaintiffs to KPMG's motion to dismiss consolidated amended complaint [116-1] (Attachment); Notice.(hp) Modified on 11/02/2004 (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 10/13/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Certain defendants' motion for extension of time to file their Rule 26(a) Disclosures granted [124-1] to and including 10/29/04. Mailed notice (air) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Michael R Moran, James W Sievers by Kathleen Marie McNamara. (air) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller by Lisa Zachary Fain, C. Hunter Wiggins. (air) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen for extension of time to file their Rule 26(a) Disclosures ; Notice. (air) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by defendant James Cannataro and affirmative defenses to plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint [112-1]; Notice. (hp) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPORT of parties planning meeting. (jmm) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 10/1/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : By agreement of counsel, defendant James Cannataro to answer or otherwise plead by 10/08/04. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller, Horst Hansen and affirmative defenses to plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint [112-1]; Certificate of service. (hp) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER by defendant Martin Zaepfel and affirmative defenses of defendant Martin Zaepfel [112-1] (Attachments). (hp) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers to plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint [112-1]. (hp) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 9/28/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing set for 1/13/05 at 9:30 a.m. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures to be made by 10/15/04. All fact discovery to be completed by 02/24/06. Reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(1) due from plaintiffs by 03/31/06; defendants' expert reports due 05/01/06; depositions of all experts must be completed by 06/02/06. Plaintiffs and defendants allowed until 06/01/05 to join additional parties and amend the pleadings. Dispoitive motions due 06/30/06; responses by 07/28/06; replies by 08/18/06. Response to defendant KPMG's motion to dismiss third consolidated motion to dismiss [116-1] to be filed by 11/01/04; reply 11/22/04; ruling to be made by mail. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant KPMG LLP to dismiss third consolidated amended complaint ; Memorandum in support (Attachments); Notice. (hp) Modified on 09/20/2004 (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 8/30/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Agreed motion by defendants for extension of time to respond to the consolidated amended complaint is granted. [114-1] The individual defendants are given to and including 10/01/04 to answer the consolidated complaint. Rule 16 conference set for 09/15/04 is stricken. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AGREED MOTION by defendants James Cannataro, Michael R. Moran, Martin Zaepfel, James W. Sievers, Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen, KPMG for extension of time to respond to the consolidated amended complaint ; Notice. (hp) Modified on 09/01/2004 (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 8/3/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiffs' stipulation to modify schedule granted as follows: Plaintiff shall file amended class action complaint on or before 8/4/04. Defendants shall file their respective answers or motions directed to the amended class action complaint on or before 9/3/04. Rule 16 conference set for 9/15/04 at 9:30 a.m. to stand. Mailed notice (eav) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff; Notice of filing (eav) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION to modify schedule (eav) (Entered: 08/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 7/8/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' joint motion to strike (Docket No. 60-1) is granted in part and denied in part. The motions to dismiss filed by Mr. Moran and Mr. Sievers (Docket No. 57-1), Mr. Cannataro (Docket No. 68-1), and KPMG (Docket No. 53-1) are granted in part and denied in part. The motions to dismiss filed by Dr. Otto, Dr. Crusemann, Dr. Muller, and Mr. Hansen (Docket No. 55-1) and by Mr. Zaepfel (Docket No. 76-1, 76-2) are denied, and SHI's motion to dismiss (Docket No. 66-1) is granted. Plaintiffs' motion to modify the discovery stay (Docket No. 48-1) is also granted. Plaintiffs have until 07/28/04 to file an amended complaint consistent with this opinion, and defendants have until 08/27/04 to answer or otherwise plead. Rule 16 conference is set for 09/15/04 at 9:30 a.m. (Entered Memorandum Opinion and Order.) Notices mailed by judge's staff (hp) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 5/19/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held. Ruling on pending motion to be made by mail within thiry (30) days. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by plaintiff's counsel Samuel H. Rudman of change of firm affiliation; Notice. (hp) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by defendant of attorney appearance [105-1] (Attachments). (gma) Modified on 05/14/2004 (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendant Martin Zaepfel by Laurence Shtasel; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. (gma) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Martin Zaepfel by Christopher W Carmichael, Matthew Ignatius Farmer (hp) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 4/16/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : KPMG, LLP granted leave to file memorandum in excess of 15 pages. [103-1] No notice (hp) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by defendant KPMG LLP in further support of their motion to dismiss [53-1] (Attachments). (hp) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendant James Cannataro in support of his motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA [68-1] (Attachment); Notice (hp) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc.'s counsel of change of firm name. (hp) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc. in support of its motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint [66-1] (hp) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by defendant Martin Zaepfel in further support of its motion to dismiss [76-2]. (hp) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX A by defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller, Mr. Horst Hansen in support of motion to dismiss; Unreported cases [97-1] (Attachments). (hp) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller, Mr. Horst Hansen's in support of their motion to dismiss [55-1]; Notice. (hp) (Entered: 04/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers in support of their motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA [57-1] (hp) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by defendants in further support of their joint motion to strike the complaint [60-1] (hp) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 3/29/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Plaintiff having filed an amended complaint, defendant Sievers' motion to dismiss the earlier complaint [Doc. 30-1] is stricken. [30-1] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 3/22/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants joint motion for an extension of time in which to file reply briefs in support of their respective motions to dismiss complaint is granted to and including 04/13/04. [92-1] [53-1] [55-1] [57-1] [66-1] [68-1] [76-2] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by defendants KPMG, Michael Crusemann, Michael Otto, Horst Hansen, Peter Muller, Martin Zaepfel, Spiegel Inc, James Cannataro for an extension of time in which to file reply briefs in support of their respective motions to dismiss the complaint ; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 3/18/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendants' motion for leave to file instanter defendants' response to lead plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental authority regarding plaintiffs' motion to modify discovery stay is granted. [90-1] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendants James Cannataro, Michael Crusemann, Horst Hansen, KPMG, Michael R. Moran, Peter Muller, Michael Otto, James W Sievers, Spiegel Holdings Inc, Martin Zaepfel for leave to file instanter defendants' response to lead plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental authority regarding plaintiffs' motion to modify discovery stay ; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 3/16/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Lead plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental authority in support of their motion to modify discovery stay is granted. [88-1] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 03/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by lead plaintiffs for leave to file supplemental authority in support of their motion to modify discovery stay (Attachment); Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to defendants' joint motion to strike the complaint [60-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs in opposition to defendant James R. Cannataro's motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA [68-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers' motion to dismiss claims asserted against defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA [57-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to Spiegel Holdings, Inc.'s motion to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint [66-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to defendant Martin Zaepfel's motion to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint [76-1] [76-2]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to KPMG's motion to dismiss [53-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION by lead plaintiffs to defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller and Mr. Horst Hansen 's motion to dismiss [55-1]; Notice (hp) (Entered: 03/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 2/17/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Lead plaintiffs' motion for leave to file supplemental authority in support of their motion to modify discovery stay is granted. [78-1] Plaintiff is granted leave to file the decision of Judge James Gwin in In re: First Energy Corporation Securities Litigation as recent supplemental authority in support of its motion for partial lift of the discovery stay. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Michael Otto, Horst Hansen, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller by Wendy N. Hayes (hp) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by lead plaintiffs for leave to file supplemental authority in support of their motion to modify discovery stay (Attachment); Notice (hp) (Entered: 02/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 2/9/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff granted an extension until 03/20/04 to file response(s) to defendants' motions to dismiss and defendants shall be granted an extension until 03/30/04 to file replies in support of their motions to dismiss. (Entered Joint Stipulation and Schedule Order.) Notices mailed by judge's staff (cdy) (Entered: 02/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Martin Zaepfel to strike the complaint or in the alternative to dismiss claims asserted against defendant Martin Zaepfel ; Memorandum in support (Attachments); Notice (hp) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application for leave to appear pro hac vice filed by Laurence S Shtasel on behalf of defendant Martin Zaepfel denied without prejudice for failure to appoint local counsel. Mailed notice (rmm) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice for defendant Martin Zaepfel by Laurence S Shtasel (Attachment) (rmm) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 1/15/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Defendant's motion to withdraw appearance is granted. Stephen E. Sward having retired from the law firm of Rooks Pitts on 12/31/03 therefore is granted [72-1] leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for for Spiegel Inc. Mailed notice (jmp) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant Spiegel Inc to withdraw appearance of Stephen E. Sward ; Notice. (jmp) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 1/6/04 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion on behalf of Martin Zaepfel for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint is granted [59-1]. Defendant to file motion to dismiss by 1/23/04; Response to be filed 2/17/04; reply 3/16/04. Hearing set for 1/9/04 stricken. Mailed notice (emd) (Entered: 01/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TABLE OF CONTENTS by defendant KPMG and authorities to KPMG LLP's memorandum of law in support of motion to dismiss; Notice. (ntf) (Entered: 01/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James Cannataro by Catherine A. Miller. (jmm) (Entered: 01/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant James Cannataro to dismiss claims asserted against defendant James R. Cannataro pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA ; Memorandum in support (Attachments); Notice (hp) (Entered: 01/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Spiegel Holdings Inc by Thomas Raymond Hill; Notice (ar) (Entered: 12/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc to dismiss the consolidated amended complaint ; Memorandum in support; Notice (ar) (Entered: 12/31/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 12/18/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Filed motion of defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers for leave to file instanter memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages. Motion granted. [61-1] Both sides have leave to file 40-page briefs on motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (hp) Modified on 12/22/2003 (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 12/18/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Filed motion on behalf of Martin Zaepfel for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead. [59-1] Motion entered and continued to 01/09/04 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 12/18/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Filed defendants' joint motion to strike the complaint. [60-1] Answer brief to motion due 02/17/04. Reply to answer brief due 3/16/04. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX B filed by defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen to their motion to dismiss claims asserted against defendants Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller and Mr. Horst Hansen [55-1] (Attachments). (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendants Michael Moran, James W. Sievers for leave to file instanter memorandum of law exceeding 25 pages in support of their motion to dismiss complaint ; Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by defendants to strike the complaint ; Memorandum of law in support; Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant on behalf of Martin Zaepfel for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint (hp) (Entered: 12/22/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPENDIX filed by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers of public documents cited in memorandum of law by defendants in support of their motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA (3 Vols: 58-1 thru 58-3) defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA [57-1] (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers to dismiss claims asserted against defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers pursuant to Rule 9(b) and the PSLRA ; Memorandum in support; Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by lead plaintiffs memornadum of law in further support of their motion to modify the PSLRA's discovery stay [48-1] (Attachments); Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants Michael Otto, Michael Crusemann, Peter Muller, Horst Hansen to dismiss claims asserted against defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller and Mr. Horst Hansen ; Memorandum in support; Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by defendant KPMG, LLP in support of its motion to dismiss Count I of the complaint [53-1] (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant KPMG, LLP to dismiss Count I of the complaint ; Notice (hp) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MEMORANDUM by defendants in opposition to plaintiffs' motion to modify the PSLRA's mandatory stay of discovery [48-1] (hp) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James R. Cannataro by Michael D. Freeborn, Joseph F. Fogel, Todd J. Ohlms; Notice. (hp) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 11/19/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Filed plaintiff's motion to modify the PSLRA's discovery stay. [48-1] Answer brief due 12/10/03. Reply to answer brief due 12/17/03. Ruling on plaintiff's motion to modify The PSLRA's discovery stay will be by mail. Mr. Timothy A. Nelsen granted leave to withdraw. Mr. Fogel of Freeborn & Peters granted leave to substitute for Mr. Cannataro. Defendant Cannataro's answer date extended to 12/31/03. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by plaintiffs in support of their motion to modify the PSLRA's discovery stay [48-1] (hp) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs to modify the PSLRA's discovery stay (Attachments); Notice (hp) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [26-1] by lead plaintiffs; Notice. (hp) Modified on 11/03/2003 (Entered: 11/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 10/8/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held and continued to 04/30/04 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs to file amended complaint by 10/31/03. All defendants other than Spiegel Holdings, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead by 12/15/03. Spiegel Holdings, Inc. to file response by 12/31/03. Response to defendants' motions by 02/17/04. Replies by 03/16/04. All parties have leave to file 25-page briefs without additional leave of court. Ruling to be made by mail by 04/30/04. Attorney Nelson appears on behalf of defendant Cannataro. Attorneys for defendant Zaepfel to file appearance with 30 days. Walter Calson's motion for leave to withdraw granted in part and denied in part. [33-1] [33-2] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing by defendants of attorney appearance [43-1] (hp) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant James R. Cannataro by Timothy Alan Nelsen, Donna L. McDevitt; Notice. (hp) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Dr. Michael Otto, Dr. Michael Crusemann, Dr. Peter Muller, Mr. Horst Hansen by Christopher Qualley King, Harold C. Hirshman, Tamara Lynn Meyer, Anthony Thomas Eliseuson (hp) (Entered: 10/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant KPMG by James R. Figliulo, James H. Bowhay, Michael K. Desmond, Colleen M. Schmiege (hp) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 9/16/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Stipulation and Proposed Order granted. [40-1] Defendants Michael E. Crusemann, Horst R.A. Hansen and Peter Muller having been served or have accepted service of summons and complaint, shall file and serve their answer or respond to the Amended Complaint on or before 10/08/03. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION by parties and PROPOSED ORDER; Notice (hp) (Entered: 09/17/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 8/29/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held and continued to 10/08/03 at 9:30 a.m. Minute order of 08/26/03 is amended as to the next status date. Remainder of order to stand. Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 09/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 8/26/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held and continued to 09/08/03 at 9:30 a.m. Motion for leave to withdraw appearance [33-1] and for an extension of time on behalf of defendants Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro [33-2] is entered and continued generally until defendants Zaepfel and Cannataro retain substitute counsel. Status hearing set regarding service on German defendants and to set briefing schedule on all defendants motions to dismiss. [32-1] Date for defendant Spiegel Holdings to answer or otherwise plead continued generally. Motion of defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers for leave to file instanter memorandum of law exceeding 15 pages granted. [32-1] Plaintiff also has leave to file an oversized response brief. Plaintiff's oral motion to grant Robert M. Rothman to appear pro hac vice granted. [0-0] Mailed notice (hp) (Entered: 08/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of summons and complaint executed as to KPMG on 08/25/03. (hp) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Robert M. Rothman on behalf of lead plaintiffs Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrew Dennore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons and Diane Tonetti; Order entered granting leave by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer (ar) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc by Marc A. Primack. (hp) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Michael R. Moran and James W. Sievers by Walter C. Carlson and Russell J. Keller. (hp) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendants Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro to withdraw appearances of Walter C. Carlson and Russell J. Keller and for an extension of time to answer to complaint (hp) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendants Michael R. Moran and James W. Sievers for leave to file instanter memorandum of law exceeding 15 pages ; Notice (hp) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPENDIX 1, 2 and 3 filed by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers of public documents cited in memorandum of law of defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers in support of motion to dismiss [30-1] (3 Vols: 31-1 through 31-3). (hp) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendants Michael R. Moran, James W. Sievers to dismiss claims asserted against defendants Michael Moran and James Sievers ; Memorandum in support (Attachment); Notice. (hp) Modified on 08/12/2003 (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 8/4/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion of Spiegel Holdings, Inc. to extend time to respond to consolidated amended complaint [28-1], and for leave for an additional attorney to file appearance [28-2] is granted. Spiegel Holdings, Inc has to and including 09/12/03 to answer or otherwise plead. Marc A. Primack is granted leave to file his appearance as an additional attorney for Spiegel Holdings, Inc . Mailed notice (ntf) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc to extend time to respond to consolidated amended complaint , and for leave for an additional attorney to file appearance ; Notice (ntf) (Entered: 08/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 5/29/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing re-set to 8/26/03 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants' time to answer or otherwise plead extended to 08/11/03. Status hearing set for 06/15/03 stricken. (Enter Stipulation and Order Extending Defendants' Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint and Continuing Date for Status Hearing). Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff; jury demand (Attachments); Notice (cdy) (Entered: 05/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER of 4/28/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing re-set for 06/18/03 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's to file their Consolidated Complaint by 05/12/03. Remaining defendants' time to file their Answers or motions to dismiss extended to 06/11/03. (Entered Stipulation and Order.) Mailed notice by judge's staff (gcy) (Entered: 04/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER of 3/27/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion for leave to withdraw appearance for Spiegel, Inc. is granted [23-1]. Mailed notice (gcy) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Stepen E. Ward to withdraw appearance of Spiegel, Inc. ; Notice. (gcy) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER of 3/11/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion by Edward David Rappa to consolidate actions [21-1],to be appointed lead plaintiff [21-2], and for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel are withdrawn [21-3]. No notice (las) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION of Edward David Rappa to consolidate actions to be appointed lead plaintiff and for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel ; Memorandum in suport : Affidavit of Darren J. Check (Attachments) : Notices (las) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER of 3/11/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : The Oliver Group's motion to appoint lead plaintiff [11-1], and to approve selection of lead counsel [11-2] and for consolidation of related cases is granted [11-3]. Martin's motions [12-1], [12-2], [12-3] are stricken as moot. No notice (las) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER of 3/11/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing held and continued to 5/23/03 at 9:00 a.m. The above-captioned actions are consolidated for all purposes and shall proceed under case No. 02 C 8946. [12-1] The following cases are dismissed: Meeuwenberg v. Spiegel, 02 C 9107; Sampair v. Spiegel, Inc., 03 C 484 and Martin v. Spiegel, Inc. 03 C 593, Johann Oliver, Lisa Oliver, Andrew Demore, Ronald Peters, Steven Simmons, and Dione Tonetti are appointed lead plaintiff for the class pursuant to Section 21D of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934; and the law firms of Cauley Geller Bowman Coates & Rudman, LLP and Ademi & O'Reilly, LLP are appointed Lead Counsel and the law firm of Miller Faucher and Cafferty LLP is appointed Liaison Counsel. Plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint no later than 4/21/03. Defendants shall file their answer or motion to dismiss by 5/21/03. (Entered Order) Mailed notice by judge's staff (eav) (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of alias summons and complaint executed on 02/10/03 as to defendant Spiegel Holdings Inc (Attachment) (ar) (Entered: 03/11/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by plaintiff's counsel fo withdrawal of the motion fo Jon M. Bowman and Tim Martin for consolidation fo the related cases, appointment as lead plaintiffs and approval of their selection of lead counsel; Notice. (lc) (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of withdrawal of the motion of Edward David Rappa to consolidate actions, appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of their selection of lead counsel; Notice. (gcy) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 2/19/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : The Oliver Group's motion to appoint lead plaintiff [11-1] approve selection of lead counsel [11-2] and for consolidation of related cases [11-3] are entered and continued. Mailed notice (vmj) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ADDITIONAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff by Michael I Behn, Ronald L. Futterman. (vmj) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Behn in support of the motion for consolidation of the related cases [12-1], appoint Jon M. Bowman and Tim Martin as lead plaintiffs [12-2] and to approve lead plaintiffs' choice of counsel [12-3] (Attachments). (vmj) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Jon M Bowman, Tim Martin for consolidation of the related cases , appointment as lead plaintiffs , and for approval of their selection of lead counsel ; Notice. (vmj) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by The Oliver Group to appoint lead plaintiff , approve selection of lead counsel , and for consolidation of related cases ; Memorandum in support (Attachments); Notice. (vmj) (Entered: 02/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER of 2/18/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Motion for leave to withdraw appearance for Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro is granted [9-1]. Mailed notice (cem) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendants Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro for leave to withdraw appearance of Stephen E. Sward and Jay A. Lipe for Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro ; Notice. (cem) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants' Spiegel Inc, Martin Zaepfel and James Cannataro by Walter C. Carlson and Russell J. Keller (hmb) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER of 2/4/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Status hearing set for 3/10/03 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff's motion for finding of relatedness is granted [6-1]. The court finds case numbers 02c8946 (Judge Pallmeyer), 02c9107 (Judge Andersen), 03c484 (Judge Bucklo) and 03c593 (Judge Kennelly) are related and requests that 02c9107, 03c484 and 03c593 be reassigned for consilidation with 02c8946. Rule 16 conference set for 2/20/03 stricken. Mailed notice (hmb) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by plaintiff for finding of relatedness (Attachments); Notice. (hmb) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER of 1/6/03 by Hon. Rebecca R. Pallmeyer : Agreed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead granted to and including 1/31/03 [4-1]. Status set for 2/20/03 stricken. The parties are directed to appear through lead counsel for a pretrial conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16 on 2/20/03 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel are requested promptly to meet face-to-face for a discussion of possible settlement and for preparation of a planning report in the form that appears on the reverse of this order. Such report shall be submitted to Judge Pallmeyer in chambers no later than two business days prior to the conference. (See reverse of minute order.) Mailed notice (las) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AGREED MOTION by defendants Spiegel Inc, Martin Zaepfel, and James Cannataro for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead ; Notice (las) (Entered: 01/07/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendants Spiegel Inc, Martin Zaepfel, James Cannataro by Stephen E. Sward, Jay A. Lipe. (fce) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to defendants Spiegel Inc, Spiegel Holdings Inc, Michael R Moran, Martin Zaepfel, James W Sievers and James Cannataro on 12/13/02. (Documents 2-1 through 2-6). (jmp) (Entered: 12/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT; jury demand - Civil cover sheet - Appearance(s) of S. Gene Cauley, Marvin Alan Miller, Christopher B. Sanchez, Jennifer Winter Sprengel, Guri Ademi, Shpetim Ademi as attorney(s) for plaintiff (No summons(es) issued.) (Documents: 1-1 through 1-4) (hp) Modified on 12/11/2002 (Entered: 12/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?