Altera Corporation v. PACT XPP Technologies, AG
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-02868
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2019 at 3:55 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Altera Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by mkwllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sherman William Kahn +1 212 524 9309 skahn@mkwllp.com
Space Marc J. Pernick +1 415 992 3424 +1 415 992 3421 mpernick@mkwllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adela Gotz +1 650 813 5600 +1 650 494 0792 AGotz@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl J. Kramer +1 415 813 5775 +1 650 494 0792 kkramer@mofo.com
Space Brian Martinez +1 415 268 7000 +1 415 268 7522 brianmartinez@mofo.com
Space Colette Reiner Mayer +1 650 813 5600 +1 650 494 0792 CRMayer@mofo.com
Space Eric Chingyun Pai +1 650 813 5600 +1 650 494 0792 epai@mofo.com
Space Diek O. Van Nort +1 650 813 5696 +1 303 592 1510 dvannort@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Colette Reiner Verkuil +1 212 336 4173 +1 212 468 7900 creiner@mofo.com
No Logo Pact Xpp Technologies Ag, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Cannon +1 415 680 4057 cannon.matthew.d@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen Elizabeth Lovin +1 415 875 6419 +1 415 875 6700 klovin@keker.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret H. Shyr +1 650 801 5097 +1 650 801 5100 margaretshyr@quinnemanuel.com
Space Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr. +1 650 801 5000 charliestiernberg@quinnemanuel.com
Space Mark Yeh-Kai Tung +1 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 marktung@quinnemanuel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Owen Cooper +1 415 591 1566 +1 415 591 1400 WCooper@winston.com
No Logo Rambus Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by ROBINS KAPLAN MILLER CIRESI LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Li Zhu +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 lzhu@robinskaplan.com
No Logo Xilinx, Inc., Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Howard Cohen +1 213 680 8558 +1 213 680 8500 mcohen@kirkland.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (315) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of All Claims and Counterclaims with Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
      Order by Hon. James Donato granting 252 Stipulation. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 247 Order on Stipulation,, Continuing Stay of Case Pending Finalization of Settlement filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 12/7/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          Order: The Court acknowledges the parties' submissions re 249 Order to Show Cause. The parties have addressed the Court's concerns and the Order to Show Cause is dismissed. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/4/2016. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2015) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
              Response to Order to Show Cause 249 Order to Show Cause,,, Joint Response of Altera and PACT to Order to Show Cause byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 01, # 2 Exhibit 02, # 3 Exhibit 03, # 4 Exhibit 04, # 5 Exhibit 05, # 6 Exhibit 06, # 7 Exhibit 07, # 8 Exhibit 08, # 9 Exhibit 09, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Declaration of Karl J. Kramer, # 16 Declaration of John M. Neukom)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 12/2/2015) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court-appointed expert, Dr. John Wawrzynek, has advised that neither party has paid his invoices, which have been outstanding for some time. The Court is concerned about the failure of counsel and their law firms to honor this payment obligation. Lead counsel for each party are ordered to show cause by 12:00 p.m. on Friday, December 4, 2015, why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Court's requirement to pay equal shares of Dr. Wawrzynek's invoices in a timely manner. Counsel for PACT is further ordered to show cause by December 4, 2015 why it should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Court's October 21, 2015 order and October 27, 2015 email re retrieving its documents from the Court-appointed expert. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/30/2015. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: The parties should work with the court-appointed expert, Professor John Wawrzynek, on the disposition of case materials provided to him. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/21/2015. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                    Order by Hon. James Donato re 246 Stipulation: In light of the parties' settlement representation, the Court stays the case for 45 days. The April 13, 2016 pre-trial conference and April 25, 2016 trial dates will remain in place on calendar, but all pre-trial deadlines are vacated. If the parties do not file a stipulated dismissal in 45 days, the case will return to active status. The parties are advised that the pre-trial conference and trial dates will not be moved. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Deadlines Pending Finalization of Settlement filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/16/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        CLERK'S NOTICE The Court VACATES the January 28, 2016 settlement conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2015) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Further Settlement Conference held on 10/14/2015.FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: 10/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                            Declaration of Li Zhu in Support of 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byRambus Inc. (Related document(s) 236 ) (Zhu, Li) (Filed on 10/13/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altera Corporation re 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Catancio COS re Rambus Documents (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altera Corporation re 236 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Catancio COS re Under Seal Documents (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                  Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of 238 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Expert Report Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,119,181, 6,338,106, and 6,513,077, 239 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Report Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,943,242, 6,859,869, and 7,565,525, 237 MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Infringement Report filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11)(Related document(s) 238, 239, 237 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Report Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 5,943,242, 6,859,869, and 7,565,525 filed by Altera Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 10/21/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Expert Report Regarding Validity of U.S. Patent Nos. 6,119,181, 6,338,106, and 6,513,077 filed by Altera Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 10/21/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Strike Portions of Dr. Marwan Hassoun's Infringement Report filed by Altera Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 10/21/2015. Replies due by 10/28/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karl J. Kramer ISO Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration of Diek O. Van Nort ISO Motions, # 4 Exhibit A-Part 1 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 5 Exhibit A-Part 2 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 6 Exhibit A-Part 3 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 7 Exhibit A-Part 4 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 8 Exhibit A-Part 5 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 9 Exhibit A-Part 6 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 10 Exhibit A-Part 7 of 7 to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 11 Exhibit B to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted, # 12 Exhibit C to Van Nort Decl - Unredacted)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: 10/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE by Altera Corporation ALTERA's Final Election of Asserted Prior Art (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 1/13/2016. Pretrial Conference set for 4/13/2016 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Selection set for 4/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/25/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/1/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2015.FTR Time 2:01-2:14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/1/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: 9/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 230 Stipulation. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Submission of Materials to Court-Appointed Expert filed by Altera Corporation. (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG PACT's Final Election of Asserted Claims (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato granting 227 Stipulation. The Court extends the Expert Discovery Cut-Off to September 16, 2015 for the limited purpose of deposing the parties' damages experts, James R. Kearl and Paul K. Meyer. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2015) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: 9/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Damages Expert Depositions After Expert Discovery Cutoff filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric C. Pai ISO Stipulation)(Pai, Eric) (Filed on 9/1/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: 8/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Margaret H. Shyr (Shyr, Margaret) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER. The parties are instructed to provide the dates and locations of their upcoming experts' depositions to the Court-appointed expert, Professor John Wawrzynek, so that he may choose whether to attend. Also, the parties should provide searchable PDF and hardcopy transcripts (with exhibits) of those expert depositions to Professor Wawrzynek expeditiously, so that he may consider them in the preparation of his own report. Signed by Judge James Donato on 08/24/2015. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER. Pursuant to paragraph 5d of the Court's Instructions to Court-Appointed Technical Expert (Dkt. No. 110-1), the parties are reminded that they must choose a deposition date for Professor Wawrzynek that is available on the Court's calendar. The parties are instructed to submit a few proposed dates to the Court's courtroom deputy, Lisa R. Clark, for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge James Donato on 08/24/2015. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER. The Court directs the parties to provide copies of their expert reports to the Court-appointed expert, Professor John Wawrzynek, as follows: each party will provide to Professor Wawrzynek by Thursday, August 27, 2015, (1) searchable PDF copies of its opening and rebuttal expert reports, including all appendices and attachments that were provided to the other party, and (2) a separate document that summarizes the party's opening and rebuttal expert reports. The summary document is not to exceed 30 pages and may use the format of a bullet-point summary. Each party is also directed to send one set of paper copies of the above-mentioned documents to Professor Wawrzynek at his home address by Friday, August 28, 2015. The parties should call the Court's courtroom deputy if they do not have this address. The parties should also send to the Court chambers copies of the summary documents only. Signed by Judge James Donato on 08/24/2015. (This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2015) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 10/14/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 8/21/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: 8/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER RE FRE 706 EXPERT'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION COMMENTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FRE 706 Expert's Comments on Claim Construction) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge James Donato granting 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; finding as moot 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting in part and denying in part 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; and denying 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/17/2015, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 8/14/2015.Court Reporter Name Not Reported. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/14/2015) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 8/14/2015 12:30 PM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2015) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Donato re 202 , 203 , 204 , 206 , 211 , 212 , 213 , 214 discovery letter briefs. The Court schedules a telephone conference to discuss the briefs for 8/14/2015 at 12:30 p.m. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato extending date of fact discovery for the purpose of deposing Richard Dewitt Crisp pursuant to 210 Stipulation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief Altera's Response to PACT's Letter Brief re Technical Documents [Re Dkt. 206] filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              Discovery Letter BriefAltera's Letter Brief Responding to PACT's Letter Brief re Email Discovery [Re Dkt. 204] filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief Altera's Response to PACT's Letter Brief re Damages Information [Re Dkt. 203] filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/8/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Discovery Letter Brief PACT's Responsive Discovery Letter Brief [Re: Dkt 202] filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 8/7/2015) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: 7/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Richard Dewitt Crisp After the Close of Fact Discovery filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/29/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ORDER re discovery letter briefs. By 8/7/2015, PACT will file a response to 202 Altera's Discovery Letter Brief and Altera will file responses to 203 , 204 , and 206 PACT's Discovery Letter Briefs. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 7/27/2015.Court Reporter Name Not Reported. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: 7/28/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in PACT's Discovery Letter Brief (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Production of Technical Documents filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/27/2015) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in PACT's Discovery Letter Brief filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of PACT's Discovery Letter Brief, # 4 Unredacted Version of PACT's Discovery Letter Brief)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/27/2015) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Email Discovery filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/27/2015) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Information Relevant to Damages filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/27/2015) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/28/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 7/27/2015) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: 7/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret H. Shyr (Shyr, Margaret) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: 7/21/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato re Deposition of Richard Cliff after the Close of Fact Discovery pursuant to 198 Stipulation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 7/27/2015 10:30 AM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2015) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Deposition of Richard Cliff After the Close of Fact Discovery filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/20/2015) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Response re 192 Order on Motion for Leave to File, PACT's Response to Comments From Court-Appointed Expert byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/20/2015) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato re 193 Stipulation Regarding the Authenticity and Dates of Public Accessibility of Certain Documents. Both the authenticity of a document and its public accessibility are questions of fact. In re NTP, Inc., 654 F.3d 1279, 1295, 1297 (Fed. Cir. 2011). "A stipulation of fact that is fairly entered into is controlling on the parties and the court is generally bound to enforce it." Ring & Pinion Serv. Inc. v. ARB Corp., 743 F.3d 831, 836 (Fed. Cir. 2014). Consequently, the Court will enforce the stipulation and any other stipulations regarding questions of fact; the parties need not seek a Court order approving such stipulations. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge James Donato re 189 and [194- Discovery Letter Briefs. The Court sets a telephonic hearing to discuss the briefs at 10:30 a.m. on 7/27/2015. If appropriate, the Court will extend the discovery cutoff for the sole purpose of deposing Messrs. Wiertz and Gleichmann. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Discovery Letter BriefPACT's Responsive Discovery Letter Brief [Re: Dkt 189] filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Authenticity and Dates of Public Accessibility of Certain Documents filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato granting 188 Motion for Leave to File Response to Comments from Court-Appointed Expert. The proposed response attached at Dkt. No. 188 -1 is deemed filed. PACT may file a response of its own of up to 7 pages by 7/20/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2015) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: 7/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 188 MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant Altera Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Response to Comments from Court-Appointed Expert - ) PACT's Opposition to Altera's Administrative Motion for Leave to File Response to Comments from Court-Appointed Expert filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit A1)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. James Donato re 189 Discovery Letter Brief. The Court directs PACT to file a response by 7/17/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2015) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Discovery Letter Brief
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery Letter Brief filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 7/14/2015) (Entered: 07/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File - Defendant Altera Corporation's Administrative Motion to File Response to Comments from Court-Appointed Expert - filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Administrative Motion, # 2 Declaration of Karl J. Kramer, # 3 Exhibit A to Kramer Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 7/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato granting 186 Stipulation to Allow the International Deposition of Peter Weber. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: 7/7/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Allow the International Deposition of Peter Weber filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: 6/29/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by William Owen Cooper (Cooper, William) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: 6/26/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/28/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/26/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 6/26/2015. Case did not settle. Further settlement conference set for 1/28/16 at 9:30 AM. Parties may contact the Court if they desire an earlier settlement conference. Court to issue Order.FTR Time Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney Karl J. Kramer & Diek O. Van Nort. Defendant Attorney Charlie Stiernberg & John Neukom. This is a text only Minute Entry (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2015) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 6/23/15, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2015. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT ORDER by PACT XPP Technologies, AG for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: 6/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Altera Corporation for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/25/2015, Entered: None Claims Construction / Markman Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 6/23/2015.Court Reporter Name JoAnn Bryce. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2015) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement of Recent Decision (L.R. 7-3 (d)(2)) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 177 by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement of Recent Decision (L.R. 7-3(d)(2)) by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part 133 Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Order by Hon. James Donato granting 172 Unopposed Administrative Motion Regarding Third-Party Depositions. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion to Compel Altera to Narrow its Preliminary Election of Prior Art. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of 172 MOTION Additional Third-Party Depositions - Defendant Altera Corporation's Unopposed Administrative Motion Regarding Third-Party Depositions - filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 172 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Additional Third-Party Depositions - Defendant Altera Corporation's Unopposed Administrative Motion Regarding Third-Party Depositions - filed by Altera Corporation. Responses due by 7/6/2015. Replies due by 7/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Martinez (Martinez, Brian) (Filed on 6/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order by Hon. James Donato taking under advisement 145 Motion to Compel Altera to Narrow its Infringement Contentions. Pursuant to Civil L.R. 7-1(b), the Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument and vacates the hearing set for 6/3/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 145 MOTION to Compel Altera Corporation to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions ) PACT's Reply In Support of Its Motion to Compel Altera to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/20/2015) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Claims Construction hearing and the motion hearing re: 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity previously set for May 26, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. is continued to June 23, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato vacating hearing for 133 Motion to Amend Invalidity Contentions. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds this motion appropriate for disposition without oral argument and vacates the 5/27/2015 hearing. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (re 165 MOTION for Leave to File Altera's Administrative Motion For Leave To File An Opposition To Pact's Request to Strike Expert Declarations ) PACT's Opposition to Altera's Administrative Motion for Leave to File an Opposition filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Altera's Administrative Motion)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Altera's Administrative Motion For Leave To File An Opposition To Pact's Request to Strike Expert Declarations filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Opposition to Pact's Request to Strike Expert Declarations), # 2 Proposed Order Granting Altera's Administrative Motion For Leave To File Opposition)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/14/2015, Entered: None Tutorial Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Tutorial Hearing held on 5/8/2015.Court Reporter Not Reported. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2015) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 145 MOTION to Compel Altera Corporation to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions ) Altera's Opposition to Pact's Motion to Compel Altera to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diek Van Nort ISO Altera's Opposition to Pact's MTC, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Van Nort Decl ISO Altera's Opposition)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 133 MOTION to Amend/Correct Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions. Motion Hearing continued to 5/27/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Tutorial Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Tutorial Hearing held on 5/8/2015.Court Reporter Name Not Reported. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2015) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Response ( Non Motion )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to re 143 Brief,, 150 Response PACT's Reply Claim Construction Brief by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of PACT's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit AA, # 3 Exhibit BB, # 4 Exhibit CC, # 5 Exhibit DD, # 6 Exhibit EE)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY (re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity ) filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diek Van Nort ISO Altera's Reply ISO Its MSJ on Invalidity, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Van Nort Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Van Nort Declaration)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Final Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Disputed Terms, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Terms, # 3 Exhibit C1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,119,181, # 4 Exhibit C2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,338,106, # 5 Exhibit C3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,513,077, # 6 Exhibit C4 - U.S. Patent No. 5,943,242, # 7 Exhibit C5 - U.S. Patent No. 6,859,869, # 8 Exhibit C6 - U.S. Patent No. 7,565,525)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/11/2015) (Entered: 05/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: 5/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY (re 133 MOTION to Amend/Correct Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions ) filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Diek Van Nort In Support of Altera's Reply In Support of Its Motion for Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Van Nort Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Van Nort Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Van Nort Declaration)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato Allowing Equipment in Courtroom. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: 5/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Administrative Motion for Order Permitting Equipment in the Courtroom filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Allowing Equipment in the Courtroom)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 153 Opposition/Response to Motion,, Proposed Order Denying Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE (re 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity ) PACT's Opposition to Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Declaration of Dr. Marwan Hassoun, # 10 Exhibit A, # 11 Exhibit B, # 12 Exhibit C, # 13 Exhibit D, # 14 Exhibit E, # 15 Exhibit F, # 16 Exhibit G)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Professor Majid Sarrafzadeh in Support of 150 Response Regarding Claim Construction filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Professor John Villasenor in Support of 150 Response Regarding Claim Construction filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 150 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response re 143 Brief,, Altera Corporation's Responsive Claim Construction Brief byAltera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/26/2015 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/26/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 145 MOTION to Compel Altera Corporation to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions. Responses due by 5/13/2015. Replies due by 5/20/2015. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to 145 MOTION to Compel Altera Corporation to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 133 MOTION to Amend/Correct Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions ) filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Altera Corporation to Narrow its Invalidity Contentions filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 6/17/2015. Replies due by 6/24/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Cannon, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Proposed Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/29/2015) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: 4/23/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ERRATA re 143 Brief,, Notice of Errata Regarding PACT's Opening Claim Construction Brief by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Errata PACT's Corrected Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Brief PACT's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1, # 2 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of PACT's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 4/20/2015) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Professor Majid Sarrafzadeh in Support of 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of 140 MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 140 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: 4/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by Altera Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 5/4/2015. Replies due by 5/11/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Altera's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 134 Declaration in Support, of Altera's Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 21 of 21, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS re 134 Declaration in Support, of Altera's Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 16 of 21, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 17 of 21, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 18 of 21, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 19 of 21, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 20 of 21)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS re 134 Declaration in Support, of Altera's Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 11 of 21, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 12 of 21, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 13 of 21, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 14 of 21, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 15 of 21)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 134 Declaration in Support, of Altera's Motion for Leave to Amend its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 6 of 21, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 7 of 21, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 8 of 21, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 9 of 21, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 10 of 21)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS re 134 Declaration in Support, of Altera's Motion For Leave to Amend Its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1 of 21, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2 of 21, # 3 Exhibit 1 Part 3 of 21, # 4 Exhibit 1 Part 4 of 21, # 5 Exhibit 1 Part 5 of 21)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of 133 MOTION to Amend/Correct Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Related document(s) 133 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions filed by Altera Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 4/29/2015. Replies due by 5/6/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Altera's Motion For Leave To Amend Its Invalidity Contentions)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 4/15/2015) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of Proceedings held on 3/11/15, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 118 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2015. (Related documents(s) 118 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: 4/7/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-18-2015, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 96 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2015. (Related documents(s) 96 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 4/7/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Discovery Hearing held on 4/1/2015.(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 126 Clerk's Notice, Re CourtCall Telephonic Appearance (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altera Corporation re 126 Clerk's Notice, Re CourtCall Telephonic Appearance (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: 3/31/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altera Corporation re 126 Clerk's Notice, re CourtCall Telephonic Appearance (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 3/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 4/1/2015 12:00 PM before Hon. James Donato. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to schedule their appearance before the Court for the hearing. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2015) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re 122 and 124 discovery letter briefs. The Court sets a telephonic hearing for noon on 4/1/2015 to discuss the discovery dispute. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2015) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: 3/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from John M. Neukom Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re 122 Discovery Letter Brief. PACT will file a responsive letter brief not to exceed 3 pages by 3/27/15. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/21/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Karl J. Kramer Regarding Discovery Disputes. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 3/20/2015) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Hon. James Donato granting 120 Stipulation and Order Regarding Claim Construction Discovery. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Certain Aspects of Claim Construction Discovery filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 3/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Altera Corporation for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by PACT XPP Technologies, AG for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Cannon, Matthew) (Filed on 3/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: 3/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 3/11/2015. re 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG Court Reporter JoAnn Bryce. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *** FILED IN ERROR. Modified on 3/10/2015 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order re 114 Claim Construction Statement. In their claim construction briefing, the parties are requested to provide specific examples of what would be covered by one party's construction and not the other's for each disputed claim term. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2015) (Entered: 03/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/7/2015, Entered: None Claim Construction Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Jointly Filed Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Disputed Terms, # 2 Exhibit B - Agreed Terms, # 3 Exhibit C1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,119,181, # 4 Exhibit C2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,338,106, # 5 Exhibit C3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,513,077, # 6 Exhibit C4 - U.S. Patent No. 5,943,242, # 7 Exhibit C5 - U.S. Patent No. 6,859,869, # 8 Exhibit C6 - U.S. Patent No. 7,565,525)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 3/6/2015) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: 3/6/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Karl J. Kramer re Motion to Disqualify Dr. Tredennick (Dkt. 59). (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order re 102 Motion to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction. The motion to designate additional claim terms is denied: the Court will construe no more than 10 claim terms at this stage. Altera may, however, move for summary judgment that the term "the unit" in claim 1 of the '077 patent and the term "haltered" in claims 13 and 14 of the '869 patent are indefinite; the indefiniteness motion will be briefed and heard on the same schedule as claim construction. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2015) (Entered: 03/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement re 107 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, Regarding Number of Claim Terms by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RE INSTRUCTIONS TO FRE 706 EXPERT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Instructions to Court-Appointed Technical Expert) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: 3/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/4/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: 3/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Diek O Van Nort (Van Nort, Diek) (Filed on 3/3/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order re 102 Administrative Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction. The parties are directed to file by 3/4/15 a joint statement listing the 13 claim terms or term groups that Altera seeks to have the Court construe, prioritized by how important each party believes it is for the Court to construe it, along with the claim(s) each term is found in. The list should note for each term whether the parties believe their dispute goes to an issue of claim scope (i.e., whether one construction would cover products, systems, or processes that the other would not). Finally, the statement should list the four terms that Altera claims are indefinite, along with a brief statement (not to exceed two sentences per term) describing the basis for the indefiniteness argument. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2015) Modified on 3/2/2015 (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: 2/27/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Re Additional Information Re Candidates filed by Altera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Karl J. Kramer In Support Of Altera's Administrative Motion For Relief, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Altera's Administrative Motion For Relief, # 3 Unredacted Version of Letter Re Additional Information Re Candidates)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order re 104 Letter Regarding Court-Appointed Expert. The Court directs Altera to file a sealed letter brief (to be served on opposing counsel as well) with the additional input concerning these candidates that it wishes the Court to consider. The Court also directs the parties to consult with the potential experts and propose times for a telephone conference with each of them, preferably on 3/2/15 or 3/3/15. If the potential experts have current CVs, please email them to jdpo@cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2015) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to Judge Donato Regarding Court Appointed Expert. (Cannon, Matthew) (Filed on 2/25/2015) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (re 102 MOTION To Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction ) filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Altera's Administrative Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 2/24/2015) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction filed by Altera Corporation. Responses due by 3/6/2015. Replies due by 3/13/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kramer Declaration ISO Administrative Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Altera's Administrative Motion for Leave to Designate Additional Claim Terms for Construction)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2015) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order by Hon. James Donato granting 56 PACT's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING DATE: As to 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick. Motion Hearing reset to 3/11/2015 10:00 AM before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: 2/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Chingyun Pai (Pai, Eric) (Filed on 2/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Altera Corporation for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT ORDER by PACT XPP Technologies, AG for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 2/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: 2/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 2/18/2015. re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG Court Reporter Debra Pas. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order re 56 PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds that this motion can be decided without oral argument. The Court will discuss the appointment of FRE 706 experts at the hearing on 2/18/2015. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2015) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: 2/17/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Marc H. Cohen in Support of 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 88 ) (Cohen, Marc) (Filed on 2/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/13/2015, Entered: 2/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Judge Donato Regarding Court Appointed Expert. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Neukom, John) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 88 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Neukom, John) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY (re 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick ) PACT's Reply in Support of its Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of PACT's Reply, # 2 Exhibit W)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/12/2015, Entered: 2/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 4 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RE COURT-APPOINTED EXPERTS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/2015. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of 85 Opposition/Response to Motion 73 Motion for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 85 ) (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: 2/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (re 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick ) filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Statements due 6/18/15. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 2/4/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: 2/4/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 2/3/2015. Further settlement conference set for 6/25/15 @ 9:30 AM. Court Reporter Name or FTR Time Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: 2/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration of Adela Gotz in Support of 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Exhibit M to PACT's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Related document(s) 79 ) (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 79 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Exhibit M to PACT's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY (re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions ) PACT's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of PACT's Reply, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in Exhibit M to PACT's Reply in Support of its Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Exhibit M, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit M)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/29/2015) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: 1/26/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Marc H. Cohen in Support of 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 72 ) (Cohen, Marc) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 73 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (re 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions ) Altera's Opposition to PACT's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byAltera Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karl J. Kramer in Support of Altera's Opposition to PACT's Motion to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 2/5/2015. Replies due by 2/12/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit K, # 10 Exhibit L, # 11 Exhibit M, # 12 Exhibit N, # 13 Exhibit O, # 14 Exhibit P, # 15 Exhibit Q, # 16 Exhibit R, # 17 Exhibit S, # 18 Exhibit T, # 19 Exhibit U, # 20 Exhibit V, # 21 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: 1/22/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit J)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Cannon (Cannon, Matthew) (Filed on 1/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order by Hon. James Donato granting 68 Stipulation to Extend Time for Parties to Exchange Terms for Claim Construction. The deadline for the exchange of proposed terms for construction is extended to 1/20/15. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2015) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. James Donato denying 67 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. The Court cannot remove documents from the ECF docket. The documents at issue -- Dkt. Nos. 59-14, 59-15, 59-16, and 59-17 -- have, however, been locked, and are therefore inaccessible to the public. The Court orders that the documents remain locked and inaccessible to the public. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Parties to Exchange Terms for Claim Construction filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Altera Corporation Altera's Preliminary Election of Asserted Prior Art (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Adela Gotz in Support of 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits filed byAltera Corporation. (Related document(s) 55 ) (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: 1/12/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Marc H. Cohen in Support of 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Leave to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review filed byXilinx, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 58 ) (Cohen, Marc) (Filed on 1/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Leave to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Leave to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 56 MOTION to Amend/Correct PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions, 59 MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2015) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order and to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/23/2015. Replies due by 1/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 2 Declaration of John M. Neukom in Support of Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, *** # 14 Exhibit L - Part 1 of 4, # 15 Exhibit L - Part 2 of 4, # 16 Exhibit L - Part 3 of 4, # 17 Exhibit L - Part 4 of 4 DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. ***, # 18 Exhibit M, # 19 Exhibit N, # 20 Exhibit O, # 21 Exhibit P, # 22 Exhibit Q, # 23 Exhibit R, # 24 Exhibit S, # 25 Exhibit T, # 26 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Disqualify Dr. Harry Tredennick and Motion for Protective Order)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015) Modified on 1/13/2015 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and for Leave to Lodge Documents for In Camera Review filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion to Disqualify and Motion for Protective Order, # 4 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit E, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit U, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit V)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/9/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 55 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/8/2015) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. Motion Hearing set for 2/18/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Responses due by 1/22/2015. Replies due by 1/29/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kristen E. Lovin in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 01 of 23, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 02 of 23, # 4 Exhibit A - Part 03 of 23, # 5 Exhibit A - Part 04 of 23, # 6 Exhibit A - Part 05 of 23, # 7 Exhibit A - Part 06 of 23, # 8 Exhibit A - Part 07 of 23, # 9 Exhibit A - Part 08 of 23, # 10 Exhibit A - Part 09 of 23, # 11 Exhibit A - Part 10 of 23, # 12 Exhibit A - Part 11 of 23, # 13 Exhibit A - Part 12 of 23, # 14 Exhibit A - Part 13 of 23, # 15 Exhibit A - Part 14 of 23, # 16 Exhibit A - Part 15 of 23, # 17 Exhibit A - Part 16 of 23, # 18 Exhibit A - Part 17 of 23, # 19 Exhibit A - Part 18 of 23, # 20 Exhibit A - Part 19 of 23, # 21 Exhibit A - Part 20 of 23, # 22 Exhibit A - Part 21 of 23, # 23 Exhibit A - Part 22 of 23, # 24 Exhibit A - Part 23 of 23, # 25 Exhibit B, # 26 Exhibit C, # 27 Exhibit D, # 28 Exhibit E, # 29 Exhibit F, # 30 Exhibit G, # 31 Exhibit H, # 32 Exhibit I, # 33 Exhibit J, # 34 Exhibit K, # 35 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 36 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/8/2015) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Information in PACT's Motion for Leave to Amend its Infringement Contentions and Supporting Exhibits filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Charles M. Stiernberg in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 3 Redacted Version of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Leave to Amend, # 5 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 01 of 23, # 6 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 02 of 23, # 7 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 03 of 23, # 8 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 04 of 23, # 9 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 05 of 23, # 10 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 06 of 23, # 11 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 07 of 23, # 12 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 08 of 23, # 13 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 09 of 23, # 14 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 10 of 23, # 15 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 11 of 23, # 16 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 12 of 23, # 17 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 13 of 23, # 18 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 14 of 23, # 19 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 15 of 23, # 20 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 16 of 23, # 21 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 17 of 23, # 22 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 18 of 23, # 23 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 19 of 23, # 24 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 20 of 23, # 25 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 21 of 23, # 26 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 22 of 23, # 27 Redacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 23 of 23, # 28 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 01 of 23, # 29 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 02 of 23, # 30 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 03 of 23, # 31 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 04 of 23, # 32 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 05 of 23, # 33 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 06 of 23, # 34 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 07 of 23, # 35 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 08 of 23, # 36 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 09 of 23, # 37 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 10 of 23, # 38 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 11 of 23, # 39 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 12 of 23, # 40 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 13 of 23, # 41 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 14 of 23, # 42 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 15 of 23, # 43 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 16 of 23, # 44 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 17 of 23, # 45 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 18 of 23, # 46 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 19 of 23, # 47 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 20 of 23, # 48 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 21 of 23, # 49 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 22 of 23, # 50 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A - Part 23 of 23, # 51 Redacted Version of Exhibit G, # 52 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 53 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, # 54 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/8/2015) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG PACT's Preliminary Election of Asserted Claims (Neukom, John) (Filed on 12/29/2014) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: 12/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Charles McLean Stiernberg, Jr on behalf of PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Stiernberg, Charles) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 2/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/15/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Pernick (Pernick, Marc) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Sherman W. Kahn (Kahn, Sherman) (Filed on 12/4/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE. Pursuant to PACT's request 48 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for a settlement conference to be held at his convenience. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/25/2014. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by PACT XPP Technologies, AG of Request for Appointment of Magistrate as Mediator (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order by Hon. James Donato entering 45 Stipulated Order re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. James Donato entering 44 Stipulated Protective Order. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/19/2014) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/12/2014) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***AMENDED*** Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 11/05/14, before Judge James Donato. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 11/28/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2015. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Michael Page as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***PLEASE DISREGARD - INCORRECT DOCUMENT ATTACHED - See Dkt. No. 42 *** ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Michael Page as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/10/2014 (cmf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/10/2014 (cmf, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order by Hon. James Donato granting 34 Stipulation Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims Relating to U.S. Patent Nos. 6,088,795; 6,728,871; 6,542,998; 7,028,107; 6,526,520; and 7,237,087. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: 11/7/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 11/05/14, before Judge James Donato. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., Telephone number (858) 453-7590.;echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 1:32 - 1:47. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 38 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 12/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/8/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2015. (Related documents(s) 38 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT ORDER by PACT XPP Technologies, AG for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Altera Corporation for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2014 before James Donato (Date Filed: 11/5/2014). (Recording #FTR: 1:32-1:47.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: 11/5/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM 19 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, - Altera Corporation's Answer to PACT XPP Technologies, AG's Counterclaims - byAltera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Adela Gotz (Gotz, Adela) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/27/2014) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Entities by PACT XPP Technologies, AG re 28 Certificate of Interested Entities (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order re 27 Amended Joint Stipulation to Move Case Management Conference Date. Based on PACT's counsel's representation that he had not yet been retained by PACT when he committed to be in North Carolina on October 29, the Court moves the Case Management Conference to November 5, 2014, at 1:30 pm. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities by PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 26 Order on Stipulation,, filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Neukom)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order by Hon. James Donato re 23 stipulation to move Case Management Conference date. The Court declines to move the Case Management Conference because the parties have not shown good cause -- specifically, whether PACT's lead counsel's commitment to be in North Carolina on October 29 was scheduled before or after the Case Management Conference was scheduled for that date. If the former, the parties may file a revised stipulation stating that fact. (This is a text-only entry. No document is associated with this entry.)(jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/21/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER adopting 21 stipulation selecting mediation. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Move Case Management Conference Date filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by PACT XPP Technologies, AG filed by PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/13/2014, Entered: 10/13/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Altera Corporation (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 10/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Altera Corporation byPACT XPP Technologies, AG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/8/2014) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Yeh-Kai Tung on behalf of PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Tung, Mark) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Lovin on behalf of PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Lovin, Kristen) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Neukom on behalf of PACT XPP Technologies, AG (Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Altera Corporation re 7 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only,,, 11 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint,, 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, 9 Case Management Scheduling Order, 6 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge, 8 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned, 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, 5 Patent/Trademark Copy, 2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order by Hon. James Donato granting 13 Stipulation to Move Case Management Conference Date. The case management conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2014 is continued to October 29, 2014 at 1:30 p.m. (This is a text-only order.) (jdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Move Case Management Conference Date filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Under Local Rule 6-1(a) to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Altera Corporation. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to PACT XPP Technologies, AG. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Summons. (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/17/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/14. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/9/14. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Altera Corporation.. (Verkuil, Colette) (Filed on 7/8/2014) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Altera Corporation - Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Civil L.R. 3-15) - (Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Patent Noninfringement and Invalidity against PACT XPP Technologies, AG. Filed byAltera Corporation. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8713662) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kramer, Karl) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (sv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2015. Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 11/2/2015. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings:, Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines: Discovery due by 7/20/2015. Motions due by 9/16/2015. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/21/2015 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 12/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Jury Trial set for 12/14/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/8/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 11/25/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Donato. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?