Mason v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-24062
District Judge Ursula Ungaro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 2, 2016 at 12:06 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tracy Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barzee Flores PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Rundlet +1 305 374 3998 +1 305 379 6668 alexanderrundlet@barzeeflores.com
v.
No Logo Armor Correctional Health Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo CORIZON, INC., Defendant
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Restani Dittmar & Hauser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Ann Hauser +1 305 445 4090 +4457 445 445 7728 hhauser@rdhlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia I. Murray +1 305 789 9200 pmurray@rdhlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna Volkova +1 305 445 4090 +1 305 445 7728 avolkova@rdhlegal.com
No Logo George Green, Defendant
No Logo J. Green, Defendant
No Logo JOSE COLON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dutton Law Group, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheridan K. Weissenborn +1 786 871 7971 +1 786 542 6655 SWeissenborn@Tampalawyers.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Oscar E. Marrero

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oscar Edmund Marrero +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 oem@marrerolegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lourdes Espino Wydler +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 lew@marrerolegal.com
No Logo M. Limia, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bunnell & Woulfe, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
No Logo Mycnel Jean-Louis, Defendant
No Logo Scott J. Israel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Kronenberg, Gilmartin, Fichtel & Wander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Losey +1 954 370 9970 +1 954 333 3763 dlosey@kelleykronenberg.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to 14 Order on Motion to Remand, (yha) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER ON REMAND RE: 13 Motion to Remand. THE COURT, ORDERS AND ADJUDGES that Counts I, II, III, V and VII are REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2013. (gp) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION to Remand State Law Claims by Tracy Mason. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Administrative Order Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/27/2013. (yha) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/13/2013. (dq) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/13/2013. (dq) (Entered: 11/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Ursula Ungaro for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 11/12/2013. Judge Jose E. Martinez no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/8/2013. (yha) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                  Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/12/2013 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100068758 (yha) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN as party plaintiff by Sheridan K. Weissenborn on behalf of Jose Colon (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM the Amended Complaint by Jose Colon. Attorney Sheridan K. Weissenborn added to party Jose Colon(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/29/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                        Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Corizon, Inc. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/2013, Entered: None
                          Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: 1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint) filed by Corizon, Inc.. Document(s) were filed conventionally that should have been filed electronically (CM/ECF Administrative Procedures). (vjk) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez (vjk) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT) Filing fees $400.00, filed by Corizon, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit State Court Records, # 3 Exhibit Notice of Filing)(vjk) (Entered: 11/08/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 121 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?