Mason v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-21750
District Judge Ursula Ungaro, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 9:04 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tracy Mason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barzee Flores PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander Rundlet +1 305 374 3998 +1 305 379 6668 alexanderrundlet@barzeeflores.com
v.
No Logo Anthony Howell, Defendant
No Logo Armor Correctional Health Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Broward Sheriff Office, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley, Kronenberg, Gilmartin, Fichtel & Wander, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Lee Losey +1 954 370 9970 +1 954 333 3763 dlosey@kelleykronenberg.com
No Logo Carletha Howard, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dutton Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sheridan K. Weissenborn +1 786 871 7971 +1 786 542 6655 SWeissenborn@Tampalawyers.net
No Logo Corizon Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bunnell & Woulfe, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregg Alan Toomey +1 239 337 1630 +1 239 337 0307 gat@thetoomeylawfirm.com
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Restani Dittmar & Hauser

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Helen Ann Hauser +1 305 445 4090 +4457 445 445 7728 hhauser@rdhlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anna Volkova +1 305 445 4090 +1 305 445 7728 avolkova@rdhlegal.com
No Logo George Green, Defendant
No Logo Harvey Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo Jarius Green, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Oscar E. Marrero

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Oscar Edmund Marrero +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 oem@marrerolegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lourdes Espino Wydler +1 305 446 5528 +4460 446 446 0995 lew@marrerolegal.com
No Logo JOSE COLON, Defendant
No Logo Michele Vassell, Defendant
No Logo Mycnel Jean-Louis, Defendant
No Logo Vonita Wilcox, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (151) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 151 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/20/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Administrative Order Closing Case. For administrative purposes this case is hereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/6/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      Notice of Court Practice Upon Settlement. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/6/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 148 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
        FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by H.T. Smith. Disposition: Settled in full.(Smith, Harold) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Affirming 141 Report and Recommendations and denying 131 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/2/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 05/02/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER of Dismissal Re: 144 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Harvey Hoffman and Vonita Wilcox terminated. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/1/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Corizon Health, Inc. of Firm Name Change (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendants Harvey Hoffman and Vonita Wilcox by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                  OBJECTIONS to 141 Report and Recommendations of Magistrate by Jose Colon. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Sheridan K. Weissenborn (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 131 Defendant Jose Colon's Motion for an Award of Attorneys' Fees. Objections to R&R due by 4/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/10/2014. (rse) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 126 Motion to Dismiss. Corizon Health, Inc. is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/31/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT signed by : Sergio Casiano. re 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jose Colon (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jose Colon. (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 126 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 115 Amended Complaint, filed by Corizon Health, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting 134 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 3/6/2014. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/4/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Corizon Health, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER OF REFERENCE Re: 131 Motion for Attorney Fees. Motion referred to Edwin G. Torres. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/3/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 115 Amended Complaint, filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Attorney Fees by Jose Colon. Responses due by 3/10/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Affidavit)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER denying as moot 119 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/18/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/17/2014, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE to Motion re 119 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Tracy Mason. Replies due by 2/27/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 02/17/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jarius Green, Anthony Howell. (Marrero, Oscar) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER Re-Setting Calendar Call, Trial Date and Pretrial Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2014 at 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Trial reset for 11/3/2014 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call reset for 10/29/2014 at 1:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/7/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 115 Amended Complaint, by Corizon Health, Inc.. Responses due by 2/24/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corizon Health, Inc. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 117 Unopposed Motion to Enlarge Pretrial Deadlines and Continue Trial Date. All Discovery due by 8/15/2014. In Limine Motions due by 9/12/2014. All Motions other than Motions in Limine due by 9/5/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/19/2014. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/5/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                          ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Broward Sheriff Office. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Harvey Hoffman. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order by Broward Sheriff Office. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    STATUS REPORT (Interim) by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Enlarge Pretrial Deadlines and Continue Trial Date re 84 Scheduling Order,, by Corizon Health, Inc.. Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 115 Amended Complaint,. Party Mel Limia, M.D. Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties and add the additional parties. (tp) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Third AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Corizon Health, Inc., Jarius Green, Harvey Hoffman, Anthony Howell, Scott J. Israel, Vonita Wilcox, filed by Tracy Mason. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 101 Motion to Dismiss Count V of the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/14/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 100 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Jose Colon is terminated as a party. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/13/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER Scheduling Mediation before H.T. Smith. Mediation Hearing set for 4/28/2014 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 1/9/2014. (ar2) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer Re: 109 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [DE 110] Notice of Mediation Hearing. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ar2) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Amended Notice of Selection of Mediator and Mediation Hearing. Mediation Hearing set for 4/28/2014 at 10:00 AM. (See DE 109 for image). (ar2) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by Tracy Mason (Amended) of Selection of Mediator (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION TO DISMISS 89 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jose Colon. (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 101 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint, filed by Corizon Health, Inc.. (Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint, filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION TO DISMISS 89 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/19/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jarius Green, Anthony Howell. (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE by Tracy Mason of Parties' Selection of Mediator (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 89 Amended Complaint, by Corizon Health, Inc.. Responses due by 12/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Toomey, Gregg) (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS 89 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jose Colon. Attorney Sheridan K. Weissenborn added to party Jose Colon(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/23/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena filed by Tracy Mason. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Scott J. Israel. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Harvey Hoffman. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting 91 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Selection of Mediator. The parties shall submit notification of their selection of a mediator on or before December 11, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/2/2013. (gp) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Striking 92 MOTION to Remand State Law Claims (Case No. 13-CV-24620) filed by Tracy Mason by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STRICKEN. MOTION to Remand State Law Claims (Case No. 13-CV-24620) by Tracy Mason. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) Modified per DE 93 Notice of Striking on 12/3/2013 (ar2). (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Select Mediator re 85 Order Referring Case to Mediation by Tracy Mason. Responses due by 12/16/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 86 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2013. (ail) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Corizon Health, Inc., Jarius Green, Harvey Hoffman, Anthony Howell, Scott J. Israel, Vonita Wilcox, Jose Colon filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Tracy Mason.(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Quash or Modify Subpoena by Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Anna Volkova added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Volkova, Anna) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER Merging Cases. ( Second Amended Complaint due by 11/25/2013). After a second amended complaint is filed in Case No. 13-21750 and Case No. 13-24062 has been voluntarily dismissed, all motions that were pending in Case No. 13-24064 should be refiled in Case No. 13-21750. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/18/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 61 Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 12/2/2013) by Corizon Health, Inc. Attorney Gregg Alan Toomey added to party Corizon Health, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toomey, Gregg) Modified to add document link on 11/14/2013 (ar2). (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF REFERRAL to Mediation. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/28/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER for Pretrial Conference and Trial: Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2014 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Trial set for 7/14/2014 at 9:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 7/9/2014 at 1:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2013. Discovery due by 4/18/2014. Expert Discovery due by 4/18/2014. Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2013. In Limine Motions due by 5/16/2014. All Motions including Summary Judgment Motions and Daubert Motions due by 5/9/2014. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/28/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Dismissing Defendants Mycnel Jean-Louis, George Green & M. Limia. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/21/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 81 Order to Show Cause, by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/18/2013. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file proof of service for Defendants Mycnel Jean-Louis, George Green and M. Limia on or before Friday, October 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/16/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tracy Mason (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 09/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. Plaintiff has until Friday, October 11, 2013, to serve the remaining Defendants. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/12/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 69 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The claims against Defendants Carletha Howard and Michelle Vassell, stated in Count III and IV of the Amended Complaint are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/12/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 69 MOTION TO DISMISS 61 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Carletha Howard, Michele Vassell. (Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time for Service of Process on Defendants George Green, Mycnel Jean-Louis and M. Limia by Tracy Mason. Responses due by 9/30/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vonita Wilcox, Harvey Hoffman, Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Scott J. Israel (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            AGREED ORDER granting 72 Unopposed Motion for HIPAA Qualified Protective Order and Order to Disclose Protected Health Information. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/3/2013. (See Order for details). (ar2) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 69 MOTION TO DISMISS 61 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order Unopposed Motion for HIPAA Qualified Protective Order and Order to Disclose Protected Health Information by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Harvey Hoffman, Scott J. Israel, Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jarius Green, Anthony Howell. Attorney Oscar Edmund Marrero added to party Jarius Green(pty:dft), Attorney Oscar Edmund Marrero added to party Anthony Howell(pty:dft). (Marrero, Oscar) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/20/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 08/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION TO DISMISS 61 Amended Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Carletha Howard, Michele Vassell. Attorney Sheridan K. Weissenborn added to party Michele Vassell(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/6/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 08/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Scott J. Israel. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Harvey Hoffman. Attorney Daniel Lee Losey added to party Harvey Hoffman(pty:dft). (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 24 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Howell and J. Green must file an answer to the Complaint within 14 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 8/16/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Anthony Howell. (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by Jarius Green. (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 08/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., George Green, Jarius Green, Carletha Howard, Anthony Howell, Scott J. Israel, Mycnel Jean-Louis, M. Limia, Michele Vassell, Vonita Wilcox, Harvey Hoffman, filed by Tracy Mason.(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. -Joint Scheduling Report due by 9/27/2013 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/5/2013. (cbr) (Entered: 08/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc. served on 5/31/2013, answer due 6/21/2013. See 45 for image. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerks Notice to Filer re 45 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 57. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re 44 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 54. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Scott J. Israel served on 6/3/2013, answer due 6/24/2013. See 44 for image. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Michele Vassell served on 8/3/2013, answer due 8/26/2013. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 43 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Party Served Selected; ERROR - The incorrect party served was selected. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 51. It is not necessary to refile this document. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Carletha Howard served on 6/29/2013, answer due 7/22/2013. See 43 for image. (ral) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Tracy Mason with Update on Service of Process for Michele Vassell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Carletha Howard served on 6/29/2013, answer due 8/2/2013. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Jarius Green served on 6/18/2013, answer due 7/15/2013. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Anthony Howell served on 6/15/2013, answer due 7/8/2013. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Tracy Mason. Vonita Wilcox served on 6/15/2013, answer due 7/8/2013. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Please See DE# 56 Clerk's Notice. Modified text on 8/6/2013 (ral). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Please See DE# 55 Clerk's Notice. (Rundlet, Alexander) Modified text on 8/6/2013 (ral). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Please See DE# 51 Clerk's Notice. Modified text on 8/6/2013 (ral). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION for More Definite Statement by Carletha Howard. Responses due by 8/19/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER on 18 Motion to Dismiss. With respect to Counts 1 and 2, the motion (D.E. 18) is DENIED AS MOOT because the Court has declined to exercise jurisdiction over those counts. With respect to Count 3, the motion (D.E. 18) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/31/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Requiring Response. Plaintiff must file proof of service for all defendants who have been served on or before August 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/29/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Declining Supplemental Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/29/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tracy Mason (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Disclosure(s) by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by Vonita Wilcox. (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Vonita Wilcox, Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Scott J. Israel Rule 26 Disclosure (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to Motions to Dismiss; granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Carletha Howard answer due 8/2/2013. Plaintiff must file a response to Defendant Greens Motion to Dismiss on or before August 5, 2013, and must file a response to Defendant Howells Motion to Dismiss on or before August 8, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/22/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Regarding Unidentified Defendants. Plaintiff must name the unidentified defendant within 90 days of this order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/22/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to 1 Complaint by Carletha Howard. Attorney Sheridan K. Weissenborn added to party Carletha Howard (pty:dft). (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weissenborn, Sheridan) Modified text/relief on 7/19/2013 (ar2). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Files Responses to Motions to Dismiss Filed by Defendants Anthony Howell and Jarius Green re 24 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, 25 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Tracy Mason. Responses due by 8/5/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Pendency of Other Action by Tracy Mason (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Florida Department of Corrections is terminated as a party. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/18/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Jarius Green. Responses due by 8/1/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Anthony Howell. Responses due by 7/29/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Florida Department of Corrections. (Hauser, Helen) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Jarius Green SHALL file a responsive pleading on or before Monday, July 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/11/2013. (dod) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to 1 Complaint by Jarius Green. Responses due by 7/29/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wydler, Lourdes) Modified text/relief on 7/11/2013 (ar2). (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Anthony Howell SHALL respond to the complaint on or before Friday, July 12, 2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 7/8/2013. (dod) (Entered: 07/08/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Vonita Wilcox. Responses due by 7/22/2013 (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer RE: Complaints re 1 Complaint by George Green, Jarius Green, Anthony Howell, Mycnel Jean-Louis. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 07/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint filed by Tracy Mason. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS 1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Florida Department of Corrections. Attorney Helen Ann Hauser added to party Florida Department of Corrections(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/11/2013 (Hauser, Helen) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lourdes Espino Wydler on behalf of George Green, Jarius Green, Anthony Howell, Mycnel Jean-Louis. Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party George Green(pty:dft), Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Jarius Green(pty:dft), Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Anthony Howell(pty:dft), Attorney Lourdes Espino Wydler added to party Mycnel Jean-Louis(pty:dft). (Wydler, Lourdes) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Lee Losey on behalf of Vonita Wilcox. Attorney Daniel Lee Losey added to party Vonita Wilcox(pty:dft). (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 06/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint by Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Scott J. Israel. Responses due by 7/8/2013 (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued as to Anthony Howell and Vonita Wilcox. (ar2) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (Second) by Tracy Mason (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 06/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Lee Losey on behalf of Scott J. Israel. Attorney Daniel Lee Losey added to party Scott J. Israel(pty:dft). (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Lee Losey on behalf of Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.. Attorney Daniel Lee Losey added to party Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Losey, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 8/9/2013 at 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. -Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 7/26/2013. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/28/2013. (ar2) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued as to Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc., Florida Department of Corrections, George Green, Jarius Green, Carletha Howard, Anthony Howell, Scott J. Israel, Mycnel Jean-Louis, Michele Vassell. (ar2) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Tracy Mason (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Armor Correctional Health Services, Inc.. (Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (vjk) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (vjk) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Tracy Mason. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-5723340, filed by Tracy Mason. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rundlet, Alexander) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?