ZUZA v. OFFICE OF THE HIGH REPRESENTAITVE et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01099
District Judge Rudolph Contreras, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 11:36 AM EDT (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo ZORAN ZUZA, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ZORAN ZUZA
v.
No Logo JEREMY ASHDOWN, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Cymrot +1 202 861 1677 +1 202 861 1783 mcymrot@bakerlaw.com
No Logo OFFICE OF THE HIGH REPRESENTAITVE, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Cymrot +1 202 861 1677 +1 202 861 1783 mcymrot@bakerlaw.com
No Logo VALENTIN INZKO, Defendant

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Alan Cymrot +1 202 861 1677 +1 202 861 1783 mcymrot@bakerlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas P. Cartier +1 202 616 8351 nicholas.cartier@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Reconsideration
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Strike
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/7/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Supplemental Memorandum
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Surreply
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2014, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None CM/ECF Password
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against JEREMY ASHDOWN, VALENTIN INZKO, OFFICE OF THE HIGH REPRESENTAITVE ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616064478) with Jury Demand filed by ZORAN ZUZA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?