Robinson v. Disney Online d/b/a Disney Interactive
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-04146
District Judge Ronnie Abrams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 4, 2017 at 11:49 PM EDT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JAMES ROBINSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edelson McGuire LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rafey S. Balabanian +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 rbalabanian@edelson.com
Space J. Dominick Larry +1 312 589 6370 nlarry@edelson.com
Space Benjamin Harris Richman +1 312 589 6370 +1 312 589 6378 brichman@edelson.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
v.
No Logo The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schwartz & Thomashower, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel Schwartz +1 212 227 4300 rschwartz@stllplaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 50 Notice of Appeal, filed by James Robinson. USCA Case Number 16-1544. Counsel for Appellant has filed a motion to dismiss this appeal without prejudice to a personal representative's ability to seek reinstatement of the appeal and substitution for Appellant, should an appropriate representative come forward. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/19/2016. (nd) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 50 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 41 Clerk's Judgment, 49 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,, 40 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by James Robinson. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-12300960. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Larry, James) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER denying 44 Motion for Reconsideration. On November 18, 2015, Plaintiff James Robinson moved for the Court to reconsider its October 20, 2015 order, which granted Defendant's motion to dismiss. "A party making a motion for reconsideration is not supposed to treat the court's initial decision as the opening of a dialogue in which that party may then use such a motion to advance new theories or adduce new evidence in response to the court's rulings, much less rehash arguments already made and rejected." His motion does not identify any change of controlling law or present new evidence, nor does he argue that reconsideration will prevent manifest injustice. Instead, he merely attempts to take another bite at the apple, repackaging arguments that this Court has already rejected, and improperly seeking to advance new-and unconvincing-theories. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/14/2016) (cf) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 48 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 40 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, 41 Clerk's Judgment, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). . Document filed by James Robinson. (Larry, James) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 44 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 40 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, 41 Clerk's Judgment, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). . Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ring, Rose) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 46 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. Dominick Larry dated 11/18/2015 re: Request for Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). Document filed by James Robinson.(Larry, James) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 40 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, 41 Clerk's Judgment, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). . Document filed by James Robinson. (Larry, James) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION for Reconsideration re; 40 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,, 41 Clerk's Judgment, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). Document filed by James Robinson.(Larry, James) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/5/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/5/2015 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/19/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated October 21, 2015, Disney's motion to dismiss is granted and the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/21/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        OPINION & ORDER re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. filed by Disney Online. As alleged, the disclosures at issue here indicate only that a specific device somewhere was used by someone to watch specific videos. Id. Paragraph 13. An unrelated third party equipped with the information purportedly disclosed by Disney, and nothing more, could not identify Robinson. The third party would not know his name, his age, his gender, his social security number, his home address or any other information tantamount to a physical location, or any similar details that would enable it to identify Robinson as the specific person accessing specific videos on his specific Roku device. The somewhere and someone remain unknown until Adobe purportedly combines Disney's disclosure with other information collected from elsewhere. See Am. Compl. Paragraphs 27, 29, 55-57. Thus, Robinson's allegations, as measured against the definition of personally identifiable information adopted by the Court, fail to show that he is entitled to relief. Accordingly, Robinson cannot make out a viable claim under the VPP A, and his Amended Complaint must be dismissed. In dismissing this action, the Court is sensitive to the policy implications posed by the increasing ubiquity of digital technologies, which, as Robinson ably alleges, have dramatically expanded the depth, range, and availability of detailed, highly personal consumer information. There is no doubt that the world of Roku devices, streaming video, and data analytics is a very different one from that of the physical video stores and tape rentals in which the VPP A was originally passed, and that, as the Yershov court noted, deciding VPPA cases today is thus akin to placing "a square peg... into a round hole." 2015 WL 2340752, at *4. But while the Court recognizes the frustration of an individual such as Robinson-who seeks to keep his information private-whether it is personally identifying or not, the VPP A as written, and even as amended in 2013, does not afford him, or those similarly situated, a remedy. For the reasons stated above, Disney's motion to dismiss is granted. The Clerk of Court is requested to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. 30 and close the case. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth within this Opinion.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 10/20/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rosemarie T. Ring dated October 13, 2015 re: Relevant Decision Issued on 10/9/15 by U.S.Court Appeals for 11th Circuit. Document filed by Disney Online, The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation.(Ring, Rose) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: Oral argument on Defendant's pending motion to dismiss in this action, Dkt. 30, is hereby scheduled for Monday, October 5, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Square. The parties should be prepared to address all arguments raised in the briefing, as well as Yershov v. Gannett Satellite Info. Network, _ F. Supp. 3d _, 2015 WL 2340752 (D. Mass. June 17, 2015); the meaning and relevance (or lack thereof) of "personally identifiable information" in other statutory contexts; and the statutory requirement that any disclosure of "personally identifiable information" under the Video Privacy Protection Act be "knowing[]." 18 U.S.C. § 2710(b)(1). SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 10/5/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/29/2015) (ajs) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Glenn D. Pomerantz dated May 8, 2015 re: relevant new decision. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Glenn D. Pomerantz dated January 26, 2015 re: relevant new decisions. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Glenn D. Pomerantz dated December 9, 2014 re: relevant new decision. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Disney Online. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by James Robinson. (Larry, James) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Glenn D. Pomerantz dated September 12, 2014 re: Request for Oral Argument on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Disney Online.(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bryan H. Heckenlively, # 2 Exhibit A to Heckenlively Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Heckenlively Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Heckenlively Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Heckenlively Declaration)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Disney Online. Responses due by 10/3/2014(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion for Jonathan H. Blavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 24 Motion for Rosemarie T. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting 23 Motion for Bryan H. Heckenlively to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 22 Motion for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION for Jonathan H. Blavin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10049935. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Blavin, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Rosemarie T. Ring to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10049856. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ring, Rose) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                          AMENDED MOTION for Bryan H. Heckenlively to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit B to Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Heckenlively, Bryan) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                            AMENDED MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                              EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 20 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by James Robinson.(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FRCP RULE 15 NON-COMPLIANCE - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Disney Online with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James Robinson. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by James Robinson.(Richman, Benjamin) Modified on 8/25/2014 (jom). (Entered: 08/23/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bryan H. Heckenlively to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10013971. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certiticate of Good Standing (California), # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing (New York), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Heckenlively, Bryan) Modified on 8/19/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Glenn D. Pomerantz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10013902. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Disney Online. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pomerantz, Glenn) Modified on 8/19/2014 (sdi). (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that Disney Online d/b/a Disney Interactive be substituted as Defendant in this action for Defendant The Walt Disney Company ("TWDC"), and that the case caption be modified accordingly. This agreement is without prejudice to Plaintiff renaming TWDC as appropriate based upon information learned in discovery or otherwise and without prejudice to TWDC's right to challenge any action or claim brought against it on any ground, and as further set forth. Disney Online added. The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation terminated. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/14/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for September 5, 2014 is adjourned sine die. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/14/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 15(a)(2), Plaintiff will file a First Amended Complaint on or before August 22, 2014. Defendant shall have until September 12, 2014 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that if Defendant moves to dismiss the First Amended Complaint, the briefing schedule for the motion is as follows: 1. Plaintiff shall serve his opposition papers on or before October 3, 2014; and 2. Defendant shall serve its reply papers on or before October 17, 2014. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that this Stipulation may be executed in multiple counterparts and exchanged electronically with the same force and effect as if executed and exchanged in the original. (Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2014.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/14/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Extend time to Answer, Amend The Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rachel Schwartz dated August 14, 2014. Document filed by The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Rachel) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2014 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 8/11/2014) (cd) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 9 Motion for Rafey S. Balabanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 8 Motion for James Dominick Larry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting 7 Motion for Benjamin H. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Ronnie Abrams)(Text Only Order) (Abrams, Ronnie) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Rafey S. Balabanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice as attorney for Plaintiff James Robinson. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9923982. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Balabanian, Rafey) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for James Dominick Larry to Appear Pro Hac Vice as attorney for Plaintiff James Robinson. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9923114. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Larry, James) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Benjamin H. Richman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9922968. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by James Robinson. (Attachments: # 1 Letter of Good Standing, # 2 Proposed Order)(Richman, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/24/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION ADJOURNING TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel, that the time for defendant The Walt Disney Company to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned action is hereby extended from July 3, 2014 to August 14, 2014, and as further set forth. So ordered. The Walt Disney Company, A Delaware corporation answer due 8/14/2014. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/30/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Rachel Schwartz dated June 28, 2014. Document filed by The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Schwartz, Rachel) (Entered: 06/28/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation served on 6/12/2014, answer due 7/3/2014. Service was accepted by Sue Rhea, Managing Agent. Document filed by James Robinson. (Zerden, Judith) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (moh) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against The Walt Disney Company, A delaware corporation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1008134)Document filed by James Robinson.(moh) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 313 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?