Rigas et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-06964

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2021 at 11:10 AM DT (3.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John J. Rigas, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTIE CALLAHAN COMERFORD +1 215 575 7187 +1 215 575 7200 ccomerford@dilworthlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAWRENCE G. MCMICHAEL +1 215 575 7000 +1 215 575 7200 lmcmichael@dilworthlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Michael Northen +1 215 575 7057 +1 215 575 7200 pnorthen@dilworthlaw.com
No Logo Timothy J. Rigas, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Dilworth Paxson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHRISTIE CALLAHAN COMERFORD +1 215 575 7187 +1 215 575 7200 ccomerford@dilworthlaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAWRENCE G. MCMICHAEL +1 215 575 7000 +1 215 575 7200 lmcmichael@dilworthlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Michael Northen +1 215 575 7057 +1 215 575 7200 pnorthen@dilworthlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Respondent
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Roger Blais +1 212 637 2521
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justina Louise Geraci +1 212 637 2468
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Benton Massey +1 212 637 2283 +1 212 637 2937 david.massey@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov
No Logo Adelphia Communications Corporation., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Mark Vinegrad +1 212 841 1000 +1 212 841 1010 avinegrad@cov.com
No Logo Non-Party Movant Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Douglas J. Pepe +1 212 407 1284 dpepe@jhany.com
No Logo Mr. Patrick M. McLaughlin, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin Law, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean T. Lavin +1 216 623 0900 +1 216 623 0935 slavin@m-litigation.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. McLaughlin +1 216 623 0900 +1 216 623 0935 pmclaughlin@m-litigation.com
  Entries (155) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/12/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Corrected Notice of Appeal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Letter
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting 146 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; granting 146 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted. SO ORDERED, N.Y., N.Y. (Replies due by 9/10/2017.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/21/2017) (ras) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence C. Marshall dated August 21, 2017., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence C. Marshall dated August 21, 2017. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/21/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Copies of Cases Cited re: 143 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 1, # 2 2, # 3 3, # 4 4, # 5 5, # 6 6, # 7 7, # 8 8, # 9 9, # 10 10, # 11 11, # 12 12, # 13 13, # 14 14, # 15 15, # 16 16, # 17 17, # 18 18, # 19 19, # 20 20, # 21 21, # 22 22, # 23 23, # 24 24, # 25 25, # 26 26, # 27 27, # 28 28, # 29 29, # 30 30, # 31 31, # 32 32, # 33 33, # 34 34, # 35 35, # 36 36, # 37 37, # 38 38, # 39 39)(Flodr, Aline) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appendix in Support of Memorandum of Law of the United States of America in Opposition to Ground One of the Petitioners' First Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 re: 143 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, Part 1, # 2 Appendix A, Part 2, # 3 Appendix A, Part 3, # 4 Appendix A, Part 4, # 5 Appendix B, Part 1, # 6 Appendix B, Part 2, # 7 Appendix C, # 8 Appendix D, # 9 Appendix E, # 10 Appendix F, # 11 Appendix G, # 12 Appendix H, # 13 Appendix I, # 14 Appendix J, # 15 Appendix K, # 16 Appendix L, # 17 Appendix M, # 18 Appendix N, # 19 Appendix O, Part 1, # 20 Appendix O, Part 2, # 21 Appendix P, # 22 Appendix Q, # 23 Appendix R, # 24 Appendix S, Part 1, # 25 Appendix S, Part 2, # 26 Appendix S, Part 3, # 27 Appendix S, Part 4, # 28 Appendix T, # 29 Appendix U, # 30 Appendix V, Part 1, # 31 Appendix V, Part 2, # 32 Appendix W, # 33 Appendix X, # 34 Appendix Y, # 35 Appendix Z, Part 1, # 36 Appendix Z, Part 2, # 37 Appendix Z, Part 3, # 38 Appendix Z, Part 4, # 39 Appendix Z, Part 5, # 40 Appendix AA, # 41 Appendix BB, # 42 Appendix CC, # 43 Appendix DD, # 44 Appendix EE, # 45 Appendix FF, # 46 Appendix GG, # 47 Appendix HH, # 48 Appendix II, # 49 Appendix JJ, # 50 Appendix KK)(Flodr, Aline) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Ground One of the Petitioners' First Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. Document filed by USA. (Flodr, Aline) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE re: 134 Rule 56.1 Statement . Document filed by USA. (Flodr, Aline) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting 140 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Granted. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/9/2017) (ras) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSA Brian R. Blais dated August 4, 2017. Document filed by USA.(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting 138 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. All parties shall complete any remaining discovery by Dec. 31, 2017. Petitioners' pending motions are due January 30, 2018. If the government wishes to respond, they must do so by March 1, 2018. The government's Brady response is due by Aug. 10, 2017. Discovery due by 12/31/2017. Motions due by 1/30/2018. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/24/2017) (ras) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSA Damian Williams dated May 21, 2017. Document filed by USA.(Williams, A.) (Entered: 05/21/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 123 MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims. Corrected Memorandum. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      DECLARATION of Lawrence Marshall in Support re: 123 MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims.. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix App. 1, # 2 Appendix App. 2-5, # 3 Appendix App. 6-7, # 4 Appendix App. 8, # 5 Appendix App. 9, # 6 Appendix App. 10, # 7 Appendix App. 11-15, # 8 Appendix App. 16-19, # 9 Appendix App. 20-24, # 10 Appendix App. 25-29, # 11 Appendix App. 30-32, # 12 Appendix App. 33-34, # 13 Appendix App. 35-37, # 14 Appendix App. 38-40, # 15 Appendix App. 41-43, # 16 Appendix App. 44-47, # 17 Appendix App. 48-49, # 18 Appendix App. 50, # 19 Appendix App. 51-52, # 20 Appendix App. 53-57, # 21 Appendix App. 58-61, # 22 Appendix App. 62, # 23 Appendix App. 63-65, # 24 Appendix App. 66-69, # 25 Appendix App. 70, # 26 Appendix App. 71, # 27 Appendix App. 72-73, # 28 Appendix App. 74, # 29 Appendix App. 75-76, # 30 Appendix App. 77-80, # 31 Appendix App. 81-83, # 32 Appendix App. 84-87, # 33 Appendix App. 88-92, # 34 Appendix App. 93-94, # 35 Appendix App. 95-101, # 36 Appendix App. 102)(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 135 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 123 MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims. Synopsis of Memorandum. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/17/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aline R Flodr on behalf of USA. (Flodr, Aline) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment Corrected Memorandum in Support of Judgment. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) Modified on 5/15/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Greenwood on behalf of USA. (Greenwood, Jessica) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 123 MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims. Copies of Authorities Cited in Memorandum. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 1, # 2 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 2, # 3 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 3, # 4 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 4, # 5 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 5, # 6 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 6, # 7 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 7, # 8 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 8, # 9 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 9, # 10 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 10, # 11 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 11, # 12 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 12, # 13 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 13, # 14 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 14, # 15 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 15, # 16 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 16, # 17 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 17, # 18 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 18, # 19 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 19, # 20 Appendix Authorities Cited: Part 20)(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/29/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment Appendix of Documents. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exh. 1, # 2 Appendix Exh. 2-5, # 3 Appendix Exh. 6-7, # 4 Appendix Exh. 8, # 5 Appendix Exh. 9, # 6 Appendix Exh. 10, # 7 Appendix Exh. 11-15, # 8 Appendix Exh. 16-19, # 9 Appendix Exh. 20-24, # 10 Appendix Exh. 25-29, # 11 Appendix Exh. 30-32, # 12 Appendix Exh. 33-34, # 13 Appendix Exh. 35-37, # 14 Appendix Exh. 38-40, # 15 Appendix Exh. 41-43, # 16 Appendix Exh. 44-47, # 17 Appendix Exh. 48-49, # 18 Appendix Exh. 50, # 19 Appendix Exh. 51-52, # 20 Appendix Exh. 53-57, # 21 Appendix Exh. 58-61, # 22 Appendix Exh. 62, # 23 Appendix Exh. 63-65, # 24 Appendix Exh. 66-69, # 25 Appendix Exh. 70, # 26 Appendix Exh. 71, # 27 Appendix Exh. 72-73, # 28 Appendix Exh. 74, # 29 Appendix Exh. 75-76, # 30 Appendix Exh. 77-80, # 31 Appendix Exh. 81-83, # 32 Appendix Exh. 84-87, # 33 Appendix Exh. 88-92, # 34 Appendix Exh. 93-94, # 35 Appendix Exh. 95-101, # 36 Appendix Exh. 102)(Marshall, Lawrence) Modified on 5/15/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct 124 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct To Amend Section 2255 Petition. . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 126 FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment Synopsis of Memorandum., 124 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct To Amend Section 2255 Petition., 125 FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rule 56.1 Statement.FIRST MOTION for Judgment ., 123 MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims. . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Summary Judgment Synopsis of Memorandum. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) Modified on 5/15/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Rule 56.1 Statement., FIRST MOTION for Judgment . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) Modified on 5/15/2017 (ldi). (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct To Amend Section 2255 Petition. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Judgment on Various Brady Claims. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting 120 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioners' Motion for Summary Judgment on the Brady claims is due April 28, 2017. See Memo Endorsement of Doc. 120. If the Government wishes to respond, they must do so by May 30, 2017. All parties shall complete any remaining discovery by August 22, 2017. Petitioners' pending motions are due by September 21, 2017. If the Government wishes to respond, they must do so by October 23, 2017. This Order amends the Court's Order dated April 20, 2017 (Doc. No. 119). (Discovery due by 8/22/2017. Motions due by 9/21/2017. Responses due by 10/23/2017) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/24/2017) (ras) Modified on 4/25/2017 (ras). (Entered: 04/25/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 120 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and/or Adjustment of Deadlines addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence C. Marshall dated April 24, 2017 filed by Timothy J. Rigas, John J. Rigas. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioners' 56.1 Statements must be purely factual. Each statement shall be followed by references to the record that support it. Attached as an Exhibit to the 56.1 Statement shall be each exhibit referenced in the 56.1 Statement, and each deposition transcript relied upon. Counsel shall highlight the portions of the exhibit or deposition transcript relied upon. The Exhibit shall be tabbed with the name or number of each deponent or Exhibit. Respondent's submissions shall follow the same format, with each paragraph number conforming to the paragraph it responds to. See separate scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/24/2017) (ras) Modified on 5/8/2017 (ras). (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time and/or Adjustment of Deadlines addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence C. Marshall dated April 24, 2017. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: The Court orders that all parties shall complete discovery by May 22, 2017. Petitioners' Motion is due by June 22, 2017. If the Government wishes to respond, they must do so by July 24, 2017. (Discovery due by 5/22/2017., Motions due by 6/22/2017., Responses due by 7/24/2017) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/20/2017) (cla) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER: The Court QUASHES the Subpoenas served on the Law Firms. If, in the future, Petitioners wish to serve a much more limited subpoena based on either discovery from the Government or Adelphia, or any other new information, Petitioners should seek a conference with the Law Firms at which Petitioners would explain the relevance of the documents sought and address burden issues. In that event, if no agreement is reached, Petitioners and the Law Firms should contact the undersigned for a conference. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/13/2017) (kgo) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 116 granting Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will accept a 75-page Memorandum, on condition that Petitioners simultaneously submit a 10-page synopsis of its memorandum. Counsel must attach to their memorandum a copy of each decision cited, in alphabetical order, and tabbed. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/31/2017) (ras) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence C. Marshall on behalf of John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Marshall, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/16/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER #106720 re: 102 MOTION to Compel Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena filed by Timothy J. Rigas, John J. Rigas. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Petitioners' motion to compel production of the McLaughlin notes. The Court will produce copies of the documents to Petitioners by first-class mail. (As further set forth in this Opinion & Order.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/24/2016) (mro) Modified on 9/19/2016 (ca). (Entered: 08/25/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford, Lawrence C. Marshall, Ilana R. Miller, Sarah F. Warren, Dan C. Kozusko, and Jason P. Criss dated August 9, 2016 re: Discovery Dispute. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Petitioners John and Timothy Rigas have submitted a letter to the Court, dated April 13, 2016, (Doc. No. 111), seeking guidance as to whether the Court has ruled on a specific discovery request, referred to as "Revised Document Request 29." The Court rejected an earlier version of the request in its June 19, 2014 Order. (Doc. No. 39). Petitioners subsequently requested that the Court consider a revised version of the discovery request, (Doc. No. 46), and both parties submitted argument on the issue. (Doc. No. 49), (Doc. No. 53). The Court now clarifies that its May 5, 2015 Opinion & Order, (Doc. No. 80), did not rule on this request sub silentio. The Court has considered the arguments submitted by both parties, and finds that Petitioners have made sufficiently "specific allegations" to demonstrate "good cause" for discovery. See Bracy v. Gramley, 520 U.S. 899, 908-09 (1997). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS a limited version of Petitioners' request for discovery as follows: All notes or other documents relating to information the Government learned, directly or indirectly, from current or former Scientific Atlanta and Motorola representatives or personnel, regarding marketing support agreements. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/19/2016) (kl) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated April 13, 2016 re: request for clarification on whether the Court has ruled on Petitioners request for discovery. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER: In order to resolve Petitioners' motion to compel, the Court will first review in camera all documents responsive to the subpoenas as originally drafted. To facilitate that review, Mr. McLaughlin is ordered to send copies of all responsive documents (including, but not limited to, Mr. McLaughlin's handwritten notes of Mr. Rothenberger's February 20, 2004 interview with the Government) no later than April 11, 2016 to the following address: Hon. Kimba M. Wood Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, Room 1910 500 Pearl Street New York, NY 10007. Mr. McLaughlin should include an index of the documents with brief summaries of each. SO ORDERED. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/4/2016) (kl) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 102 MOTION to Compel Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick M McLaughlin on behalf of Patrick M. McLaughlin. (McLaughlin, Patrick) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sean T Lavin on behalf of Patrick M. McLaughlin. (Lavin, Sean) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 102 MOTION to Compel Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by Patrick M. McLaughlin. (Lavin, Sean) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Sean T. Lavin dated 2/23/2016 re: it is requested that Mclaughlin have an extension of 30 days to March 21, 2016 within which to oppose petitioners' motion(s) to compel. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court agrees that under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45(f), Mr. Lavin and Mr. Laughlin are not required to seek admission pro hac vice and may file papers and appear on the motion. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/21/2016) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/1/2016) (kl) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER TO REDUCE SENTENCE OF IMPRISONMENT TO TIME SERVED: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the defendant's term of imprisonment is hereby reduced to the time he has already served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall be released from the custody of the Federal Bureau of Prisons as soon as his medical condition permits, the release plan is implemented, and travel arrangements can be made. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon his release from the custody of the Federal Bureau of Prisons, the defendant shall begin serving the six-month term of supervised release previously imposed. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/19/2016) (kl); [*** NOTE: Also docketed in related Criminal Case 02-Cr-1236(RJS), Doc.#479. ***] Modified on 2/22/2016 (bw). (Entered: 02/19/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 102 MOTION to Compel Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated February 9, 2016 re: authorization to issue subpoenas. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying 93 EMERGENCY MOTION of John J. Rigas for Bail Pending Habeas. Although John Rigas's motion for bail pending resolution of his habeas petition has shown that extraordinary circumstances exist that would make the grant of bail necessary to make the habeas remedy effective, he has not demonstrated that his habeas petition raises substantial claims. His motion for bail pending resolution of his habeas petition [Doc. No. 93] is therefore DENIED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/22/2015) (kl) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated December 21, 2015 re: Reply to Letter Submitted by the Government in Response to John Rigas's Motion for Bail Pending Habeas Petition. Document filed by John J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSA Brian R. Blais dated December 21, 2015 re: Responding to Petitioner John Rigas's Request for Bail Pending Habeas. Document filed by USA.(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Dr. Howard Miller in Support re: 93 EMERGENCY MOTION of John J. Rigas for Bail Pending Habeas .. Document filed by John J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Government is directed to respond to John J. Rigas' Emergency Motion for Bail Pending Habeas (Doc. 93, filed 12/11/15), on December 22, 2015. (Responses due by 12/22/2015) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/14/2015) (kl) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Christie Callahan Comerford in Support re: 93 EMERGENCY MOTION of John J. Rigas for Bail Pending Habeas .. Document filed by John J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 EMERGENCY MOTION of John J. Rigas for Bail Pending Habeas . . Document filed by John J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            EMERGENCY MOTION of John J. Rigas for Bail Pending Habeas . Document filed by John J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 91 Response, filed by Adelphia Communications Corporation. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioners may retain the right to move to compel production if ACC's production is incomplete. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/16/2015) (kl) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                JOINT RESPONSE re: 90 Order,, Joint Letter in Response to Court Order regarding Discovery Dispute. Document filed by Adelphia Communications Corporation. (Criss, Jason) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court will schedule a conference to resolve the discovery matters in dispute between Adelphia Communications Corporation ("ACC") and petitioners in this proceeding. Because the letters to the Court leave unclear which matters are currently in dispute, ACC and petitioners are directed to send to the Court by October 13, 2015, a joint letter setting forth each item currently in dispute, and each side's respective position (with authorities) with respect to each dispute. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford dated October 2, 2015 re: Response to September 28, 2015 letter from Mr. Criss regarding Subpoena to Adelphia Communications Corp. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Jason P. Criss dated September 28, 2015 re: Request for Discovery Conference. Document filed by Adelphia Communications Corporation.(Criss, Jason) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 62 Motion to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Petitioners' motion to compel production of the three contested documents, redacted to reveal only purely factual summaries of Rothenberger's remarks during the February 20, 2004 interview. The Court will produce redacted versions of the documents to Petitioners by first-class mail. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/25/2015) (kl) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: 85 Letter withdrawing 78 Motion to Compel Carl E. Rothenberger and Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena. The Court vacates its June 4, 2015 Order [doc. no. 84]. Messrs Rothberger and McLaughlin are not required to submit documents to the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/15/2015) (kl) Modified on 6/16/2015 (kl). (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated June 12, 2015 re: Request by Petitioners to Vacate the Court's June 4, 2015 Order and the Withdrawal of its Motion to Compel filed April 15, 2015. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 6/16/2015, Doc. #86. ORDER re: 79 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Timothy J. Rigas, John J. Rigas. In order to resolve Petitioners' motion to compel, the Court will first review in camera all documents responsive to the subpoenas as originally drafted. To facilitate that review, Rothenberger and McLaughlin are ordered to send copies of all responsive documents (including, but not limited to, McLaughlin's handwritten notes of Rothenberger's February 20, 2004 interview with the Government) by first-class mail to the following address: Hon. Kimba M. Wood Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, Room 1910 500 Pearl Street New York, NY 10007. Rothenberger and McLaughlin should include an index of the documents with brief summaries of each. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/4/2015) (kl) Modified on 6/16/2015 (kl). (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 82 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for non-party Adelphia Communications Corporation to respond to Petitioners' subpoena duces tecum. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/1/2015) (kl) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for non-party Adelphia Communications Corporation to respond to Petitioners' subpoena duces tecum addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Alan Vinegrad dated May 29, 2015. Document filed by Adelphia Communications Corporation.(Vinegrad, Alan) (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 58 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law of Petitioners John and Timothy Rigas on the Issue of Procedural Bar as to Petitioners' Habeas Claims). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      OPINION & ORDER: After review, the Court preliminarily holds that Petitioners have demonstrated cause for defaulting both claims. The Court also holds in response to a Government argument beyond the scope of the requested briefing that the Witness Access Claim is not barred by the law-of-the-case doctrine. Accordingly, Petitioners may proceed with discovery on their claims, using the attached lists of authorized document requests. The Government also makes a host of "specific objections" to individual document requests. (Gov. Discovery Objections at 921). After considering those objections, the Court has modified several requests. The final lists of document requests, which Petitioners may use for discovery going forward, are attached as Exhibits A through C. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/15/2015) (kl) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 78 MOTION to Compel Carl E. Rothenberger and Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Carl E. Rothenberger and Patrick M. McLaughlin to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Petitioners John and Timothy Rigas ("Petitioners") have moved for discovery in connection with their petition to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentences they received in United States v. Rigas, 02-CR-1236. On June 20, 2014, the Court found that Petitioners had made sufficiently "specific allegations" to demonstrate "good cause" for some discovery in this action. See Dkt. No. 39 (citing Bracy v. Gramley, 520 U.S. 899, 908-09 (1997)). Petitioners now seek to issue subpoenas in the form attached hereto to Patrick M. McLaughlin, Esquire, and Carl E. Rothenberger, Esquire. For the reasons previously set forth by the Court, IT IS ORDERED that Petitioners' request is GRANTED on this 17th day of March, 2015. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/17/2015) (kl) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Douglas J. Pepe dated March 16, 2015 re: response to Petitioners' letter dated March 16, 2015 (ECF No. 75). Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC.(Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated March 16, 2015 re: authorization to issue subpoenas. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Subpoenas and Schedule A, # 2 Proposed Order)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena filed by Timothy J. Rigas, John J. Rigas: The Court will review the four contested documents (except any that has been lost) in camera to determine which portions, if any, must be produced. To facilitate that review, Buchanan is ordered to send copies of the documents by first-class mail to the following address: Hon. Kimba M. Wood, Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, Room 1910 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/2/2015) (tn) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of P. Jerome Richey in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena .. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Patrick M. McLaughlin, Esq. in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena .. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of J. Alan Johnson, Esq. in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena .. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of John R. Leathers, Esq. in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena .. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of J. Alexander Hershey, Esq. in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena .. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC's Response Brief in Opposition to Petitioners' Motion to Compel. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 65 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/12/2014) (tn) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Compel addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Douglas J. Pepe dated 12/11/2014. Document filed by Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC.(Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Compel Production of Documents in Response to Subpoena served on Brian Roger Blais, Justina Louise Geraci, A. Damian Williams and J. Alexander Hershey on 12/9/14. Service was made by Electronic Mail and Mail. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 62 MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Compel Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney, PC to Produce Documents in Response to Subpoena . Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 37.3, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply Memorandum of Law on the Issue of Procedural Bar as to Petitioners' Habeas Claims. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 59 Letter filed by Timothy J. Rigas, John J. Rigas. ENDORSEMENT: Petitioners may file their Sur-Reply no later than November 3, 2014. (Surreplies due by 11/3/2014.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/27/2014) (tn) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford dated October 27, 2014 re: Motion for leave to file a Sur-Reply. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 52 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Memorandum of Law on the Issue of Procedural Bar addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford dated September 23, 2014. . Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mulcahey Brief, # 2 Exhibit November 26, 2002 Hearing Trascript)(Williams, A.) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford, Esquire dated September 30, 2014 re: Corrected Filing - Rigas v. United States, 11 Civ. 6964 (KMW) & 02 Cr. 1236 (KMW). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 51 Brief, 55 Opposition Brief Of Petitioners On The Issue Of Procedural Bar As To Petitioners' Habeas Claims. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 51 Brief On The Issue of Procedural Bar As To Petitioners' Habeas Claims. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 52 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Petitioners' response is due on September 29, 2014, and the Government may reply by October 7, 2014. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/23/2014) (tn) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated September 23, 2014 re: Petitioners Response to the Government's August 27, 2014 letter objection to the Rigases discovery requests. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Memorandum of Law on the Issue of Procedural Bar addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Christie Callahan Comerford dated September 23, 2014. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF on the Issue of Procedural Bar as to Petitioners' Habeas Claims. Document filed by USA.(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Damian Williams and Brian R. Blais dated 9/5/2014 re: the Government respectfully requests, with Petitioners' consent, an adjournment until Tuesday, September 9, 2014 to file the opening brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/5/2014) (tn) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSA Damian Williams dated August 27, 2014 re: Request for SA and Motorola Notes. Document filed by USA.(Williams, A.) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Christie Callahan Comerford, Esq. re: 47 Order, Set Deadlines,,,, Pursuant to August 20, 2014 Order. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: As set forth within, by September 5, 2014, the Government shall submit an opening brief addressing its procedural default argument. By September 19, 2014, Petitioners shall respond. The Government may reply by September 26, 2014. If the Government wishes to object to Petitioners' revised document request twenty-nine, it may do so in a letter to the Court, filed no later than August 27, 2014. SO ORDERED. (See Order). (Brief due by 9/5/2014. Reply to Response to Brief due by 9/26/2014. Responses to Brief due by 9/19/2014) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/20/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 08/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE re: 45 Response to Discovery (Petitioner's Response to Objections of the United States of America to Discovery Requests). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Discovery Request from United States of America.Document filed by USA.(Blais, Brian) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting 40 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: The time for the Government to state objections to Petitioners' specific discovery requests is extended to July 21, 2014. Petitioners' time to respond is extended to August 4, 2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/1/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated July 1, 2014 re: supplement to June 30th letter. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated June 30, 2014 re: Response to Mr. Williams' June 27, 2014 letter requesting (30) day extension. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Roger Blais on behalf of USA. (Blais, Brian) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 27, 2014. Document filed by USA.(Williams, A.) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Petitioners John and Timothy Rigas ("Petitioners") have moved for discovery in connection with their petition to vacate, set aside, or correct the sentences they received in United States v. Rigas, 02-CR-1236. Prior to endorsing Petitioners' specific discovery requests, as modified, the Court will permit the Government, by July 1, 2014, to state objections to the specific requests. Petitioners may respond by July 15, 2014, both to the Court's tentative revisions, and to any further changes suggested by the Government. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/19/2014) (cd) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated April 16, 2014 re: summary of meet and confer and proposed briefing schedule. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The court adjourns sine die the conference scheduled for April 2, 2014. Counsel for Petitioners and the Government are directed to meet and confer regarding Petitioners' request to amend their Petition. They must send the Court a joint letter, by April 16, 2014, stating to what extent, if any, the parties disagree, regarding the request to amend. The parties should propose a briefing schedule, if necessary. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/1/2014) (ft); [*** NOTE: Also docketed in related Criminal Case 02-cr-1236(KMW), see Doc.#470. ***] Modified on 4/2/2014 (bw). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by A. Damian Williams on behalf of USA. (Williams, A.) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 34 Letter Motion for Conference. Granted. The Court hereby sets a status conference Wednesday, April 2, 2014, at 2:30 P.M. to discuss the matters raised in this letter, and an appropriate schedule going forward. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 4/2/2014 at 02:30 PM before Judge Kimba M. Wood. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/27/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION for Conference to discuss an appropriate schedule to brief request for leave to amend habeas petitions addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated March 24, 2014. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated March 14, 2014 re: Case Status Update. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated March 7, 2014 re: Case Status Update. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated January 29, 2014 re: Supplement to Case Status Report filed on November 20, 2013. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from AUSAs Massey and Geraci dated November 20, 2013 re: Status Update. Document filed by USA.(Geraci, Justina) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Lawrence G. McMichael dated November 20, 2013 re: Status Report. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STATUS REPORT. Letter to the Court dated November 20, 2013 Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(McMichael, Lawrence) Modified on 11/21/2013 (ka). (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - STATUS REPORT. Letter to the Court dated November 20, 2013 Document filed by USA.(Massey, David) Modified on 11/21/2013 (ka). (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The parties shall send a status letter to the Court by November 20, 2013. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/31/2013) (tn) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER M10-468: Stay of Certain Civil Cases Pending the Restoration of Department of Justice Funding. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2013) ***Original Standing Order docketed in case no. 1:13-mc-00334-LAP, document no. 2 on 10/1/2013.***(tro) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Judge Leonard B. Sand is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Justina L. Geraci dated 7/11/2012. re: We write on behalf of the Government in the above-captioned matter. On June 28,2012, counsel for the Rigases wrote to the Court, requesting permission to exceed the 10-page limit for reply memoranda and to allow them to file instead a 50-page reply brief. That request was denied on the same day by the Honorable George B. Daniels. On July 9, 2012, the Government received the Rigases' 25-page reply memorandum via ECF. We therefore respectfully request that the Rigases' reply brief be stricken because it exceeds the 10-page limit set by this Court. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 7/12/2012) (dnd) (Entered: 07/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum in Support of Motions to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct a Sentence and Declaration in Support served on Justina Louise Geraci & David Benton Massey on July 9, 2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Christie Callahan Comerford in Support re: 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (McMichael, Lawrence) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Attorney Lawrence G. McMichael dated June 28, 2012 re: The Rigases believe it will require approximately 50 pages to reply properly to the arguments raised by the government in its response. We respectfully request therefore that you permit the Rigases to exceed the page limit of the Individual Rules and submit a reply brief of 50 pages, and endorse this letter as indicated below. If the Court should deny our request, we would respectfully request an extension of ten days to re-write the brief with out clients' input. ENDORSEMENT: Ten day extension granted. Page extension denied. ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/28/2012) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in related Criminal Case 02-cr-1236(LBS), see Doc.#464. ***] (bw) (Entered: 06/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Lawrence G. McMichael dated 5/11/2012 re: I write on behalf of John and Timothy Rigas to respectfully request a second, thirty-day adjournment of the date by which the Rigases are to reply in support of their motions for relief under 28 U.S.C. § 2255. ENDORSEMENT: Adjournment granted as requested., ( Replies due by 6/29/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/15/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from Attorney Lawrence G. McMichael dated April 11, 2012 re: submitted on behalf of John and Timothy Rigas to request a brief adjournment of the date by which the Rigases are to reply in support of their motions for relief under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255. With the consent of the Government, we therefore respectfully request an adjournment until May 30, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Adjournment to May 30, 2012 granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/16/2012) [*** NOTE: Also docketed in related Criminal Case, 02-cr-1236(LBS), see Doc.#462. ***] (bw) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: MOTION for Discovery.. Document filed by USA. (Massey, David) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand, from David B. Massey/Justina L. Geraci, AUSAs, dated 1/30/2012, re: request a brief adjournment to respond to the motions for relief under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2255 by John and Timothy Rigas -- requests a 21-day adjournment, until February 22, 2012, to submit its opposition papers. Defense counsel has requested a reply date of April 30, 2012, with the Government's consent. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. ( Responses due by 2/22/2012. Replies due by 4/30/2012.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 1/31/2012) (ja) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Christie Callahan Comerford, Esquire re: 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) (Supplemental) Attaching Exhibit MM. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (Comerford, Christie) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from AUSAs David B. Massey, Justina L. Geraci, dated November 3, 2011 re: On or about October 6, 2011, the Government received copies of the motions for relief under 28 U.S.C. Section 2255, including motions for discovery, filed by John and Timothy Rigas. The Government requests, with the consent of the defense, 120 days to respond to the motions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent of 120 days to respond to motions. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 11/7/2011) [*** Also docketed in related Criminal Case, 02-cr-1236(LBS), see doc.#460. ***] (bw); Modified on 11/10/2011 (bw). (Entered: 11/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justina Louise Geraci on behalf of USA (Geraci, Justina) (Entered: 11/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 8 Motion for Christie Callahan Comerford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/17/2011) (rdz) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 9 Motion for Lawrence G. McMichael to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 10/17/2011) (rdz) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Lawrence G. McMichael to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(pgu) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Christie Callahan Comerford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas.(pgu) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Christie Callahan Comerford, Esquire. (laq) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2011: # 1 Declaration Part 2, # 2 Declaration Part 3, # 3 Ex. F-L, # 4 Ex. M-S, # 5 Ex. T-CC, # 6 Ex. DD-JJ, # 7 Ex. KK-LL) (ama). (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Timothy J. Rigas. Document also includes J. Rigas declaration, Grand declaration, Maloney Declaration, Preziosi Declaration. Document filed by Timothy J. Rigas. (laq) (ama). (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Benton Massey on behalf of USA (Massey, David) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Lawrence G. McMichael re: 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (laq) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/18/2011: # 1 Declaration L. McMichael Part 2) (ama). (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 2 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), 1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. (laq) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2011: # 1 Memo of Law Part 2) (ama). (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 02-cr-1236 (LBS).Document filed by Timothy J. Rigas.(laq) (ama). (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 02-cr-1236 (LBS).Document filed by John J. Rigas.(laq) (ama). (Entered: 10/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 0 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION of John J. Rigas and Timothy J. Rigas for Discovery under Rule 6(A) of the Rules governing Section 2255 Proceedings. Document filed by John J. Rigas, Timothy J. Rigas. * Original document filed in criminal case no. 02-cr-1236, document # 458. *Accepted for filing by the Chambers of the Honorable Leonard B. Sand. (tro) Modified on 10/12/2011 (tro). (Entered: 10/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?