KERRIGAN et al v. THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:07-cv-00687
District Judge John R. Padova, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge John R. Padova
Last Updated September 8, 2016 at 10:36 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ANTHONY HOLIDAY, Plaintiff
No Logo CAROLYN DAVENPORT, Plaintiff
No Logo KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, Plaintiff

Represented by DISABILITIES LAW PROJECT

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert W. Meek +1 215 238 8070 +1 215 772 3126 rmeek@drnpa.org

Represented by Law Office of Richard D. Grossman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen F. Gold +1 215 627 7100 Stevegoldada1@gmail.com

Represented by Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Seth F. Kreimer +1 215 898 7447 skreimer@law.upenn.edu
No Logo MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, Plaintiff
No Logo RENEE CROSBY, Plaintiff
No Logo TARIQ MANGUM, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ANTHONY CLARK, Defendant
No Logo City of Philadelphia, Defendant
No Logo EDGAR HOWARD, Defendant
No Logo HONORABLE ANTHONY CLARK, Defendant
No Logo JOSEPH DUDA, Defendant
No Logo MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, Defendant
No Logo PEDRO A. CORTES, Defendant
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SUE ANN UNGER +1 215 560 2127 +1 215 560 1031 sunger@attorneygeneral.gov
No Logo PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, Defendant
No Logo THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, Defendant

Represented by City of Philadelphia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERT D. AVERSA +1 215 683 5020 robert.aversa@phila.gov

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com
TERMINATED: 08/31/2010 KEVIN GREENBERG +1 215 279 9912 kevin.greenberg@flastergreenberg.com
TERMINATED: 02/13/2008 TARA S. PARVEY +1 856 382 2223
TERMINATED: 08/31/2010 CHRISTINE E. THELEN +1 971 269 9356 christine.thelen@flastergreenberg.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Timeline
  Entries (213) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Order of Distribution of Funds
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Status Conference held on 10/11/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
SECOND ADDENDUM TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ORDER THAT IT WILL BE INCORPORATED BY REFERENCE IN THE AGREEMENT AS IF FULLY SET FORTH THEREIN. THE COURT WILL CONTINUE TO RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THIS LITIGATION FOR PURPOSES OF INTERPRETATION AND ENFORCEMENT OF AND COMPLIANCE WITH THE AGREEMENT AND ADDENDUM; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 5/1/13. 5/1/13 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Second Addendum To Settlement Agreement by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, JOSEPH DUDA, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement status Conference held on 3/7/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement STATUS Conference held on 2/27/13. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None
Report Of by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None
Report Of The City Of Philadelphia by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
Report Of City of Philadelphia, Ninth Repoort by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE ORDER DISMISSING ACTION IS VACATED. THE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THE MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/8/12. 2/8/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: SETTLEMENT Status Conference held on 1/19/12. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 2/1/12. 2/1/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 2/9/2012 (afm, ). (VACATED PER ORDER #202) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO: Settlement Conference held on 2/1/12. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: None
Report Of Eighth Report by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. Certificate of Service. (AVERSA, ROBERT) Modified on 2/1/2012 (lisad, ). (Entered: 01/31/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 2/1/12 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 3I; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 1/19/12. 1/20/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/20/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/17/2012, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Post-Judgment Monitoring and Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (AVERSA, ROBERT) Modified on 1/18/2012 (nd, ). (Entered: 01/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CITY DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED AN EXTENSION UNTIL 1/17/12 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/12/12. 1/12/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/12/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CITY DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED UNTIL 1/6/12 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/3/12. 1/3/12 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CITY OF DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED UNTIL 1/3/12 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/14/11. 12/14/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CITY DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED UNTIL 12/22/11 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/13/11. 12/14/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/13/2011, Entered: None
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR POST JUDGMENT ATTORNEY FEES IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/13/11. 12/13/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 10/20/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CITY DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED A 30 DAY EXTENSION UNTIL 12/1/11 TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/20/11. 10/20/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Fees for Post-Judgment Monitoring and Enforcement of Settlement Agreement filed by TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, Pt. 1, # 5 Exhibit D, Pt. 2, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION TO APPROVE THE ADDENDUM TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO WITHDRAW THE ADDENDUM TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ERRONEOUSLY FILED IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/17/11. 10/18/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 10/12/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Approval of Addendum to Settlement Agreement and to Withdraw Addendum Erroneously Filed (Docket # 184) filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Addendum to Settlement Agreement)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 9/28/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS BE GRANTED AN EXTENSION UNTIL 10/18/11 TO FILE A MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/3/11. 10/4/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/29/2011, Entered: None
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Addendum by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, JOSEPH DUDA, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/20/2011, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS DISMISSED AS MOOT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/20/11.9/20/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 09/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 9/14/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 9/8/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 7/28/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 7/26/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 7/22/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 6/6/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing:EVIDENTIARY HEARING SET FOR AUGUST 16-18, 2011 AT 9:30 A.M., IN COURTROOM 3G, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE. NOTICE FAXED TO COUNSEL ON 6/6/11.(cms) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/3/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 5/3/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement STATUS (VIA TELEPHONE) Conference held on 3/30/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE 4/13/11 CONTEMPT HEARING IS RESCHEDULED FOR 5/16/11 AT 9:00 A.M. THROUGH 5/18/11; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/30/11. 3/30/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/28/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 3/28/11. (jl, ) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PARAGRAPH 2 OF THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATED 1/28/11, AS PREVIOUSLY AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 3/10/11, IS FURTHER AMENDED AS FOLLOWS: EACH PARTY SHALL SUBMIT A PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM BY 3/30/11; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/21/11. 3/23/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
ORDER THAT EACH PARTY SHALL SUBMIT A PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM BY 3/18/11 LISTING: THE NAMES OF ANY WITNESSES WHO WILL TESTIFY AT THE HEARING, ALONG WITH A BRIEF SUMMARY OF EACH WITNESS'S ANTICIPATED TESTIMONY. ANY DOCUMENTS THAT WILL BE OFFERED INTO EVIDENCE AT THE HEARING; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. FELIPE RESTREPO ON 3/10/11. 3/11/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/11/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None
Report Of The City Of Philadelphia, Seventh Set Of Responses by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
ORDERED THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT WILL BE HELD ON 4/13/11 THROUGH 4/15/11 BEGINNING EACH DAY AT 9:30 A.M.. EACH PARTY SHALL SUBMIT A PRE-HEARING MEMORANDUM BY 3/11/11; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/28/11. 1/28/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None
ORDERED THAT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTEMPT IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE FOR DISPOSITION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/24/11. 1/24/11 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 1/24/2011 (jl, ). (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Telephone Conference held on 1/20/11 (jl, ) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/20/2011 02:00 PM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE CALL.(gk, ) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
EXHIBIT E to City's Response In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Civil Contempt (Docket No. 162) by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE.. Certificate of Service (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
BRIEF in Support of RESPONSE in Opposition re 158 MOTION for Contempt filed by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit F) (AVERSA, ROBERT) Modified on 1/13/2011 (nd). (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT CITY DEFENDANTS BE GRANTED AN EXTENSION UNTIL 1/12/11 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CONTEMPT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/7/11. 1/7/11 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None
Report Of City's Sixth Set Of Responses by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION re 158 MOTION for Contempt TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR CITY TO RESPOND by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO CLERK/JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 12/28/2010 (nd, ). (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
MOTION for Contempt filed by RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, TARIQ MANGUM, MICHAEL J. MCSHEA.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Contempt, # 2 Request for Hearing and Argument, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/16/2010, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 11/16/2010. (kk, ) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $21,590.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/6/10. 10/6/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
Report Of City Defendants' Fifth Set of Responses To Third Parties' Accessibility Recommendations For Polling Place Locations by CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION. (AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 9/2/10. (jl, ) (Entered: 09/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by KEVIN GREENBERG on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GREENBERG, KEVIN) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. THELEN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, JOSEPH DUDA, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ABBE F. FLETMAN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK, PEDRO A. CORTES, JOSEPH DUDA, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE REQUEST TO AMEND THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT IS APPROVED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/6/2010. 8/9/2010 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(kk, ) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THE CLERK OF COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,610.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/26/10. 7/26/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED. COPY FORWARDED TO FISCAL. (kk, ) (Entered: 07/26/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THE CLERK OF COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,980.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/1/10. 6/2/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $17,135.OO FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 5/3/10. 5/4/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE TIMOTHY RICE: Settlement Conference held on 4/30/10. (jl, ) Modified on 5/4/2010 (jl, ). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOVING AMENDMENT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT THAT THE THIRD PARTIES MAY INCLUDE RECOMMENDATION OF RELOCATION SITES FOR A GIVEN VOTING DIVISION WITH AN INACCESSIBLE POLLING PLACE IN NO MORE THAN THREE BIMONTLY REPORTS.THE THIRD PARTIES ARE NOT REQUIRED TO IDENTIFY ALL POTENTIAL RELOCATION SITES FOR A GIVEN VOTING DIVISION. THE THIRD PARTIES WILL FOCUS THEIR RECOMMENDATION ON LOCATIONS WHERE THE BUILDING OWNER HAS ALREADY AGREED TO HOST A POLLING PLACE OR THAT HAVE A HIGH PROBABILITY OF BEING ACCEPTABLE TO THE CITY DEFENDANTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/26/10. 4/27/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/27/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $19,235.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/22/10. 3/23/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $20,140.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 1/21/10. 1/22/10 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146 IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,350.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOW MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/23/09. 12/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTALISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $44,935.00 FUNDS. 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/23/09. 11/24/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146 IN THE AMOUNT OF $47,190.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; AND WHEN ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED, THEN ALL PAYMENTS WILL BE PAID FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 10/29/09. 10/30/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $47,910.00 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; AND WHEN ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED, THEN ALL PAYMENTS WILL BE PAID FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 9/21/09. 9/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT CLERK OF COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TOPAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA. 19146 IN THE AMOUNT OF $56,985, AS OUTLINED HEREIN.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 8/20/09. 8/21/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED..(rf, ) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $57,600. 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED AND WHEN ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED, THEN ALL PAYMENTS WILL BE PAID FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/28/09. 7/28/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND COSTS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/14/2009. 7/20/2009 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 07/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT D. AVERSA on behalf of MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(AVERSA, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Settlement Approval Hearing held on 7/14/09. (jl, ) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THIS CASE SHOULD BE REMOVED FROM CIVIL SUSPENSE AND RESTORED TO THE ACTIVE DOCKET. THE ABOVE ACTION SHALL BE MARKED CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/14/09. 7/15/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED. THE CLASS NOTICE SCHEME AND THE CONTENTS OF THE CLASS NOTICE SATISFIED THE REQUIREMENTS OF DUE PROCESS AND THE FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS APPROVED AS FAIR, ADEQUATE AND REASONABLE AS REQUIRED BY FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23 (e). THE REACTION OF THE CLASS MEMBERS TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT WEIGHS IN FAVOR OF APPRROVAL. THERE HAVE BEEN NO SIGNIFICANT OBJECTIONS TO THE SETTLEMENT. THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS INCORPORATED INTO THIS ORDER. THE COURT SHALL RETAIN CONTINUING JURISDICTION OVER THIS CASE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR PURPOSES OF DISPUTE RESOLUTION, INTERPRETATION, ENFORCEMENT OF, AND COMPLAINCE WITH THE AGREEMENT. PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE UNDER THE TERMS SET FORTH IN THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/14/09. 7/15/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/15/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICE FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,064 FUNDS WILL BE RELEASED IN THE FOLLOWING MANNER: 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE WILL BE PAID FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT AND 50 PERCENT OF THE INVOICE FROM THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT UNTIL ALL FUNDS FROM THE PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT ARE EXPENDED; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 7/13/09. 7/14/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Attorney Fees Litigation Expenses, and Costs filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM. Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 7/6/2009 (lisad, ). (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None
Certification of Notice by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 7/6/2009 (lisad, ). (Entered: 07/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Status Conference held on 6/25/09. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RELEASE FUNDS FROM THE COURT ESCROW ACCOUNT ESTABLISHED IN THIS MATTER TO PAY THE ATTACHED INVOICES FROM CAMPBELL THOMAS & COMPANY, 1504 SOUTH STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19146, IN THE AMOUNT OF $16,064.00; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 6/25/09. 6/25/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/25/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None
Declaration of Christine E. Thelen on Class Notice Publication by MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 06/22/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Status Conference held on 6/19/09. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SET FOR 7/14/2009 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL PROMPTLY ESTABLISH A SUB-ACCOUNT (THE "CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT") IN THE ESCROW ACCOUNT PREVIOUSLY ESTABLISHED ON 3/4/09 BY THE COURT FOR THIS MATTER. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA SHALL PAY TO THE CLERK OF THE COURT $400,000, WHICH THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL PLACE IN THE CITY PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT. THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA MAY PAY THE CLERK OF THE COURT THE $400,000 IN PERIODIC INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF THE COURT SHALL DISBURSE FUNDS FROM THE CITY THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT, AS DIRECTED BY THE COURT. THE COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA AND THE CITY OF PHILADELPHIA MAY SUBMIT OBJECTIONS TO THE COURT REGARDING ANY INVOICE. THE COURT WILL DETERMINE WHETHER THE OBJECTIONS HAVE MERIT AND WHAT PORTION OF THE INVOICE MUST BE PAID; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 4/23/09. 4/27/09 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/27/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Settlement Conference held on 4/21/09. (jl, ) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR APPROVAL OF THE CLASS NOTICE IS GRANTED. THE AGREEMENT RESULTED FROM SERIOUS, INFORMED AND NON-COLLUSIVE NEGOTIATIONS AMONG THE PARTIES. THE AGREEMENT TREATS ALL CLASS MEMBERS EQUALLY. A HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT IS HEREBY SCHEDULED FOR 7/14/09 AT 10:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 17B; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/23/09. 4/23/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
Praecipe to Substitute Attachment by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM. (Attachments: # 1 Amended Attachment 3 (Class Notice) to Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement and Approval of Class Notice)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Approval Preliminary Approval of the Proposed Class Action Settlement and for Approval of the Class Notice filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Att. 1 (Local Rule 7.1(b) Certification), # 2 Att 2 (Settlement, Pt. 1), # 3 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 2), # 4 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 3), # 5 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 4), # 6 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 5), # 7 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 6), # 8 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 7), # 9 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 8), # 10 Att. 2 (Settlement, Pt. 9), # 11 Att. 3 (Proposed Class Notice), # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 3/31/09 (jl, ) Modified on 4/2/2009 (jl, ). (Entered: 04/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 3/16/09 (jl, ) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS ACTION CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACE THIS MATTER IN THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE, PENDING THE OUTCOME OF SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS OR OTHER FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/12/09. 3/13/09 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 3/12/09 (jl, ) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL PROMPTLY ESTABLISH AN ESCROW ACCOUNT WITH TWO SUB-ACCOUNTS--ONE FOR PRIVATE THIRD PARTY FEES AND COSTS (THE "PRIVATE THIRD PARTY SUB-ACCOUNT"); AND ONE FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES, COSTS AND CLASS NOTICE. THE CLERK OF THE COURT WILL ISSUE FUNDS FROM THE ACCOUNT AS DIRECTED BY THE COURT; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 3/4/09. 3/5/09 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 2/20/09 (jl, ) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 1/23/09 (jl, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 12/12/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 11/7/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 10/21/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, PEDRO A. CORTES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Commw 1 and Commw 2)(UNGER, SUE) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 9/24/2008 (afm, ). (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Status Conference held on 9/22/08. (jl, ) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/22/2008 09:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss filed by PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, PEDRO A. CORTES.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(UNGER, SUE) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to 91 Amended Complaint, by MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN GREENBERG on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(GREENBERG, KEVIN) (Entered: 09/08/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. THELEN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK (THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by ABBE F. FLETMAN on behalf of CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK (FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION, RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 9/5/08. 9/5/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 09/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 92 MOTION for Clarification , Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Stay of Proceedings filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 9/4/2008 (nd). (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY re: EVELYN MULIVER served Summons and Complaint upon MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, PEDRO A. CORTES, ANTHONY CLARK by Personal Service. MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE served on 8/26/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; JOSEPH DUDA served on 8/26/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; CITY OF PHILADELPHIA served on 8/26/2008, answer due 9/15/2008; PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008; PEDRO A. CORTES served on 8/27/2008, answer due 9/16/2008; ANTHONY CLARK served on 8/26/2008, answer due 9/15/2008. (stb, ) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Clarification , Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Stay of Proceedings filed by MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, ANTHONY CLARK.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Clarification of the Court's August 14, 2008 Order, Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Stay of Proceedings, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 First Alternative Proposed Order, # 4 Alternative Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF STATE, PEDRO A. CORTES, ANTHONY CLARK, filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/14/08. (Attachments: # 1 appendix a, # 2 appendix b, # 3 appendix c) 8/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 88 Transcript - PDF, 8/13/08 Entered and Copies Emailed and Mailed.. (jl, ) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 7/31/08, before Judge PADOVA. Court Reporter/Transcriber JEN CABRERA. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/3/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2008. (jl, ) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Summary Judgment/Argument held on 7/31/08. Counsel address the Court on behalf of Plaintiff and Defendant. Hearing taken under advisement. Court Reporter: ESR. (mac, ) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Telephone Conference held on 7/29/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment : ORAL ARGUMENT SET FOR 7/31/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 07/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer filed by ANTHONY CLARK, THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 32 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : MOTION HEARING RESCHEDULED FOR 8/25/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Telephone Conference held on 7/21/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE HONORABLE ANTHONY CLARK WILL BE SUBSTITUTED IN PLACE OF DEFENDANT, FORMER COMMISSIONER EDGAR HOWARD AND THE CAPTION OF CASE SHALL BE CHANGED TO: KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, MICHAEL MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM AND CAROLYN DAVENPORT, ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND ALL OTHER INDIVIDUALS SIMILARLY SITUATED, PLAINTIFFS VS. THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION; MARGARET TARTAGLIONE, JOSEPH DUDA AND ANTHONY CLARK, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, IN THEIR OFFICIAL CAPACITIES, DEFENDANTS; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/18/08. 7/22/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Amend Answer by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, ANTHONY HOLIDAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 76 MOTION in Limine filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, ANTHONY HOLIDAY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 73 MOTION in Limine (Exhibits A through V filed separately with Clerk's Office) and Motion for Leave to Amend Answer filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit B to Memorandum - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, # 5 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer, # 6 Proposed Order, # 7 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE EVIDENCE USED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/11/08.7/11/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion in Limine, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, # 5 Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 72 MOTION to Strike Evidence Used in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 07/07/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION IN LIMINE (jl, ) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None
MOTION in Limine (Exhibits A through V filed separately with Clerk's Office) filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Strike Evidence Used in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Substitute Party filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Support re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Supplemental Materials Facts, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit A-2, # 4 Exhibit A-3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2008: # 21 Exhibit I, # 22 Exhibit J) (nd, ). (Entered: 06/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS GRANTED. THE DEFENDANTS MUST FILE THEIR REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT NO LATER THAN 6/18/08; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/12/08. 6/13/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 63 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 06/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 32 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : MOTION HEARING RESCHEDULED FOR 8/4/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 18B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Telephone Conference held on 6/9/08 (jl, ) (Entered: 06/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBITS by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY. IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (jl, ) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Exhibits Will Be Filed By Hand Delivery) filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Responses to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Plaintiffs' Statement of Supplemental Material Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Opposition, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON OR BEFORE 5/30/08; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/21/08. 4/21/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Certificate of SErvice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum of Law, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Proposed Order, # 16 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/22/08 TO FILE THEIR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 4/2/08. 4/2/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. THIS CASE SHALL PROCEED ON BEHALF OF THE FOLLOWING CLASS: ALL ELIGIBLE PHILADELPHIA COUNTY VOTERS WITH MOBILITY DISABILITIES WHO EITHER BECAME ELIGIBLE TO VOTE OR DEVELOP A MOBILITY DISABILITY AFTER 10/22/01; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/13/08. 3/17/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Reply Memorandum, Attachment, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification, # 3 Revised Proposed Class Certification Order, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Class Certification)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None
Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition 8 MOTION to Certify Class filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G (part 1), # 8 Exhibit G (part 2), # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Certificate of Service, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) Modified on 3/6/2008 (fh, ). (Entered: 02/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 32 MOTION for Permanent Injunction : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 6/16/2008 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 17B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND TRIAL DATE IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY BRIEF IS GRANTED. THE TIME FOR FILING DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION IS EXTENDED UNTIL 4/15/08. THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION IS HEREBY CONTINUED UNTIL 6/16/08 AT 9:30 A.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/27/08. 2/28/08 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) Modified on 2/28/2008 (jl, ). (Entered: 02/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None
DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND TRIAL DATE, DECLARATION. (jl, ) (Entered: 02/27/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN GREENBERG on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(jl, ) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Trial Date filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Trial Date; Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lee, Jr.; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Trial Date, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Robert Lee, Jr., # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR CERTIFICATION OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL AND STAY OF PROCEEDINGS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/15/08. 2/19/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
Memorandum in Opposition re 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Trial Date filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Trial Date, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 2/19/2008 (nd). (Entered: 02/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 2/21/08 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 2/14/08. 2/14/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. THELEN on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) **(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY., ATTY. WILL SUBMIT ORIGINAL TO CLERK'S OFFICE FOR FILING)** Modified on 2/15/2008 (fh) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE E. THELEN on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS with Certificate of Service (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by TARA PARVEY on behalf of THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(THELEN, CHRISTINE) Modified on 2/14/2008 (nd). (Entered: 02/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Reconsideration or in the Alternative for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Stay of Proceedings filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal and Stay of Proceedings, # 2 Proposed orders, # 3 Certificate of service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) Modified on 2/15/2008 (fh) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/12/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Extend Trial Date filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline and Trial Date, # 2 Declaration of Robert Lee, Jr., # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 02/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: None
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of a Plaintiff filed by RENEE CROSBY, Certificate of Service. (GOLD, STEPHEN) Modified on 1/31/2008 (nd). (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/29/08. 1/30/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/29/08. 1/29/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION NO LATER THAN 2/29/08. THE TIME FOR FILING DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION IS EXTENDED UNTIL 3/24/08; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/29/08. 1/29/08 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA: Scheduling Conference held on 1/29/08. (jl, ) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/29/2008 11:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
EXHIBITS by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION. (jl, ) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Memorandum, Exhibits (via hard copy filed separately), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE: Telephone Conference held on 12/18/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Telephone Conference held on 11/27/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Status Conference held on 10/31/07. (jl, ) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Status Conference held on 10/16/2007. (ap, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 10/15/2007 (ap, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 10/4/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 9/26/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Settlement Conference held on 9/18/07. (jl, ) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 9/12/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 9/7/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Status Conference held on 8/1/07. (jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2007 (jl, ). (Entered: 08/01/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A STATUS/SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 8/1/07 AT 10:30 A.M. IN CHAMBERS; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/30/07. 7/30/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 07/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Settlement Conference held on 6/28/07. (jl, ) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Telephone Conference held on 6/22/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 06/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge TIMOTHY R. RICE : Settlement Conference held on 6/14/07. (jl, ) Modified on 6/15/2007 (jl, ). (Entered: 06/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
ORDERED THAT THIS MATTER IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY RICE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD AS SOON AS POSSIBLE; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 6/1/07. 6/4/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED, E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Telephone Conference held on 5/30/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing:STATUS TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 5/30/2007 AT 09:15 AM BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA.(gk, ) (Entered: 05/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Certify Class filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS with Certificate of Service. (PARVEY, TARA) Modified on 5/18/2007 (le, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum, Order and Certificate of Service (REPLY ATTACHED). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(PARVEY, TARA) Modified on 5/18/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 10 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 5/17/2007 (fh) (Entered: 05/16/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None
MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' 8 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS, Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Order.(PARVEY, TARA) Modified on 5/15/2007 (fh) (Entered: 05/14/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE of Hearing:TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE STATUS SET FOR 5/22/2007 11:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. PLAINTIFF WILL INITIATE CALL.(gk, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Certify Class filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None
Memorandum of Law in Opposition re 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits in Support of Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MEEK, ROBERT) Modified on 4/26/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/25/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS.Memorandum, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Certificate of Service)(PARVEY, TARA) Modified on 4/13/2007 (afm, ). (Entered: 04/12/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/12/07 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/28/07. 3/28/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2007 (ac, ). (Entered: 03/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 4/6/07 TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; ETC.. SIGNED BY JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 3/26/07. 3/26/07 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND FAXED.(jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2007 (jl, ). (Entered: 03/26/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge JOHN R. PADOVA : Telephone Conference held on 3/20/07 (jl, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN, ANTHONY HOLIDAY re: LATRICE BROOKS served Summons and Complaint upon THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS by PERSONAL SERVICE. THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION served on 2/28/2007, answer due 3/20/2007; MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE served on 2/28/2007, answer due 3/20/2007; EDGAR HOWARD served on 2/28/2007, answer due 3/20/2007; JOSEPH DUDA served on 2/28/2007, answer due 3/20/2007; PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS served on 2/28/2007, answer due 3/20/2007. (jl, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2007 (as, ). (Entered: 03/02/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against THE PHILADELPHIA BOARD OF ELECTION, MARGARET M. TARTAGLIONE, EDGAR HOWARD, JOSEPH DUDA, PHILADELPHIA CITY COMMISSIONERS ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 936891.), filed by MICHAEL J. MCSHEA, TARIQ MANGUM, RENEE CROSBY, CAROLYN DAVENPORT, KATHLEEN KERRIGAN.(ss, ) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 90 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?