Unknown
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-11932
District Judge Douglas P. Woodlock, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 22, 2016 at 11:42 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michienzie & Sawin, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. DeCosta +1 617 227 5660 +1 617 227 5882 cd@masatlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Michienzie +1 617 227 5660 +1 617 227 5882 pm@masatlaw.com
v.
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bartlett Hackett Feinberg PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Gentilli +1 617 422 0200 +1 617 422 2120 reg@bostonbusinesslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Looney +1 617 422 0200 +1 617 896 6274 tml@bostonbusinesslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren A. Solar +1 617 422 0200 +1 617 896 6262 las@bostonbusinesslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Korde & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2008 Kathryn A. Goodfriend +1 978 256 1500 +1 978 256 7615 kgoodfriend@kordeassoc.com
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
formerly known asUnited States Karen E. Wozniak +1 202 307 1927 +1 202 514 5238 karen.e.wozniak@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen E. Wozniak +1 202 307 1927 +1 202 514 5238 karen.e.wozniak@usdoj.gov
No Logo New Century Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2000-NCB, Defendant
No Logo Richard Federico, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Wayside Trans. Corp., Defendant
No Logo Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Cross-Claimant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Looney, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. Order for Release of Funds(York, Steve) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/3/2009, Entered: None
      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. re 49 Joint MOTION for Release of Funds. (Looney, Thomas) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Release of Funds by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Looney, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None
          MOTION for Extension of Time to August 15, 2009 to extend the nisi dismissal period by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc..(Looney, Thomas) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. 30 DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: None
              NOTICE re Statement of Position With Respect to the Trial on the Merits and Request for Additional Time for Settlement Negotiations by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. (DeCosta, Christopher) Modified text on 3/20/2009 (Lovett, Jarrett). (Entered: 03/19/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to Motion re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment and LR. 561.1 Statement of Material Facts Statement of Facts filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. (DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                  Opposition re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. (DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Strike 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment Portions of the Affidavit of Lakeitra Webb by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                      Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 17, 2008 to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. re 37 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1, 36 Opposition to Motion, 38 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. and in Support of Cross-Motion filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Affidavit)(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                          Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                            Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to plaintiff Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.'s re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Solar, Lauren) Modified event & text on 11/21/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                              STIPULATION of Dismissal of the United States by Internal Revenue Service. (Furman, Austin) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                STATUS REPORT by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(as servicer for JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee and Custodian). (DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: None
                                  Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 21, 2008 to File Response/Reply as to 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc..(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 10/21/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                    Statement of Facts L.R. 56.1 by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(as servicer for JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee and Custodian).(DeCosta, Christopher) Modified text on 10/14/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(as servicer for JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee and Custodian). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Christopher J. DeCosta, # 2 Affidavit John Cottrell)(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(as servicer for JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee and Custodian). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 17 (continued), # 19 Exhibit 18)(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/28/2008, Entered: None
                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to October 10, 2008 to File Motions for Summary Judgment by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(as servicer for JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee and Custodian).(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 09/28/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: None
                                          ANSWER to 26 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 08/22/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. re 26 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT, COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                FILING ERROR - FILED PREMATURELY & INCORRECT EVENT(S) USED - Assented to RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer & Counterclaim Answer and Cross-Claim filed by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. (DeCosta, Christopher) Modified text on 8/12/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 08/11/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer & Counterclaim by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Answer & Counterclaim)(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 08/04/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All Amendments to the Pleadings due by 8/4/2008. Responses to any Amended Pleadings due by 8/11/2008. All Fact Discovery to be completed by 9/2/2008. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 9/30/2008. Joint Status Report due by 10/30/2008. Further Status/Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 11/7/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock.(Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 07/24/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                      Joint MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/30/2008. All Depositions shall be completed by 6/30/2008. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 7/11/2008. Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2008. Further Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock(Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 05/29/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to June 30, 2008 to Complete Discovery by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc..(Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 02/20/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/30/2008. Motions for Summary Judgment due by 7/11/2008. Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2008. Further Status/Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. (Solar, Lauren) (Entered: 02/15/2008)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference reset for 2/15/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.. (DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3) by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc..(Looney, Thomas) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Assented MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference for January 29, 2008. (DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Countrywide Home Loans Inc. as assignee of Defendant U.S. Bank, N. by U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee.(Goodfriend, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren A. Solar, Thomas M. Looney and Richard E. Gentilli on behalf of Countrywide Home Loans, Inc formerly known as U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Solar, Lauren) Modified text on 1/25/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                ANSWER to 7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2008 03:00 PM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 12/28/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM against Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc. by U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Goodfriend, Kathryn) Modified text on 1/25/2008 (Seelye, Terri). (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by United States re 5 Response to Motion, Notice of Disclaimer of Interest and Withdrawral of the United States' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Deposit Funds into Court and for Award of Attorney's Fees (Wozniak, Karen) (Entered: 11/09/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court and For Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by United States. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Federal Tax Lien# 2 Notice of Federal Tax Lien# 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Debt)(Wozniak, Karen) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to December 5, 2007 to File Answer by U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee.(Goodfriend, Kathryn) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION to Deposit Funds into Court and For Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs by Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc..(DeCosta, Christopher) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to November 12, 2007 to File Answer by United States.(Wozniak, Karen) (Entered: 10/15/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States from Middlesex County Superior Court, case number 07-2842-G. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Complaint# 2 Service of Summons# 3 State Scheduling Order# 4 Civil Cover Sheet# 5 Category Sheet)(Wozniak, Karen) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?