Wollrab v. Siebel Systems, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:04-cv-00983
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 9, 2016 at 2:33 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary Gelman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arthur Binkow +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 info@glancylaw.com
No Logo Ilene Armour, Plaintiff
No Logo Louis V. Imundo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Braun Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Braun +1 310 442 7755 +1 310 442 7756 service@braunlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Lawrence Godino +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mgodino@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Philip G. Fisher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Norton +1 212 619 5400 +1 212 619 3090 jnorton@nfllp.com
No Logo Pilar M. Fisher, Plaintiff
No Logo Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Bacine +1 215 963 0600 +1 215 963 0838 dbacine@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonard Barrack +1 215 963 0600 +1 215 963 0838 lbarrack@barrack.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen R. Basser +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sbasser@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Robinson +1 215 963 0600 +1 215 963 0838 drobinson@barrack.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel M. Ward +1 619 230 0800 +1 619 230 1874 sward@barrack.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saudi Arabian Oil Company

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Haeussler +0119 663 874 7073 john.haeussler@aramco.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marisa C. Livesay +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 livesay@whafh.com
No Logo Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, Plaintiff
No Logo Sarah L. Mateski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
No Logo Stanley Sved, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bottini & Bottini, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis A. Bottini, Jr. +1 858 914 2001 +1 858 914 2002 fbottini@bottinilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Francis M Gregorek +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 gregorek@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Betsy Carol Manifold +1 619 239 4599 manifold@whafh.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachele R. Rickert +1 619 239 4599 +1 619 234 4599 rickert@whafh.com
No Logo William Wollrab, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Marc Goldberg +1 310 201 9150 +1 310 201 9160 mmgoldberg@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda M. Fong +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 lfong@kaplanfox.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurence David King +1 415 772 4700 +1 415 772 4707 lking@kaplanfox.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Bernard M Gross PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah R. Gross +1 215 561 3600 +1 215 561 3000 debbie@bernardmgross.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerach Coughlin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Russell J. Gunyan +1 631 367 7100

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard M. Maniskas +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 ecf_filings@sbclasslaw.com
v.
No Logo David Schmaier, Defendant
No Logo Kenneth A. Goldman, Defendant
No Logo Siebel Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin L. Bansal +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 ebansal@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Penelope A Graboys Blair +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 pgraboysblair@orrick.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Torpey +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 mtorpey@orrick.com
No Logo Thomas M. Seibel, Defendant
No Logo Allan G. Carlson, Movant
No Logo City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, Movant
No Logo Dominick Cerrone, Movant
No Logo ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Speirs +1 212 223 3900 +1 212 371 5969 rspeirs@zsz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Zwerling, Schachter & Zwerling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dan Drachler +1 206 223 2053 +1 206 343 9636 ddrachler@zsz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaye J Fuchs +1 516 509 8755 +1 516 371 5725 sfuchs@zsz.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Schachter +1 212 223 3900 +1 212 371 5969 rschachter@zsz.com
No Logo The Wollrab Group, Movant
No Logo Tillis Group, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrice Lyn Bishop +1 310 209 2468 +1 310 209 2087 pbishop@ssbla.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Jay Yourman +1 310 208 2800 +1 310 209 2348 service@wyca.com
No Logo Pamela Plotkin, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Arroyo LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian James Robbins +1 619 525 3990 +1 619 525 3991 brobbins@robbinsumeda.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (206) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: None
CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 204 , 205 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2008) (Entered: 01/28/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
    USCA JUDGMENT as to 194 Notice of Appeal filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. The judgment of the District Court is affirmed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2008) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None
      ORDER of USCA as to 194 Notice of Appeal filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. The decision of the District Court is affirmed. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2008) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, for proceedings held on 11/4/05 (C/R: Belle Ball), 1/28/05 (C/R: Leo Mankiewicz) before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2006) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER re 199 Stipulation filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/02/06. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2006) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None
            CLERK'S NOTICE re: Failure to E-File Document No. 200. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2006) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: None
              AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago re 194 Notice of Appeal (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2006) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Staying Taxation of Costs Pending the Disposition of Lead Plaintiff's Appeal by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 2/1/2006) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 1/26/2006) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                    Declaration of Samuel M. Ward In Support of Lead Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 1/26/2006) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                      Declaration of Stephen R. Basser In Support of Lead Plaintiff's Objection to Defendants' Bill of Costs filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 1/26/2006) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                        OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Bill of Costs by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 1/26/2006) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEAL AND NINTH CIRCUIT RULE 3-2 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 3380673. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2006) (Entered: 01/24/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: None
                            BILL OF COSTS by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 1/11/2006) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/28/2005. (crbsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2005) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2006 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: None
                                JUDGMENT entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs. (crbsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2005) Modified on 12/29/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/4/2005 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Belle Ball.. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2005) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None
                                    Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 11/7/2005) re 105 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Siebel Systems, Inc.,, Thomas M. Seibel,, Kenneth A. Goldman,, David Schmaier,, 177 MOTION to Strike (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and (2) Declaration of Erin L. Bansal in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago GRANTED. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2005) Modified on 11/8/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago Notice of Recent Authority in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Def's Motion to Dismiss (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/2/2005) (Entered: 11/02/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing Motions Hearing set for 11/4/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2005) (Entered: 09/12/2005)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
                                          Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 9/2/2005) (Entered: 09/02/2005)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: None
                                            STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d In Support of Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 8/24/2005) (Entered: 08/24/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                Memorandum in Opposition DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Reply to Opposition DEFENDANTS' REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 8/8/2005) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                      OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                        Proposed Order Granting Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                          Declaration of John L. Haeussler in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Motion to Strike (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and (2) Declaration of Erin L. Bansal in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits Thereto; or, in the Alternative, to permit Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f) filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Strike (1) Portions of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and (2) Declaration of Erin L. Bansal in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Exhibits Thereto; or, in the Alternative, to Permit Discovery Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(f) filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2005 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2005) (Entered: 06/23/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                              EXHIBITS re 174 Declaration in Support, EXHIBITS E THROUGH H DECLARATION OF ERIN L. BANSAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 174 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                EXHIBITS re 174 Declaration in Support, EXHIBIT A THROUGH D TO DECLARATION OF ERIN L. BANSAL IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 174 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  Declaration of ERIN L. BANSAL in Support of 162 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 162 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT P to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                      EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT O to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                        EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT N to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBITS M to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBITS J & K to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT I to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT H to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  EXHIBITS re 164 Request for Judicial Notice,, EXHIBIT H to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 164 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    EXHIBITS G to REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 162 filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A# 2 Exhibit Ex.B# 3 Exhibit Ex.C# 4 Exhibit Ex.D# 5 Exhibit Ex.E# 6 Exhibit Ex.F1# 7 Exhibit Ex.F2)(Related document(s) 162 ) (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT re 162 by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2005 10:00 AM. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) Modified on 4/28/2005 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc. DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/27/2005) (Entered: 04/27/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/12/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2005) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EXPANDING PAGE LIMITS FOR RESPONSE TO LEAD PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 4/11/2005) (Entered: 04/11/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER expanding page limits. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/25/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2005) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Expanding Page Limits by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 3/23/2005) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER re 155 Stipulation filed by Siebel Systems, Inc.,, Thomas M. Seibel,, Kenneth A. Goldman,, David Schmaier,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/09/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2005) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO LEAD PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 3/7/2005) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT Lead Plaintiff's [Corrected] First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 153 against all defendants. Filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: # 1)(Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 3/1/2005) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 154 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT Lead Plaintiff's First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint against all defendants. Filed byPlumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund. (Attachments: # 1)(Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 3/1/2005) Modified on 3/1/2005 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/28/05 before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz.. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2005) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2005 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 1/28/2005) re 105 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Siebel Systems, Inc.,, Thomas M. Seibel,, Kenneth A. Goldman,, David Schmaier,. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 105 Motion to Dismiss (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2005) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Oppostion Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Objection to Defendants' Contentions of Alleged Facts Not Alleged in Lead Plaintiff's CAC filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 1/12/2005) (Entered: 01/12/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER removing motion to stay discovery from court calendar. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/06/05. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2005) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REMOVING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION FROM COURT CALENDAR by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Graboys, Penelope) (Filed on 1/5/2005) (Entered: 01/05/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF SERVICE by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/23/2004) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/23/2004) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Reply to Opposition REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/23/2004) (Entered: 12/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/22/2004) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNTER-MOTION TO STRIKE filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/22/2004) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Reply to Opposition REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/22/2004) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT Proof of Service by Pamela Plotkin. (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery in Parallel State Court Derivative Action by Pamela Plotkin. (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Marc M. Umeda in Support of Specially Appearing State Court Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery in Parallel State Court Derivative Action filed byPamela Plotkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition Specially Appearing State Court Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay Discovery in Parallel State Court Derivative Action filed byPamela Plotkin. (Umeda, Marc) (Filed on 12/17/2004) (Entered: 12/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF SERVICE by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT F filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT E filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT D filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT C filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT B filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT A (PART 2) filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Request for Judicial Notice EXHIBIT A (PART 1) filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION filed byThomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVATIVE ACTION filed by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) Modified on 12/3/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY IN PARALLEL STATE COURT DERIVTIVE ACTION filed by Thomas M. Seibel, Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/7/2005 10:00 AM. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 12/1/2004) (Entered: 12/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of John L. Haeussler in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Objection to Defendants' Raising Contentions of Alleged Facts Outside the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/22/2004) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Objection to Defendants' Raising Contentions of Alleged Facts Outside the Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/22/2004) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Marisa C. Livesay in Support of Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/22/2004) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed byPolicemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/22/2004) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER expanding page limits for briefs. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/12/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2004) (Entered: 11/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Further Expanding Page Limits for Briefs Respecting Defendants Motion to Dismiss Lead Plaintiffs CAC by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 11/12/2004) (Entered: 11/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  EXHIBITS L & M to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    EXHIBITS K to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      EXHIBITS J to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        EXHIBITS H & I to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBITS G (part 2) to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBITS G (part 1) to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBITS E & F to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBITS C & D to Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with Exhibits A-B) filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF SERVICE by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of KATHERINE K. IKEDA IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2005 10:00 AM. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) Modified on 10/14/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/28/2005 10:00 AM. (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 10/12/2004) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER expanding page limits. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/08/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2004) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER EXPANDING PAGE LIMITS FOR BRIEFS RESPECTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS LEAD PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Graboys, Penelope) (Filed on 10/6/2004) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE C-04-3503 to lead case C-04-0983.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/31/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2004) (Entered: 09/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT LEAD PLAINTIFF'S CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against all defendants. Filed by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 8/27/2004) (Entered: 08/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER consolidating related actions for violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Regarding a revised briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/23/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2004) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS FOR VIOLATIONS OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS AND RE: A REVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 8/20/2004) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding response to consolidated complaint. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/30/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2004) (Entered: 08/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING RESPONSE TO CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Blair, Penelope) (Filed on 7/30/2004) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Penelope Graboys Blair NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANTS (Blair, Penelope) (Filed on 7/30/2004) (Entered: 07/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc. SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (Bansal, Erin) (Filed on 7/22/2004) (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Keith H. Rutman by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2004) (Entered: 06/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Order re 37 , 38 , 39 Appointing the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel by Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/23/2004) (Entered: 06/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2004 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 6/18/2004) re 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, 51 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, 56 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiff Dominick Cerrone's Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate All Related Actions for All Purposes; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Dominick Cerrone, 57 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, 37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM, 8 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Tillis Group, 25 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Dominick Cerrone as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Dominick Cerrone, 15 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Allan G. Carlson, 28 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion of The Wollrab Group for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by The Wollrab Group, 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Court Reporter James Yeomans.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2004) (Entered: 06/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT Certification of Attorney Susan G. Kupfer Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by William Wollrab. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2004) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Dominick Cerrone of Withdrawal of Motion of Dominick Cerrone to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and for Approval of Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel and Liaison Counsel (King, Laurence) (Filed on 6/16/2004) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT CERTIFICATION OF DAN DRACHLER PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3-7(d) by William Wollrab. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/16/2004) (Entered: 06/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE. Case 04-1286 reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Judge Samuel Conti no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on June 8, 2004. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2004) (Entered: 06/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting D. Drachler's 85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2004) (Entered: 06/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Dan Drachler) filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2004) FEE PAID (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to Opposition (s) Filed in Response to Their Motion for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Tillis Group. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Samuel M. Ward in Support of the Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of The Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Their Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Further Support of the Motion For Appointment as Lead Plaintiff by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of the Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund and The Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Their Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel Richard A. Speirs Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael M. Goldberg on behalf of City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel Shaye J. Fuchs Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael M. Goldberg on behalf of City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of Counsel Robert S. Schachter Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael M. Goldberg on behalf of City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2004) (Entered: 06/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel Samuel M. Ward by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago re 74 Certificate of Counsel, 75 Certificate of Counsel, 73 Certificate of Counsel (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2004) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel David E. Robinson by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel Leonard Barrack by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel Daniel E. Bacine by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 Memorandum in Further Support of Motion to Appoint Dominick Cerrone as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel filed by Dominick Cerrone. (Related document(s) 25 ) (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/28/2004) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 70 Memorandum in Opposition In Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2004) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel In Response to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2004) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition to Motions for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Tillis Group. (Bishop, Patrice) (Filed on 5/28/2004) (Entered: 05/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition To The Separate Motions Filed By All Others Seeking To Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and Approval Of Their Selection of Lead Counsel filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 5/27/2004) (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Counsel Marisa C. Livesay pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d), by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, and [proposed] lead counsel for plaintiffs and the class (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of Counsel John L. Haeussler pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d), by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago, and [proposed] lead counsel for plaintiffs and the class (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting L. Barrack's 58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2004) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting D. E. Bacine's 57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2004) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting Robinson's 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2004) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE C04-1205 to leal case C-04-983 CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2004) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RELATING CASEC-04-1204 to lead case C-04-983 CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/21/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2004) (Entered: 05/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by William Wollrab re 53 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, 54 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice, 55 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice OF GRANTING APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEYS SHAYE E. FUCHS, ROBERT S. SCHACHTER AND RICHARD A. SPEIRS (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2004) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2004) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Leonard Barrack) filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Daniel E. Bacine) filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (David E. Robinson) filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting S. J. Fuchs's 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2004) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting R. A. Speirs's 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2004) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting R. S. Schachter's 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2004) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Related Case, 04-1204 Gelman v. Siebel Systems, Inc. et al. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Shaye J. Fuchs) filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2004) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Richard A. Speirs) filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2004) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Robert S. Schachter) filed by City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System, ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. FEE PAID (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2004) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Related Case to 04-1205 Armour v. Siebel Systems, Inc. et al. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE of Counsel Stephen R. Basser Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Stephen R. Basser on behalf of Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 5/12/2004) (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Received Order re 37 MOTION to Appoint Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' choice of Counsel. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Received Order re 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RE-NOTICE by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago re 37 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, 36 MOTION to Consolidate Cases that 6/18/04 hearing is at 10:00 a.m. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/14/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel AMENDED NOTICE by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/12/2004) (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Marisa C. Livesay Supplemental to Motion to appoint Lead Ptf filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Basser, Stephen) (Filed on 5/11/2004) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE of Counsel Jennifer R. Liakos Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Jennifer R. Williams on behalf of Tillis Group (Williams, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/11/2004) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Kevin J. Yourman Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Jennifer R. Williams on behalf of Tillis Group (Williams, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/11/2004) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Marisa C. Livesay in Support of 37 filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. (Related document(s) 37 ) (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago as Lead Plaintiffs and to Approve Lead Plaintiffs' choice of Counsel . Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 08:30 AM. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plumbers and Pipefitters National Pension Fund, and the Policemen's Annuity and Benefit Fund of Chicago. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 08:30 AM. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order Appointing Dominick Cerrone as Lead Plaintiff and Appointing Lead Counsel by Dominick Cerrone. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Wollrab Group CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 32 (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William Wollrab. Kenneth A. Goldman waiver sent on 3/18/2004, answer due 5/17/2004; David Schmaier waiver sent on 3/18/2004, answer due 5/17/2004; Thomas M. Seibel waiver sent on 3/18/2004, answer due 5/17/2004; Siebel Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 3/18/2004, answer due 5/17/2004. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              *** Filed in Error - please see 34 for corrected filing *** CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Wollrab Group (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) Modified on 5/11/2004 (dlp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Order Granting Motion of The Wollrab Group for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel by The Wollrab Group. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Linda M. Fong in Support of the Motion of The Wollrab Group for Consolidation, for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by The Wollrab Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support of the Motion of The Wollrab Group for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by The Wollrab Group. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion of The Wollrab Group for Consolidation, Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and for Approval of Selection of Lead and Liaison Counsel filed by The Wollrab Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 10:00 AM. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dominick Cerrone (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Linda M. Fong In Support of Motion to Appoint Dominick Cerrone as Lead Plaintiff Pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 and to Approve Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by Dominick Cerrone. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel Notice of Motion and Motion to Appoint Dominick Cerrone as Lead Plaintiff and for Appointment of Lead Counsel; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Dominick Cerrone. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 10:00 AM. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Dominick Cerrone's Motion to Consolidate All Related Actions for All Purposes by Dominick Cerrone. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases Plaintiff Dominick Cerrone's Notice of Motion and Motion to Consolidate All Related Actions for All Purposes; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Dominick Cerrone. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 10:00 AM. (Fong, Linda) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM re 17 Declaration in Support,, 19 Proposed Order,, 14 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, 16 Memorandum in Support, (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Order re 15 by Allan G. Carlson. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration in Support of 15 filed by Allan G. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 17 , 14 , 16 Motion of Movants City of Roseville Employees Retirement System and City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System For Consolidation and For Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs And Co-Lead Counsel by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 15 filed by Allan G. Carlson. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration of Robert S. Schachter in Support of 15 , 16 Motion of Movants City of Roseville Employees Retirement System and City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System For Consolidation and For Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs And Co-Lead Counsel filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Related document(s) 15 , 16 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 Motion of Movants City of Roseville Employees Retirement System and City of St. Clair Shores Police and Fire Retirement System For Consolidation and For Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs And Co-Lead Counsel filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. (Related document(s) 14 ) (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Allan G. Carlson. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 10:00 AM. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by ROSEVILLE EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 08:30 AM. (Goldberg, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Michael D. Braun on behalf of Tillis Group (Braun, Michael) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) by Marc L. Godino on behalf of Tillis Group (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Order re 8 by Tillis Group. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Marc L. Godino in Support of 8 filed by Tillis Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 8 ) (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 filed by Tillis Group. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Tillis Group. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2004 10:00 AM. (Godino, Marc) (Filed on 5/10/2004) (Entered: 05/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER RELATING CASE C-04-1390 to lead case C-04-983CRB. Signed by Judge Charle R. Breyer on 4/23/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2004 (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RELATING CASE case C-04-1482 to lead case C-04-983CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/23/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2004 (be, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Related Case (04-1482 CRB) (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2004) (Entered: 04/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Related Case (04-1390) (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2004) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RELATING CASE C-04-1152CRB to lead case C-04-983CRB. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/26/04. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2004) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEC CLASS ACTION SCHEDULING ORDER SEC Class Action Notice due by 3/30/2004. Case Management Conference set for 6/11/2004 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 standing orders# 2 special notice)(mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2004) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Kenneth A. Goldman, David Schmaier, Thomas M. Seibel, Siebel Systems, Inc. (Filing fee $ 150.). Filed by William Wollrab. (mmt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2004) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/19/2004 (mmt, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?