GMH Contracting and Management Corp et al v. City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-03550
District Judge Laura Taylor Swain, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 31, 2016 at 7:15 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gabriel Munoz, Plaintiff
No Logo GMH Contracting and Management Corp, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay Anthony Sanchez +1 646 657 5345 +1 646 390 3214 janthonysanchez@post.harvard.edu
No Logo Indira Fuentes, Plaintiff
v.
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill DeBlasio"
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karen Beth Selvin +1 212 442 0588 +1 212 791 9714 kselvin@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Jean-Guy Laroche, Defendant
No Logo Jonathan Mintz, Defendant
No Logo Julie Menin, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
New York City Department Of Consumer Affairs New York City Department Of Consumer Affairs, Defendant
No Logo Shirley Laroche, Defendant
No Logo Susan Kassapian, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen Beth Selvin on behalf of Michael Bloomberg(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Michael Bloomberg(individually), City of New York, Bill DeBlasio(individually), Bill DeBlasio(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Julie Menin(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Julie Menin(individually), Jonathan Mintz(individually), Jonathan Mintz(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), New York City Department of Consumer Affairs. (Selvin, Karen) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    INITIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/1/2014 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Laura Taylor Swain, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/4/2014) (cd) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Michael Bloomberg(individually), City of New York, Bill DeBlasio(individually), Bill DeBlasio(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Susan Kassapian(individually ), Susan Kassapian(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Jean-Guy Laroche, Shirley Laroche, Julie Menin(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), Julie Menin(individually), Jonathan Mintz(individually), Jonathan Mintz(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), New York City Department of Consumer Affairs(in their capacities as employees of the City of New York and/or the Department of Consumer Affairs), New York City Department of Consumer Affairs(individually). (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401095169)Document filed by GMH Contracting and Management Corp, Gabriel Munoz, Indira Fuentes.(jom) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2014: # 1 pt 2, # 2 pt 3, # 3 pt 4) (jom). (Entered: 05/20/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None
        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jom) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 362 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?