Gibson v. The City of New York et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01452
District Judge Margo K. Brodie, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 5, 2016 at 4:22 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rufus Gibson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rufus Gibson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rufus Gibson +1 516 574 2937
v.
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo NYC Police Officer Mobeen Yasin, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Bridge +1 212 356 2347 +1 212 356 3509 mbridge@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Court shall hold an initial pretrial conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on 7/8/2014 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse. No planning conference pursuant to Rule 26(f), Fed. R. Civ. P., shall be required at this time. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 6/4/2014. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2014, Entered: None
    ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Michael Bloomberg, The City of New York, Mobeen Yasin. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service) (Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rufus Gibson; copy of Judge Blooms order of 3/25/14 returned as attempted not known. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER endorsed on doc.# 2 : The application is granted. SO ORDERED Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 4/10/2014. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Defendants' answers due by 6/2/2014.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/11/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Michael Bloomberg. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service) (Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
          SUMMONS Returned Executed by pro se Rufus Gibson. Police Officer Mobeen Yasin served on 3/26/2014, answer due 4/16/2014. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by pro se Rufus Gibson. Mayor Michael Bloomberg served on 3/14/2014, answer due 4/4/2014. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
              Letter dated 4/1/2014 from pro se Rufus Gibson, informing the Court of Plaintiff's correct apartment number and enclosing the notarized Proof of Service re: service of Summons and Complaint upon the Defendants. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: The City of New York requests an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Plaintiff consents to this request. (Id.) The City's 7 request is granted. The City shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/2/2014. The City also informs the Court that the docket contains is a typo in plaintiff's address. Plaintiff resides in apartment 2L at 1035 Clarkson Ave., not apartment 22. The Clerk of Court is directed to update plaintiff's address accordingly and to re-send a copy of the Court's 3/11/2014 order 4 to plaintiff. The Court hereby vacates its 6 Order directing plaintiff to update his address. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 4/3/2014. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (The City of New York's answer due by 6/2/2014.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of service) (Bridge, Matthew) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: On 3/24/2014, the Court's 3/11/2013 Order was returned as 5 undeliverable. Plaintiff has apparently moved from his Clarkson Avenue address. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with his current address by 4/25/2014. If plaintiff fails to provide the Court with his current address 4/25/2014, the Court shall recommend that this case should be dismissed as abandoned. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 3/25/2014. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Rufus Gibson; copy of Judge Bloom's order of 3/11/14 return to sender attempted not known unable to forward. (Guzzi, Roseann) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: Plaintiff is to provide a copy of this Order and the enclosed rules to defendants along with the summons and complaint. Accordingly, if service is not made upon the defendants by 7/3/2014, or if plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected by that date, it will be recommended that the Court should dismiss this action without prejudice. Plaintiff is required to advise the Clerk of Court of any change of address. Plaintiff may choose to receive electronic notification of court issued filings in this civil case. If plaintiff is eligible and wishes to receive electronic notification of court issued documents, plaintiff should complete the attached Registration and Consent form and return the form(s) to the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 3/11/2014. C/mailed w/Attachments: # 1 Individual Practices of Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, # 2 Instruction for Pro Se Registration and Consent for Electronic Service of Orders and Notices Issued by the Court in Civil Cases, # 3 Pro Se Registration and Consent Form. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                          Summons Issued as to Michael Bloomberg, The City of New York, Mobeen Yasin. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg, The City of New York, Mobeen Yasin, filed by Rufus Gibson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 171 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?