Magnisalias v. Tesla Motors, Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-05438
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags
Last Updated November 19, 2020 at 3:04 PM ST (7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John Magnisalias, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kendall Law Group LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joe Kendall +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 jkendall@kendalllawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Jean McKey +1 214 744 3000 +1 214 744 3015 jmckey@kendalllawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren Jay Robbins +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 e_file_sd@csgrr.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Conrad Walton +1 619 231 1058 +1 619 231 7423 davew@rgrdlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Anthony Williams +1 415 288 4545 +1 415 288 4534 swilliams@rgrdlaw.com
v.
Ahuja, Deepak P. Ahuja, Deepak P., Defendant
Officially listed as "Deepak Ahuja"
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Fireeye, Inc.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc"

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles E. Elder +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 celder@irell.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Siegel +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 dsiegel@irell.com
No Logo Thuan Nguyen, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Punzalan Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Punzalan +1 650 362 4150 +1 650 362 4151 mark@chanpunzalan.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None Letter
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Magnisalias (Walton, David) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
        CLERKS NOTICE vacating Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2014 (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 14 Stipulation to extend time to respond and modify briefing. (If response to the consolidated complaint is a motion to dismiss, opposition to the motion to dismiss due no later than 45 days after and reply due no later than 30 days after opposition). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
            Certificate of Interested Entities by Deepak Ahuja, Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 1/28/2014) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
              STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Response to Complaint and Briefing Schedule filed by Deepak Ahuja, Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (Siegel, David) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Edward Elder (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Appearance by David Siegel (Siegel, David) (Filed on 1/27/2014) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                    Notice of Withdrawal of 10 Motion of Thuan Nguyen for Consolidation of the Actions, Appointment of Lead Plaintiff, and Approval of Lead Counsel (Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases and for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel filed by Thuan Nguyen. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/21/2014. Replies due by 1/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Mark Punzalan, # 3 Exhibit A to Punzalan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B to Punzalan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Punzalan Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Punzalan Declaration, # 7 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) of Mark Punzalan, # 8 Certificate/Proof of Service Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 3-7(d) of Nicholas Porritt)(Punzalan, Mark) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                        CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER and Standing Orders Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2014. Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER RELATING CASE(s): C-13-5438 WHO is hereby related to C-13-5216 CRB.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/2/2014. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by John Magnisalias. Service waived by Deepak Ahuja waiver sent on 12/3/2013, answer due 2/3/2014; Elon Musk waiver sent on 12/3/2013, answer due 2/3/2014; Tesla Motors, Inc waiver sent on 12/3/2013, answer due 2/3/2014. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 12/26/2013) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/11/2014. Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/25/13. (Attachments: # 1 WHO Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                Summons Issued as to Deepak Ahuja, Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                  Case assigned to Hon. William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                    Certificate of Interested Entities by John Magnisalias (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                      Proposed Summons. (Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/22/2013) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF THE FEDERAL SECURITIES LAWS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8183245.). Filed byJohn Magnisalias. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff Certification, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams, Shawn) (Filed on 11/22/2013) Modified on 11/25/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?