Alford et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-03049
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
Last Updated October 4, 2016 at 1:45 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Allen Brown, Plaintiff
No Logo Alyce Bryant-Walker, Plaintiff
No Logo Carol Varner, Plaintiff
No Logo Jacqueline Friar, Plaintiff
No Logo Janet Byrd, Plaintiff
No Logo Larry Holcomb, Plaintiff
No Logo Mary Halbert, Plaintiff
No Logo Neil Alford, Plaintiff

Represented by Audet & Partners, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William M. Audet +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 waudet@audetlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Caleb Ezrin +1 415 568 2555 +1 415 568 2556 jezrin@audetlaw.com
No Logo O'Neil Varner, Plaintiff
v.
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Defendant

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Baker +1 415 471 3100 +1 415 471 3400 michael.baker@aporter.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maurice Abraham Leiter +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 maurice.leiter@aporter.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sharon Douglass Mayo +1 213 243 4000 +1 213 243 4199 sharon_mayo@aporter.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space McKesson Corporation
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Timeline
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Order Transferring Case - - Out of District
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/25/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2014 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2014) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re 1 Notice of Removal,, -Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE OF REMOVAL -Defendant Bristol-Myers Squibb Company's Notice of Removal of Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441 and 1446 from S.F. Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-540333. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-8744547). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 7/3/2014) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 70 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?