Thomas Lee McAlpine- Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 14-03011
District Judge Harry C. Dees, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 1:46 PM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Indiana Insurance Co. a/s/o LaPorte Community Schools, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Brooks J. Grainger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brooks J. Grainger +1 574 272 1000 +1 574 272 4303 bankruptcy@krisorlaw.com
v.
No Logo Thomas Lee McAlpine, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward L. Janes

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward L. Janes +1 219 324 0556 +1 219 324 5476
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: None
BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)8 Scheduling Order). Notice Date 04/12/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
    Scheduling Order. Pre-Trial Order due by 7/9/2014. Discovery due by 6/9/2014. Mediation Report due by 5/12/2014 (crd) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
    Appearance of Counsel Filed by Defendant Thomas Lee McAlpine (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Janes, Edward) Modified on 4/8/2014 (crd). (Entered: 04/07/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
      Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Thomas Lee McAlpine (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Janes, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
        BNC Certificate of Mailing.(related document(s)3 Summons Issued). Notice Date 03/12/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
          Notice of Mailing Filed by Plaintiff Indiana Insurance Co. a/s/o LaPorte Community Schools (related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Indiana Insurance Co. a/s/o LaPorte Community Schools, 3 Summons Issued) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)(Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
            Summons Issued on Thomas Lee McAlpine Date Issued 3/10/2014, Answer Due 4/9/2014. (dlh) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
              Notice of Appearance of Krisor & Associates by Brooks J. Grainger Filed by Plaintiff Indiana Insurance Co. a/s/o LaPorte Community Schools (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
                Adversary case 14-03011. (65 (Dischargeability - other)) Complaint by Indiana Insurance Co. a/s/o LaPorte Community Schools, Thomas Lee McAlpine against Thomas Lee McAlpine. Fee Amount $293. (Grainger, Brooks) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 158 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?