Gill et al v. Department of Justice et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-03120
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 26, 2019 at 10:24 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Conklin, Plaintiff
No Logo James Prigoff, Plaintiff
No Logo Khaled Ibrahim, Plaintiff
No Logo Tariq Razak, Plaintiff
No Logo Wiley Gill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU Foundation of Southern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Bibring +1 213 977 9500 pbibring@aclu-sc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of San Diego & Imperial Counties

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mitra Ebadolahi +1 619 232 2121 +1 619 232 0036 mebadolahi@aclusandiego.org
Space John David Loy +1 619 232 2121 +1 619 232 0036 davidloy@aclusandiego.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Advancing Justice-Asian Law Caucus

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nasrina Bargzie +1 415 848 7711 +1 415 896 1702 nasrinab@advancingjustice-alc.org
Space Yaman Salahi +1 415 848 7711 +1 415 896 1702 yamans@advancingjustice-alc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hugh Handeyside +1 212 549 2616 +1 212 549 2654 hhandeyside@aclu.org
Space Hina Shamsi +1 212 284 7321 +1 212 549 2654 hshamsi@aclu.org

Toggle Switch Represented by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Of Northern California

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Lye +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 1478 llye@aclunc.org
Space Julia Harumi Mass, Esq. +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 8437 jmass@aclunc.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward A Andrews +1 310 907 1000 +1 310 907 2000
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan A Loeb +1 310 255 9064 +1 310 907 2064 jon.loeb@bingham.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Blank Rome LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Alan Loeb +1 424 239 3422 +1 424 239 3443 jloeb@blankrome.com
Space Jeffrey Rosenfeld +1 424 239 3417 +1 424 239 3807 jrosenfeld@blankrome.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael James Ableson +1 212 705 7000 michael.ableson@morganlewis.com
Space Jeffrey Scott Raskin , +1 415 442 1000 jraskin@morganlewis.com
Space Stephen Scotch-Marmo +1 212 705 7575 stephen.scotch-marmo@morganlewis.com
v.
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Defendant
Officially listed as "Attorney General Eric H. Holder, Jr."
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Justice"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space Kieran Gavin Gostin +1 202 353 4556 +1 202 616 8460 kieran.g.gostin@usdoj.gov
Holder, Jr., Eric H. Holder, Jr., Eric H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Eric H. Holder, Jr."
No Logo Kshemendra Paul, Defendant
No Logo Program Manager - Information Sharing Environment, Defendant
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 702
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None USCA Case Number
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: None USCA Appeal Fees
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/29/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Terminate Civil Case
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Aaron Conklin, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, James Prigoff, Tariq Razak Notice of Withdrawal of Nicole R. Sadler as Counsel for Plaintiffs (Wiese, Phillip) (Filed on 4/15/2016) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2016. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 1/28/2016 Continued to 2/18/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2016) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Transcript Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        CLERK'S NOTICE Advancing Motion Hearing on 73 MOTION Complete the Administrative Record to Thursday, 12/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to 73 MOTION Complete the Administrative Record Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion to Complete the Administrative Record; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing continued to 12/17/2015 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 11/19/2015 Continued to 1/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/28/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/3/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/1/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Statement
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/14/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE The Case Management Conference previously set for 7/9/2015 is continued to 8/20/2015 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice.(rslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2015) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Amended Document (Not Motion)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Document E-Filed Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: None Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Case Management Conference - Further
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/5/2015, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Notice of Need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference RESET TO 01:30 PM on January 8, 2015 in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2015. Case Management Conference previously set for 10/9/14 has been CONTINUED TO 1/8/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2014) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Gerald Freeborne on Behalf of the Federal Defendants (Freeborne, Paul) (Filed on 7/22/2014) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL ABLESON PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael Ableson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 25GMJS9U.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/16/2014 filed by Wiley Gill. (Ableson, Michael) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEPHEN SCOTCH-MARMO PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Scotch-Marmo ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8764691.) filed by Aaron Conklin, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, James Prigoff, Tariq Razak. (Scotch-Marmo, Stephen) (Filed on 7/14/2014) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HINA SHAMSI PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY HUGH HANDEYSIDE PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Hina Shamsi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8761004.) filed by Aaron Conklin, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, James Prigoff, Tariq Razak. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lye, Linda) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Hugh Handeyside ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8760932.) filed by Aaron Conklin, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, James Prigoff, Tariq Razak. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lye, Linda) (Filed on 7/11/2014) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Kshemendra Paul, Program Manager - Information Sharing Environment. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/2/2014. Case Management Conference set for 10/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (svS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Conklin, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, James Prigoff, Tariq Razak.. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Summons. (Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against Department of Justice, Eric H. Holder, Jr, Kshemendra Paul, Program Manager - Information Sharing Environment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8757477.). Filed byJames Prigoff, Wiley Gill, Khaled Ibrahim, Aaron Conklin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Loeb, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/10/2014) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 226 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?