USA v. BNP Paribas S.A.
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cr-00460
District Judge Lorna G. Schofield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 21, 2021 at 7:18 PM DT (3.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

BNP Paribas, SA BNP Paribas, SA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maura Eileen Miller +1 212 558 4130 +1 212 558 3357 millerme@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Karen Patton Seymour +1 212 558 3196 +1 212 291 9039 seymourk@sullcrom.com
Space William Henry Wagener +1 212 558 7945 +1 212 558 3588 wagenerw@sullcrom.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 64 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: 1/7/2016 LetterCourt Filing
      LETTER by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Andrew D. Goldstein dated January 7, 2016 re: U.S. v. BNP Paribas, S.A. Document filed by USA. (Goldstein, Andrew)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Appeal Transcript RequestCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A. for a Sentence proceeding held on may 1, 2015 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: [62] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Transcript due by 7/16/2015. (Sanchez-Calderon, William)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A. from [57] Amended Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401128558. (nd)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015 Designation of Record on Appeal
            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) Modified on 6/12/2015 (ka).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 6/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
              CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE / MONEY JUDGMENT as to (14-Cr-460-01) BNP Paribas S.A....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by its undersigned attorneys, and the defendant, by and through its counsel, Karen Patton Seymour, Esq., that: 1. As a result of the offense charged in Count One of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $8,833,600,000.00 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. 2. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, BNP PARIBAS, S.A., at sentencing, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith....[See this Order]... 7.The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, and to amend it as necessary, pursuant to Rule 32.2(e) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. 8.The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Sharon Cohen Levin, Chief of the Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, United States Attorney's Office, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. 9. The signature pages of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. A facsimile or electronic image of the original signature of any party executing this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment shall be deemed an original signature and shall constitute an original as against the party whose signature appears in the facsimile or electronic image. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/9/2014) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment to AUSA Sharon Cohen Levin, by inter-office mail on 6/2/2015. ***] (bw)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BNP Paribas S.A. re: Sentence held on 5/1/2015 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/22/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2015. (Grant, Patricia)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: 5/18/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to BNP Paribas S.A.. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/1/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/15/2015, Entered: 5/15/2015 Amended JudgmentCourt Filing
                    AMENDED JUDGMENT as to BNP Paribas S.A. (1), Count(s) 1, Probation for a term of 5 years. 1. The defendant shall enhance its compliance policies and procedures regarding the United States' sanctions laws and regulations in accordance with the settlement agreements it has entered into with the Federal Reserve and the NY State Department of Financial Services 2. The defendant shall consent to the imposition of a monitor. The defendant shall pay the special assessment fee and fine of $140,000,400.00 as a lump sum payment due immediately. See Consent Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment dated May 1, 2015. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/15/2015)(ft)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Notice of Filing Transcript
                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to BNP Paribas S.A.. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 5/1/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Grant, Patricia)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BNP Paribas S.A. re: Sentence held on 5/1/2015 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015. (Grant, Patricia)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 54 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/11/2015 Judgment*Court Filing
                          JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to BNP Paribas S.A. (1), Pleaded guilty to Count(s) 1, Probation for a term of 5 years. Special Assessment of $400 and Fine $140,000,000.00. Lump sum payment of $140,000,400.00 which is due immediately. The defendant shall enhance its compliance policies and procedures regarding the United States' sanctions laws and regulations in accordance with the settlement agreements it has entered into with the Federal Reserve and the NY State Department of Financial Services. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/1/15)(jw)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015 Order for Forfeiture of PropertyCourt Filing
                            CONSENT ORDER OF FORFEITURE/MONEY JUDGMENT as to BNP Paribas S.A. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United Statesof America, by its undersigned attorneys, and the defendant, by and through its counsel, Karen Patton Seymour, Esq., that As a result of the offense charged in Count One of the Information, to which the defendant pied guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $8,833,600,000.00 in United Statescurrency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/1/15)(jw)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 52 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER as to BNP Paribas S.A. it is hereby ORDERED that Petitioners motion for restitution is DENIED. Even assuming the various procedural requirements for mandating restitution had been met, see generally 18 U.S.C. § 3664, and BNPP's criminal conduct was of the type "for which restitution may be ordered," 18 U.S.C. § 3663A(a)(2), it cannot be shown by a preponderance of the evidence that Petitioner is a "victim" who was "directly and proximately harmed" by BNPP's criminal conduct. Petitioner's conclusory speculation that she could have collected her judgment against the Republic of Cuba if BNPP had blocked the funds it transferred to and from Cuba as required by the U.S. sanctions regime is insufficient to show that BNPP's offense "directly and proximately harmed" Petitioner. See, e.g., United States v. Reifler, 446 F.3d 65, 135 (2d Cir. 2006) ("the district court cannot properly order restitution under the [Mandatory Victims Restitution Act] unless the victim's harm resulted from the offense of conviction"). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at Dkt. No. 50. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/30/2015)(ft) Modified on 4/30/2015 (ft). (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                LREF
                                Blank 51 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                OPINION & ORDER as to BNP Paribas S.A. re: 46 THIRD PARTY LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez-Calderon dated 04/21/2015 re: 43 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re: Hearing Government's Motion to Dismiss filed by Marilyn Wiederspan, 35 MOTION to Dismiss Notices of Lien filed by USA, 33 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated February 27, 2015 re: Request for Conference filed by Marilyn Wiederspan. Petitioner has every right to enforce her valid judgment against the Republic of Cuba in a proceeding in which she has standing. For the foregoing reasons, this is not such a proceeding. Accordingly, the Governments motion to dismiss the Petition is GRANTED, and Petitioners application for a hearing is DENIED. The Petition is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motions at Dkt. Nos. 33 and 35. The Clerk is further directed to close the letter motion at Dkt. No. 46 as moot. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sol Schreiber on 4/30/15)(jw) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                  FIRST MOTION Approved order . Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated 04/28/2015 re: Order approved.Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sanchez-Calderon, William) Modified on 4/29/2015 (ka). (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A. 's Sentencing on May 1, 2015. (Ambuehl, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/27/2015)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Ambuehl, Jennifer) Modified on 4/27/2015 (ka). (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          THIRD PARTY LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez-Calderon dated 04/21/2015 re: 43 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion re: Hearing Government's Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            AMENDED ORDER as to BNP Paribas S.A. It is hereby, ORDERED that the Order dated April 16, 2015 is VACATED. ORDERED that the sentencing in this matter shall be held on May 1, 2015 at 10:50 a.m. (Sentencing set for 5/1/2015 at 10:50 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/20/2015)(ft) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER as to BNP Paribas S.A.( Sentencing set for 7/20/2015 at 04:30 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) It is hereby ORDERED that the sentencing in this matter, previously scheduled for May 1, 2015 at 10:50 a.m., shall be adjourned to July 20, 2015 at 4:30 p.m., due to a conflict in the Courts schedule. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/16/15)(jw) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A. re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Notices of Lien.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A. re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss Notices of Lien.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) Modified on 4/14/2015 (ka). (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Attorney William J. Sanchez, Counsel for Marilyn Wiederspan, Interested Party, dated March 26, 2015 re: Pursuant to our previously submitted letter motion of March 26, 2015, please be informed that the new due date for our Response, will actually be April 10, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 39. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/30/2015)(bw) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: as to USA v. BNP Paribas S.A., Defendants; Marilyn Wiederspan, individually and as representative of the Estate of her father, Jose Velazquez Fernandez, Co-Plaintiff, v. The Republic of Cuba, Co-Defendants, et al. The motion of William J. Sanchez-Calderon for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he/she is a member in good standing of the bar(s) of the state(s) of Florida; and that his/her contact information is as follows: William J. Sanchez, Esq., William J. Sanchez, P.A., 12600 SW 120 Street, Suite 102, Miami, Florida 33186, Telephone: 305.232.8889, Facsimile: 305.232.8819. Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Interested Party Marilyn Weiderspan in the above entitled action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/30/2015); The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket number 31. (bw) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William Sanchez dated March 26, 2015 re: 37 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated March 26, 2015 re: Enlargement of Time to Respond to Government's Motion to Dismiss the Notices of Lien of Marilyn Wiederspan . re: CORRECTED DUE DATE ON PREVIOUS MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME . Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 37 LETTER MOTION Extension of Response Deadline as to BNP Paribas S.A. (1). Application Granted. Interested Party Marilyn Wiederspan's response, if any, to the Government's Motion to Dismiss Notices of Lien (Dkt. No. 35) shall be filed by April 3, 2015. No reply shall be filed unless further ordered by the Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 37. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/26/2015) (ft) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated March 26, 2015 re: Enlargement of Time to Respond to Government's Motion to Dismiss the Notices of Lien of Marilyn Wiederspan . Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A. re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Notices of Lien., 33 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated February 27, 2015 re: Request for Conference .. (in Opposition to Sanchez Letter Motion) (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Notices of Lien. Document filed by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Attorney William J. Sanchez dated February 27, 2015 re: We respectfully submit this letter to request a conference with the court and counsel for USA, regarding Marilyn Wiederspan's interests in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: No later than March 25, 2015, the Government shall file a response to this letter. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/17/2015)(bw) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from William J. Sanchez dated February 27, 2015 re: Request for Conference . Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE of Amended Notice of Lien as to BNP Paribas S.A. (Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for William Jose Sanchez-Calderon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-10585964. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Marilyn Wiederspan as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 27 LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to BNP Paribas S.A. (1)...ENDORSEMENT...Application Granted. The sentencing in this matter is hereby adjourned to May 1, 2015 at 10:50 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/30/15) (jw) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Notice of Lien as to BNP Paribas S.A. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sanchez-Calderon, William) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Ephraim Weis Cohen appearing for USA. (Cohen, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen Patton Seymour dated January 26, 2015 re: Request for Adjournment of Sentencing . Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A.. (Seymour, Karen) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 25 LETTER MOTION filed by BNP Paribas S.A. (1), addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Attorney Karen Patton Seymour dated November 21, 2014 re: Request for Adjournment of Sentencing. We therefore respectfully request that the current sentencing date be adjourned for 60 days to February 3, 2015. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The sentencing is adjourned to February 3, 2015, at 4:30 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/25/2014) (bw) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen Patton Seymour dated November 21, 2014 re: Request for Adjournment of Sentencing . Document filed by BNP Paribas S.A.. (Seymour, Karen) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen Patton Seymour dated 9/23/14 re: Reschedule Sentencing...ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The sentencing in this matter currently scheduled for October 3, 2014 is hereby adjourned to December 5, 2014 at 11:00am ( Sentencing set for 12/5/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/24/14)(jw) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        LETTER by BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen Patton Seymour dated September 23, 2014 re: Request for Adjournment for Sentencing (Seymour, Karen) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          LETTER by BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen P. Seymour dated 07/07/2014 re: 18 re: In response to the Court's July l, 2014 Order, Defendant BNP Paribas S.A. ("BNPP" or the "Bank") respectfully submits that the June 27, 2014 plea agreement between the United States and BNPP (the "Plea Agreement") provides an appropriate resolution to this matter for the reasons set forth below as well as the reasons set forth in the Government's concurrent submission. (jcs) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            LETTER by BNP Paribas S.A. addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Karen P. Seymour dated 07/08/2014 re: 19 :This letter is respectfully submitted in response to the Court's July 7, 2014 order requesting various information regarding BNP Paribas S.A. ("BNPP" or the "Bank") and its legal and financial ability to enter into the proposed plea agreement ("Plea Agreement"), among other documents, with the United States Department of Justice. Each of the requests is addressed below. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(jcs) (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by USA as to BNP Paribas S.A. re: 18 Order,,,, . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Goldstein, Andrew) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: As to BNP Paribas S.A. The Court is in receipt of the parties submissions pursuant to the Courts order of July 1, 2014. The parties are hereby directed to submit no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 8, 2014, the following: Documents evidencing the authority conferred on the Board of Directors of BNPParibas S.A. (BNPP), including the relevant provisions of the Articles of Association of BNPP and the French Commercial Code (Code de Commerce), to (a) consent to the proposed Plea Agreement, Waiver of Indictment and Stipulated Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, admit to the Statement of Facts and plead guilty to the specified charge; and (b) delegate said authority to the individuals named in the Limited Certificate of Corporate Resolution appended to the Proposed Plea Agreement; and Documents evidencing the financial ability of BNPP to pay the forfeiture amount. This request will be docketed as an order at the time this matter receives a case number. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: As to BNP Paribas S.A. The Court is in receipt of the parties submissions pursuant to the Courts order of July 1, 2014. The parties are hereby directed to submit no later than 5:00 p.m. on July 8, 2014, the following: Documents evidencing the authority conferred on the Board of Directors of BNPParibas S.A. (BNPP), including the relevant provisions of the Articles of Association of BNPP and the French Commercial Code (Code de Commerce), to (a) consent to the proposed Plea Agreement, Waiver of Indictment and Stipulated Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, admit to the Statement of Facts and plead guilty to the specified charge; and (b) delegate said authority to the individuals named in the Limited Certificate of Corporate Resolution appended to the Proposed Plea Agreement; and Documents evidencing the financial ability of BNPP to pay the forfeiture amount. This request will be docketed as an order at the time this matter receives a case number. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: As to BNP Paribas S.A. The parties are scheduled to appear before the Court on July 9, 2014. As the parties are aware, the Court is tasked with considering the proposed Plea Agreement submitted by the parties, pursuant to which BNP Paribas S.A. (BNPP) has agreed to forfeit to the United States a total of US$8,833,600,00.00, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981 and Title 28, United States Code, Section 2461. The Court hereby requests that no later than 10:00 a.m. on July 7, 2014, the parties submit a memorandum of law, not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages, summarizing the key facts of the case, including the relevance of each of the regulatory agreements submitted by the parties to this Court, and setting forth the legal standards and analysis on the basis of which the parties seek Court approval of the proposed Plea Agreement. The memorandum may be submitted either by the Government or the Defendant, or jointly by the parties, and should be sent to Chambers as a PDF attachment at Schofield_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER: As to BNP Paribas S.A. The parties are scheduled to appear before the Court on July 9, 2014. As the parties are aware, the Court is tasked with considering the proposed Plea Agreement submitted by the parties, pursuant to which BNP Paribas S.A. (BNPP) has agreed to forfeit to the United States a total of US$8,833,600,00.00, pursuant to Title 18, United States Code, Section 981 and Title 28, United States Code, Section 2461. The Court hereby requests that no later than 10:00 a.m. on July 7, 2014, the parties submit a memorandum of law, not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages, summarizing the key facts of the case, including the relevance of each of the regulatory agreements submitted by the parties to this Court, and setting forth the legal standards and analysis on the basis of which the parties seek Court approval of the proposed Plea Agreement. The memorandum may be submitted either by the Government or the Defendant, or jointly by the parties, and should be sent to Chambers as a PDF attachment at Schofield_NYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2014)(dnd) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Craig Michael Timm appearing for USA. (Timm, Craig) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jennifer Elizabeth Ambuehl appearing for USA. (Ambuehl, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Maura Eileen Miller appearing for BNP Paribas S.A.. Appearance Type: Retained. (Miller, Maura) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Henry Wagener appearing for BNP Paribas S.A.. Appearance Type: Retained. (Wagener, William) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Plea Agreement, docketed as Court Exhibit 9 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Information, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, # 4 Exhibit Limited Certificate of Corporate Resolution)(jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Elements for the Plea Allocution, docketed as Court Exhibit 8 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Advice of Rights Form, docketed as Court Exhibit 7 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Signed Waiver of Indictment, docketed as Court Exhibit 6 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Press Release - French Regulatory Authorities, docketed as Court Exhibit 5 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Article L. 225-56 of the French Commercial Code, docketed as Court Exhibit 4 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Articles of Association, docketed as Court Exhibit 3 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              L22-35 French Commercial Code, docketed as Court Exhibit 2 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Limited Certificate of Corporate Resolution, docketed as Court Exhibit 1 to proceeding held on 7/9/2014. (jp) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by BNP Paribas S.A.. (jm) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Karen Patton Seymour appearing for BNP Paribas S.A.. (jm) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to BNP Paribas S.A. (1) count(s) 1. (jm) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to BNP Paribas S.A.. (jm) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3,438 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?