Ross Weintraub v. Elon Musk et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:14-cv-02817
Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 4:22 AM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ross Weintraub, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Alexander Firm P.C. -

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vahn Alexander +1 310 407 5335 +1 310 407 5338 info@alexanderfirmpc.com
v.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Antonio J. Gracias"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Officially listed as "Brad W. Buss"
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Unknown Role, Cavium Networks
Unknown Role, Aecom Technology Corp
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation

Toggle Switch Represented by Irell & Manella, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles E. Elder +1 310 277 1010 +1 310 203 7199 celder@irell.com
Space Colin T Roth +1 310 277 1010 croth@irell.com
No Logo Harald Kroeger, Defendant
Ehrenpreis, Ira Ehrenpreis, Ira, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ira Ehrenpreis"
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Kimbal Musk"
Unknown Role, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Steve Jurvetson"
Unknown Role, Athenahealth, Inc.
Unknown Role, Draper Associates, LP
Unknown Role, Draper Timothy C
Unknown Role, Fisher John H N
Unknown Role, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Unknown Role, Tesla, Inc.
Unknown Role, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Unknown Role, SolarCity Corporation
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting (43) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-05216-CRB (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Certificate of Interested Entities
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Order Relating Case
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Ronald M. Whyte for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd remains as the referral judge assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/17/2014. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elon Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc.. (Elder, Charles) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Ross Weintraub. Service waived by Brad W. Buss waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Ira Ehrenpreis waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Antonio J. Gracias waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Steve Jurvetson waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Elon Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Kimbal Musk waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014; Tesla Motors, Inc waiver sent on 7/7/2014, answer due 9/5/2014. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 7/16/2014) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                          Summons Issued as to Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Antonio J. Gracias, Steve Jurvetson, Harald Kroeger, Elon Musk, Kimbal Musk, Tesla Motors, Inc. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None
                            Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2014. Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                Proposed Summons. (Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-8706450.). Filed byRoss Weintraub. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Vahn) (Filed on 6/18/2014) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?