Campbell-Jackson et al v. Radisson Hotels & Resorts et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-01261-JBM-JAG
District Judge Joe Billy McDade, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carla Campbell-Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa A Goldblatt +1 202 942 9124 +6288 628 628 8189

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Wittels & Heisler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Sanford +1 202 742 7780 +1 202 742 7776 dsanford@sanfordheisler.com
No Logo Lisa Campbell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa A Goldblatt +1 202 942 9124 +6288 628 628 8189

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Wittels & Heisler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Sanford +1 202 742 7780 +1 202 742 7776 dsanford@sanfordheisler.com
v.
No Logo Carlson Hotels Management Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by htwslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Wood +1 309 827 0044 +1 309 829 0328 gwood@htwslaw.com
No Logo Carlson Hotels Worldwide, Defendant
No Logo Radisson Hotels & Resorts, Defendant
No Logo Radisson Hotels Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by htwslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George C Wood +1 309 827 0044 +1 309 829 0328 gwood@htwslaw.com
Office Peoria
Filed 9/6/2005
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 443 - Civil Rights: Housing/Accommodations
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County McLean
Terminated 4/17/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 13, 15, CLOSED, REFER
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Carlson Hotels Management Corporation, Radisson Hotels Corporation. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order for Dismissal)(Wood, George)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Remark
    Remark: Civil case terminated pursuant to stipulation of dismissal filed 4/5/07. (RK, ilcd)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Order on Motion to Stay
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John A. Gorman: Parties present via phone by Attys Sanford and Wood for Motion Hearing held on 4/17/06 at 11:00 AM. [7] Motion to Stay Litigation is moot. With respect to the parties now before the Court, this case is dismissed without prejudice due to pending Administrative Proceedings. (TK, ilcd)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
        NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Rule 16 hearing set for Monday, 4/17/06 at 11:00 AM is CANCELLED pending further order. The motion hearing in re Motion to Stay remains set for telephone conference at that date and time. (WW, ilcd)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
          NOTICE of Hearing in re [7] MOTION to Stay the Litigation: Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2006 is CANCELLED and RESET to Monday, 4/17/2006 at 11:00 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman.(WW, ilcd)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Notice of Hearing on Motion
            NOTICE of Hearing in re [7] MOTION to Stay the Litigation: Motion Hearing set for Thursday, 4/20/2006 at 1:30 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. (WW, ilcd)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006, Terminated: 4/17/2006 Motion to Stay
              MOTION to Stay the Litigation by Plaintiffs Carla Campbell-Jackson, Lisa Campbell. Responses due by 4/18/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Sanford, David)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
                TEXT ONLY ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling conference set for Monday, 4/17/2006 at 11:00 AM in person in chambers before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. If an agreed discovery plan is filed by 4/13/06, then the hearing will be converted to a phone conference rather than in person and the court will set up the call. Entered by Judge John A. Gorman on 3/13/06. (WW, ilcd)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion/Petition
                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [3] MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f) filed by Plaintiffs Carla Campbell-Jackson, Lisa Campbell. (Sanford, David)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Return of Service Executed
                    Return of Service Executed by Carla Campbell-Jackson, Lisa Campbell as to Radisson Hotels Corporation 1/6/2006. (Sanford, David)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006 Return of Service Executed
                      Return of Service Executed by Carla Campbell-Jackson, Lisa Campbell as to Carlson Hotels Management Corporation 1/5/2006. (Sanford, David)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006, Terminated: 4/17/2006 Motion to Dismiss
                        MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b), MOTION to Strike Pursuant to Rule 12(f). Responses due by 2/7/2006 Responses due by 2/7/2006 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Affidavit of Mary Ann Fallon# (2) Exhibit Affidavit of David Fedor)(Wood, George)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Notice of Cancellation of Hearing
                        NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Telephone status conference set on Friday, 1/27.06 is CANCELLED. (WW, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                          NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for Friday, 1/27/2006 at 1:30 PM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge John A. Gorman. Complaint was filed on 9/6/05. The Court will be checking the status of service on the defendant at this status conference.(WW, ilcd)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Summons Issued
                            Summons Issued as to Radisson Hotels & Resorts, Carlson Hotels Worldwide. (RK, ilcd)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Remark
                              Remark: Mr. Sanford's office called to advise they will be issuing Summons. (RK, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Filing Fee Received
                                Filing fee: $ 250 pd, receipt #P013695. (TK, ilcd)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against Radisson Hotels & Resorts, Carlson Hotels Worldwide (Filing fee $250.00-TO BE RECEIPTED 9/7/5), filed by Carla Campbell-Jackson, Lisa Campbell. (Attachments: # (1)civil cover sheet)(HK, ilcd)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Remark
                                  Remark: Spoke with Atty Sanford and he will not at this time be issuing any service of process (summons/notice of lawsuit) (HK, ilcd)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 1,316 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?