McDaniel et al v. Depuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Central District Court, Case No. 2:05-cv-02243-MPM-DGB
District Judge Michael P. McCuskey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Curtis McDaniel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ERWIN MARTINKUS & COLE LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A Martinkus +1 217 351 4040 +1 217 351 4314 jim.martinkus@erwinlaw.com
No Logo Orlena McDaniel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ERWIN MARTINKUS & COLE LTD

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A Martinkus +1 217 351 4040 +1 217 351 4314 jim.martinkus@erwinlaw.com
v.
No Logo De Puy, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
Space William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
No Logo Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
Space William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
Johnson & Johnson, Inc. Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Barrier Therapeutics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Immunicon Corp
Officer/Director, Nevro Corp
Officer/Director, Fusion Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Officer/Director, Inno-tech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Biopsys Medical, Inc.
Officer/Director, De Puy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Femrx, Inc.
Officer/Director, Heartport, Inc.
Officer/Director, Orapharma, Inc.
Officer/Director, Tri Point Medical Corp
Officer/Director, Animas Corp
Officer/Director, Provention Bio, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Dames +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 john.dames@dbr.com
Space William V Essig +1 312 977 1510 +1 312 977 1511 william.essig@dbr.com
Office Urbana
Filed 10/27/2005
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Champaign
Terminated 1/18/2007
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 21, 25, CLOSED, REFER, REMOVAL
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Order Dismissing Case
TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 1/18/07. This Court has reviewed and now approves the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss [19]. This case is terminated. (VB, ilcd)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 1/15/2007, Entered: 1/15/2007 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by defendants and by Orlena McDaniel, Curtis McDaniel. (Martinkus, James)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Subpoena
      Subpoena filed by Orlena McDaniel, Curtis McDaniel as to Dr. Chris Dangles.. (Martinkus, James)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Certificate of Service/Counsel
        CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Discovery Requests by James A Martinkus on behalf of all plaintiffs (Martinkus, James)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete
          TEXT ORDER entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 8/10/06. The Joint Motion for Brief Extension of Fact Discovery Deadline [16] is GRANTED. The current fact discovery deadline of 8/31/06 is extended to 10/13/06. (MT, ilcd)
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: 8/9/2006, Terminated: 8/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Fact Discovery Deadline) by Plaintiffs Orlena McDaniel, Curtis McDaniel, Defendants Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc.Responses due by 8/23/2006 (Essig, William)
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Notice of Removal
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson, Inc., Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc (AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (Essig, William)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Certificate of Service/Counsel
                CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel by James A Martinkus on behalf of all plaintiffs (Martinkus, James)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Status Conference
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David G. Bernthal : Status Conference held on 3/29/2006. Appearance of plaintiffs by James Martinkus; appearance of defendants by William Essig. Issue of citizenship of plaintiff discussed. Counsel represent issue is resolved. Defendant to file Amended Notice of Removal. No further status conference scheduled. (Tape #C334:841-1006.) (MT, ilcd)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Notice of Hearing.
                    NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/29/2006 11:00 AM by telephone (court will place call) before Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal. The purpose of the hearing is to discuss diversity jurisdiction issues.(TC, ilcd)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Notice of Change of Address
                      NOTICE of Change of Address by William V Essig (Essig, William)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        DISCOVERY ORDER entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 12/8/05. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2007 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/15/2007 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. (Case No. 2)(VB, ilcd)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Certificate
                          CERTIFICATE of Service. (Essig, William)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Certificate of Service/Counsel
                            CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel by James A Martinkus on behalf of all plaintiffs (Martinkus, James)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Notice of Docket Text or Event Modification
                              Notice of Docket Text Modification re Scheduling Conference - minutes corrected to include statement about jurisdiction question. (SP, ilcd)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Scheduling Conference
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held on 12/1/2005 before Judge David G. Bernthal : Appearance by Rick Aeilts for James Martinkus on behalf of plaintiff; William Essig appeared on behalf of defendants. Scheduling Conference held. Deficiencies in allegation of jurisdiction discussed. Proposed plan amended and approved. ADR options offered. Consent to magistrate judge discussed. Order to be entered. (Tape #C314:1952-3796) (SP, ilcd) Modified on 12/1/2005 (SP, ilcd).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting
                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Depuy Orthopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc. (Essig, William)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order
                                    TEXT ORDER entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 11/4/05. The 11/4/05 text order striking document [8] was entered in error and is withdrawn. The Answer and Affirmative Defense [8] remains as previously filed. (MT, ilcd)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order Striking/Vacating Document
                                      TEXT ORDER STRIKING DOCUMENT entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 11/4/05. Defense Attorney Essig e:filed duplicate Answers and Affirmative Defenses [7] and [8] on 11/1/05. [8] is STRICKEN. Parties are cautioned to follow this Court's Civ. Adm. Pro. (available online at www.ilcd.uscourts.gov), specifically p. 17 regarding electronic signatures. Future pleadings may be stricken if not in accordance with the rules.(MT, ilcd)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005, Terminated: 11/4/2005 Answer
                                        ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Defendant Depuy Inc.(Essig, William) Modified on 11/4/2005 to remove text that document was striken. (MT, ilcd).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005 Answer
                                          ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Defendant Depuy Othopaedics Inc.(Essig, William)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Setting Rule 16 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                            ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 10/27/05. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/1/2005 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal.(VB, ilcd)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by William V Essig on behalf of Depuy Othopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc (MT, ilcd)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Appearance of Attorney
                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by John Dames on behalf of Depuy Othopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc (MT, ilcd)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Certificate of Interest
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Depuy Othopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc. (MT, ilcd)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING Notice of Removal by Depuy Othopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc (MT, ilcd)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Notice of Removal
                                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Champaign County, case number 2005 L 222 ( Filing fee $ 250; Receipt U4404 ), filed by Depuy Othopaedics Inc, Depuy Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(MT, ilcd)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Space Space

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?