Donovan v. Yale University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00549
District Judge Vanessa L. Bryant, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 23, 2016 at 10:04 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Martin Donovan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Sylvester Palmieri +1 203 562 3100 +1 203 498 6076 wpalmieri@hotmail.com
v.
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 621
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 64 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Yale University against Martin Donovan.For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 2/25/14.(LaLone, L.) Modified on 2/25/2014 (LaLone, L.). (Entered: 02/25/2014)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. The settlement conference scheduled before Judge Smith on February 27, 2014, is cancelled in light of the Court's 62 Summary Judgment Order. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on February 25, 2014. (Pylman, J.) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant as to Plaintiff's federal law claim pursuant to the Age Discrimination in Employment Act. The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state law claims. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/24/14. (Ives, D) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER denying 60 Motion to Continue. The deadline for the Joint Trial Memo remains 2/28/14. Jury selection will take place on 4/10/14 and the presentation of evidence will follow immediately thereafter. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/18/14. (Ives, D) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
          First MOTION to Continue of Compliance with Joint Trial Memorandum Order and Trial by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Settlement Conference set for 2/27/2014 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 258, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Thomas P. Smith. Counsel shall meet in the West Courtroom and inform the Court once all parties have arrived. Further, counsel must be accompanied by appropriate persons with authority to settle, including insurance adjusters. SEE ATTACHED Nick v. Morgan's Foods decision. SEE ALSO ATTACHED ORDER requiring each party to submit an ex parte statement at least 2 business days prior to the conference. (Attachments: # 1 Nick v. Morgan's Foods) (Pylman, J.) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 4/1/14. The Jury Selection scheduled for 4/1/14 has been rescheduled for 4/10/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. All other dates in the 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER remain in effect. (Ives, D) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/22/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Yale University re 34 Memorandum in Support of 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment, (Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 11/5/2013 to link to motion. (Grady, B.). Modified on 11/5/2013 to create association (Grady, B.). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None
                      First OBJECTION re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Martin Donovan. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Statement of Material Facts)(Palmieri, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/10/2013: # 10 REPLACEMENT PDF - Memorandum in Opposition, # 11 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 1, # 12 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 2, # 13 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 3, # 14 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 4, # 15 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 5, # 16 REPLACEMENT PDF - Exhibit 6) (Grady, B.). (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/30/2013. See order dkt# 52 . (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Plaintiff to respond to/oppose the 33 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be September 30, 2013. The Motion for Summary Judgment was filed on April 25, 2013, nearly six months ago, and the Plaintiff has subsequently asked for four extensions of the deadline to respond. Accordingly, NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/17/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                            Third MOTION for Extension of Time until October 21, 2013 Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, by Martin Donovan. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 9/16/2013 (Sunbury, B.) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time until September 16, 2013 to File Response/Reply to 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court notes that despite the representation made in the motion, this is Plaintiff's third request for an extension of this deadline and not his first. Any further requests to extend this deadline will be disfavored. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/12/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 08/12/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: None
                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment until September 16, 2013 by Martin Donovan. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                                    AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Special Defenses by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER granting Defendant's 32 Motion to Amend/Correct its Answer. The Defendant shall file its Amended Answer as a separate docket entry by 7/19/13. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/11/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 40 Motion for Relief from Order. The Court will treat the 36 Statement of Undisputed Facts filed on May 10, 2013 as responsive to the Court's order (and not as responsive to the Summary Judgment Motion as it is billed) and will credit the paragraphs on which the parties agree. The Court denies Plaintiff's 41 request for attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/11/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time until August 12, 2013 for Plaintiff to File a Response/Reply to Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/1/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment until August 12, 2013 by Martin Donovan. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              RESPONSE re 41 Objection re 40 Motion for Relief filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 6/28/2013 to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                OBJECTION re 40 MOTION for Relief from Order And Motion For Fees and Costs filed by Martin Donovan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Palmieri, William) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Relief from Order by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/31/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 7/1/2013. See order dkt# 38 . (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time until 7/1/13 to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The Parties are also ORDERED to comply with the Court's 4/26/13 Order directing the parties to file a joint statement of undisputed facts as to the dates of the events relevant to this action, including the dates of any CHRO or EEOC filings and/or determinations, such that the Court may determine its jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 626 and may rule on the Defendant's 32 Motion for Permission to File an Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/22/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment until 07/01/2013 by Martin Donovan. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Statement of Material Facts re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: The parties are ordered to file by Monday, 5/13/13 a joint statement of undisputed facts as to the dates of the events relevant to this action, including the dates of any CHRO or EEOC filings and/or determinations, such that the Court may determine its jurisdiction over this matter pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 626. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/26/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Memorandum in Support re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Yale University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Table of Contents of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Colleen Davis, # 3 Exhibit Local Rule 56(a)(1) Stmt, # 4 Exhibit Affidavit of Sally Chesney, # 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Cynthia Walker, # 6 Exhibit Affidavit of James Tsai)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Yale University.Responses due by 5/16/2013 (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/25/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Answer to Complaint by Yale University.Responses due by 5/9/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Answer)(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:in light of the Court's 30 Order granting an extension of time for dispositive motions, the Court sets the following amended case management deadlines: Dispositive Motions are due by 4/25/13; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 5/25/13 and Jury Selection will take place on 7/9/13 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 2/28/14 and Jury Selection will take place on 4/1/14 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/7/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time until 4/25/13 to file dispositive motions. The Court will set an amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/7/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 03/07/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        Memorandum in Support re 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/25/2013 To File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/25/2013 To File Motion for Summary Judgment by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the jury selection scheduled for 5/7/13 in the 21 Scheduling Order has been rescheduled for 4/30/13. Please note that all other dates and instructions in the 21 Scheduling Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/24/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time until February 21, 2013 for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Requests for Production. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/22/13. (Ives, D) (Entered: 01/22/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 21, 2013 TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time until November 14, 2012 for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/16/12. (Ives, D) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2012 to Respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production by Martin Donovan. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Yale University.(Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 07/17/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER in light of the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report 16 the Court hereby sets the following case management deadlines: Discovery shall be completed by 1/31/2013; Dispositive Motions are due by 3/1/2013; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 4/1/2013 and Jury Selection will take place on 5/7/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 11/1/13 and Jury Selection will take place on 12/3/13 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/3/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER denying as moot 19 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court has already granted this request. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/3/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 21, 2012 to Plead to 1 Complaint by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/29/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time until 7/21/12 to file a responsive pleading. The Court notes that 17 Motion for Extension of Time is still not in compliance with Paragraph 1 of Chambers Practices as it is not in Arial Bold font. Any further motions or pleadings not in compliance with Chambers Practices may be summarily denied. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/27/12. (Hildebrand, J.) (Entered: 06/27/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 21, 2012 TO ANSWER 1 COMPLAINT by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) Modified on 6/28/2012 to edit text to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER re 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time does not comply with paragraph 1, of the Court's Chambers Practices. Please read the Chambers Practices in their entirety and comply with its terms. Future noncompliant motions and other filings may be denied. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/22/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 06/22/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until July 21, 2012 to plead by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/26/2012. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time until 06/14/2012 to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/27/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time until 06-14-2012 Answer Complaint by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Donovan. Yale University served on 4/23/2012, answer due 5/14/2012. (Palmieri, William) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER. All parties are asked to read and comply with the 5 Court's Chambers Practices, including the filing and discovery dispute resolution requirements. Failure to comply may result in the summary denial of relief sought in a non-compliant pleading. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/18/2012. (Grady, B.) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *William Sylvester Palmieri* *Law Offices of William S. Palmieri, LLC* *129 Church Street, Suite 405* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Docket Annotation, 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint filed by Martin Donovan, 5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, 4 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/12/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/12/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 7/12/12. Amended Pleadings due by 6/11/2012 Discovery due by 10/12/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 11/11/2012. Signed by Clerk on 4/12/12. (LaLone, L.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Docket Entry Correction re 1 Complaint, Original PDF not signed. (Torres, K.) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Yale University ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2466181.), filed by Martin Donovan.(Palmieri, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/12/2012: # 1 Replacement PDF) (Torres, K.). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 400 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?