Donald H. Lake v. California Department of Financial Institutions
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2009-00102604-CU-DE-CTL

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lake, Donald G., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kodam & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel S Kodam +1 951 296 2336 +1 951 296 2338 daniel@kodamlaw.com
v.
No Logo California Department of Financial Institutions, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris A. Knudsen +1 619 645 3060

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patti Ranger +1 619 645 3058 +1 619 645 2581 patti.ranger@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Prada, Julio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris A. Knudsen +1 619 645 3060
Space Patti Ranger +1 619 645 3058 +1 619 645 2581 patti.ranger@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Venchiarutti, Robert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Annmarie Marciarille

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris A. Knudsen +1 619 645 3060
Space Patti Ranger +1 619 645 3058 +1 619 645 2581 patti.ranger@doj.ca.gov
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 34 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011
Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Lake, Donald H (Plaintiff) Lake, Donald H.
    Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011
    Minutes finalized for Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) heard 01/21/2011 10:00:00 AM.
      Blank 32 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011
      Civil Jury Trial set for 2/10/11 at 9:00am vacated.
        Blank 31
          Blank 30
            Blank 29 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010
            Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt was vacated.
              Blank 28 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010
              Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed by California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert. Attachments: (#1) Declaration of Chris A. Knudsen
              Blank 27 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010
              Summary Judgment / Summary Adjudication (Civil) scheduled for 01/07/2011 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt.
                Blank 26 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010
                Association of Attorney (Notice of Joint Counsel) filed by California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert.
                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: 7/13/2010
                  Status of Mediation process changed to Pending on 07/09/2010.
                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010
                    Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/09/2010 08:30:00 AM.
                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010
                      This matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.
                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010
                        Jury demanded by all parties.
                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Court Filing
                          Civil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/10/2011 at 09:00AM before Judge William R. Nevitt, Jr..
                            Blank 20 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Court Filing
                            Trial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/21/2011 at 10:00AM before Judge William R. Nevitt, Jr..
                              Blank 19
                                Blank 18
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010
                                  Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2010 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 William R. Nevitt.
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010
                                    Stipulation - Other (AGREEMENT TO PROTECT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION AND STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER) filed by California Department of financial Institutions; Venchiarutti, Robert; Lake, Donald H..
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010
                                      Stipulation - Other (Agreement to protect confidential information and proposed stipulated protective order) submitted by California Department of financial Institutions rejected on 04/09/2010.
                                        Blank 14
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: 3/26/2010
                                          Answer (to Complaint) submitted by California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert rejected on 03/26/2010.
                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
                                            Answer filed by California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert. Refers to: Lake, Donald
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010
                                              Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: Venchiarutti, Robert
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: 2/26/2010
                                                Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: Prada, Julio
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010
                                                  Certificate of Service filed by Lake, Donald H..
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010
                                                    Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: Venchiarutti, Robert
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010
                                                      Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: Prada, Julio
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
                                                        Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: California Department of financial Institutions
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010
                                                          Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: California Department of financial Institutions
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009
                                                            Case assigned to Judicial Officer Nevitt, William.
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009
                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009
                                                                Original Summons filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009
                                                                  Complaint filed by Lake, Donald H.. Refers to: California Department of financial Institutions; Prada, Julio; Venchiarutti, Robert

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 1,097 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?