HATFILL v. ASHCROFT et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-01793

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 9:25 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo STEVEN J. HATFILL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eric O. Bravin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/25/2005, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric O. Bravin +1 917 797 5536

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris, Wiltshire & Grannis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Gerard Connolly +1 202 730 1339 +1 202 730 1301 tconnolly@hwglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven A. Fredley +1 202 730 1300 +1 202 730 1301 sfredley@hwglaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Andrew Grannis +1 202 730 1300 +1 202 730 1301 mgrannis@hwglaw.com
TERMINATED: 06/11/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tonya L. Mitchell +1 202 730 1342
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Pearse O'Donnell +1 202 730 1300 +1 202 730 1301 podonnell@harriswiltshire.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Welsh Flaxan & Gitler LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Thomas Kimmett, Jr. +1 202 730 1357 +1 202 730 1301 ckimmett@hwglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WILTSHIRE & GRANNIS, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy E Richardson +1 202 730 1329 +1 202 730 1301 arichardson@wiltshiregrannis.com
v.
No Logo Alberto Gonzales, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
No Logo DARYL DARNELL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Montague +1 202 616 4158 +1 202 616 4314 Rich.montague@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Serrin Andrew Turner +1 212 637 2701 +1 212 637 2686 serrin.turner@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda K. Morris +1 202 514 1439 brenda.morris@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
No Logo JOHN ASHCROFT, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Montague +1 202 616 4158 +1 202 616 4314 Rich.montague@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Serrin Andrew Turner +1 212 637 2701 +1 212 637 2686 serrin.turner@usdoj.gov
No Logo TIMOTHY BERES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Montague +1 202 616 4158 +1 202 616 4314 Rich.montague@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Serrin Andrew Turner +1 212 637 2701 +1 212 637 2686 serrin.turner@usdoj.gov
No Logo TRACY HENKE, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Montague +1 202 616 4158 +1 202 616 4314 Rich.montague@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brenda K. Morris +1 202 514 1439 brenda.morris@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
No Logo VAN HARP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Stewart Greene +1 202 616 4143 +1 202 616 4314 glenn.greene@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Montague +1 202 616 4158 +1 202 616 4314 Rich.montague@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Serrin Andrew Turner +1 212 637 2701 +1 212 637 2686 serrin.turner@usdoj.gov
No Logo ALLAN LENGEL, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Interested Party
Officially listed as "ASSOCIATED PRESS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo Baltimore Sun Company, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo DANIEL KLAIDMAN, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
Space Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
Space Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
No Logo JAMES STEWART, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo MICHAEL ISIKOFF, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
Space Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
Space Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
The New York Times Company The New York Times Company, Interested Party
Officially listed as "NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY"

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo TONI LOCY, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Paul Machado +1 202 659 6736 +1 202 659 4130 leslie.machado@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurin H. Mills +1 703 647 5903 +1 703 647 5953 laurin.mills@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Charles Bernius +1 202 585 8000 +1 202 585 8080 rbernius@nixonpeabody.com
No Logo American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
Space Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
The Associated Press The Associated Press, Movant
Officially listed as "ASSOCIATED PRESS"

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Rappaport +1 202 408 5565 +1 202 588 5020 arappaport@citizensforethics.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Rappaport +1 202 408 5565 +1 202 588 5020 arappaport@citizensforethics.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo CNBC, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Rappaport +1 202 408 5565 +1 202 588 5020 arappaport@citizensforethics.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo Gannett Company, Inc., Movant
Officially listed as "GANNETT CO., INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClair Ryan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leslie Paul Machado +1 202 659 6736 +1 202 659 4130 leslie.machado@leclairryan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurin H. Mills +1 703 647 5903 +1 703 647 5953 laurin.mills@leclairryan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nixon Peabody LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Charles Bernius +1 202 585 8000 +1 202 585 8080 rbernius@nixonpeabody.com
Newsweek, Inc. Newsweek, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
Space Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
No Logo Scott, Shane, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam J. Rappaport +1 202 408 5565 +1 202 588 5020 arappaport@citizensforethics.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chad R. Bowman +1 202 508 1120 +1 202 861 9888 cbowman@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lee Levine +1 202 508 1100 +1 202 861 9888 llevine@lskslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David A. Schulz +1 212 850 6103 +1 212 850 6299 dschulz@lskslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathan E Siegel +1 202 508 1184 +1 202 861 9888 nsiegel@lskslaw.com
No Logo The Washington Post Company, Movant
Officially listed as "WASHINGTON POST"
Unknown Role, Cable One, Inc.
Unknown Role, Smartpros Ltd

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Taylor Baine +1 202 434 5010 +1 202 434 5029 KBaine@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Hardy +1 202 434 5257 khardy@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl Rowan Metz +1 202 434 5000 cmetz@wc.com
  Entries (244) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER. Order vacating the order issued by this Court on August 13, 2007, granting the plaintiffs Motion to Compel further testimony from Ms. Locy; vacating the contempt order issued from the bench on February 19, 2008; and vacating the order issued March 7, 2008, denying Ms. Locys motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 02/11/09. (TH, ) (Entered: 02/11/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to 225 Notice of Appeal, filed by TONI LOCY; ORDERED that the motion for leave to file motion to dismiss be granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be granted; FURTHER ORDERED that the contempt order issued by the district court against the appellant be vacated. (USCA No. 08-5049) (mmh, ) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Fredley, Steven) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton of proceedings held on May 29, 2008; Page Numbers: 1-7. Court Reporter/Transcriber Phyllis Merana, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Court Reporter Email Address : phyllis_merana@dcd.uscourts.gov.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/29/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/8/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2008.(Merana, Phyllis) (Entered: 07/08/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER Vacating the the order issued August 13, 2007, granting the plaintiffs Motion to Compel further testimony from Mr. Stewart. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 07/01/08. (TH, ) (Entered: 07/01/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF COURT'S WILLINGNESS TO VACATE. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 06-30-08. (TH, ) (Entered: 06/30/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE of Settlement corrected filing to note it is filed on behalf of plaintiff and defendants (not "interested parties") by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Settlement by all parties (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/27/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 219 Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/15/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages with Proposed Filings Attached by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Memorandum, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/14/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment Statement of Material Facts Not In Dispute by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit)(Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/14/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ERRATA Amended Notice Regarding Bulky Exhibits by STEVEN J. HATFILL 229 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Notice of Bulky Exhibits, # 5 Declaration of Steven Fredley)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 04/11/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by JAMES STEWART (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Dep. of V. Walter))(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 03/28/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 11, 2008 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis B. Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 19, 2008 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis B. Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to February 19, 2008 oral ruling and 224 Memorandum & Opinion, 223 Order, 202 Memorandum & Opinion by TONI LOCY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 4616010811. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(td, ) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/07/08. (TH, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 03/07/08. (TH, ) (Entered: 03/07/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/16/08. (mpt, ) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 74 Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 01/15/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/11/2008. (TH, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/11/2008. (TH, ) (Entered: 01/11/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 211 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) filed by JAMES STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lee Levine# 2 Exhibit A (Ashcroft Dep.)# 3 Exhibit B (Ayres Dep.)# 4 Exhibit C (Cogswell Dep.)# 5 Exhibit D (Eberhart Dep.)# 6 Exhibit E (Isikoff Dep.)# 7 Exhibit F (Klaidman Dep.)# 8 Exhibit G (Klaidman Dep. II)# 9 Exhibit H (Lengel Dep.)# 10 Exhibit I (Locy Dep.)# 11 Exhibit J (Ross Dep.)# 12 Exhibit K (Stewart Dep.)# 13 Exhibit L (Stewart Dep. II)# 14 Exhibit M (Weierman Dep.))(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 204 MOTION Hold James Stewart in Civil Contempt filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL; (See Docket Entry 215 to view document) (td, ) (Entered: 01/08/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 205 MOTION Hold Toni Locy in Civil Contempt, 212 MOTION for Reconsideration of August 13, 2007 Order (D.E. #201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (D.E. #204) MOTION for Reconsideration of August 13, 2007 Order (D.E. #201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (D.E. #204) filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Richardson, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 211 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204), 204 MOTION Hold James Stewart in Civil Contempt filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit F)(Richardson, Amy) (Entered: 01/07/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 212 MOTION for Reconsideration of August 13, 2007 Order (D.E. #201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (D.E. #204) MOTION for Reconsideration of August 13, 2007 Order (D.E. #201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (D.E. #204) filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Richardson, Amy) Modified on 1/7/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 211 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Richardson, Amy) Modified on 1/7/2008 (td, ). (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration of August 13, 2007 Order (D.E. #201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Contempt (D.E. #204) by TONI LOCY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Declaration of Toni Locy# 3 Locy Deposition)(Machado, Leslie) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration of Order dated August 13, 2007 (Dkt. 201) or in Opposition to Plaintiff's Contempt Motion (Dkt. 204) by JAMES STEWART (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Declaration of James Stewart# 4 Declaration of Lee Levine# 5 Exhibit 1 to Levine Declaration# 6 Exhibit 2 to Levine Declaration# 7 Exhibit 3 to Levine Declaration# 8 Exhibit 4 to Levine Declaration# 9 Exhibit 5 to Levine Declaration# 10 Exhibit 6 to Levine Declaration# 11 Exhibit 7A to Levine Declaration# 12 Exhibit 7B to Levine Declaration# 13 Exhibit 8A to Levine Declaration# 14 Exhibit 8B to Levine Declaration# 15 Exhibit 9A to Levine Declaration# 16 Exhibit 9B to Levine Declaration# 17 Exhibit 10 to Levine Declaration# 18 Exhibit 11 to Levine Declaration# 19 Exhibit 12 to Levine Declaration# 20 Exhibit 13 to Levine Declaration# 21 Exhibit 14 to Levine Declaration# 22 Exhibit 15 to Levine Declaration# 23 Exhibit 16 to Levine Declaration# 24 Exhibit 17 to Levine Declaration# 25 Exhibit 18 to Levine Declaration# 26 Exhibit 19 to Levine Declaration)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motions for Civil Contempt by TONI LOCY, JAMES STEWART (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for Civil Contempt by TONI LOCY, JAMES STEWART (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie) (Entered: 11/05/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Consent MOTION to Stay, MOTION for Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION; (FILED UNDER SEAL) (td, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDERED that the 204 ; 205 Motions to Stay is Granted and the civil proceedings shall be stayed until December 3, 2007. It is further ORDERED that the depositions will continue as scheduled, however, the depositions shall be limited to parties, witnesses, and counsel for the witnesses being deposed and the transcripts will be sealed until December 3, 2007. It is further ORDERED that the Respondents Toni Locy's and Jim Stewart's oppositions to the contempt motions shall be due on December 3, 2007. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/9/07. (mpt, ) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/3/07 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Susan Page Tyner. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MOTION Hold Toni Locy in Civil Contempt by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION Hold James Stewart in Civil Contempt by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Exhibit Exhibit A# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 13, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 152 Motion to Quash; granting 156 Motion to Quash; granting 157 Motion to Compel; granting 159 Motion to Quash; granting 162 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 166 Motion to Compel; granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 13, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 9, 2007 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, ) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ERRATA Supplemental Exhibits by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Errata A# 2 Exhibit B)(td, ) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 196 MOTION to Strike 194 Response to Document filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Kimmett, Charles) Modified on 7/11/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 07/10/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike 194 Response to Document by TONI LOCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    ERRATA Supplemental Exhibits by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST, MICHAEL ISIKOFF, DANIEL KLAIDMAN, ALLAN LENGEL 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL, 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(td, ) (Entered: 07/09/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 195 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Kimmett, Charles) Modified on 7/9/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony, 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST, MICHAEL ISIKOFF, DANIEL KLAIDMAN, ALLAN LENGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Supplemental Exhibit A)# 2 Exhibit (Supplemental Exhibit B)# 3 Exhibit (Supplemental Exhibit C))(Metz, Carl) Modified on 7/9/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RESPONSE 185 to Defendants' Memorandum [Dkt. 185] Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [Dkt. 157] filed by JAMES STEWART. (Bowman, Chad) Modified on 6/19/2007 (td, ). (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D)(Fredley, Steven) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              REPLY to opposition to motion re 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Richardson, Amy) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STEVEN J. HATFILL. Attorney Tonya L. Mitchell terminated. (Fredley, Steven) (Entered: 06/11/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 181 OPPOSITION OF ABC, et al. to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Documents filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/8/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20# 21 Exhibit 21# 22 Exhibit 22# 23 Exhibit 23# 24 Exhibit 24# 25 Exhibit 25# 26 Exhibit 26# 27 Exhibit 27)(Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I# 10 Exhibit J# 11 Exhibit K# 12 Exhibit L# 13 Exhibit M# 14 Exhibit N# 15 Exhibit O# 16 Exhibit P# 17 Exhibit Q)(Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE re 181 182 183 184 to Reporters' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibits 1 -3# 2 Appendix Exhibits 4 -8)(Freeborne, Paul) Modified on 6/5/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to re 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by JAMES STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by CBS BROADCASTING INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 166 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST, MICHAEL ISIKOFF, DANIEL KLAIDMAN, ALLAN LENGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Excerpt of Deposition of Brian Ross)(Hardy, Kevin) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying 147 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 31, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 152 MOTION to Quash filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST. (Metz, Carl) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 162 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of John B. O'Keefe# 2 Exhibit 01# 3 Exhibit 02# 4 Exhibit 03# 5 Exhibit 04# 6 Exhibit 05# 7 Exhibit 06# 8 Exhibit 07# 9 Exhibit 08# 10 Exhibit 09# 11 Exhibit 10# 12 Exhibit 11# 13 Exhibit 12# 14 Exhibit 13# 15 Exhibit 14# 16 Exhibit 15# 17 Exhibit 16# 18 Exhibit 17# 19 Exhibit 18# 20 Exhibit 19# 21 Exhibit 20# 22 Exhibit 21# 23 Exhibit 22)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 159 MOTION to Quash Subpoenas filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY. (Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 156 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by CBS BROADCASTING INC.. (Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Third Party MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to 166 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by JAMES STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Stewart Declaration# 2 Bowman Declaration# 3 Exhibit 1 to Bowman Declaration# 4 Exhibit 2 to Bowman Declaration# 5 Exhibit 3 to Bowman Declaration# 6 Exhibit 4 to Bowman Declaration# 7 Exhibit 5 to Bowman Declaration# 8 Exhibit 6 to Bowman Declaration# 9 Exhibit 7 to Bowman Declaration# 10 Exhibit 8 to Bowman Declaration# 11 Exhibit 9 to Bowman Declaration# 12 Exhibit 10 to Bowman Declaration# 13 Exhibit 11 to Bowman Declaration# 14 Exhibit 12 to Bowman Declaration# 15 Exhibit 13 to Bowman Declaration# 16 Exhibit 14 to Bowman Declaration# 17 Exhibit 15 to Bowman Declaration# 18 Exhibit 16 to Bowman Declaration# 19 Exhibit 17 to Bowman Declaration# 20 Exhibit 18 to Bowman Declaration# 21 Exhibit 19 to Bowman Declaration# 22 Exhibit 20 to Bowman Declaration# 23 Exhibit 21 to Bowman Declaration# 24 Exhibit 22 to Bowman Declaration# 25 Exhibit 23 to Bowman Declaration# 26 Exhibit 24 to Bowman Declaration# 27 Exhibit 25 to Bowman Declaration# 28 Exhibit 26 to Bowman Declaration)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by JAMES STEWART. (Attachments: # 1 Stewart Declaration)(nmw, ) Modified on 5/24/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Bowman, Lee Levine, Nathan E Siegel on behalf of JAMES STEWART (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by MICHAEL ISIKOFF, DANIEL KLAIDMAN, ALLAN LENGEL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Isikoff Deposition# 2 Exhibit B Klaidman Deposition# 3 Exhibit C Lengel Deposition# 4 Exhibit D Klaidman Affirmation# 5 Exhibit E Lengel Affirmation)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin T. Baine on behalf of MICHAEL ISIKOFF, DANIEL KLAIDMAN, ALLAN LENGEL (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to 157 MOTION to Compel Further Testimony filed by TONI LOCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Paul Machado, Laurin H. Mills, Robert Charles Bernius on behalf of TONI LOCY (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Fredley on behalf of STEVEN J. HATFILL (Fredley, Steven) Modified on 5/23/2007 (jf, ). (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 162 MOTION to Quash, 156 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, 159 MOTION to Quash, 152 MOTION to Quash filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 & 2# 2 Exhibit 3# 3 Exhibit 4# 4 Exhibit 5# 5 Exhibit 6# 6 Exhibit 7# 7 Exhibit 8# 8 Exhibit 9# 9 Exhibit 10# 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....Memorandum in opposition to re 156 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, 159 MOTION to Quash, 162 MOTION to Quash, 152 MOTION to Quash filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Kimmett, Charles) Modified on 5/18/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Siegel Declaration and Exhibits# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Bowman, Nathan E Siegel on behalf of NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Subpoenas by ASSOCIATED PRESS, BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY (Attachments: # 1 Siegel Declaration# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Bowman, Nathan E Siegel on behalf of BALTIMORE SUN COMPANY (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Further Testimony by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Supplement Memorandum in Support# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G# 10 Exhibit H# 11 Exhibit I# 12 Exhibit J# 13 Exhibit K# 14 Exhibit L# 15 Exhibit M# 16 Exhibit N# 17 Exhibit O# 18 Exhibit P# 19 Exhibit Q# 20 Exhibit R# 21 Exhibit S# 22 Exhibit T# 23 Exhibit U# 24 Exhibit V# 25 Exhibit W)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Subpoena by CBS BROADCASTING INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Lee Levine# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 05/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Attempt to Serve Subpoenas filed by ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, ALBERTO GONZALES, TRACY HENKE, JOHN ASHCROFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Please see Document No. 154 for scanned image). (nmw, ) (Entered: 05/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to opposition to motion re 147 MOTION to Amend/Correct March 30, 2007 Order And Objection to Discovery Served By Plaintiff filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Rowan Metz on behalf of AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST (Metz, Carl) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1, Subpoena dated 12.28.04# 3 Exhibit 2, Subpoena dated 12.27.04# 4 Exhibit 3, Subpoena dated 12.27.04# 5 Exhibit 4, Letter dated 5.2.05# 6 Exhibit 5, Letter dated 5.13.05# 7 Exhibit 6, Subpoena dated 4.25.07# 8 Exhibit 7, Subpoena dated 4.25.07# 9 Exhibit 8, Subpoena dated 4.27.07)(Metz, Carl) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Thomas Kimmett, Jr on behalf of STEVEN J. HATFILL (Kimmett, Charles) (Entered: 05/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Pearse O'Donnell on behalf of STEVEN J. HATFILL (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 147 MOTION to Amend/Correct March 30, 2007 Order And Objection to Discovery Served By Plaintiff filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Michael Smith on behalf of all defendants (Smith, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct March 30, 2007 Order And Objection to Discovery Served By Plaintiff by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1# 2 Attachment 2# 3 Attachment 3# 4 Attachment 4# 5 Attachment 5# 6 Attachment 6)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON DISCOVERY AND REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 20, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Praecipe Regarding Discovery by STEVEN J. HATFILL (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Compel Discovery and Overrule Defendants' Assertion of Law Enforcement Privilege Over Information Disclosed to the Press. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 30, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 141 Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Transcript)(Freeborne, Paul) Modified on 4/2/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/19//07 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM on the invocation of the law enforcement privilege filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL; (SEALED BULKY) (td, ) (Entered: 03/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re 139 Order dated March 20, 2007 filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 20, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 108 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 16, 2007. (MDW, ) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/6/06 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 11/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part 117 Motion to Preclude Non-Pecuniary Damages, deferring ruling on 130 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 8, 2006. (MDW, ) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTIFICATION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by STEVEN J. HATFILL (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 27, 2005 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (tg, ) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 130 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and the Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST, CBS BROADCASTING INC.. (Bowman, Chad) Modified on 8/21/2006 (nmw, ). (Entered: 08/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to motion re 130 MOTION to Compel MOTION overrule defendants' assertion of law enforcement privilege over information disclosed to the press MOTION overrule defendants' assertion of law enforcement privilege over information disclosed to the press MOTION overrule defendants' assertion of law enforcement privilege over information disclosed to the press filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit # 2 Exhibit A-J# 3 Errata K-U)(td, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel, MOTION overrule defendants' assertion of law enforcement privilege over information disclosed to the press by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum# 2 Affidavit # 3 Text of Proposed Order # 4 Exhibit A# 5 Exhibit B# 6 Exhibit C# 7 Exhibit D# 8 Exhibit E# 9 Exhibit F# 10 Exhibit G# 11 Exhibit H# 12 Exhibit I# 13 Exhibit J# 14 Exhibit K# 15 Exhibit L# 16 Exhibit M# 17 Exhibit N# 18 Exhibit O# 19 Exhibit P# 20 Exhibit Q# 21 Exhibit R# 22 Exhibit S# 23 Exhibit T# 24 Exhibit U# 25 Exhibit V# 26 Exhibit W# 27 Exhibit X# 28 Exhibit Y# 29 Exhibit Z# 30 Exhibit AA)(td, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery and Overrule Assertion of Law Enforcement Privilege by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reply Brief# 2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick O'Donnell# 3 Exhibit Exhibits A-J# 4 Exhibit Exhibits K-U)(nmw, ) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 28, 2006 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: William D. Mc Allister. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing by ALBERTO GONZALES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION re 125 Memorandum in Opposition (Attachments: # 1)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 07/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 29, 2006. (MDW, ) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to re 121 MOTION for Leave to File A Motion to Compel Discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Attachments A-H)(Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to opposition to motion re 117 MOTION to Preclude Non-Pecuniary Damages or, in the Alternative, for an Independent Mental Examination, and Stay of Discovery Into Emotional Damages filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments A & B)(Goitein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goitein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File To File Motion Compel And To Accompanying Motion by ALBERTO GONZALES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File a Motion to Compel by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order -Motion for Leave to File# 2 Motion to Compel# 3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel# 4 Declaration of P. O'Donnell# 5 Exhibit A# 6 Exhibit B# 7 Errata C# 8 Exhibit D# 9 Exhibit E# 10 Exhibit F# 11 Exhibit G# 12 Exhibit H# 13 Exhibit I# 14 Exhibit J# 15 Exhibit K# 16 Exhibit L# 17 Exhibit M# 18 Exhibit N# 19 Exhibit O# 20 Exhibit P# 21 Exhibit Q# 22 Exhibit R# 23 Exhibit S# 24 Exhibit T# 25 Exhibit U# 26 Exhibit V# 27 Exhibit W# 28 Exhibit X# 29 Exhibit Y# 30 Exhibit Z# 31 Exhibit AA# 32 Text of Proposed Order -Motion to Compel# 33 Text of Proposed Order -Appointment of Master and Production of Documents)(nmw, ) (Entered: 06/02/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 117 MOTION to Preclude Non-Pecuniary Damages or, in the Alternative, for an Independent Mental Examination, and Stay of Discovery Into Emotional Damages by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goitein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 117 MOTION to Preclude Non-Pecuniary Damages or, in the Alternative, for an Independent Mental Examination, and Stay of Discovery Into Emotional Damages filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing by ALBERTO GONZALES, JOHN ASHCROFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Curriculum Vitae of Dr. Robert Phillips)(Goitein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preclude Non-Pecuniary Damages or, in the Alternative, for an Independent Mental Examination, and Stay of Discovery Into Emotional Damages by ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, ALBERTO GONZALES, TRACY HENKE, JOHN ASHCROFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Goitein, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; Upon consideration of the 114] Consent Motion to Amend Protective Order, it is hereby ORDERED that Paragraph 1 of the Protective Order signed by the Court on May 12, 2005, and entered on May 13, 2005, is AMENDED; (See Image for Details) . Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/10/06. (mpt, ) (Entered: 04/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Plaintiff's Information by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order Concerning Plaintiff's Information)(Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 03/14/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 108 MOTION to Dismiss The Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by TRACY HENKE, JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Montague, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to Disclose Expert Reports by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re 108 motion to dismiss first amended complaint filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. Related document: 103 Amended Complaint filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL,.(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss The Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by TRACY HENKE, JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Montague, Richard) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Montague, Richard) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Regarding the Number of Depositions of Government Witnesses in Privacy Act Claim by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALBERTO GONZALES, TRACY HENKE, ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, JOHN ASHCROFT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELLfiled by STEVEN J. HATFILL.(td, ) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .NOTICE First Amended Complaint by STEVEN J. HATFILL re 1 Complaint (Grannis, Mark) Modified on 11/21/2005 (td, ). (Entered: 11/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/7/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 93 Order on Motion for Protective Order,, 74 Protective Order by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 11/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and Join Additional Parties by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 11/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 96 More Definite Statement filed by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 10/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Hearing by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (See document no. 97 for image) (td, ) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 96 More Definite Statement filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for More Definite Statement by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Reggie B. Walton on September 16, 2005. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Reggie B. Walton on September 16, 2005. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 09/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDERED that the 92 Consent Motion to Amend Protective Order is Granted; It is hereby ORDERED that Paragraph 1 of the Protective Order signedy by the Court on May 12, 2005, and entered on May 13, 2005, is AMENDED . (See Image for Details) Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/8/05. (mpt, ) (Entered: 07/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Protective Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal Transcript by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 07/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Denying Agency Defendants' Motion for Order Barring June 30 Deposition of Virginia Patrick [DE #84]. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 29, 2005. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Submission of ex parte and in camera Declaration by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Order Barring Deposition of Virginia Patrick by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Order Barring Deposition of Virginia Patrick# 2 Exhibit A to Motion for Order Barring Deposition)(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 06/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 6, 2005. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Freeborne on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Freeborne, Paul) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/22/05 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m, Monday through Friday. (td, ) (Entered: 06/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Limited Admission of Tonya L. Mitchell by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STEVEN J. HATFILL. Attorney Eric O. Bravin terminated. (O'Donnell, Patrick) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITHDRAWAL of Motion by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CBS BROADCASTING INC., CNBC, INC., SCOTT SHANE. (Siegel, Nathan) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by GANNETT CO., INC. re 54 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash MOTION to Quash (Machado, Leslie) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST (Hardy, Kevin) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER setting forth procedures for handling confidential material; allowing designated material to be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/12/05. (mpt, ) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Protective Order by STEVEN J. HATFILL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES. (mpt, ) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER for INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE; set for 5/27/05 at 9:00 am. (mpt, ) (Entered: 04/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Ex Parte Submission by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 leave to examine Van Harp filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Take In-Court Testimony of Defendant Van Harp filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CBS BROADCASTING INC., CNBC, INC., SCOTT SHANE. (Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 66 Leave to Take In-Court Testimony of Van Harp filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Leave to Take In-Court Testimony of Defendant Van Harp by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 02/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to opposition to motion re 56 to Quash or For a Protective Order filed by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CBS BROADCASTING INC., CNBC, INC., SCOTT SHANE. (Bowman, Chad) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 to Quash or for a Protective Order filed by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST. (Hardy, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to opposition to motion re 52 Subpoenas to Media Companies filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/16/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 59 Shane subpoena filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in opposition to motion re 52 quashing subpoenas filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Signed Ross Declaration by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian Ross)(Hardy, Kevin) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Quash, or MOTION for Protective Order by SCOTT SHANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Shane# 2 Declaration of Nathan Siegel# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR..... MOTION to Quash Subpoena, or MOTION for Protective Order by SCOTT SHANE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Scott Shane# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(nmw, ) Modified on 2/4/2005 (nmw, ). (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Bowman, Lee Levine, Adam J. Rappaport, David A. Schulz, Nathan E. Siegel on behalf of SCOTT SHANE (nmw, ) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash, or MOTION for Protective Order by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CBS BROADCASTING INC., CNBC, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Declaration of Nathan E. Siegel# 3 Declaration of Sandy Johnson# 4 Declaration of Linda Mason# 5 Affidavit of William Wheatley)(nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Chad R. Bowman, Adam J. Rappaport, Nathan Siegel, Lee Levine, David A. Schulz on behalf of ASSOCIATED PRESS, CBS BROADCASTING INC., CNBC, INC. (nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash, or MOTION for Protective Order by GANNETT CO., INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order-Motion to Quash# 2 Text of Proposed Order-Motion for Protective Order# 3 Declaration of Kenneth A. Paulson# 4 Declaration of Leslie Paul Machado)(nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie Paul Machado, Laurin H. Mills, Robert Charles Bernius on behalf of GANNETT CO., INC. (nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash, or MOTION for Protective Order by AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order-Motion to Quash# 2 Text of Proposed Order-Motion for Protective Order# 3 Declaration of Allan Lengel# 4 Declaration of Daniel Klaidman# 5 Declaration of Brian Ross)(nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Hardy, Kevin T. Baine on behalf of AMERICAN BROADCASTING COMPANIES, INC., NEWSWEEK, INC., WASHINGTON POST (nmw, ) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 10/21/04; Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. (td, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 10/7/04; Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. (td, ) (Entered: 11/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Stuart Modlinger on behalf of all defendants (Modlinger, Alan) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 21, 2004. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 10/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 42 Agency Defendants' Motion to Stay Depositions filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Deposition Discovery by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP re 27 Reply to opposition to Motion, 21 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Clark v. Kansas City Mo. School District, No. 03-2950 (8th Cir. July 13, 2004))(Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 07/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Reconsideration or Clarification by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Connolly, Thomas) (Entered: 07/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on Continued Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 6, 2004. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by JOHN ASHCROFT, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 3/29/04; Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. (td, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates 2/6/04; Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. (td, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED for dates January 26, 2004; Court Reporter: Phyllis Merana. (td, ) (Entered: 04/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM from Plaintiff Steven Hatfill in Opposition to the Agency Defendants' Renewed Stay Request. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Limited Stay from Agency Defendants. (Turner, Serrin) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Plaintiff by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Turner, Serrin) Modified on 3/22/2004 (td, ). Modified on 3/22/2004 (td, ). (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by STEVEN J. HATFILL of Service of Court-Ordered Discovery (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6)(Connolly, Thomas) (Entered: 02/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 10, 2004. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 02/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss Replies due by 2/6/2004.Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 2, 2004. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 02/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE of Ex Parte Submission (Turner, Serrin) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in opposition to motion re 24 Partial Opposition to the Motion for Extension of Time filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Individual Defendants Motion to Dismiss by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Greene, Glenn) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ERRATA by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (corrected copy))(Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to motion re 21 filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Griffin v. Ashcroft, No. 02-5399 (D.C. Cir. Sep. 3, 2003) (unpublished case))(Turner, Serrin) (Entered: 01/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/5/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 5, 2004. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 01/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in opposition to motion re 18 filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Grannis, Mark) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in support of motion re 14 filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Turner, Serrin) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in opposition to motion re 14 filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Thomas) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR. . . .Memorandum in opposition to motion re 14 filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Connolly, Thomas) Modified on 12/3/2003 (td, ). (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Stay Proceedings by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard L. Lambert)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/21/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to DARYL DARNELL (Served Registered Agent) served on 10/30/2003, answer due 12/29/2003. (td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to United States Attorney served on 9/16/2003, answer due 11/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to JOHN ASHCROFT served on 9/16/2003, answer due 11/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to VAN HARP served on 9/30/2003, answer due 12/1/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to TIMOTHY BERES served on 9/16/2003, answer due 11/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/16/2003, answer due 11/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 9/17/2003, answer due 11/17/2003. (Attachments: # 1)(td, ) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/10/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, VAN HARP, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Shapiro, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Deviate from Local Civil Rule 5.1(e)(1). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 8, 2003. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 09/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to deviate from Local Rule 5.1(e)(1) by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (td, ) (Entered: 09/03/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 28, 2003.(lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 08/30/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear for pro hac vice admission of Eric O. Bravin by STEVEN J. HATFILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(rje, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ALL UNKNOWN AGENTS/EMPLOYEES, JOHN ASHCROFT, TIMOTHY BERES, DARYL DARNELL, VAN HARP, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee $ 150.) , filed by STEVEN J. HATFILL.(rje, ) (Entered: 08/29/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?