USA v. BOARDMAN
Criminal Case Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cr-00333
District Judge J. Curtis Joyner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 19, 2020 at 1:07 PM DT (1.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN N. BOARDMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jose Luis Ongay

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/08/2015 Jose Luis Ongay +1 484 681 1117 jlolaw@live.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Gregory Weaver (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained THOMAS F. BURKE +1 215 568 1400 +1 312 362 0440 brennan_law@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Transfer Out/Probationer
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Return of Property/PostTrial
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None Return of Property/PostTrial
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: None
            ORDER AS TO KEVIN N. BOARDMAN THAT THE JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT SIGNED ON 4/6/2015 IS AMENDED AS OUTLINED IN THIS ORDER. Signed by HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER on 4/20/2015.4/22/2015 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (tomg, ) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: None Remark
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Sentencing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Judgment of Forfeiture
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                      FORFEITURE MONEY JUDGMENT AS TO KEVIN N. BOARDMAN. Signed by HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER on 3/25/2015.4/7/2015 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. CERTIFIED COPIES TO U.S. MARSHAL, FBI.(kk, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order to Suspend Sentence
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                          IT IS ORDERED THAT THE EXECUTION OF PRISON SENTENCE FOR KEVIN N. BOARDMAN IS SUSPENDED UNTIL 4/27/2015, AT WHICH TIME DEFENDANT IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO THE DESIGNATED INSTITUTION NO LATER THAN 12:00 P.M.. Signed by HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER on 3/25/2015.4/7/2015 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (kk, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/7/2015, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                              ORDER AS TO KEVIN N. BOARDMAN THAT THE UNITED STATES'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS FIVE THROUGH TEN OF THE INDICTMENT IS GRANTED, AND COUNTS FIVE THROUGH TEN OF THE INDICTMENT ARE HEREBY DISMISSED. Signed by HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER on 4/6/2015.4/7/2015 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (kk, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None Sentencing Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Forfeiture of Property
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN held on 11/20/2014, before Judge J. CURTIS JOYNER. (kk, ) (Entered: 02/04/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Plea Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Change of Plea Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Plea Memorandum
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None Continue
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of Justice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None Continue
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Continue
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Continue
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE Regarding United States Passports for Criminal Defendant as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN (Two Passports surrendered and one is expired). (ke) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE AS TO KEVIN N. BOARDMAN (1) THAT THE DEFENDANT IS RELEASED IN THE AMOUNT OF $50,000 o/r WITH THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS AS OUTLINED HEREIN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN on 7/11/2014.7/11/2014 Entered and Copies E-Mailed. (ap, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE WILLIAM BRENNAN appearing for KEVIN N. BOARDMAN (ap, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN: Initial appearance/Arraignment as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN (1) Count 1-10 held on 7/11/2014. The Government and defense have agreed to conditions of release. Plea entered by KEVIN N. BOARDMAN Not Guilty on ALL COUNTS. COunsel have 14 days to file pretrial motions. Court Reporter ESR.(ap, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN JURY TRIAL SET FOR 8/25/2014 at 9:30 AM IN COURTROOM 17A - 17TH Floor BEFORE HONORABLE J. CURTIS JOYNER. (sc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN Initial Appearance set for 7/11/2014 at 1:30 PM in COURTROOM 5A - 5TH Floor before MAGISTRATE JUDGE HENRY S. PERKIN. (sc, ) (Entered: 07/03/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      INDICTMENT as to KEVIN N. BOARDMAN (1) count(s) 1-10. (Attachments: # 1 Designation Form) (jwl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 7,794 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?