RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP v. REVIZER LTD.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-01353
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 1:59 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Red Online Marketing Group, LP, Plaintiff

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ALIZA R. KARETNICK +1 215 979 1231 +1 215 405 3724 akaretnick@duanemorris.com
Space DAVID E. LANDAU +1 215 979 1000 +1 215 979 1020 dlandau@duanemorris.com
Space JESSICA PRISELAC +1 215 979 1159 jpriselac@duanemorris.com

Represented by Flaster Greenberg, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LEE M. EPSTEIN +1 215 279 9393 lee.epstein@flastergreenberg.com
Space Abbe F. Fletman +1 215 279 9388 abbe.fletman@flastergreenberg.com
Space KEVIN GREENBERG +1 215 279 9912 kevin.greenberg@flastergreenberg.com
Space JOANNE M. KELLEY +1 215 279 9392 annie.kernicky@flastergreenberg.com
No Logo REVIZER LTD., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Revizer Technologies Ltd, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo REVIZER LTD., Defendant

Represented by HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL & PUDLIN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maureen Smith Lawrence +1 215 568 6200 +1 215 568 0300 mlawrence@hangley.com
Space DANIEL SEGAL +1 215 568 6200 dsegal@hangley.com
No Logo Revizer Technologies Ltd, Defendant

Represented by HANGLEY ARONCHICK SEGAL & PUDLIN PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DYLAN JOSHUA STEINBERG +1 215 496 7375 +1 215 568 0300 dsteinberg@hangley.com
No Logo Red Online Marketing Group, LP, Counter-Defendant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (178) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Sheet
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Sheet
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Telephone Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Amend/Correct
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Status Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/23/2016, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Hearing:A SECOND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/8/2016 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 3-C BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER.(kp, ) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Final
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/19/2016 (kp, ) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS J. RUETER FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE TO BE HELD 12/12/2016 AT 10:00 AM. JURY SELECTION SET FOR 5/12/2017 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8B BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 3/17/2017. THE TRIAL DATE IS SET FOR 5/15/2017 AT 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 8B BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 10/19/2016. 10/20/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/11/2016: # 1 sealed documents, # 2 sealed documents) (tjd, ). (Entered: 10/11/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Pretrial Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Main Document 138 replaced on 10/11/2016) (tjd). (tjd). Modified on 10/11/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 10/11/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP, D/B/A 50ONRED'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF OMNIBUS 123 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 136 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' 124 MOTION to Exclude filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF in Support of DEFENDANTS' re 126 MOTION to Exclude filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SECOND REVISED ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/19/2016 AT 01:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/15/2016. 7/18/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/18/2016 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/13/2016. 7/13/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 132 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in Opposition re 124 MOTION to Exclude filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 131 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 MOTION to Exclude filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 130 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW AND EXHIBITS IN OPPOSITION TO 123 MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE to Motion re 125 MOTION to Exclude Report of Marc Goldberg filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. Certificate of Service. (LANDAU, DAVID) Modified on 7/11/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 07/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER THAT THE EMERGENCY 127 MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED. THE AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER DATED 2/18/2016 IS AMENDED TO PROVIDE DAUBERT MOTION REPLY BRIEFS SHALL BE DUE 7/22/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/29/2016.6/29/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendant's Emergency Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. Memorandum in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) Modified on 6/29/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT OF WALTER BRATIC PURSUANT TO DAUBERT V. MERRELL DOW AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD..(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT OF MARC GOLDBERG PURSUANT TO DAUBERT V. MERRELL DOW AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD..(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 124 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE REPORT OF BRENT HALLIBURTON PURSUANT TO DAUBERT V. MERRELL DOW AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP LP'S OMNIBUS MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. EXHIBITS. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM N. SCHUPACK on behalf of REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD with Certificate of Service(SCHUPACK, ADAM) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY to Response to Motion re 116 MOTION to Strike filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. Certificate of Service. (KARETNICK, ALIZA) Modified on 6/15/2016 (tjd). (Entered: 06/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 120 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S 116 MOTION to Strike filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 118 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF 110 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 117 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. EXHIBITS. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 116 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PLAINTIFF RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP,LP.'S MOTION TO STRIKE filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.MEMORANDUM OF LAW, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re 110 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/13/2016 AT 10:00 AM BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/16/2016. 5/16/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER THAT A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 8/18/2016 AT 01:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 5/4/2016. 5/4/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 112 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.MEMORANDUM OF LAW.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 111 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXHIBITS TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.MEMORANDUM OF LAW, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE JOINT 107 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED. EXPERT DEPOSITIONS ARE TO BE COMPLETED BY 3/29/2016. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE ON 4/15/2016, WITH OPPOSITIONS DUE 5/16/2016 AND REPLIES DUE 6/1/2016. DAUBERT MOTIONS ARE DUE 6/20/2016, OPPOSITIONS ARE DUE 7/8/2016 WITH REPLIES DUE 7/15/2016. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/18/2016.2/19/2016 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO COMPEL IS DISMISSED AS MOOT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 12/17/2015.12/18/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Claim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None Memorandum
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Claim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None
THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD, filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Leave to File Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND COMPEL filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 08/12/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 7/6/2015, Entered: None
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' 82 MOTION to Compel filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/11/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by ALIZA R. KARETNICK on behalf of RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP with Certificate of Service(KARETNICK, ALIZA) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Memorandum and/or Opinion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Response in Support of Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Praecipe/Request
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None Settlement Conference
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Transcript - PDF
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Dismiss
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THE MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENT IS HEREBY GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEAL DOCKET ENTRY 48. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 7/16/2014.7/16/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Seal Document 48 Pretrial Memorandum , Uncontested, with Certificate of Counsel and Certificate of Service filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE IS GRANTED. THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS RESCHEDULED FOR 8/25/2014 AT 11:00AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 7/16/2014.7/16/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP Certificate of Service. (FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 Emergency MOTION to Continue the July 21, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Sagis)(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 49 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD Certificate of Service. (SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 46 Emergency MOTION to Continue the July 21, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
Emergency MOTION to Continue the July 21, 2014 Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS HEREBY SET FOR 7/21/2014 AT 11:00AM BEFORE THE HONORABLE RONALD BUCKWALTER. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS HEREBY GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS IS DENIED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE PRE-CONTRACTUAL EVIDENCE IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANTS' EXPERT IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXHIBITS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/30/2014.7/1/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/30/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Exclude filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/29/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Exclude Exhibits filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/29/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Preclude the Expert Testimony of Michal S. Gal, with Certificate of Service filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) Modified on 6/30/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Support re 26 MOTION to Compel filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION to Preclude filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (kp, ) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
MOTION IN LIMINE TO PRECLUDE THE EXPERT TESTIMONY OF MICHAL S. GAL filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP..(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 38 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
MOTION IN LIMINE OF PLAINTIFF RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP D/B/A 50ONRED TO PRECLUDE PRE-CONTRACTUAL EVIDENCE. (FILED UNDER SEAL) (ems) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Notice of Intent to Raise Issues of Foreign Law Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 44.1 filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD., certificate of service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) Modified on 6/26/2014 (fb). (Entered: 06/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Reply Brief in Support with Certificate of Service filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
Response to June 16, 2014 Letter to the Court filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP, certificate of service. (FLETMAN, ABBE) Modified on 6/18/2014 (fb, ). (Entered: 06/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO STRIKE filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None
REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Compel filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (KELLEY, JOANNE) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Compel filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS REVIZER, LTD AND REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES, LTD TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFF RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP D/B/A 50 ON RED TO COMPEL FULL AND COMPLETE RESPONSES TO ITS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION IS EXTENDED UNTIL 6/9/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 6/5/2014. 6/6/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (ems) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD , Notice of Intention to Raise Issues of Foreign Law Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedures 44.1, with Certificate of Service (SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.Memorandum of Law in Support and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS RESCHEDULED FOR 6/30/2014 AT 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM 14A BEFORE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/23/2014. 5/23/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel full and Complete Responses to Requests for Production filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.MEMORANDUM, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE.(FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS IS DISMISSED AS MOOT IN LIGHT OF PLAINTIFF'S FILING A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/12/2014.5/13/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD, filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FILED UNDER SEAL)(kp, ) (Entered: 05/09/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT THE JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 5/5/2014.5/5/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.Joint Motion for Protective Order. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Joint Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Stipulated Proposed Order)(KELLEY, JOANNE) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6), MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(SEGAL, DANIEL) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re 19 Transcript - PDF, 4/16/2014 Entered and Copies Emailed.(kp, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of HEARING held on 4/1/2014, before Judge BUCKWALTER. Court Reporter/Transcriber AJ FOLLMER/DIANA DOMAN TRANSCRIBING. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/7/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/19/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2014. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT RE: On 4/09/2014, Steven Carey, Deputy Clerk mailed a copy of the Amended Complaint and Summons upon Revizer Ltd. by registered mail,return receipt requested. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
Letter to the Clerk of Court from Abbe F. Fletman, Esq. on 4/7/2014 RE: Clerk's Office Service of Summons and Amended Complaint pursuant to Rule 4(f)(2)(c)(ii). (kp, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND A PRELIMINARY INJUCTION IS DENIED AS TO A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. DEFENDANT SHALL APPEAR BEFORE THIS COURT 6/3/2014 AT 10:00AM IN COURTROOM 14A TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT GRANT PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. ALL DISCOVERY AS TO PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IS DUE 5/27/2014. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/3/2014. 4/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/3/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 4/3/2014. 4/3/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 04/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2014 re 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP Court Reporter: A. FOLLMER. (kp, ) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
AMENDED DOCUMENT by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. Amendment to 12 Declaration of Abbe F. Fletman. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
Declaration re 7 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Declaration of Abbe F. Fletman by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Appearance by DYLAN J. STEINBERG on behalf of REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD with Certificate of Service(STEINBERG, DYLAN) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
Verification of Stephen Gill by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (FLETMAN, ABBE) Modified on 4/2/2014 (lisad, ). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE to Motion re 7 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Sagis, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(SEGAL, DANIEL) Modified on 4/1/2014 (kp, ). (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against REVIZER LTD., REVIZER TECHNOLOGIES LTD, filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT A, # 2 EXHIBIT B)(kp, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.Amended Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Proposed Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause, # 2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(KELLEY, JOANNE) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
ORDER THAT A HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER IS SET FOR 4/1/2014 AT 04:00 PM IN COURTROOM 1A BEFORE HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE RONALD L. BUCKWALTER ON 3/26/2014. 3/27/2014 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP, E-MAILED.(kp, ) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.Brief, Declaration and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 12 Exhibit J to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 13 Exhibit K to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 14 Exhibit L to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 15 Exhibit M to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 16 Exhibit N to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 17 Exhibit O to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 18 Exhibit P to Declaration of Stephen Gill, # 19 Text of Proposed Order, # 20 Text of Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order and Rule to Show Cause, # 21 Certificate of Service)(FLETMAN, ABBE) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT RE: On 3/12/2014, Steven Carey, Deputy Clerk mailed a copy of the Complaint and Summons upon Revizer Ltd. by registered mail,return receipt requested. (kp, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
Letter to the Clerk of Court from Abbe F. Fletman, Esq. RE: Clerk's Office Service of Summons and Complaint pursuant to Rule 4(f)(2)(c)(ii).(kp, ) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP.(tj, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against REVIZER LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097320.), filed by RED ONLINE MARKETING GROUP, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Designation Form, # 3 Case Management Track Form)(tj, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2014: # 4 Ex A, # 5 Ex B) (tj, ). (Entered: 03/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 256 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?