Mendoza v. LAINESITA RESTAURANT CORP. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-04188

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 2:14 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Campos Santos, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Rodriguez +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 atarazi@laborlaws.com
TERMINATED: 08/02/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
No Logo Doris Mendoza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Edward Lee Sample , II

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/08/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Lee Sample, II +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547

Toggle Switch Represented by Frank & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/18/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea E. Batres +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil Michael. Frank +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 nfrank@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrea Rodriguez +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 atarazi@laborlaws.com
TERMINATED: 08/02/2015, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Arcadio Romero +1 631 756 0400 +1 631 756 0547 promero@laborlaws.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Alec Stockman +1 212 608 1178 +1 212 608 2913 jstockman@laborlaws.com
v.
No Logo Eduardo Pabon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Fenicia Restaurant Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Fernando Pabon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Juan Carlos Pabon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Lainesita Restaurant Corp. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Marco.T.Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Stefita Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
No Logo Stephanie Pabon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Andrew D. Presberg, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew David Presberg +1 631 232 4444 apresberg@presberg.com
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Pretrial Conference - Initial
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Proposed Pretrial Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Adjourn Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Order(Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER IN RE CASES RE-ASSIGNED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 4/27/2015. (Attachments: # 1 AYS Rules) (Torres, Jasmine) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Status Conference
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT granting 37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; That Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint, a copy of which is attached hereto; that counsel for Defendants will accept service of the Second Amended Complaint and shall file a responsive pleading within two weeks of the filing of the Second Amended Complaint; that Plaintiff, through the filing of the Second AmendedComplaint, will withdraw all wage and hour claims (First and Second Claims in First Amended Complaint) with prejudice and said Second Amended Complaint shall only include the existing discrimination claims pursuant to N.Y. Executive Law §296, Title VII of the Civil Rights Act of 1964, as amended, 42 U.S.C. § 2000e et seq ("Title VII") and 42 U.S.C. § 1981 et seq., as amended by the Civil Rights Act of 1991 ("§ 1981") (Third, Fourth and Fifth Claims in FirstAmended Complaint); that Plaintiff hereby voluntarily dismisses Defendant Stephanie Pabon as a party to this action with prejudice, and that the caption of the Second Amended Complaint shall be amended to reflect said discontinuance; and that this Stipulation may be signed in counterparts and by facsimile, pdf, or electronic signatures, all of which shall be treated as an original when taken together. (Ordered by Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/12/2014.)(Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Fagan, Linda) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Discovery Hearing
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 31 MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Compel
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Letter MOTION to Dismiss by Doris Mendoza. (Rodriguez, Andrea) Modified on 7/9/2014 (Fagan, Linda). (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Rodriguez, Andrea) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Doris Mendoza. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER re 25 : See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/28/2014. c/ecf (Miller, Dina) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY in Opposition filed by All Defendants. (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Compel by Doris Mendoza. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Letter MOTION for Discovery completion extension by Fenicia Restaurant Corp.. (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Fenicia Restaurant Corp., Lainesita Restaurant Corp., Marco.T.Corp., Eduardo Pabon, Fernando Pabon, Juan Carlos Pabon, Stephanie Pabon, Stefita Corporation. (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File sur-reply by Fenicia Restaurant Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit copy of email) (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY in Support re 19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Complaint filed by Doris Mendoza. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 19 First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E) (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement the Complaint by Doris Mendoza. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration) (Batres, Andrea) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY in Support of MOTION for pre motion conference to Amend the Complaint filed by Doris Mendoza. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION for pre motion conference to Amend the Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/10/2013 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/9/2013. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay:Initial Conference held on 1/9/2013: The proposed scheduling order was discussed and dates were agreed upon. Counsel for the plaintiff agreed to provide defense counsel with a copy of plaintiffs right to sue letter and a copy of the proposed amended complaint. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION for pre motion conference to Amend the Complaint Opposition to Pre-Motion Conference filed by All Defendants. (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION for pre motion conference to Amend the Complaint by Doris Mendoza. (Sample, Edward) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/7/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Scheduling Order) c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fenicia Restaurant Corp., Lainesita Restaurant Corp., Marco.T.Corp., Eduardo Pabon, Fernando Pabon, Juan Carlos Pabon, Stephanie Pabon, Stefita Corporation (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Presberg, Andrew) (Entered: 09/14/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Mendoza. Fernando Pabon served on 8/28/2012, answer due 9/18/2012. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Mendoza. Stephanie Pabon served on 8/28/2012, answer due 9/18/2012. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Mendoza. Juan Carlos Pabon served on 8/28/2012, answer due 9/18/2012. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Mendoza. Eduardo Pabon served on 8/28/2012, answer due 9/18/2012. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Doris Mendoza. Lainesita Restaurant Corp. served on 8/29/2012, answer due 9/19/2012. (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Doris Mendoza (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            CONSENT to become party in a class action. by Campos Santos (Romero, Peter) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Fenicia Restaurant Corp., LAINESITA RESTAURANT CORP., MARCO.T.CORP., JUAN CARLOS PABON, Eduardo Pabon, Fernando Pabon, Stephanie Pabon, Stefita Corporation Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Doris Mendoza. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Padilla, Kristin) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 40 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?