United States of America v. Osram Sylvania, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-01621

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 1:21 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Northern District of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine A. Abend +1 202 514 2463 +1 202 616 6584 katherine.abend@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Osram Sylvania, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi B. Friedman +1 216 566 5559 +1 216 566 5800 heidi.goldstein@thompsonhine.com
Philips Electronics North America Corporation Philips Electronics North America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Philips Electronics North America Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph E. Innamorati +1 978 659 4636

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Atriano +1 614 365 2783 +1 614 365 2499 vincent.atriano@squirepb.com
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Consent Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Case Management Conference Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
        Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (M,L) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
          Notice of Lodging of Consent Decree filed by United States. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Decree)(Abend, Katherine) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 47 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?