VALLABHANENI v. ENDOCYTE, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Southern District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-01048-TWP-MJD
District Judge Tanya Walton Pratt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 4:19 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI , Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brattain & Minnix

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mario Garcia +1 317 231 1750 +1 317 231 1760 mgarcia@brattainminnix.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahn Gauthier Swick, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig John Geraci, Jr. +1 504 455 1400 craig.geraci@ksfcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahn Swick & Foti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J Ryan Lopatka +1 504 455 1400 +1 504 455 1498 j.lopatka@ksfcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2040

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kim Elaine Miller +1 212 696 3730 +1 504 455 1498 kim.miller@ksfcounsel.com
No Logo Tony Nguyen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jennifer L. Schmidt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles C. Hayes +1 317 491 1050 charleshayes.atty@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis Wagner LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. Richard Blaiklock +1 317 237 0500 +1 317 630 2790 rblaiklock@lewiswagner.com
v.
No Logo ANN F. HANHAM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo BETH TAYLOR , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy L. Woods +1 317 632 3232 +1 317 632 2962 jwoods@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Lee, Pei Fung

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judy L. Woods +1 317 632 3232 +1 317 632 2962 jwoods@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Lee, Pei Fung

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam Selim Hakki +1 212 848 4924 +1 646 848 4924 ahakki@shearman.com
No Logo Endocyte, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
Space Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
Space Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com
No Logo FRED A. MIDDLETON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo JOHN C. APLIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo KEITH E. BRAUER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo LESLEY RUSSELL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo MARC KOZIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo MICHAEL A SHERMAN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo P. RON ELLIS, Defendant
No Logo PETER D. MELDRUM, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
No Logo PHILIP S. LOW, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel E. Pulliam +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 daniel.pulliam@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher G Scanlon +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 chris.scanlon@faegrebd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul A. Wolfla +1 317 237 0300 +1 317 237 1000 paul.wolfla@faegrebd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 3400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joni S. Jacobsen +1 312 646 5813 +1 312 646 5858 joni.jacobsen@dechert.com
  Entries (124) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
USCA Case Number 16-1454 for 124 Notice of Appeal filed by GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (MAG) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
    Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 124 Notice of Appeal. - for Court of Appeals Use Only. (LBT) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: None
      PARTIES' SHORT RECORD re 124 Notice of Appeal - Instructions for Attorneys and Designation of Record information attached. (LBT) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 124 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 119 Entry on Motion to Dismiss, 122 Order, and 123 Closed Judgment, filed by Plaintiff GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Filing fee $505, receipt number 0756-3798690) (Garcia, Mario) Modified on 3/1/2016 to create links to additional documents (LBT). (Entered: 03/01/2016)
          LREF
          Blank 123 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. PRO. 58 - Having granted Defendants' motion to dismiss in relation to all of the Plaintiff's claims, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/2/2016.(JLS) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER - As of this date, the Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint that would meet the requirements of the Court's prior order. As a result, the Court AMENDS its prior to order and DISMISSES with prejudice the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (Filing No. 107.) The Court will enter final judgment by separate order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 2/2/2016.(JLS) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE - Christopher G. Scanlon of the law firm of Faegre Baker Daniels LLP, having moved the Court for leave to withdraw his appearance on behalf of Endocyte, Inc., John C. Alpin, Keith E. Brauer, Ann F. Hanham, Marc Kozin, Philip S. Low, Peter D. Meldrum, Fred A. Middleton, Lesley Russell, P. Ron Ellis, Beth Taylor and Michael A. Sherman, and the Court having reviewed the same and being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS said Motion. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED, that the Appearance of Christopher G. Scanlon is hereby WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/14/2016. (JLS) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                MOTION of Withdrawal of Appearance by Christopher G. Scanlon on behalf of JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order On Motion for Leave to Withdraw Appearance of Christopher G. Scanlon) (Scanlon, Christopher) Modified on 1/14/2016 (JLS). Modified on 1/14/2016 (JLS). (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ENTRY ON MOTION TO DISMISS - The Court DISMISSES without prejudice the Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Filing No. 107). The Plaintiff is allowed up to Monday, February 1, 2016 to demonstrate sufficient facts exist to justify an amended pleading, consistent with this Order. If the Plaintiff does not present such facts by that time, dismissal will be changed to with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/4/2016. (JLS) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE ORAL ARGUMENT - The parties, by their respective counsel, by counsel, having filed a Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument, and the Court having reviewed the Stipulation finds that the request to continue the December 1, 2015, Oral Argument should be and hereby is DENIED. Upon further review the Court declines to hear oral argument. The oral argument set December 1, 2015 is VACATED. A ruling on the pending motion will be issued in due course. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/23/2015. (JLS) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION to Continue Oral Argument, filed by Defendants CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Stipulation)(Woods, Judy) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT - Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is set for oral argument on December 1, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 344, Birch Bayh Federal Building and United States Courthouse, Indianapolis, Indiana. Parties are allotted thirty minutes each side for a total of one hour. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/22/2015.(JLS) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Angela M. Liu hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Liu, Angela) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Joni S. Jacobsen hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Jacobsen, Joni) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Carl E. Volz hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Volz, Carl) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, David H. Kistenbroker hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Kistenbroker, David) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION For Oral Argument On Their Motion To Dismiss, filed by Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
                                    REPLY in Support of Motion re 106 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Endocyte 05/13/2011 Form 10-Q Excerpts, # 2 Exhibit 2 - November 27, 2012 Press Release)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Plaintiff GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Miller, Kim) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Status Conference held on 3/10/2015. The parties report that the motion to dimsiss has been filed and briefing is proceeding. A discussion was further held regarding a related matter at 1:14-cv-01551-SEB-DML. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (NLR) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 106 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Endocyte 3/5/2014 Form 10-K, # 3 Exhibit 2 - 3/20/2014 CHMP Opinion, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 3/25/2014 Shelf Registration, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 3/25/2014 Prospectus)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/6/2015, Entered: None
                                            MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting Parties' 102 Motion for Joni S. Jacobsen to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 2/2/2015. Copy sent to Ms. Jacobsen via U.S. Mail. (BGT) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                RECEIPT #IP044342 for pro hac vice fee (for attorney Joni S. Jacobsen) in the amount of $30.00, paid by Faegre Baker & Daniels LLP. (DJH) Modified on 2/2/2015 (DJH). (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Joni S. Jacobsen to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certification of Joni S. Jacobsen, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulliam, Daniel) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Status Conference held on 1/14/2015. The newly named Defendants confirmed they would be prepared to file a motion to dismiss by the March 6, 2015 deadline. A discussion was further held regarding a related matter at 1:14-cv-01551-SEB-DML. Status Conference set for 3/10/2015 at 10:30 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore.*see order for additional information*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (NLR) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent CREDIT SUISSE HOLDINGS (USA), INC., Corporate Parent CREDIT SUISSE (USA), INC., Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG, Corporate Parent Credit Suisse AG for CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC.. (Woods, Judy) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC. identifying Corporate Parent CITIGROUP INC., Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Corporate Parent Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC... (Woods, Judy) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER - granting 92 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Adam S. Hakki for CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., Adam S. Hakki for CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/15/2015. (CKM) Copy Mailed. (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER - granting 91 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Agnes Dunogue for CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., Agnes Dunogue for CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 1/15/2015. (CKM) Copy Mailed. (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (LAB) (MGG) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Pulliam on behalf of Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Pulliam, Daniel) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Scanlon on behalf of Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Scanlon, Christopher) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Wolfla on behalf of Defendants JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION for Attorney(s) Adam S. Hakki to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3315534), filed by Defendants CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Adam S. Hakki, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear)(Woods, Judy) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Attorney(s) Agnes Dunogue to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3315522), filed by Defendants CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Certification of Agnes Dunogue, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear)(Woods, Judy) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Judy L. Woods on behalf of Defendants CITIGROUP GLOBAL MARKETS INC., CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA) LLC. (Woods, Judy) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting 87 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Samuel Duncan Krahulik is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 12/15/2014. (MGG) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Movant VIJAY VUYYURU. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Summons Issued as to JOHN C. APLIN, KEITH E. BRAUER, ANN F. HANHAM, MARC KOZIN, PHILIP S. LOW, PETER D. MELDRUM, FRED A. MIDDLETON, LESLEY RUSSELL, MICHAEL A SHERMAN, BETH TAYLOR. (MGG) (Entered: 12/11/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Status Conference held on 12/5/2014. Plaintiff reported on the status of service of the newly added Defendants. In light of the joinder or new Defendants, the Court amends the Court's Minute Entry for September 26, 2014 [Dkt. 78] as follows: Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint, to include the filing of any motion to dismiss, on or before March 6, 2015. If a motion to dismiss is filed, Plaintiff shall respond thereto on or before April 6, 2015 and Defendant shall file any reply in support of the motion on or before April 20, 2015. Status Conference set for 1/14/2015 at 01:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *see order for additional information*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (NLR) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Mario Garcia hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (MGG) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Miller, Kim) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Submission of Signature Requirement re 79 Amended Complaint by GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Miller, Kim) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., filed by GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI.(Geraci, Craig) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: ; Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2014. The Court orders as follows:1.Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before November 17, 2014.2.Defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint, to include the filing of any motion to dismiss, on or before December 22, 2014. If a motion to dismiss is filed, Plaintiff shall respond thereto on or before January 26, 2015 and Defendant shall file any reply in support of the motion on or before February 9, 2015. In light of the above order, the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of an Interim Scheduling Order [Dkt. 9] is DENIED AS MOOT. Status Conference set for 12/5/2014 03:00 PM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. *see order for additional information*. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (NLR) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 76 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Brad A. Catlin and Ronald J. Waicukauski withdrawn on behalf of Movant, Ho Wing Sit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/25/2014. (CBU) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Movant HO WING SIT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting 72 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney A. Richard Blaiklock withdrawn as to TONY NGUYEN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/24/2014. (MAC) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 71 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of Offer Korin on behalf of WESLEY E. YORK. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/24/2014. (MAC) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MARGINAL APPROVAL re 69 NOTICE of Withdrawal. Docket entries 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel filed by HO WING SIT, 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by HO WING SIT AND 15 Declaration filed by HO WING SIT are WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/23/2014.(MGG) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance of A. Richard M. Blaiklock, filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance, filed by Movant WESLEY F. YORK. This was docketed for administrative purposes, previously filed in Case No. 1:14-cv- 01162-TWP-MJD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(MGG) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Movant's Ho Wing Sit (Filing No. 13 ), Endocyte Investors Group (Filing No. 25 ), and Vijay Vuyyuru (Filing No. 28 ) Motions are DENIED and Mr. Vallabhaneni's Motion (Filing No. 33 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is Ordered to consolidate Case No. 1:14-cv-01162-TWP-MJD with and under Case No. 1:14-cv-01048-TWP-MJD. The Clerk shall administratively close Case No. 1:14-cv- 01162-TWP-MJD. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:14-cv- 01048-TWP- MJD and the caption shall read: Gopichand Vallabhaneni, on Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated, plaintiff vs. Endocyte, Inc. and P. Ron Ellis, Defendants. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/22/2014. (MGG) Modified on 9/23/2014 (MGG). (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal, filed by Movant HO WING SIT, re 15 Declaration, 40 Submission of Signature Requirement, 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Plaintiff Movant's 63 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney J. Ryan Lopatka for GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI added. If not already registered with the Court's Electronic Filing System, Ryan Lopatka is ordered to so register within ten (10) days of entry of this order. Copy mailed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/12/2014. (AH) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER-Pretrial Conference reset for 9/26/2014 11:30 AM in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/11/2014.(CBU) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Non-Opposition, filed by Movant VIJAY VUYYURU, re 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Movant GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) J. Ryan Lopatka to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3185886), filed by Movant GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              MARGINAL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPROVAL regarding withdrawal of 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases, 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support and 12 DECLARATION of Charles Hayes. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/11/2014. (MGG) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                MARGINAL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF APPROVAL regarding withdrawal of 22 Motion, 23 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support and 24 DECLARATION of Thomas J. McKenna. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/10/2014. (MGG) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 55 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Kim E. Miller for GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2014 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 54 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Craig J. Geraci for GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2014 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Withdrawalof appointment as lead counsel, etc. by JOHN A. CERITELLI (Hayes, Charles) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 47 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Offer Korin withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/10/2014. (CBU) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Withdrawal of Lead Plaintiff Motion, filed by Movants MARK CUTHBERT, VICTOR VELOSO, re 22 MOTION OF THE CUTHBERT GROUP TO CONSOLIDATE THE ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVE THE SELECTION OF COUNSEL. (Gilchrist, Scott) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Attorney(s) Kim E. Miller of Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3182664), filed by Movant GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig J. Geraci of Kahan Swick & Foti, LLC to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $30, receipt number 0756-3182632), filed by Movant GOPICHAND VALLABHANENI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Certification, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 46 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Carl E. Volz for P. RON ELLIS and ENDOCYTE, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/8/2014 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 45 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David H. Kistenbroker for P. RON ELLIS and ENDOCYTE, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/8/2014 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Angela M. Liu for P. RON ELLIS and ENDOCYTE, INC. added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/8/2014 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Movant HO WING SIT. (Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead plaintiff's selection of counsel, 22 MOTION OF THE CUTHBERT GROUP TO CONSOLIDATE THE ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVE THE SELECTION OF COUNSEL , filed by Movant ENDOCYTE INVESTORS GROU[. (Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RECEIPT #IP042370 for PHV fees for attorneys Angela M. Liu, David Kistenbroker and Carl Volz fee in the amount of $90.00, paid by FAEGRE BAKER DANIELS LLP. (AAM) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Movant WESLEY F. YORK. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korin, Offer) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Attorney(s) Carl E. Volz to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Attorney(s) David H. Kistenbroker to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Attorney(s) Angela M. Liu to Appear pro hac vice (No fee paid with this filing), filed by Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MARGINAL ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 42 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Wesley F. York to Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel. The following docket entries 17 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by WESLEY F. YORK, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Wesley F. York to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel filed by WESLEY F. YORK, 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by WESLEY F. YORK, and 20 Declaration filed by WESLEY F. YORK are WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 9/4/2014.(MGG) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion of Wesley F. York to Be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel, filed by Movant WESLEY F. YORK, re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Wesley F. York to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel. (Korin, Offer) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER - This matter for an in person pretrial conference on Tuesday, September 16, 2014 at 9:40 a.m., in room 257, United States Court House, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 9/2/2014.(MGG) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of Signature Requirement re 15 Declaration by Ho Wing Sit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA early notice, # 2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA certification of Ho Wing Sit, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Ho Wing Sit Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit 4 - The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Price Waicukauski & Riley, LLC Firm Resume)(Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brad A. Catlin on behalf of Movant Ho Wing Sit. (Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Charles C. Hayes on behalf of Movant JOHN A. CERITELLI. (Hayes, Charles) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT in Support of Motion re 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead plaintiff's selection of counsel in Support of Declaration of A. Richard M. Blaiklock, filed by Movant Endocyte Investors Group. (Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Proposed Order, filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN, re 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases . (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Mario Garcia re 33 Motion to Consolidate Cases by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Proposed Lead Plaintiff, # 2 Vallabhaneni Loss Chart, # 3 Press Release, # 4 Firm Resume of Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC)(Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Garcia on behalf of Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Garcia, Mario) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Sam D. Krahulik re 28 Motion to Consolidate CasesMotion (Other)Motion to Appoint Counsel by Vijay Vuyyuru. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B - Vuyyuru Certification, # 3 Exhibit C- Vuyyuru Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit D - Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit E - Hastings Firm Resume)(Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Movant Vijay Vuyyuru. (Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of A. Richard M. Blaiklock re 27 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Endocyte Investors Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Consolidate Cases (), MOTION for Appointment of Lead Plaintiff (), MOTION to Appoint Counsel , filed by Movant Vijay Vuyyuru. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 25 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead plaintiff's selection of counsel , filed by Movant Endocyte Investors Group. (Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Duncan Krahulik on behalf of Movant Vijay Vuyyuru. (Krahulik, Samuel) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases , appointment as lead plaintiff, and approval of lead plaintiff's selection of counsel, filed by Movant Endocyte Investors Group. (Blaiklock, A.) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Thomas J. McKenna re 22 Motion (Other) by Mark Cuthbert, Victor Veloso. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Press Release, # 2 Exhibit B-Cuthbert and Veloso Certifications, # 3 Exhibit C-Resume of Gainey, McKenna & Egleston, # 4 Exhibit D-Resume of Cohen & Malad)(Gilchrist, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 22 MOTION OF THE CUTHBERT GROUP TO CONSOLIDATE THE ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVE THE SELECTION OF COUNSEL , filed by Movants Mark Cuthbert, Victor Veloso. (Gilchrist, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION OF THE CUTHBERT GROUP TO CONSOLIDATE THE ACTIONS, APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVE THE SELECTION OF COUNSEL, filed by Movants Mark Cuthbert, Victor Veloso. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gilchrist, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Gilchrist on behalf of Movants Mark Cuthbert, Victor Veloso. (Gilchrist, Scott) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Offer Korin in Support of the Motion of Wesley F. York to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel re 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel, 19 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by Wesley F. York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Certification of Wesley F. York, # 2 Exhibit B - Loss Chart for Mr. York, # 3 Exhibit C - Press Release published on June 24, 2014 on PRNewswire, # 4 Exhibit D - Firm resume of Brower Piven, A Professional Corporation, # 5 Exhibit E - Firm resume of Katz & Korin, PC)(Korin, Offer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Wesley F. York to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel , filed by Movant Wesley F. York. (Korin, Offer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion of Wesley F. York to be Appointed Lead Plaintiff and to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Choice of Counsel, filed by Movant Wesley F. York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korin, Offer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Movant Wesley F. York. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Korin, Offer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Offer Korin on behalf of Movant Wesley F. York. (Korin, Offer) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Phillip Kim re 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, 13 Motion to Consolidate Cases by Ho Wing Sit. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA early notice, # 2 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA certification of Ho Wing Sit, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart of Ho Wing Sit, # 4 Exhibit 4 - The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Price Waicukauski & Riley, LLC Firm Resume)(Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel , filed by Movant Ho Wing Sit. (Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Approve Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Counsel, filed by Movant Ho Wing Sit. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Catlin, Brad) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Charles Hayes re 10 Motion to Consolidate Cases, 11 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Press Release, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Lead Plaintiff Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Loss Chart, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Glancy Firm Resume, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - SweeneyHayes Firm Resume)(Hayes, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Hayes, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Consolidate Cases , filed by Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hayes, Charles) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Motion (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Entry of Interim Scheduling Order, filed by Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Wolfla, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Wolfla, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Pulliam on behalf of Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Pulliam, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher G. Scanlon on behalf of Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Scanlon, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Wolfla on behalf of Defendants P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (Wolfla, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Magistrate Judge's Notice of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summonses Issued as to P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC.. (DJH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by A. Richard Blaiklock on behalf of Plaintiff TONY NGUYEN. (DJH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/24/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against P. RON ELLIS, ENDOCYTE, INC., filed by TONY NGUYEN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP041341) (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Plaintiff, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(DJH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 330 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?