Anger v. Accretive Health, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-12864

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 6, 2017 at 11:45 PM ST (3.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Joseph Anger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mantese and Rossman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Honigman +1 248 457 9200 +1 248 457 9201 dhonigman@manteselaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian M. Saxe +1 248 457 9200 +1 248 457 9201 bsaxe@manteselaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mantese Honigman, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tishia Browning +1 248 457 9200 +1 248 457 9201 tbrowning@manteselaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mike Cox Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/13/2015, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark C. Rossman +1 248 457 9200 mrossman@mikecoxlaw.com
v.
No Logo Accretive Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen A. Brogan +1 202 879 5083 +1 202 879 5200 kathleen.brogan@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Brian Clubok +1 202 879 5173 +1 202 879 5200 aclubok@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Gardner Levy +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 jennifer.levy@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Murray +1 202 879 5000 +1 202 879 5200 claire.murray@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leonid Feller, PHV +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 862 2200 leonid.feller@kirkland.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Judgment*
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None Motion - Free
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/10/2017, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Extend - free
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Extend - free
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Extend - free
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Extend - free
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Appear*
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Appear*
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Extend
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Extend - free
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None Correction
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Civil Case - Complaint, Amended
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Withdraw Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: None Certify Class
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Appear*
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: 8/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Accretive Health, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply) (Levy, Jennifer)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SUR-REPLY re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Defendants Web Page, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Class Action Complaint) (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File an Eighteen Page Sur-Reply in Response to Defendant's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs. (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Tishia Browning appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Browning, Tishia) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2015, Entered: 4/13/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting 22 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark C. Rossman.. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Mark C. Rossman by All Plaintiffs. (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Clubok on behalf of Accretive Health, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Accretive Health, Inc. (Levy, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: 3/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer G. Levy on behalf of Accretive Health, Inc.. (Levy, Jennifer)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Accretive Health, Inc.. (Murray, Claire)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Accretive Health, Inc.. (Murray, Claire)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Murray on behalf of Accretive Health, Inc.. (Murray, Claire)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Brogan on behalf of Accretive Health, Inc.. (Brogan, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ERRATA Sheet re: 13 Response to Motion,,,, filed by Joseph Anger. by Joseph Anger (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 5 - Shirley Harris v. LNV Corp., et al., # 3 Exhibit 6 - Shirley Harris v. LNV Corp., et al.) (Honigman, David) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph Anger. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Class Action Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Accretives First Letter, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Accretives Second Letter, # 5 Exhibit 4 - Medical Debt Collector to Settle Suit for $2.5 Million Article, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Nancy C. Justice, et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, # 7 Exhibit 6 - Shirley Harris v. LNV Corp., et al., # 8 Exhibit 7 - Joseph & Gina Haber v. Bank of America, N.A., # 9 Exhibit 8 - Mahala A. Church v. Accretive Health, Inc., # 10 Exhibit 9 - Donna M. Scheuer f/k/a Donna M. Millard v. Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, # 11 Exhibit 10 - Jeffrey Lovelace v. Stephens & Michaels Associates, Inc., # 12 Exhibit 11 - Antonio Soto v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., # 13 Exhibit 12 - Matt Fuller v. Exxon Mobil, M.C., # 14 Exhibit 13 - Myrna Tayag v. National City Bank, et al., # 15 Exhibit 14 - Rozann G. Bergdale v. Countrywide Bank FSB, et al, # 16 Exhibit 15 - George Munoz; Magda Reyes v. Federal National Mortgage) (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Joseph Anger. (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/3/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            STIPULATED ORDER to Extend Time to File Response re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Accretive Health, Inc.. Response due by 1/8/2015 Reply due by 2/9/2015 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER to Extend to Extend Briefing Deadlines re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Accretive Health, Inc. Response due by 11/24/2014 Reply due by 12/15/2014 Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (CPin)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss by Accretive Health, Inc.. (Feller, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  Stipulated Order Extending Response Deadline. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (LVer)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION to Extend Response Deadline by Accretive Health, Inc. (Feller, Leonid) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: 8/25/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Leonid E. Feller on behalf of Accretive Health, Inc.. (Feller, Leonid)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Accretive Health, Inc. served on 8/6/2014, answer due 8/27/2014. (Honigman, David) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued for *Accretive Health, Inc.* (KKra) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian M. Saxe appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Saxe, Brian) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark C. Rossman appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rossman, Mark) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Anger against Accretive Health, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-4741470 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Honigman, David)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 606 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?