Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. AVG Technologies USA, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-00626

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2018 at 4:37 PM DT (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 Joshua J. Bennett +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jbennett@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mangrum Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Aaron Mangrum +1 469 401 2659 brett@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Simon Law Firm, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014 Michael Patrick Kella +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2029 mkella@simonlawpc.com
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014 Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carter Stafford Arnett Hamanda & Mockler, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 Joshua J. Bennett +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 jbennett@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 E Leon Carter +1 214 550 8188 +1 214 550 8185 lcarter@carterscholer.com
TERMINATED: 04/15/2015 James Robert Arnett, II +1 214 550 8209 +1 214 550 8185 barnett@carterscholer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Scott Loveless +1 972 292 8303 +1 817 887 5950 ryan@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Ryan Casey O'Neill +1 817 332 7788 +1 817 332 7789 casey.oneill@wickphillips.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mangrum Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett Aaron Mangrum +1 469 401 2659 brett@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014 Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1260

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Russell Maynard +1 949 885 6084 scott@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Simon Law Firm, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014 Michael Patrick Kella +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2029 mkella@simonlawpc.com
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014 Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/19/2014 Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Avg Technologies Usa Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
v.
No Logo Avg Technologies Usa Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Avg Technologies Usa Inc., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Ableton, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Novak Druce, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Sloan Coats, III +1 415 814 6161 +1 415 814 6165 william.coats@novakdruce.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste 2800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Klein Ayers +1 214 939 5497 +1 214 939 5849 jennifer.ayers@klgates.com
No Logo Acronis Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Roman +1 212 484 3900 +1 212 484 3990

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Altova Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 281 501 3490 +1 832 415 2535 mcollins@ip-lit.com
No Logo Arcsoft, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DelGiorno IP Law PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew DelGiorno +1 214 601 5390 matt@delgiornolaw.com
No Logo Avanquest North America Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Miles Aurzada +1 214 721 8041 +1 214 721 8100 keith.aurzada@bryancave.com
Brocade Communications Systems, Inc. Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com
No Logo Cambium Learning Group, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
Canon USA, Inc. Canon USA, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/17/2015 Jenna Marie Gillingham +1 312 845 1200 +1 312 845 5500 jenna.gillingham@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William James McCabe +1 212 596 9018 +1 646 728 2673 william.mccabe@ropesgray.com
No Logo Chief Architect, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells St John Ps

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark W Hendricksen mhendricksen@wellsstjohn.com
No Logo Code 42 Software, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robins Kaplan Miller & Ciresi - Minneapolis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jacob M. Holdreith +1 612 349 8500 +1 612 339 4181 jholdreith@robinskaplan.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles W. Goehringer, Jr. +1 409 654 6700 +1 409 835 2115 cwgoehringer@germer.com
No Logo Comodo Ca Ltd., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Comodo CA Limited"
No Logo Comodo Communications, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Comodo Group Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
No Logo Comodo Security Solutions, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen Franklin Gardner +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 allen@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV +1 903 597 8311 patrickclutter@potterminton.com
No Logo Corel, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Domingo Manuel Llagostera +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 dllagostera@blankrome.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Alan Rutherford +1 713 228 6601 +1 713 228 6605 krutherford@blankrome.com
No Logo Drs Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 600

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Matthew Connor +1 303 607 3368 +1 303 265 9472 jmconnor@kilpatricktownsend.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 303 571 4000 +5714 571 571 4321 dsipiora@kilpatricktownsend.com
No Logo Edgewater Marine Industries, LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lyondell Bassell Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F Lee Butler +1 713 308 0100 +1 713 652 5152 lee.butler@arlaw.com
No Logo Embarcadero Technologies, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by TechMark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Neil D. Greenstein +1 858 704 0515 +1 408 280 2250 ndg@techmark.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Knight LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vishal Hemant Patel +1 214 969 1224 +1 214 880 3224 vishal.patel@tklaw.com
No Logo Encore Software, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Griffith Bates Champion & Harper Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey L Griffith casey.griffith@griffithbates.com
No Logo Juniper Networks, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
No Logo Kaspersky Lab, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Patterson Thuente Pedersen, P.a.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey A Kniser +1 612 349 5740 +1 612 349 9266 kniser@ptslaw.com
No Logo Kofax, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Native Instruments North America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lerner David Littenberg Krumholz & Mentilk, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory S. Gewirtz +1 908 654 5000 +1 908 654 7866 ggewirtz@ldlkm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Weber LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert William Weber +1 903 223 5656 +1 903 223 5652 bweber@smithweber.com
No Logo Parallels, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ricardo Joel Bonilla +1 214 747 5071 +1 214 747 2091 rbonilla@fr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com
No Logo Perfect World Entertainment, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of MATTHEW GROSSMAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark P Wine +1 949 852 7704 +1 949 567 6710 mwine@orrick.com
No Logo Rapid7 LLC, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 125

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James Collins +1 281 501 3490 +1 832 415 2535 mcollins@ip-lit.com
No Logo Rockstar Games, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ramey and Flock

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter Thomas Henson +1 903 597 3301 +1 903 597 2413 thenson@rameyflock.com
No Logo Sdl International America Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "SDL International America Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Lee Gillam, Jr. +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 gil@gillamsmithlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com
Sega Of America, Inc. Sega Of America, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo TLM, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Almasri & Marzwanian Law Firm PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Roger Brian Craft +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 bcraft@findlaycraft.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric Hugh Findlay +1 903 534 1100 +1 903 534 1137 efindlay@findlaycraft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lane Powell, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Bodine +1 206 223 7000 bodineb@lanepowell.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Douglas Swanson +1 206 223 7000 +1223710 +12 223 7107 Swansonp@lanepowell.com
No Logo Trend Micro Inc., Consol Defendant
Officially listed as "Trend Micro Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Hopkins & Carley ALC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff +1 408 286 9800 +1 408 998 4790 jratinoff@hopkinscarley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan J Sinclair +1 650 798 6700 +1 650 798 6701 bryan.sinclair@klgates.com
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Valve Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Allan Lujin +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 plujin@shb.com
No Logo Zebra Technologies Corporation, Consol Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
  Entries (162) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal between Embarcadero Technologies, Inc. and Plaintiffs by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 89 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV and Michael E Jones terminated as counsel for Defendants AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Comodo Security Solutions, Inc., Comodo Group,Inc. and Comodo Communications, Inc. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/13/16. (mjc, ) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Michael E. Jones and Patrick C. Clutter by AVG Technologies USA, Inc., Comodo Communications, Inc., Comodo Group, Inc., Comodo Security Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of IPR Decisions Concerning the Patent-in-Suit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh A Decision -IPR2015-01207, # 2 Exhibit Exh B Decision -IPR2016-00414, # 3 Exhibit Exh C Decision -IPR2016-00427)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Appeal of Decision in Related IPR Proceeding (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Docketing, # 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeal)(Etheridge, James) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/16/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Edgar Leon Carter; James Robert Arnett, II and Joshua James Bennett terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, ) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/25/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None Order Staying Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: 7/21/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: 7/7/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/2/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: 5/30/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: 5/29/2014 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: 5/1/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/28/2014 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 Response to Non-Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/1/2013 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?