Internet Communications Solutions LLC v. Microsoft Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:14-cv-00189

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 5:09 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Internet Communications Solutions LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shawn Alexander Latchford +1 903 255 1000 +1 903 255 0800 slatchford@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by benefieldlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Aaron Benefield +1 903 212 3222 +1 903 212 3738 michael@benefieldlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berend & Lindsey, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/30/2014 Christie Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@berendlindsey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bragalone Conroy PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan H. Rastegar +1 214 785 6670 +1 214 785 6680 jrastegar@bcpc-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
v.
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Unknown Role, Facebook, Inc.
Unknown Role, Visiocorp
Unknown Role, Immersion Corp
Unknown Role, Avanade Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Microsoft Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Killough +1 425 703 8865 +1 425 869 1327 davkill@microsoft.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nathaniel C. Love +1 312 853 7804 +1 312 853 7036 nlove@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John W McBride +1 312 853 7000 jwmcbride@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DAVID T. PRITIKIN +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 dpritikin@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ellen Sue Robbins +1 312 853 7000 erobbins@sidley.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Herman F Webley PHV, Jr. +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 hwebley@sidley.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 4000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bryan Alan Blumenkopf +1 213 896 6000 +1 213 896 6600 bblumenkopf@sidley.com
No Logo Skype Communications S.a r.l. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
No Logo Skype, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Cederoth +1 312 853 7000 +1 312 853 7036 rcederoth@sidley.com
No Logo David Keyzer, Technical Advisor

Toggle Switch Represented by 5170 Golden Foothill Parkway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Michael Keyzer +1 916 243 5259 +1 916 404 0436 david@keyzerlaw.com
No Logo Francis McGovern, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by Francis McGovern

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis McGovern mcgovern@law.duke.edu
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/6/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Reply to Claim Construction Brief
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Brief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/7/2014, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Discovery
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling, Protective or Discovery Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2014., Jury Selection set for 7/13/2015 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Mediation Completion due by 2/27/2015., Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Motions due by 5/11/2015., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/25/2015. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/16/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Agreed MOTION For Entry Of Docket Control And Discovery Orders by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Internet Communications Solutions LLC . (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 7/15/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Internet Communications Solutions LLC . (Bumgardner, Barry) Modified on 7/15/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 07/15/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/11/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Francis E. McGovern, Room 4182, 210 Science Drive, Box 90362. Durham, NC 27708-0362, telephone number 919.613.7095 and fax number 919.613.7231, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/11/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge David Folsom, filed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting 42 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/01/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shawn A. Latchford on behalf of Internet Communications Solutions LLC (Latchford, Shawn) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Seal by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Of Order In Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 37 Sealed Motion to file under seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/17/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 39 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/17/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 6/17/2014 (ch, ). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/06/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 35 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Barry J. Bumgardner, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2014 02:00 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Responses due by 6/5/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/28/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael A. Benefield on behalf of Internet Communications Solutions LLC (Benefield, Michael) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 23 Motion to Seal Motion to Dismiss or Transfer. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/6/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Skype Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Springboard Acquisition Corp. for Skype Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Skype Communications S.a r.l. identifying Corporate Parent Springboard Acquisition Corp. for Skype Communications S.a r.l.. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        SEALED MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of N. Love, # 2 Exhibit A-1 to Declaration of N. Love, # 3 Exhibit A-2 to Declaration of N. Love, # 4 Exhibit A-3 to Declaration of N. Love, # 5 Exhibit B to Declaration of N. Love, # 6 Exhibit C to Declaration of N. Love, # 7 Exhibit D to Declaration of N. Love, # 8 Exhibit E to Declaration of N. Love, # 9 Exhibit F to Declaration of N. Love, # 10 Exhibit G to Declaration of N. Love, # 11 Exhibit H to Declaration of N. Love, # 12 Exhibit I to Declaration of N. Love, # 13 Exhibit J to Declaration of N. Love, # 14 Exhibit K to Declaration of N. Love, # 15 Exhibit L to Declaration of N. Love, # 16 Exhibit M to Declaration of N. Love, # 17 Exhibit N to Declaration of N. Love, # 18 Exhibit O to Declaration of N. Love, # 19 Exhibit P to Declaration of N. Love, # 20 Exhibit Q to Declaration of N. Love, # 21 Exhibit R to Declaration of N. Love, # 22 Exhibit S to Declaration of N. Love, # 23 Exhibit T to Declaration of N. Love, # 24 Exhibit U to Declaration of N. Love, # 25 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hart Rastegar on behalf of Internet Communications Solutions LLC (Rastegar, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie Brow Lindsey on behalf of Internet Communications Solutions LLC (Lindsey, Christie) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Killough on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Killough, David) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Herman F Webley on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4641169. (Webley, Herman) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ellen S Robbins on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4641156. (Robbins, Ellen) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David T Pritikin on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4641145. (Pritikin, David) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel C Love on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4641125. (Love, Nathaniel) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard A Cederoth on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4641096. (Cederoth, Richard) (Entered: 05/01/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Skype Communications S. r.l. deadline is 5/5/2014. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 4/25/2014. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO MOVE, ANSWER, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Skype Communications S.a r.l.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Skype Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Skype Inc..( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.( Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. Microsoft Corporation served on 3/13/2014, answer due 4/3/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. Skype Inc. served on 3/7/2014, answer due 3/28/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Skype Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Microsoft Corporation)(ch, ) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Internet Communications Solutions LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, Skype Communications S.a r.l., Skype Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4553060.), filed by Internet Communications Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,625,584)(Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?